Kelley et al v. City of Dallas et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-01015
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 16, 2017 at 12:22 AM EDT (7.7 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo D.D., Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Emmanuel U. Obi +1 214 207 1349 +1 855 988 5677 eobi@obilawfirm.com
No Logo Lasondra E. Kelley, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Emmanuel U. Obi +1 214 207 1349 +1 855 988 5677 eobi@obilawfirm.com
No Logo Marjurita D Kelley, Plaintiff

Represented by Emmanuel U. Obi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Emmanuel U. Obi +1 214 207 1349 +1 855 988 5677 eobi@obilawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Abigail Dominguez, Defendant
AT&T Mobility LLC AT&T Mobility LLC, Defendant

Represented by AT&T, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Charles J Blanchard +1 214 757 3348 +1 214 746 2211 charles.blanchard@att.com
No Logo Chief Of Police David O Brown, Defendant

Represented by City of Dallas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Stefani Rashal Williams +1 214 671 1501 +1 214 670 0622 stefani.williams@dallascityhall.com

Represented by Dallas City Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing J G Schuette +1 214 670 3519 + 214 670 0622 jason.schuette@dallascityhall.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Tatia R Wilson +1 214 671 9553 +1 214 670 0622 tatia.wilson@dallascityhall.com
No Logo City of Dallas, Defendant

Represented by Dallas City Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing J G Schuette +1 214 670 3519 + 214 670 0622 jason.schuette@dallascityhall.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Tatia R Wilson +1 214 671 9553 +1 214 670 0622 tatia.wilson@dallascityhall.com

Represented by Office of the City Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Stefani Rashal Williams +1 214 671 1501 +1 214 670 0622 stefani.williams@dallascityhall.com
No Logo Metropcs Communications, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Stephanie D Clouston +1 214 220 3400 +1 214 220 3899 stephanie.clouston@alston.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Jared M Slade +1 214 922 3424 jared.slade@alston.com
Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Defendant
Officer/Director, Greenfield Online Inc.
Officer/Director, Crisp Acquisition Corp
Officer/Director, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Officer/Director, Visiocorp
Officer/Director, Immersion Corp
Officer/Director, Avanade Inc.
Officer/Director, Acies Acquisition Corp.

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Andrew LeGrand +1 214 698 3405 +1 214 571 2960 alegrand@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Veronica S. Lewis +1 214 698 3320 +1 214 571 2900 vlewis@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Microsoft International Holdings B.v., Defendant
Nokia Corporation Nokia Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Nokia North America, Defendant
No Logo Officer Kevin Mansell, Defendant

Represented by City of Dallas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Stefani Rashal Williams +1 214 671 1501 +1 214 670 0622 stefani.williams@dallascityhall.com

Represented by Dallas City Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing J G Schuette +1 214 670 3519 + 214 670 0622 jason.schuette@dallascityhall.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Tatia R Wilson +1 214 671 9553 +1 214 670 0622 tatia.wilson@dallascityhall.com
No Logo Southwestern Bell Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Southwestern Bell Telephone Company"

Represented by AT&T, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Charles J Blanchard +1 214 757 3348 +1 214 746 2211 charles.blanchard@att.com
T-Mobile USA, Inc. T-Mobile USA, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Stephanie D Clouston +1 214 220 3400 +1 214 220 3899 stephanie.clouston@alston.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Jared M Slade +1 214 922 3424 jared.slade@alston.com
No Logo TCL GP, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Tct Mobile Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "TCT Mobile Limited"

Represented by Hoguet Newman Regal & Kenney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, Bar Status: Not Admitted Jeffrey Alan Miller +1 212 689 8808 +1 212 689 5101 jmiller@hnrklaw.com
Bar Status: Not Admitted Joshua Daniel Rievman +1 212 689 8808 +1 212 689 5101 jrievman@hnrklaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, Bar Status: Not Admitted Lauren S Suss +1 212 689 8808 +1 212 689 5101

Represented by Thompson, Coe, Cousins & Irons LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing George Christian Gabriel +1 214 871 8216 +1 214 871 8209 cgabriel@thompsoncoe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing James L Sowder +1 214 871 8200 +1 214 871 8209 jsowder@thompsoncoe.com
No Logo Tct Mobile (us) Inc., Defendant

Represented by Hoguet Newman Regal & Kenney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, Bar Status: Not Admitted Jeffrey Alan Miller +1 212 689 8808 +1 212 689 5101 jmiller@hnrklaw.com
Bar Status: Not Admitted Joshua Daniel Rievman +1 212 689 8808 +1 212 689 5101 jrievman@hnrklaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, Bar Status: Not Admitted Lauren S Suss +1 212 689 8808 +1 212 689 5101

Represented by Thompson, Coe, Cousins & Irons LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing George Christian Gabriel +1 214 871 8216 +1 214 871 8209 cgabriel@thompsoncoe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing James L Sowder +1 214 871 8200 +1 214 871 8209 jsowder@thompsoncoe.com
Other Parties
No Logo ADR Provider, Mediator

Represented by Law Offices of Robert G. Turner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Kenneth Jay Rubenstein +1 214 528 1411 kruben@swbell.net
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (99) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by Kenneth J Rubenstein. Attorneys in Attendance: OBI, EMMANUEL; DUBE, DIMITRE; SCHUETTE, JASON; CLOUSTON, STEPHANIE; SLADE, JARED. Prv Fee: $ $975. Outcome of ADR: Parties were unable to reach a settlement. (Rubenstein, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 97 Motion to Extend Time for mediation with Mr. Rubenstein no later than July 31, 2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/8/2017) (Judge Jane J. Boyle) (Entered: 07/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint MOTION to Extend Time mediation deadline filed by City of Dallas, Abigail Dominguez, Kevin Mansell, MetroPCS Communications Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Slade, Jared) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER denying 95 Motion. The Court DENIES Defendants' Opposed Motion to Postpone the Mediation Deadline. The parties must mediate this case on or before July 21, 2017. See Doc. 40, Mediation Order. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/6/2017) (chmb) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Extend Time to complete mediation filed by City of Dallas, Kevin Mansell, MetroPCS Communications Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Slade, Jared) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority filed by Lasondra E. Kelley, Marjurita D Kelley. (ykp) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 88 Motion for Leave to File. (Unless the document has already been filed, the clerk is directed to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/28/2017) (chmb) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE filed by City of Dallas, Kevin Mansell re: 89 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority (Schuette, J) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Appendix in Support filed by MetroPCS Communications Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc re 90 Response/Objection to Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority (Clouston, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE filed by MetroPCS Communications Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc re: 89 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority (Clouston, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority filed by D.D., Lasondra E. Kelley, Marjurita D Kelley with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Obi, Emmanuel) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority filed by MetroPCS Communications Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) No. 16-10105 in the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Slade, Jared) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY filed by City of Dallas re: 69 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Schuette, J) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY filed by City of Dallas re: 70 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Schuette, J) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY filed by Kevin Mansell re: 71 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Schuette, J) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER terminating as moot 75 and 78 Motions to Extend Time. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 3/7/2017) (chmb) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY filed by MetroPCS Communications Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc re: 66 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Clouston, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE filed by D.D., Lasondra E. Kelley, Marjurita D Kelley re: 69 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Obi, Emmanuel) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE filed by D.D., Lasondra E. Kelley, Marjurita D Kelley re: 71 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Obi, Emmanuel) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE filed by D.D., Lasondra E. Kelley, Marjurita D Kelley re: 70 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Obi, Emmanuel) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emmanuel U. Obi for Hannah Stroud on behalf of D.D., Lasondra E. Kelley, Marjurita D Kelley. (Obi, Emmanuel) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Extend Deadline to File Response to 66 Motion to Dismiss filed by D.D., Lasondra E. Kelley, Marjurita D Kelley with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Dube, Dimitri) Modified text on 2/21/2017 (rekc). (Entered: 02/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dimitri Dube on behalf of D.D., Lasondra E. Kelley, Marjurita D Kelley. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Dube, Dimitri) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE filed by D.D., Lasondra E. Kelley, Marjurita D Kelley re: 66 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Obi, Emmanuel) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Response to Motions to Dismiss Filed by Defendants City of Dallas and Kevin Mansell filed by D.D., Lasondra E. Kelley, Marjurita D Kelley with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Obi, Emmanuel) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER: On this day, the Court considered the unopposed motion 73 of Plaintiffs Marjurita D. Kelley, individually and as representative of the Estate of DLisa Michelle Kelley, D.D., a minor, by and through his next friend Marjurita D. Kelley, and Lasondra E. Kelley, (collectively Plaintiffs) to extend the deadline to file their response to the Motion to Dismiss 66 filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc. and MetroPCS by one week. The Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' response is due by 2/13/2017. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 2/2/2017) (Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendants T-Mobile USA, Inc. and MetroPCS Communications, Inc. filed by D.D., Lasondra E. Kelley, Marjurita D Kelley with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Obi, Emmanuel) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Order Referring City of Dallas's 69 Renewed Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiffs' State Law Tort Claims Against the Individual Defendants; City of Dallas's 70 Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiffs' Federal Claims Against It in the Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint; and Kevin Mansell's 71 Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiffs' Federal Claims Against Him in the Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/18/2017) (twd) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kevin Mansell with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Schuette, J) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of Dallas with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Schuette, J) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction () filed by City of Dallas with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) part 1 of 1) (Schuette, J) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION re: 66 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/12/2017) (epm) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Appendix in Support filed by MetroPCS Communications Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc re 66 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Clouston, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by MetroPCS Communications Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Clouston, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 64 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court GRANTS Defendants City of Dallas and Keven Mansell's Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to File Answers or Rule 12 Motions in Response to the Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. City of Dallas and Mansell's respective answers or other responses to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 53) now due January 18, 2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 1/3/2017) (chmb) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Rule 12 Motions filed by City of Dallas, Kevin Mansell with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Schuette, J) (Entered: 01/02/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot 60 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply.; finding as moot 60 Motion for Leave to File. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 12/29/2016) (Judge Jane J Boyle) (Entered: 12/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 61 Motion to Extend Time; granting 61 Motion for Leave to File; granting 61 Motion to Expedite. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 12/29/2016) (Judge Jane J Boyle) (Entered: 12/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Amended MOTION to Extend Time to file response(), Amended MOTION for Leave to File additional pages, MOTION to Expedite consideration of this relief in light of January 4, 2017 deadline filed by MetroPCS Communications Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Slade, Jared) (Entered: 12/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 53 Amended Complaint, MOTION for Leave to File Additional Pages () filed by MetroPCS Communications Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Slade, Jared) (Entered: 12/23/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot 36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in view of the Plaintiffs' filing of their Second Amended Complaint.(doc. 53). (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 12/22/2016) (Judge Jane J Boyle) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot 35 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in view of the Plaintiffs' filing of their Second Amended Complaint.(doc. 53) (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 12/22/2016) (Judge Jane J Boyle) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in view of the Plaintiffs' filing of their Second Amended Complaint.(doc. 53). (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 12/22/2016) (Judge Jane J Boyle) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot 43 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 12/22/2016) (Judge Jane J Boyle) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot 34 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in view of the Plaintiffs' filing of their Second Amended Complaint,(doc. 53), which does not include claims against David Brown. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 12/22/2016) (Judge Jane J Boyle) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot 33 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in view of the Plaintiffs' filing of their Second Amended Complaint.(doc. 53) (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 12/22/2016) (Judge Jane J Boyle) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against City of Dallas, Abigail Dominguez, Kevin Mansell, MetroPCS Communications Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc filed by Marjurita D Kelley, D.D., Lasondra E. Kelley. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (twd) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 48 Motion for Leave to File. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) After review of the Motion for Leave and Defendants' responses, the Court finds that (1) the case is in its relative infancy; (2) Defendants have not demonstrated that any prejudice would result from permitting the amendment; and (3) justice would be best served by permitting Plaintiffs the opportunity to plead their best case. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 12/21/2016) (Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot 45 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 10/3/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE filed by MetroPCS Communications Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc re: 48 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Slade, Jared) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE filed by David O Brown, City of Dallas, Kevin Mansell re: 48 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Schuette, J) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Amended MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by D.D., Lasondra E. Kelley, Marjurita D Kelley with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s), # 2 Exhibit(s), # 3 Exhibit(s), # 4 Proposed Amendment) (Obi, Emmanuel) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY filed by MetroPCS Communications Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc re: 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Slade, Jared) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: The Court refers 45 Plaintiffs D.D., Lasondra E. Kelley, and Marjurita D. Kelley's Opposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint to United States Magistrate Judge Renee H. Toliver for hearing, if necessary, and determination or recommendation to this Court. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 8/31/2016) (trk) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by D.D., Lasondra E. Kelley, Marjurita D Kelley with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amendment, # 2 Exhibit(s)) (Obi, Emmanuel) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Order Referring Motion : The Court hereby refers these motions to United States Magistrate Judge Renee H. Toliver for hearing, if necessary, and recommendation or determination, to this Court. See 28 U.S.C.A. § 636(b) (1993) re: 29 Defendants MetroPCS Communications, Inc. and T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, 33 Defendant Kevin Mansell's Motion to Dismiss, 34 Defendant David O. Brown's Motion to Dismiss, 35 & 36 Defendant City of Dallas's Motions to Dismiss and 43 Plaintiffs D.D., Lasondra E. Kelley, and Marjurita D. Kelley's Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 8/26/2016) (ykp) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 35 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 33 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 34 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by D.D., Lasondra E. Kelley, Marjurita D Kelley with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Obi, Emmanuel) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 41 Motion to Extend Time. The Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to File Their Response to Defendants' Rule 12 Motions. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to file their responses on or before August 22, 2016. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 8/1/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Defendants' 12B Motions filed by D.D., Lasondra E. Kelley, Marjurita D Kelley with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Obi, Emmanuel) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEDIATION ORDER: The court appoints Kenneth Rubenstein as mediator. Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 7/21/2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 7/29/2016) (ran) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Designation of Mediator by MetroPCS Communications Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc. (Slade, Jared) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures filed by David O Brown, City of Dallas, Kevin Mansell (Schuette, J) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by David O Brown, City of Dallas, Kevin Mansell. (Schuette, J) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of Dallas with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Additional Page(s) TTCA 101.106) (Schuette, J) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of Dallas with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Schuette, J) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by David O Brown with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Schuette, J) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kevin Mansell with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Schuette, J) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer David O Brown answer due 7/11/2016; City of Dallas answer due 7/11/2016; Kevin Mansell answer due 7/11/2016. The Court hereby GRANTS Defendants City of Dallas's, David Brown's, and Kevin Mansell's Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to File Their Answers or Rule 12 Motions in Response to the Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. These Defendants must answer or otherwise response to Plaintiffs' amended complaint on or before July 11, 2016. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 7/11/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MetroPCS Communications Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate T-Mobile US, Inc. for T-Mobile USA Inc; Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Deutsche Telekom Holding B.V. for MetroPCS Communications Inc. (Clouston, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Appendix in Support filed by MetroPCS Communications Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc re 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Clouston, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by MetroPCS Communications Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Clouston, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Rule 12 Motions re: 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND filed by David O Brown, City of Dallas, Kevin Mansell with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney J G Schuette added to party David O Brown(pty:dft), Attorney J G Schuette added to party Kevin Mansell(pty:dft) (Schuette, J) Modified text and document linkage on 7/8/2016 (ykp). (Entered: 07/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for four-week docket beginning 12/18/2017 before Judge Jane J Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 3/23/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 3/23/2017. Motions due by 9/19/2017. Discovery due by 8/21/2017. Deadline for mediation is on or before 7/21/2017. Pretrial Order due by 12/4/2017. Pretrial Materials due by 12/4/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2017 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 6/23/2016) (trk) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by MetroPCS Communications Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc. (Slade, Jared) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 24 Motion for Leave to File. (The requesting party must file the document with the clerk.) The Court hereby GRANTS Defendants T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s and MetroPCS Communications, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to Extend Page Limit. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 6/22/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Additional Pages filed by MetroPCS Communications Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Slade, Jared) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against David O Brown, City of Dallas, Kevin Mansell, MetroPCS Communications Inc, T-Mobile USA Inc, Unknown 9-1-1 Operator filed by Marjurita D Kelley, D.D., Lasondra E. Kelley. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Obi, Emmanuel) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stefani Rashal Williams on behalf of David O Brown, City of Dallas, Kevin Mansell. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Williams, Stefani) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 20 Motion to Continue. The Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Amend Schedule and ORDERS that Plaintiffs file their amended complaint on or before May 23, 2016. The subsequent deadlines based on the date of filing the amended complaint are hereby adjusted accordingly. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 5/17/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Continue Joint Motion to Amend Schedule filed by D.D., Lasondra E. Kelley, Marjurita D Kelley with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Obi, Emmanuel) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING 18 JOINT MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULE: Plaintiffs shall file their Amended Complaint no later than 5/16/2016. The Parties' Joint Status Report shall be due 6/15/2016. Defendants named in the Amended Complaint shall file their answers and/or responses to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint no later than 6/30/2016. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 4/29/2016) (twd) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION Joint Motion to Amend Schedule filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, David O Brown, City of Dallas, D.D., Lasondra E. Kelley, Marjurita D Kelley, Kevin Mansell, MetroPCS Communications Inc, Microsoft Corporation, Southwestern Bell Telephone Company, T-Mobile USA Inc, TCT Mobile Limited, TCT Mobile US Inc (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Lewis, Veronica) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey A. Miller. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). The Court hereby GRANTS Jeffrey A. Miller's Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 4/28/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lauren S. Suss. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). The Court hereby GRANTS Lauren S. Suss's Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 4/28/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Jeffrey A. Miller (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7541446) filed by TCT Mobile Limited, TCT Mobile US, Inc. (Sowder, James) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Lauren S. Suss (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7541428) filed by TCT Mobile Limited, TCT Mobile US, Inc. (Sowder, James) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joshua D. Rievman. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). The Court hereby GRANTS Joshua D. Rievman's Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 4/25/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Joshua D. Rievman (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7531708) filed by TCT Mobile Limited, TCT Mobile US, Inc. (Sowder, James) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer David O Brown answer due 5/23/2016; Kevin Mansell answer due 5/23/2016. The Court hereby GRANTS Defendants David Brown's and Kevin Mansell's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. The Court ORDERS Brown and Mansell to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before May 23, 2016. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 4/22/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by David O Brown, Kevin Mansell (Wilson, Tatia) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 8 Motion to Extend Time. The Court hereby GRANTS the moving Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. The Court ORDERS the moving Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint on or before May 23, 2016. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 4/20/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, City of Dallas, MetroPCS Communications Inc, Microsoft Corporation, Southwestern Bell Telephone Company, T-Mobile USA Inc, TCT Mobile Limited, TCT Mobile US, Inc. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Slade, Jared) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by City of Dallas. (Schuette, J) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 5/6/2016. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 4/15/2016) (ndt) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Supplemental Document by City of Dallas as to 1 Notice of Removal, Consents to Removal by Other Properly Served Defendants. (Schuette, J). (Entered: 04/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Supplemental Document by City of Dallas as to 1 Notice of Removal, State Court Documents. (Attachments: # 1 Additional Page(s) state court docket, # 2 Additional Page(s) Tab 2 part 1 pf 3, # 3 Additional Page(s) Tab 2 part 2 of 3, # 4 Additional Page(s) Tab 2 part 3 of 3, # 5 Additional Page(s) Tab3 - Tab 25, # 6 Additional Page(s) Tab 26 - Tab 29, # 7 Additional Page(s) Tab 30 - Tab 32, # 8 Additional Page(s) Tab 33 - Tab 36) (Schuette, J) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Supplemental Document by City of Dallas as to 1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet Supplement for removal cases) (Schuette, J) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 162nd District Court, Dallas County, case number DC-16-02799 filed by City of Dallas. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-7514247) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Schuette, J) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 54 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?