Disabled in Action, et al v. Trump Intl. Hotel, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-05518
District Judge Richard J. Holwell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 20, 2017 at 11:41 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Disabled in Action of Metropolitan New York, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY EDWARD A KOPELSON +1 973 984 4000 kopelson-law@earthlink.net
No Logo Freida Zames, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY EDWARD A KOPELSON +1 973 984 4000 kopelson-law@earthlink.net
No Logo Robert Levine, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY EDWARD A KOPELSON +1 973 984 4000 kopelson-law@earthlink.net
v.
No Logo A to K Corporations, Defendant
No Logo A to K Partnerships/Proprietorships, Defendant
No Logo One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brian C. Blair +1 407 649 4050 +1 407 841 0168 bblair@bakerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Sylvia Jeanine Conley +1 212 589 4635 +1 212 589 4201 jconley@bakerlaw.com
No Logo TIHT Commercial LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by 70 Grand Avenue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory R. Begg +1 201 343 3434 +1 201 343 6306 gbegg@pecklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wigdor LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jordan K. Merson +1 212 267 4177 +1 212 233 8525 jmerson@kdlm.com
Trump International Hotel And Tower Trump International Hotel And Tower, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by 70 Grand Avenue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory R. Begg +1 201 343 3434 +1 201 343 6306 gbegg@pecklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by PECKAR & ABRAMSON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Denis Serkin +1 201 343 3434 +1 201 343 6306 dserkin@pecklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wigdor LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jordan K. Merson +1 212 267 4177 +1 212 233 8525 jmerson@kdlm.com
No Logo A to K Corporations, Cross Defendant
No Logo A to K Partnerships/Proprietorships, Cross Defendant
No Logo One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brian C. Blair +1 407 649 4050 +1 407 841 0168 bblair@bakerlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Brian C. Blair +1 407 649 4050 +1 407 841 0168 bblair@bakerlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Brian C. Blair +1 407 649 4050 +1 407 841 0168 bblair@bakerlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Brian C. Blair +1 407 649 4050 +1 407 841 0168 bblair@bakerlaw.com
No Logo TIHT Commercial LLC, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by 70 Grand Avenue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory R. Begg +1 201 343 3434 +1 201 343 6306 gbegg@pecklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory R. Begg +1 201 343 3434 +1 201 343 6306 gbegg@pecklaw.com
Trump International Hotel And Tower Trump International Hotel And Tower, Cross Defendant
No Logo Cantor Seinuk Group, PC, Cross Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gogick, Byrne & Oneil, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Jude O'Neill +1 212 422 9424 +1 212 422 9429 kjo@bonlaw.com
No Logo CK Architect, P.C., Cross Claimant
No Logo Philip Johnson Ritchie & Fiore Architects, Cross Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc Shea Krieg +1 516 499 8409 +1 631 493 0763 01marc@optonline.net
No Logo Cantor Seinuk Group, PC, ThirdParty Defendant
No Logo CK Architect, P.C., ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Zetlin & De Chiara, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Kenneth Winikow +1 516 832 1000 +1 516 832 2555 swinikow@donovanhatem.com
No Logo Leslie E. Robertson Associates, jointly and severally, ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Michael O'Connor +1 516 535 1816 +1 516 712 4013 joconner@milbermakris.com
No Logo One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership, ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brian C. Blair +1 407 649 4050 +1 407 841 0168 bblair@bakerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Sylvia Jeanine Conley +1 212 589 4635 +1 212 589 4201 jconley@bakerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Steven Nelson Kirkpatrick +1 212 801 6885 +1 212 805 5585 skirkpatrick@bbwg.com
No Logo Philip Johnson Ritchie & Fiore Architects, ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc Shea Krieg +1 516 499 8409 +1 631 493 0763 01marc@optonline.net
Trump International Hotel And Tower Trump International Hotel And Tower, ThirdParty Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 70 Grand Avenue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory R. Begg +1 201 343 3434 +1 201 343 6306 gbegg@pecklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by PECKAR & ABRAMSON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Denis Serkin +1 201 343 3434 +1 201 343 6306 dserkin@pecklaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1343
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (162) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Plaintiffs and Defendants agree that the above captioned claims between them have been settled amicably and shall be dismissed with prejudice in their entirety without costs or fees to any party pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 5/1/09) (js) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The plaintiffs and defendants agree that the above captioned claims between them have been settled anticably and shall be dismissed with prejudice in their entirety without costs or fees to any party pursuant to F.R.C.P 41. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 4/27/09) (js) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None
      AFFIRMATION OF GREGORY R. BEGG, ESQ. SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR COUNSEL FEES AND IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CLAIM WITH PREJUDICE. Document filed by Trump International Hotel & Tower. (djc) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF CROSS MOTION to Compel Settlement and MOTION to Dismiss plaintiffs' claims with prejudice. Document filed by Trump International Hotel & Tower, TIHT Commercial LLC.(djc) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Edward A. Kopelson dated 3/11/2009 re: Counsel respectfully request permission to submit Plaintiff's reply brief on Monday, March 16 rather than Friday, March as required by the Endorsed Order on March 3, 2009. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 3/11/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Edward A. Kopelson dated 2/28/2009 re: Requesting that the Court reinstate the motion and set a date for submission of Defendants opposition to the motion to award attorney's fees. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants response to the motion is to be served and filed by March 10, 2009. Any reply is due by March 13, 2009. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 3/3/2009) (jpo) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Gregory R. Begg dated 1/30/2009 re: Counsel writes to advise the Court that the parties are currently attempting to resolve this application. Plaintiff's counsel has graciously agreed to extend the date for the filling of any opposition to February 9, 2009. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 1/30/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                MOTION for Attorney Fees, w/attched Brief in support and exhibits A thru O. Document filed by Robert Levine.(pl) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Edward A. Kopelson dated 1/12/2009 re: Please permit Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys Fees pursuant to Your Honor's letter endorsed Order of December 29, 2008 to be filed one-day late. The delay is a result of expecting to file it via ECF. Only after attempting to do so was I informed that this case was not designated for electronic filing. On October 3, 2008 an endorsed Order from Judge Holwell was received by counsel via ECF. Therefore, I intended to electronically file this motion. In fact, I've been in the habit of filing electronically in federal court as result of doing so in the District of New Jersey for several years. In any event, Defendants have been timely served with the motion papers bye-mail and facsimile transmission. The original and courtesy copy of the motion papers will be delivered by FedEx overnight service. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 1/12/2009) (jmi) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Edward A. Kopelson dated 12/29/2008 re: Counsel writes requesting permission to file a motion for attorney's fees. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Plaintiff may file its fee motion be 1/12/2009. Defendants response due by 1/26/2009, with plaintiff's reply to come by 2/2/2009. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 12/29/2008) (tve) (tve). Modified on 2/27/2009 (tve). (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute. Referred to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 12/19/08) (js) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Edward Kopelson dated 9/19/08 re: Request by plaintiffs to file a motion to compel compliance and impose sanctions. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff may proceed with its motion. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 10/2/08) (cd) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                          STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT in the manner that is set forth in this Order. Without admitting any liability thereof, Defendants shall pay $40,000.00) for attorney's fees and costs to Edward A. Kopelson, Esq., as counsel for plaintiffs, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. section 12205, 28 D.F.R. section 36,505, on or before 12/27/07. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/16/08) (pl) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None
                            MANDATE of USCA WITHDRAWING APPEAL (Certified Copy) as to 110 Notice of Appeal, filed by TIHT Commercial LLC, Trump International Hotel & Tower USCA Case Number 06-3023-cv....that the appeal is hereby WITHDRAWN pursuant to Rule 42(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Roseann B. MacKechnie, Clerk USCA. Certified: 10/31/2006. (nd) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None
                              REPLY DECLARATION of Gregory Begg in Support re: 138 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Trump International Hotel & Tower, TIHT Commercial LLC. (cd) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None
                                REPLY in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment as to Counts II and III of the Amended Third-Party Complaint. Document filed by One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership. (djc) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from S. Jeanine Conley dated 9/10/07 re: Sponsor's counsel requests a 7 day extension on all reply briefs making them due Monday, September 17, 2007. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/10/07) (js) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: None
                                    RULE 56.1 STATEMENT Response to movants Statement of Material Facts. Document filed by Trump International Hotel & Tower. (pl) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: None
                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 138 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Trump International Hotel & Tower, TIHT Commercial LLC. (pl) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                        RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Trump International Hotel & Tower, TIHT Commercial LLC. (jp) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                          AFFIDAVIT of Andrew Weiss in Support re: 138 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Trump International Hotel & Tower, TIHT Commercial LLC. (jp) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                            AFFIDAVIT of Michael Levchuck in Support re: 138 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Trump International Hotel & Tower, TIHT Commercial LLC. (jp) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                              DECLARATION of Gregory R. Begg in Support re: 138 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Trump International Hotel & Tower, TIHT Commercial LLC. (jp) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                BRIEF in Support of: 138 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Trump International Hotel & Tower, TIHT Commercial LLC. (jp) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for an Order purs. to Rule 56 of the FRCP for Summary Judgment, dismissing the complaint in its entirety. Document filed by Trump International Hotel & Tower, TIHT Commercial LLC.(jp) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                    Notice of Filing Depositionof Michael Levchuck dated 6/21/07 (PartII) in support of third party dft, One Central park West PT Associates Limited Partnership's motion for summary judgment as to counts II and III of the amended third party complaint. Document filed by One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership. (dle) (Entered: 07/25/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                      Notice of Filing Deposition of Robert J. Hughes Dated 4/26/07 in support of third party dft, One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership's motion for summary judgment as to counts II and III of the amended third party complaint. Document filed by One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership. (dle) (Entered: 07/25/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership. (dle) (Entered: 07/25/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                          Notice of Filing Deposition of Nathan Nelson dated 4/24/07 in support of third party dft, One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership's motion for summary judgment as to Counts II and III of the amended third party complaint. Document filed by One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership. (dle) (Entered: 07/25/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                            Notice of Filing Deposition of Charles Reiss dated 4/23/07 in support of third party dft, One Central Park West Pt Associates Limited Partnership's, motion for summary judgment as to counts II and III of the amended third party complaint. Document filed by One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership. (dle) (Entered: 07/25/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                              Notice of Filing Deposition of William Filon dated June 20, 2007 in support of third party dft, One Central Park West Pt. Associates Limited Partnership's Motion for summary judgment as to counts II and III of the amended third party complaint. Document filed by One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership. (dle) (Entered: 07/25/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for an order granting Sponsor's motion for summary judgment. Document filed by One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership.(dle) (Entered: 07/25/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Trump International Hotel & Tower. (Attachments: # 1 Defendant Brief in Support of Motion# 2 Local Rule 56.1 Statement# 3 Certification of Counsel# 4 Exhibit Exhibit to Certification of Counsel# 5 Exhibit Exhibit to Certification of Counsel# 6 Exhibit Exhibit to Certification of Counsel# 7 Exhibit Exhibit to Certification of Counsel# 8 Exhibit Exhibit to Certification of Counsel# 9 Exhibit Exhibit to Certification of Counsel# 10 Exhibit Exhibit to Certification of Counsel# 11 Exhibit Exhibit to Certification of Counsel# 12 Exhibit Exhibit to Certification of Counsel# 13 Exhibit Exhibit to Certification of Counsel# 14 Exhibit Exhibit to Certification of Counsel# 15 Exhibit Exhibit to Certification of Counsel# 16 Affidavit Affidavit of Andrew Weiss# 17 Affidavit Affidavit of Michael Levchuck# 18 Certification of Service# 19 Filing Letter)(Begg, Gregory) Modified on 7/25/2007 (KA). (Entered: 07/23/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Gregory R. Merson dated 6/22/07 re: On behalf of parties TIHT advises the Court that discovery in this matter is complete, Therefore, the parties have agreed to the following schedule: Summary Judgment motions would be due on or before 7/23/07, Opposition papers would be due on or before 8/20/07; and Reply papers would be on or before 9/10/07. So Ordered. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 6/22/07) (js) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                    FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jordan Koel Merson on behalf of Trump International Hotel & Tower, TIHT Commercial LLC (Merson, Jordan) Modified on 7/25/2007 (KA). (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Memo Endorsed on One Central Park West Pt Associates Limited Partnership's motion for protective order. Motion denied as moot. (Signed by Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 6/6/07) (dle) (Entered: 06/12/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER; a conference has been scheduled for 6/6/2007 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. (Signed by Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 5/31/07) (kco) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute:* Discovery disputes If referral is for discovery disputes when the District Judge is unavailable, the time period of the referral: June 22, 2007. Referred to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 5/24/2007) (jmi) Modified on 6/21/2007 (Miles, Janeen). (Entered: 05/31/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                            CERTIFICATION of S. Jeanine Conley in Support re: 122 MOTION for Protective Order. (jco) (Entered: 05/31/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 122 MOTION for Protective Order. Document filed by One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership. (jco) (Entered: 05/31/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION for Protective Order. Document filed by One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership.(jco) (Entered: 05/31/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Holwell from S. Jeanine Conley dated 4/26/07 re: counsel requests that the April 27, 2007 conference be rescheduled to May 4, 2007 at 3:00 p.m.. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 4/21/07) (djc) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Jeanine Conley dated 3/29/07 re: 3rd. party dft. One Central Park West PT Associates Ltd. Partnership requests an extension of the deadline for dispositive motions; So Ordered. Application Granted. The 4/27/07 conference shall serve as a pre-motion conference. Any party wishing to file a dispositive motion must submit a letter requesting setting forth the bases for such motion on or before 4/23/07. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 4/5/07) (pl) (Entered: 04/09/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                      DECLARATION of S. Jeanine Conley in Support re: 118 MOTION to Compel.. Document filed by One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership. (tro) (Entered: 04/06/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION to Compel Disclosure. Document filed by One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership.Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel Disclosure attached.(tro) (Entered: 04/06/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sylvia Jeanine Conley on behalf of One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership (mbe) (Entered: 03/27/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Brian C. Blair on behalf of One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership. New Address: Baker & Hostetler LLP, sun Trust Center, Suite 2300, 200 South Orange Avenue, Orlando, Florida, 32801, 407-649-4050. (djc) (Entered: 03/13/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER that the conference set for 3/16/07 at 10:00 am, in courtroom 17B is adjourned until 4/27/07 at 10:30 am to coincide with the close of discovery. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 3/1/07) copies sent by chambers.(cd) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Gregory R. Begg dated 2/15/07 re: Application GRANTING deposition schedule further set forth in said Order. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 3/1/07) Copies Mailed by Chambers.(db) (Entered: 03/06/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Steven Kirkpatrick dated 11/30/06 re: Counsel writes to request that the Court's 6/8/05 scheduling order be further modified to extend the remaining deadlines as follows: all discovery 2/28/07; dispositive motions by 3/30/07. Application Granted. No further extensions. A status conference shall be held on 3/16/07 at 10:00 a.m. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 12/15/06) (jco, ) (Entered: 12/07/2006)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Gregory R. Begg dated 8/10/06 re: Request the Court certify the May 24, 2006 order. ENDORSEMENT: Application DENIED. Certification under Rule 54(b) is partially inappropriate where, or here, future developments in the case may obviate any need for appellate review. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 10/3/06) (js, ) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Edward A. Kopelson dated 9/27/06 re: Request a brief extension of the dates contained in the Scheduling Order of June 8, 2006. Plaintiff's expert witness reports to be served by October 30, 2006, Defendants' expert witness reports to be served by 11/30/06, Third party defendants expert reports to be served by 12/15/06, All discovery including expert depositions completed by January 31, 2007 and all dispositive motions to be filed by 2/28/06. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 10/4/06) (js, ) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL from 103 Order. Document filed by Trump International Hotel & Tower, TIHT Commercial LLC. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 583303. Copies of Notice of Appeal mailed to Attorney(s) of Record: Greenberg, Traurig, LLP, Marc S. Krieg, Esq., Zetlin & Dechiara, LLP and Edward A. Kopelson, Esq.. (nd, ) (Entered: 06/27/2006)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 5/24/06 before Judge Richard J. Holwell. (tro, ) (Entered: 06/21/2006)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions due by 1/31/2007. Deposition due by 10/31/2006. Discovery due by 12/31/2006. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 6/8/06) (kco, ) (Entered: 06/13/2006)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian C. Blair on behalf of One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership, One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership, One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership, One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership, One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership, One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership (cd, ) (Entered: 06/13/2006)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                ANSWER to Third Party Complaint. Document filed by One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership.(db, ) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 104 Motion for Brian C. Blair to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 5/19/2006) (jmi, ) (Entered: 06/06/2006)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Brian C. Blair to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership. (db, ) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER re:granting 92 MOTION to Dismiss. MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by CK Architect, P.C.; and all claims allegd against said deefendants' in third-party plaintiff Trump International Hotel & Tower Condo's amended third party complaint are dismissed. Defendnats C.K. Architect, P.C. a nd Philip JOhnson rtitchie & Fiore Architects ae t herefore no longer parties to this action.; Furthermore, third party defendant One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership's motion to dismiss 92 is Granted in part, and Denied in part. For the reasons stated on the record, Counts I, IV, V, VI, VII and VIII are dismissed. Counts II and II are not dismssed solely as alleged against One Central PArk West. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 5/24/06) (djc, ) (Entered: 05/26/2006)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Steven Kirkpatrick dated 4/18/06 re: a request that discovery continue to be stayed until the new conference date. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Oral Argument set for 5/24/2006 at 2:30 a.m. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 4/25/06) (kco, ) (Entered: 05/01/2006)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Gregory R. Begg dated 4/13/06 re: Request an adjournment of the April 20, 2006 oral argument scheduled to take place at 10:00 a.m. to Friday June 2, 2006. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Oral argument shall be held on Wednesday May 24, 2006 at 2:30 p.m. in the Courtroom of the Honorable Richard J. Holwell, Courtroom 17B, 500 pearl Street NY, NY 10007. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 4/18/06) (js, ) (Entered: 04/19/2006)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Scott K. Winikow dated 3/27/2006 re: to adjournment of the Design Professional's time to serve their reply papers until March 28 is appropriate. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 3/27/2006) (jmi, ) (Entered: 04/04/2006)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Design Professionals' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for and Order of Summary Judgment. Document filed by Philip Johnson Ritchie & Fiore Architects. (jmi, ) (Entered: 03/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Scott K. Winikow dated 3/17/2006 re: The conference scheduled for 3/23/2006 is adjorned to 4/20/2006 at 10:30 a.m. Discovery is stayed pending the conference. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 3/20/06) (kco, ) (Entered: 03/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The pretrial conference presently scheduled for 3/17/2006 is adjourned to 3/23/2006 at 10:00 a.m., in the Courtroom of Judge Richard J. Holwell, Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska Part One on 3/14/2006) Copies Faxed By Chambers.(lb, ) (Entered: 03/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Denis Serkin dated 3/6/06 re: I am writing to confirm that the condominium will be allowed to submit twenty page memoranda of law in opposition to the recently filed motion of One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 3/9/06) (js, ) (Entered: 03/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Marc S. Krieg from Steven Kirkpatrick dated 1/11/2006 re: this letter is confirming our agreement that One Central Park's time to respond to the cross-complaint in Philip Johnson Ritchie & Fiore Architects' answer dated 12/1/2005 shall be extended until 20 days after the Court issues a decision on the motions to dismiss the third-party complaint which are currently due to be served on 1/27/2006. ENDORSEMENTS: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/25/2006) Copies Faxed By Chambers(lb, ) (Entered: 01/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 93 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership. (jmi, ) (Entered: 01/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss the amended third-party complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6)for to state a claim and (2)granting such other and further relief as this Court deems to be just.... Document filed by One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership. (jmi, ) Modified on 1/30/2006 (jmi, ). (Entered: 01/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION to Dismiss the Third Party Complaint or in the alternative a MOTION for an Order of Summary Judgment. Document filed by CK Architect, P.C.. (kco, ) (Entered: 01/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Design Professionals' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, For an Order of Summary Judgment. Document filed by CK Architect, P.C., Philip Johnson Ritchie & Fiore Architects. (lb, ) (Entered: 01/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                ANSWER and Separate Defenses of Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs Trump International Hotel & Tower Condominium, and Thit Commercial, LLC to The Cross-Complaint of Third Party Defendant Philip Johnson Ritchie & Fiore Architects. Document filed by Trump International Hotel & Tower, Trump International Hotel & Tower.(jmi, ) (Entered: 01/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that all claims asserted by the parties against each other in this action be and are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs against any party. Further, parties agree that should the amended third-party complaint be re-filed in the future, for purposes of the statue of limitations, it will be considered as filed on the date the third-party complaint was originally filed. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/8/06) Copies Faxed and Mailed By Chambers.(dt, ) (Entered: 01/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER; that the third party defendants may serve and file motion papers on or before 1/27/2006. Opposition papers shall be served and filed on or before 3/10/2006, and reply papers shall be served and filed on or before 3/21/2006. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/10/06) (kco, ) (Entered: 01/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION: the time for third party defendants to serve and file their motions is set for 1/6/06; opposition due 2/17/06 and replies are due 2/28/06. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 12/23/05) Copies Faxed by Chambers.(db, ) (Entered: 12/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF CASE - ANSWER to Amended Third Party Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against all defendants. Document filed by Philip Johnson Ritchie & Fiore Architects.(Krieg, Marc) Modified on 12/21/2005 (gf, ). (Entered: 12/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT amending 42 Third Party Complaint, against.Document filed by TIHT Commercial LLC, Trump International Hotel & Tower. Related document: 42 Third Party Complaint, filed by Trump International Hotel & Tower.(sac, ) (Entered: 12/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/27/2006. Motions due by 10/13/2006. A joint pretrial order shall be submitted by the parties within 45 days of the issuance of a decision on dispositive motions. See document for further discovery deadlines; (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 11/20/05); copies faxed by chambers. (djc, ) (Entered: 11/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL The matter in difference in the above-entitled action having been amicably resolved between the Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff, Trump International Hotel & Tower Condominium, and Third-Party Defendant Leslie E. Robertson Associates, it is hereby stipulated and agreed that all claims assert by the parties against each pther in this action be and are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs against any party. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 11/17/05) Copies Faxed By Chambers.(dt, ) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/18/2005. Motions due by 12/16/2005. Responses due by 1/16/2006 Replies due by 1/30/2006. The parties shall appear for a conference on March 17, 2006 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17B of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 10/31/2005) (jmi, ) (Entered: 11/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CASE to Judge Richard J. Holwell. Judge Michael B. Mukasey no longer assigned to the case. (laq, ) (Entered: 10/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - MOTION for Leave to File Request Leave To Move. Document filed by Philip Johnson Ritchie & Fiore Architects. (Krieg, Marc) Modified on 10/3/2005 (kg). (Entered: 09/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: The motion to dismiss filed by third-party defendant One Central Park West Associates Limited Partnership shall be withdrawn; Any third-party defendant wishing to move to dismiss or for summary judgment shall file a short letter to the Court by 9/27/2005 setting for the bases for the motion; Defendants/third-party plaintiffs Trump International Hotel & Tower, et al., shall file a letter response by 10/7/2005; The parties shall file a joint proposed discovery schedule by 10/24/2005; A Pretrial Conference is set for 10/28/2005 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard J. Holwell in Courtroom 17B of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, N.Y. 10007. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/13/2005) Copies Faxed By Chambers.(lb, ) (Entered: 09/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER AND SEPARATE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT/THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFFS TRUMP INTERNATIONAL HOTEL & TOWER CONDOMINIUM, and THIT COMMERCIAL, LLC to The Cross-Complaint of Third Party Dft. Philip Johnson Ritchie & Fiore Architects. (pl, ) (Entered: 09/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER:The time for defendants/Third party plaintiffs, Trump International Hotel & Tower Condominium, THIT Commercial, LLC, to oppose the motion to dismiss filed by One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership, is hereby extended from 9/2/2005 through and including 9/30/2005, and the time for One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership to file a reply is extended through and including 10/14/2005. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/30/2005) Copies Faxed By Chambers.(lb, ) (Entered: 09/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Howell from Edward A. Kopelson dated 8/24/2005 re: request that the Court hold a status conference in light of appearances recently filed by the five (5) newly added Third-Party Defendants. The Current Scheduling Order needs to be amended to incorporate the new parties. Telephone Conference set for 9/13/2005 at 10:00 AM. All parties are directed to call chamber's before Judge Loretta A. Preska. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/30/2005) (jmi, ) Modified on 9/1/2005 (jmi, ). (Entered: 09/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER; time for defts and third party pltfs, Trump International Hotel & Tower Condominium, THIT Commercial, LLC. to answer discovery to third party deft, Leslie E. Robertson Associates, is 9/30/05. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/30/05) (kco, ) (Entered: 09/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by CK Architect, P.C..(jmi, ) (Entered: 08/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Kenneth Winikow on behalf of CK Architect, P.C. (jmi, ) (Entered: 08/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Third Party Complaint. Document filed by CK Architect, P.C..(jmi, ) (Entered: 08/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss.third-party complaint purs to FRCP 12(b)(6) for failure to state a claim Document filed by One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership. (djc, ) (Entered: 08/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership.(djc, ) (Entered: 08/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of its motion to dismiss Counts I, II, III and IV of the Third Party Complaint. Document filed by One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership. (djc, ) (Entered: 08/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF CASE - NOTICE of Rule 7.1 Statement. Document filed by Philip Johnson Ritchie & Fiore Architects. (Krieg, Marc) Modified on 9/8/2005 (gf, ). (Entered: 08/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF CASE - DEPOSITION of Trump International and Thitt taken on October 27, 2005.Document filed by Philip Johnson Ritchie & Fiore Architects.(Krieg, Marc) Modified on 9/8/2005 (gf, ). (Entered: 08/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - POSTING A DOCKET ENTRY TO A NON-ECF CASE - ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership. Document filed by CK Architect, P.C..(Winikow, Scott) Modified on 8/25/2005 (rag, ). (Entered: 08/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - POSTING A DOCKET ENTRY TO A NON-ECF CASE - RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by CK Architect, P.C..(Winikow, Scott) Modified on 8/25/2005 (rag, ). (Entered: 08/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - POSTING A DOCKET ENTRY TO A NON-ECF CASE - NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Kenneth Winikow on behalf of CK Architect, P.C. (Winikow, Scott) Modified on 8/25/2005 (rag, ). (Entered: 08/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - POSTING A DOCKET ENTRY TO A NON-ECF CASE - ANSWER to Crossclaim. Document filed by Trump International Hotel & Tower.(Serkin, Denis) Modified on 8/25/2005 (rag, ). (Entered: 08/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - POSTING A DOCKET ENTRY TO A NON-ECF CASE - NOTICE of Appearance by Denis Serkin on behalf of Trump International Hotel & Tower (Serkin, Denis) Modified on 8/25/2005 (rag, ). (Entered: 08/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - POSTING A DOCKET ENTRY TO A NON-ECF CASE - ANSWER to Third Party Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against all defendants. Document filed by Cantor Seinuk Group, P.C..(O'NEILL, KEVIN) Modified on 8/25/2005 (rag, ). (Entered: 08/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - POSTING A DOCKET ENTRY TO A NON-ECF CASE - RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Cantor Seinuk Group, P.C..(O'NEILL, KEVIN) Modified on 8/25/2005 (rag, ). (Entered: 08/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER; the time for third-party defendant One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnetship to move against, answer or otherwise respond to the third-party complaint is extended from August 8, 2005 through and including August 18, 2005. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 8/5/05) (djc, ) (Entered: 08/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - POSTING A DOCKET ENTRY TO A NON-ECF CASE - ANSWER to Third Party Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against all defendants. Document filed by Philip Johnson Ritchie & Fiore Architects.(Krieg, Marc) Modified on 8/25/2005 (rag, ). (Entered: 08/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - POSTING A DOCKET ENTRY TO A NON-ECF CASE - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS served on ALL PARTIES on 8/2/2005. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Leslie E. Robertson Associates, jointly and severally. (O'Connor, Joseph) Modified on 8/25/2005 (rag, ). (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - POSTING A DOCKET ENTRY TO A NON-ECF CASE - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Request for Production of Documents and Things served on THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF on 8/2/2005. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Leslie E. Robertson Associates, jointly and severally. (O'Connor, Joseph) Modified on 8/25/2005 (rag, ). Modified on 8/25/2005 (rag, ). (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - POSTING A DOCKET ENTRY TO A NON-ECF CASE - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of FED.R.CIV.P 7.1(a) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT served on ALL PARTIES on 8/2/05. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Leslie E. Robertson Associates, jointly and severally. (O'Connor, Joseph) Modified on 8/25/2005 (rag, ). (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - POSTING A DOCKET ENTRY TO A NON-ECF CASE - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of EBT Notice served on ALL PARTIES on 8/2/2005. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Leslie E. Robertson Associates, jointly and severally. (O'Connor, Joseph) Modified on 8/25/2005 (rag, ). (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - POSTING A DOCKET ENTRY TO A NON-ECF CASE - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Leslie E. Robertson Associates, jointly and severally. (O'Connor, Joseph) Modified on 8/25/2005 (rag, ). (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - POSTING A DOCKET ENTRY TO A NON-ECF CASE - First OF INTERROGATORIES to Trump International Hotel & Tower Condominium and THIT Commercial, LLC.Document filed by Leslie E. Robertson Associates, jointly and severally.(O'Connor, Joseph) Modified on 8/25/2005 (rag, ). (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - POSTING A DOCKET ENTRY TO A NON-ECF CASE - REQUEST for Production of Documents.Document filed by Leslie E. Robertson Associates, jointly and severally.(O'Connor, Joseph) Modified on 8/25/2005 (rag, ). (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - POSTING A DOCKET ENTRY TO A NON-ECF CASE - REQUEST for Production of Documents.Document filed by Leslie E. Robertson Associates, jointly and severally.(O'Connor, Joseph) Modified on 8/25/2005 (rag, ). (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - POSTING A DOCKET ENTRY TO A NON-ECF CASE - NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff and Third Party Plaintiff on 10/4/05 at 10:00am.Document filed by Leslie E. Robertson Associates, jointly and severally.(O'Connor, Joseph) Modified on 8/25/2005 (rag, ). (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - POSTING A DOCKET ENTRY TO A NON-ECF CASE - ANSWER to Third Party Complaint. Document filed by Leslie E. Robertson Associates, jointly and severally.(O'Connor, Joseph) Modified on 8/25/2005 (rag, ). (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - POSTING A DOCKET ENTRY TO A NON-ECF CASE RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Leslie E. Robertson Associates, jointly and severally.(O'Connor, Joseph) Modified on 8/25/2005 (rag, ). (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER; that the time for respondent One Central park West PT Associates Limited Partnership to move against, answer or otherwise respond to the third-party complaint in this action is extended to and including 8/8/2005. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 7/22/2005) (jp, ) (Entered: 08/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to The Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses. Document filed by Trump International Hotel & Tower, TIHT Commercial LLC.(jmi, ) (Entered: 06/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Howell from Edward A. Kopelson dated 6/8/05 re: request for an extension of the dates in the Scheduling Order. Application granted in part. All dates in the Scheduling Order shall be extended by 90 days. The extension is effectively immediately and is not dependant on the filing of responsive pleading (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 6/15/03) Copies failed by Chambers.(yv, ) (Entered: 06/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from 5/24/05 dated 5/19/05 re: Counsel writes to request to leave to serve a third-party complaint. Application Granted. A formal motion is not necessary. Defendant shall file and serve the third party complaint in accordance with the Federal Rules. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 5/24/05) (jco, ) (Entered: 05/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Cantor Seinuk Group, P.C., CK Architect, P.C., Leslie E. Robertson Associates, jointly and severally, Philip Johnson Ritchie & Fiore Architects, One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership.Document filed by Trump International Hotel & Tower.(jco, ) Modified on 8/25/2005 (rag, ). Modified on 8/25/2005 (rag, ). (Entered: 05/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF CASE - ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Trump International Hotel & Tower, TIHT Commercial LLC. Related document: 38 Amended Complaint, filed by Robert Levine,, Disabled in Action of Metropolitan New York,, Freida Zames,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Begg, Gregory) Modified on 6/21/2005 (gf, ). (Entered: 05/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell's from Edward Kopelson dated 4/26/05 re: ounsel requests withdrawal of the notice of motion to compel. Application granted. Motion to compel (39) is deemed withdrawn. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 4/29/05) (dle, ) (Entered: 05/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for an order to compel non party compliance with subpoena and impose sanctions for contempt. Document filed by Robert Levine, Freida Zames. Return Date set for 4/29/2005 03:00 PM. (dle, ) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against One Central Park West PT Associates Limited Partnership, TIHT Commercial LLC, Trump International Hotel & Tower.Document filed by Disabled in Action of Metropolitan New York, Robert Levine, Freida Zames. Related document: 1 Complaint.(djc, ) (Entered: 02/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/15/2005. Joinder of Parties due by 2/15/2005. Deposition due by 7/1/2005. Discovery due by 7/1/2005; plaintiffs expert witness reports shall be served by 7/15/05; interrogatories and notices to produce documents may be served by either named party at anytime until 6/30/05; pleadings may be amended to join other parties on or before 2/15/05. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/19/05) (dle, ) (Entered: 01/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Defendants shall respond to plaintiffs' document requests by 11/19/04. Defendants shall submit a letter brief not to exceed four pages regarding any discovery dispute by 12/3/04. Plaintiffs' response not to exceed four pages, shall be submitted by 12/8/04. The next pretrial telephonic conference is scheduled for 12/12/04 at 4:30PM Responses due by 12/8/2004. Pretrial Telephone Conference set for 12/12/2004 at 4:30 PM before Richard J. Holwell. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 11/12/04) Copies Faxed By Chambers.(dfe, ) (Entered: 12/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Trump International Hotel & Tower.(sac, ) (Entered: 09/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant to file answer to amended complaint by 09/09/04; Parties to exchange interrogatories and document requests by 10/08/04; parties to respond to discovery requests by 11/11/04; next Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2004 12:00 PM before Chief Judge Michael B. Mukasey. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 08/05/04) (djc, ) (Entered: 08/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER the parties are directed to appear for a pretrial conference on 8/12/04 at 12:00 p.m. in the courtroom of the Honorable Richard J. Holwell, courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 7/14/04) "Copies Faxed By Chambers".(jco, ) (Entered: 07/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of of change of law firm and substitution of Attorney. Document filed by Disabled in Action of Metropolitan New York, Robert Levine, Freida Zames. (djc, ) (Entered: 07/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: plaintiff's motion to amend the complaint is granted. To the extent that defendant takes issue with plaintiff's claims, it can do so in connection with a summary judgment motion addressed to that pleading. Defendant's summary judgment motion is denied without prejudice to renewal insofar as such a motion may be addressed to an amended complaint following whatever additional discovery may be necessary. (Signed by Judge Michael B. Mukasey on 6/15/04) (kw, ) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF by Disabled in Action, Robert Levine, Freida Zames in support of motion to amend complaint and in opposition to dfts cross-motion for summary judgment. (db) (Entered: 08/01/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Gregory R. Begg by Trump Intl. Hotel in support Re: [26-1] cross motion for an Order pursuanat to Rules 12(b)(c), 12(c) of the FRCP dismissing the complaint, [26-2] cross motion for summary judgment pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP . (yv) (Entered: 07/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF by Trump Intl. Hotel in opposition to plaintiffs' motion to amend the complaint and in support re: [26-1] cross motion for an Order pursuanat to Rules 12(b)(c), 12(c) of the FRCP dismissing the complaint, [26-2] cross motion for summary judgment pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP (yv) (Entered: 07/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 56.1 STATEMENT filed by Trump Intl. Hotel (yv) (Entered: 07/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION by Trump Intl. Hotel for an Order pursuanat to Rules 12(b)(c), 12(c) of the FRCP dismissing the complaint and, for summary judgment pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP . Return Date not indicated. (yv) (Entered: 07/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER; On application by defendant the time in which defendant is to serve answering papers to plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint and a cross-motion is extened to 7/8/03. A reply as to plaintiff's motion and answering papers as to the cross-motion are to be served 7/29/03. A reply as to the cross-motion are to be served 8/12/03. ( signed by Chief Judge Michael B. Mukasey ) (jco) (Entered: 06/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter filed by Trump Intl. Hotel addressed to Judge Mukasey from Gregory R. Begg, dated 03/25/03, re: submission of ANSI/ASME 17.1 Section XX (1990) Safety Code for Elevators and Escalators; (djc) (Entered: 04/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter filed by Trump Intl. Hotel addressed to Judge Mukasey from Gregory R. Begg, dated 01/02/03, re: reply to plaintiffs' December 31, 2002 letter citing a "recent" decision in the matter of Pickern v. Holiday Quality Foods, Inc. in further support of their claim that their mere desire to patronize defendants' premises should suffice to confer standing to sue under the Amer. with Disabilities Act. (djc) (Entered: 04/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter filed by Disabled in Action, Robert Levine, Freida Zames addressed to Judge Mukasey from Edward Kopelson, dated 12/31/03, re: to update Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (djc) (Entered: 04/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF by Disabled in Action, Robert Levine, Freida Zames in Opposition to [11-1] motion for an Order, pursuant to Rules 12(b)(c), 12(c) and 56 of the FRCP dismissing the Complaint, [11-2] motion for summary judgment (djc) (Entered: 04/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION # 88302, For the reasons stated in this memorandum opinion, defendant's [11-1,2] motion for summary judgment as to the wheelchair lift claim is denied. Plaintiffs' claim regarding other violations at the Trump Building is dismissed. ( signed by Chief Judge Michael B. Mukasey ) (sb) (Entered: 04/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY BRIEF by Trump Intl. Hotel, A to K Corporations, A to K in further supprot of [11-1] motion for an Order, pursuant to Rules 12(b)(c), 12(c) and 56 of the FRCP dismissing the Complaint, [11-2] motion for summary judgment. (jco) (Entered: 05/01/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY BRIEF by Trump Intl. Hotel, A to K Corporations, A to K in further support of Re: [11-1] motion for an Order, pursuant to Rules 12(b)(c), 12(c) and 56 of the FRCP dismissing the Complaint, [11-2] motion for summary judgment (pl) (Entered: 04/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER; the time in which pltffs are to serve answering papers is extended to 3/1/02 for [11-1] motion for an Order, pursuant to Rules 12(b)(c), 12(c) and 56 of the FRCP dismissing the Complaint; reset to 3/1/02 for [11-2] motion for summary judgment . A reply may be served by 4/5/02 for [11-1] motion for an Order, pursuant to Rules 12(b)(c), 12(c) and 56 of the FRCP dismissing the Complaint; reset to 4/5/02 for [11-2] motion for summary judgment . ( signed by Chief Judge Michael B. Mukasey ); Copies mailed. (sn) (Entered: 02/06/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF by Trump Intl. Hotel in support of: [11-1] motion for an Order, pursuant to Rules 12(b)(c), 12(c) and 56 of the FRCP dismissing the Complaint, [11-2] motion for summary (yv) (Entered: 12/12/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Thomas P. Downing by Trump Intl. Hotel. (yv) (Entered: 12/12/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Andrew Weiss by Trump Intl. Hotel. (yv) (Entered: 12/12/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 56.1 STATEMENT filed by Trump Intl. Hotel (yv) (Entered: 12/12/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATION of Gregory R. Begg by Trump Intl. Hotel in support Re: [11-1] motion for an Order, pursuant to Rules 12(b)(c), 12(c) and 56 of the FRCP dismissing the Complaint, [11-2] motion for summary judgment . (yv) (Entered: 12/12/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION by Trump Intl. Hotel for an Order, pursuant to Rules 12(b)(c), 12(c) and 56 of the FRCP dismissing the Complaint and, for summary judgment . Return date not indicated. (yv) (Entered: 12/12/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER; on defts' unopposed application on 11/13/01, the time for defts to serve a summary judgment motion is extended to 11/30/01. Answering papers are to be served by 2/1/02. A reply may be served by 2/15/02 . ( signed by Chief Judge Michael B. Mukasey ); Copies mailed. (sn) (Entered: 11/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, defendants are to serve a summary judgment motion by 11/16/01. Answering papers are to be served by 12/14/01. A reply may be served by 12/28/01 . ( signed by Chief Judge Michael B. Mukasey ); Copies mailed. (kw) (Entered: 10/22/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by Trump Intl. Hotel (Attorney Gregory R. Begg from the Firm: Peckar & Abramson, P.C.) . (moc) (Entered: 09/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Trump Intl. Hotel . (moc) (Entered: 09/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER; that the parties will conduct informal discovery ; another conference, if necessary, will be held on 10/18/01 at 9:15 a.m. in Room 21B at which time the Court will establish a schedule for the completion of discovery, the submission of a pre-trial Order and accompanying material and the placement of the case on the ready trial calendar . ( signed by Chief Judge Michael B. Mukasey ); Copies mailed. (kkc) (Entered: 08/06/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons and complaint returned executed as to Trump Intl. Hotel; mailed on 6/26/01. Answer due on 8/27/01 for Trump Intl. Hotel. (kw) (Entered: 07/24/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER; this action has been reassigned to this Court's docket. A pre-trial conference will be held on 8/1/01 at 9:15 a.m. in Room 21B of the U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl St. Pltffs are to serve a copy of this Order on defts. ( signed by Chief Judge Michael B. Mukasey ); Copies mailed. (sac) (Entered: 07/11/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Case Assignment to Chief Judge Michael B. Mukasey . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Edward A. Kopelson . (gmo) Modified on 07/03/2001 (Entered: 07/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Disabled in Action. (moc) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 409519. (moc) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 51 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?