District Agency Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Northern District Court USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board
  1. Case No. CBM2014-00159
    Filed 7/21/2014
  2. Case No. CBM2015-00067
    Filed 1/29/2015
Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit United States Supreme Court

Think Computer Corporation v. Square, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit, Case No. 16-1818

Tags
Last Updated August 20, 2018 at 8:41 AM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Square, Inc. Square, Inc., Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Eugene Marder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eugene Marder

Toggle Switch Represented by Gray, Cary, Ware & Freidenrich, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL T. ROSATO

Toggle Switch Represented by Robin L. Brewer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin L. Brewer

Toggle Switch Represented by Stefani E. Shanberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stefani E. Shanberg

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Lynn Brewer +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 rbrewer@wsgr.com
Space Eugene Marder +1 415 947 2039 emarder@wsgr.com
Think Computer Corporation Think Computer Corporation, Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by rabilaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Isaac Philip Rabicoff +1 773 669 4459 isaac@rabilaw.com
Nature of Suit
Case Type Agency
Lower Court Case
Lower Court Case
  Entries (99) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301054331 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Mandate issued to the United States Patent and Trademark Office. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [457624] [JAB]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301033802 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    OPINION and JUDGMENT filed. The judgment or decision is: Affirmed. (FCR 36). (For the Court: Newman,Circuit Judge; O'Malley,Circuit Judge and Stoll,Circuit Judge). [448531] [JAB]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank  Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Submitted after ORAL ARGUMENT by
    Isaac Philip Rabicoff for Think Computer Corporation and Stefani E. Shanberg for Square, Inc.
    Panel: Judge: Newman , Judge: O'Malley , Judge: Stoll. [446143] [JAB]
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: Notice regarding the ECF account of Stefani E. Shanberg for Square, Inc. The e-mail address, (victoria-smith-4062@pacerpro.com), associated with your CM/ECF account has generated a delivery failure notice. Counsel should promptly report a change in contact information with the Pacer Service Center (see Fed. Cir. R. 47.3(c)(1). [439900] [PM]
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Response to oral argument order from the Appellant Think Computer Corporation. designating Isaac Rabicoff as arguing attorney. Designated time for argument: 11 minutes. Designated time for rebuttal: 4 minutes. Service of other counsel by Notice of Docket Activity from this entry. [439700] [Isaac Rabicoff]
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Response to oral argument order from the Appellee Square, Inc.. designating Stefani E. Shanberg as arguing attorney. Designated time for argument: 15 minutes. Designated time for rebuttal: 0 minutes. Service of other counsel by Notice of Docket Activity from this entry. [439643] [Stefani Shanberg]
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Amended Entry of appearance for Stefani Shanberg as principal counsel for Appellee Square, Inc.. Service: 06/02/2017 by email. [436106]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301006678 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Amended Entry of appearance for Stefani Shanberg as principal counsel for Appellee Square, Inc.. Service: 06/02/2017 by email. [436106] [Stefani Shanberg]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank  Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to withdraw attorney [50] Michael Rosato filed by Appellee Square, Inc. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [435266] [SMJ]
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION of Appellee Square, Inc. to withdraw counsel Michael T. Rosato. Any response is due within 10 days of service [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [435139]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301004535 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MOTION of Appellee Square, Inc. to withdraw counsel Michael T. Rosato. Any response is due within 10 days of service [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [435139] [Michael Rosato]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Amended Entry of appearance for Michael T. Rosato as of counsel for Appellee Square, Inc.. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [435135]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301004523 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Amended Entry of appearance for Michael T. Rosato as of counsel for Appellee Square, Inc.. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [435135] [Michael Rosato]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: The attorney entry of appearance Document No. [45] filed by Appellee Square, Inc. in 16-1818 is indicating more than one principal attorney for the party(s) and therefore cannot be accepted for filing at this time. You are being afforded the opportunity to correct the deficiency. At the discretion of the court, the corrected document may be accepted for filing if received before midnight (EST) on the date of this notice. [434716] [SMJ]
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Amended Entry of appearance for Eugene Marder as of counsel for Appellee Square, Inc.. Service: 05/26/2017 by email. [434673]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301003382 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Amended Entry of appearance for Eugene Marder as of counsel for Appellee Square, Inc.. Service: 05/26/2017 by email. [434673] [Eugene Marder]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Amended Entry of appearance for Robin L. Brewer as of counsel for Appellee Square, Inc.. Service: 05/26/2017 by email. [434672]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301003379 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Amended Entry of appearance for Robin L. Brewer as of counsel for Appellee Square, Inc.. Service: 05/26/2017 by email. [434672] [Robin Brewer]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Entry of appearance for Stefani E. Shanberg as principal counsel for Appellee Square, Inc.. Service: 05/26/2017 by email. [434670]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301003373 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Entry of appearance for Stefani E. Shanberg as principal counsel for Appellee Square, Inc.. Service: 05/26/2017 by email. [434670] [Stefani Shanberg]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE OF CALENDARING. Panel: 1707H. Case scheduled Jul 13, 2017 10:00 a.m. at the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit (Howard T. Markey National Courts Building, 717 Madison Place, N.W. Washington, DC 20439), Courtroom 203. Response to oral argument order due: 06/15/2017. Arguing counsel is required to check-in at the Clerk's Office, 4th Floor, Room 401, between 8:30 am and 9:30 am on the day of argument. Please review the Oral Argument Order. [432942] [JAB]
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Notice from Appellant Think Computer Corporation regarding conflicts with oral argument (March 22-25; April 3-7, 10-14, 17-21, & 24-28; May 22-26, & 30-31; June 1-2, & 5-6; August 1-4, & 7-10). Service: 04/23/2017 by email. [426411]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130985118 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Notice from Appellant Think Computer Corporation regarding conflicts with oral argument (March 22-25; April 3-7, 10-14, 17-21, & 24-28; May 22-26, & 30-31; June 1-2, & 5-6; August 1-4, & 7-10). Service: 04/23/2017 by email. [426411] [Isaac Rabicoff]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Notice from Appellee Square, Inc. regarding conflicts with oral argument (May 1-8, 2017; June 5-9, 2017). Service: 04/06/2017 by email. [422235]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130975991 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Notice from Appellee Square, Inc. regarding conflicts with oral argument (May 1-8, 2017; June 5-9, 2017). Service: 04/06/2017 by email. [422235] [Michael Rosato]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Notice from Appellant Think Computer Corporation regarding conflicts with oral argument (March 22-25; April 3-7, 10-14, 17-21, & 24-28; May 22-26, & 30-31; June 1-2, & 5-6). Service: 04/02/2017 by email. [420787]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130972948 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Notice from Appellant Think Computer Corporation regarding conflicts with oral argument (March 22-25; April 3-7, 10-14, 17-21, & 24-28; May 22-26, & 30-31; June 1-2, & 5-6). Service: 04/02/2017 by email. [420787] [Isaac Rabicoff]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Notice from Appellant Think Computer Corporation regarding conflicts with oral argument (March 22-25; April 3-7, 10-14, 17-21, & 24-28; May 24-26, & 30-31; June 1-2). Service: 03/16/2017 by email. [416358]
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130962838 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Notice from Appellant Think Computer Corporation regarding conflicts with oral argument (March 22-25; April 3-7, 10-14, 17-21, & 24-28; May 24-26, & 30-31; June 1-2). Service: 03/16/2017 by email. [416358] [Isaac Rabicoff]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Notice from Appellant Think Computer Corporation regarding conflicts with oral argument (March 10-14 & 17-21). Service: 01/31/2017 by email. [403537]
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130934623 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Notice from Appellant Think Computer Corporation regarding conflicts with oral argument (March 10-14 & 17-21). Service: 01/31/2017 by email. [403537] [Isaac Rabicoff]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Notice from Appellee Square, Inc. regarding conflicts with oral argument (March 6 & 13, April 6-10, June 6-9). Service: 01/26/2017 by email. [402469]
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130932301 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Notice from Appellee Square, Inc. regarding conflicts with oral argument (March 6 & 13, April 6-10, June 6-9). Service: 01/26/2017 by email. [402469] [Michael Rosato]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank  Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  6 paper copies of the Joint Appendix [35] received from Appellant Think Computer Corporation. [402358] [KW]
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Pursuant to Practice Note 34, counsel should advise the clerk of court of scheduling conflicts for the next three court weeks, or thereafter. When filing the notice of conflicts, counsel should docket the Notice Regarding Conflicts with Argument Dates event, which is found in the Calendar event category. [400479] [MJL]
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      APPENDIX FILED for Think Computer Corporation [32]. Number of Pages: 343. Service: 01/17/2017 by email. The paper copies of the appendix should be received by the court on or before 01/27/2017. [400476]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130927929 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        APPENDIX FILED for Think Computer Corporation [32]. Number of Pages: 343. Service: 01/17/2017 by email. The paper copies of the appendix should be received by the court on or before 01/27/2017. [400476] [MJL]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank  Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          6 paper copies of the Reply Brief [31] received from Appellant Think Computer Corporation. [399608] [KW]
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Statement of Compliance with Fed. Cir. R. 33 for Appellant Think Computer Corporation. Service: 01/17/2017 by email. [399512]
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130925749 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Statement of Compliance with Fed. Cir. R. 33 for Appellant Think Computer Corporation. Service: 01/17/2017 by email. [399512] [Isaac Rabicoff]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                TENDERED from Appellant Think Computer Corporation. Title: JOINT APPENDIX. Service: 01/17/2017 by email. [399509]
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130925742 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  TENDERED from Appellant Think Computer Corporation. Title: JOINT APPENDIX. Service: 01/17/2017 by email. [399509] [Isaac Rabicoff]
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    REPLY BRIEF FILED for Appellant Think Computer Corporation [30]. Number of Pages: 12. Service: 01/10/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 01/19/2017. Appendix is due 01/17/2017. [397819]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130922936 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      REPLY BRIEF FILED for Appellant Think Computer Corporation [30]. Number of Pages: 12. Service: 01/10/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 01/19/2017. Appendix is due 01/17/2017. [397819] [MJL]
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        TENDERED from Appellant Think Computer Corporation. Title: REPLY BRIEF. Service: 01/10/2017 by email. [397624]
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130922487 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          TENDERED from Appellant Think Computer Corporation. Title: REPLY BRIEF. Service: 01/10/2017 by email. [397624] [Isaac Rabicoff]
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            6 paper copies of the Corrected Opening Response Brief [27] received from Appellee Square, Inc. [393578] [JCP]
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: Notice regarding the ECF account of Michael T. Rosato for Square, Inc.. The e-mail address, (jmthomas@wsgr.com), associated with your CM/ECF account has generated a delivery failure notice. Counsel should promptly report a change in contact information with the Pacer Service Center (see Fed. Cir. R. 47.3(c)(1). [392171] [PM]
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                CORRECTED BRIEF FILED for Appellee Square, Inc. [26]. Number of Pages: 60. Service: 12/16/2016 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 12/27/2016. [392130]
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130910810 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  CORRECTED BRIEF FILED for Appellee Square, Inc. [26]. Number of Pages: 60. Service: 12/16/2016 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 12/27/2016. [392130] [MJL]
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    TENDERED from Appellee Square, Inc.. Title: CORRECTED RESPONSE BRIEF. Service: 12/16/2016 by email. [391904]
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130910393 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      TENDERED from Appellee Square, Inc.. Title: CORRECTED RESPONSE BRIEF. Service: 12/16/2016 by email. [391904] [Michael Rosato]
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REJECTION: The brief of Appellee Square, Inc., Appellee's Answering Brief [24], is not in compliance with the rules of this court and is therefore rejected for filing. Corrected brief due 12/30/2016. Appellant Think Computer Corporation's reply brief is due 1/11/2017. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [391717]--[Edited 12/16/2016 by clerk to correct the due date of the reply brief.]
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130910046 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REJECTION: The brief of Appellee Square, Inc., Appellee's Answering Brief [24], is not in compliance with the rules of this court and is therefore rejected for filing. Corrected brief due 12/30/2016. Appellant Think Computer Corporation's reply brief is due 1/11/2017. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [391717]--[Edited 12/16/2016 by clerk to correct the due date of the reply brief.] [MJL]
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130908833 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            TENDERED from Appellee Square, Inc.. Title: RESPONSE BRIEF. Service: 12/14/2016 by email. [391145]. This brief has been rejected. See Doc. No. [25]. [Michael Rosato]
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              ORDER filed. The motion [22] is granted. The appellee's response brief is due December 14, 2016, and the appellant's reply brief is due January 11, 2017. Service: 11/29/2016 by clerk. [386926]
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130899898 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                ORDER filed. The motion [22] is granted. The appellee's response brief is due December 14, 2016, and the appellant's reply brief is due January 11, 2017. Service: 11/29/2016 by clerk. [386926] [LS]
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MOTION of Appellant Think Computer Corporation and Appellee Square, Inc. to set briefing schedule. Any response is due within 10 days of service [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 11/23/2016 by email. [386050]
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130897874 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    MOTION of Appellant Think Computer Corporation and Appellee Square, Inc. to set briefing schedule. Any response is due within 10 days of service [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 11/23/2016 by email. [386050] [Robin Brewer]
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      6 paper copies of the Corrected Opening Brief [20] received from Appellant Think Computer Corporation. [367420] [KW]
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        CORRECTED BRIEF FILED for Appellant Think Computer Corporation [19]. Number of Pages: 34. Service: 09/13/2016 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 09/19/2016. Appellee Square, Inc.'s brief is due 11/30/2016. [366344]
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130855123 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          CORRECTED BRIEF FILED for Appellant Think Computer Corporation [19]. Number of Pages: 34. Service: 09/13/2016 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 09/19/2016. Appellee Square, Inc.'s brief is due 11/30/2016. [366344] [MJL]
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            TENDERED from Appellant Think Computer Corporation. Title: CORRECTED OPENING BRIEF. Service: 09/13/2016 by email. [366070]
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130854492 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              TENDERED from Appellant Think Computer Corporation. Title: CORRECTED OPENING BRIEF. Service: 09/13/2016 by email. [366070] [Isaac Rabicoff]
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130850563 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REJECTION: The brief of Appellant Think Computer Corporation, Appellant's Opening Brief [17], is not in compliance with the rules of this court and is therefore rejected for filing. Corrected brief due 09/20/2016. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [364354] [MJL]
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REJECTION: The brief of Appellant Think Computer Corporation, Appellant's Opening Brief [17], is not in compliance with the rules of this court and is therefore rejected for filing. Corrected brief due 09/20/2016. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [364354]
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130850385 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    TENDERED from Appellant Think Computer Corporation. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 09/06/2016 by email. [364269]. This brief has been rejected. See Doc. No. [18]. [Isaac Rabicoff]
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130808349 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      ORDER filed The motion [14] is granted. The opening brief is due September 6, 2016; the answering brief is due no later than November 30, 2016; and the reply brief is due no later than December 14, 2016. Service: 06/21/2016 by clerk. [345295] [LS]
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        ORDER filed The motion [14] is granted. The opening brief is due September 6, 2016; the answering brief is due no later than November 30, 2016; and the reply brief is due no later than December 14, 2016. Service: 06/21/2016 by clerk. [345295]
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130806957 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Entry of appearance for Eugene Marder as of counsel for Appellee Square, Inc.. Service: 06/17/2016 by email. [344676] [Eugene Marder]
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Entry of appearance for Eugene Marder as of counsel for Appellee Square, Inc.. Service: 06/17/2016 by email. [344676]
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130806928 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              MOTION of Appellee Square, Inc. to set briefing schedule. Response/Opposition is due 06/30/2016 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 06/17/2016 by email. [344663] [Robin Brewer]
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                MOTION of Appellee Square, Inc. to set briefing schedule. Response/Opposition is due 06/30/2016 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 06/17/2016 by email. [344663]
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Corrected Certified list from the United States Patent and Trademark Office. Service: 05/31/2016 by email, US mail. [339437]
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130795598 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Corrected Certified list from the United States Patent and Trademark Office. Service: 05/31/2016 by email, US mail. [339437] [MJL]
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Certified list from the United States Patent and Trademark Office. Service: 05/18/2016 by US mail. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 07/21/2016. [336679]
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130789458 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Certified list from the United States Patent and Trademark Office. Service: 05/18/2016 by US mail. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 07/21/2016. [336679] [MJL]
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Docketing Statement for the Appellant Think Computer Corporation. Service: 04/22/2016 by email. [329059]
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130773151 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            Docketing Statement for the Appellant Think Computer Corporation. Service: 04/22/2016 by email. [329059] [Isaac Rabicoff]
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Entry of appearance for Michael T. Rosato as principal counsel for Appellee Square, Inc.. Service: 04/22/2016 by email. [329041]
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130773097 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                Entry of appearance for Michael T. Rosato as principal counsel for Appellee Square, Inc.. Service: 04/22/2016 by email. [329041] [Michael Rosato]
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Square, Inc.. Service: 04/22/2016 by email. [329040]
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130773094 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Square, Inc.. Service: 04/22/2016 by email. [329040] [Robin Brewer]
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Docketing Statement for the Appellee Square, Inc.. Service: 04/22/2016 by email. [329039]
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130773091 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Docketing Statement for the Appellee Square, Inc.. Service: 04/22/2016 by email. [329039] [Robin Brewer]
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Entry of appearance for Robin L. Brewer as of counsel for Appellee Square, Inc.. Service: 04/22/2016 by email. [329038]
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130773088 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            Entry of appearance for Robin L. Brewer as of counsel for Appellee Square, Inc.. Service: 04/22/2016 by email. [329038] [Robin Brewer]
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 0130767210 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Think Computer Corporation. Service: 04/13/2016 by email. [326189] [Isaac Rabicoff]
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Think Computer Corporation. Service: 04/13/2016 by email. [326189]
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130767207 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Corrected Entry of appearance for Isaac Rabicoff as principal counsel for Appellant Think Computer Corporation. Service: 04/13/2016 by email. [326188] [Isaac Rabicoff]
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Corrected Entry of appearance for Isaac Rabicoff as principal counsel for Appellant Think Computer Corporation. Service: 04/13/2016 by email. [326188]
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: The attorney entry of appearance for Isaac Rabicoff (Document No. [2]) and certificate of interest (Document No. [3]) filed by Appellant Think Computer Corporation in 16-1818 contain impermissible signatures and therefore cannot be accepted for filing at this time. You are being afforded the opportunity to correct the deficiency. At the discretion of the court, the corrected document may be accepted for filing if received before midnight (EST) on the date of this notice. [325868]
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: The attorney entry of appearance for Isaac Rabicoff (Document No. [2]) and certificate of interest (Document No. [3]) filed by Appellant Think Computer Corporation in 16-1818 contain impermissible signatures and therefore cannot be accepted for filing at this time. You are being afforded the opportunity to correct the deficiency. At the discretion of the court, the corrected document may be accepted for filing if received before midnight (EST) on the date of this notice. [325868]
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: The attorney entry of appearance for Isaac Rabicoff (Document No. [2]) and certificate of interest (Document No. [3]) filed by Appellant Think Computer Corporation in 16-1818 contain impermissible signatures and therefore cannot be accepted for filing at this time. You are being afforded the opportunity to correct the deficiency. At the discretion of the court, the corrected document may be accepted for filing if received before midnight (EST) on the date of this notice. [325868] [MJL]
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Think Computer Corporation. Service: 04/12/2016 by email. [325782]
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Think Computer Corporation. Service: 04/12/2016 by email. [325782] [Isaac Rabicoff]
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Entry of appearance for Isaac Rabicoff as principal counsel for Appellant Think Computer Corporation. Service: 04/12/2016 by email. [325780] [Isaac Rabicoff]
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130764515 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Appeal docketed. Received: 04/07/2016. [325007]
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Entry of Appearance due 04/22/2016. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/22/2016. Docketing Statement due 04/22/2016. Certified List due on 05/18/2016. [MJL]
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appeal docketed. Received: 04/07/2016. [325007] Entry of Appearance due 04/22/2016. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/22/2016. Docketing Statement due 04/22/2016. Certified List due on 05/18/2016.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 458 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?