Tate v. City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-01894
Magistrate Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 29, 2017 at 1:35 PM DT (3.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lamont Tate, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dam, Tuan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jo Ann Squillace +1 718 298 5050 jsquillace@dswinlaw.com
v.
No Logo AMKC Infirmary Corizon Health Incorporated, Defendant
No Logo AMKC Medical Clinic/Facility, Defendant
No Logo Anna M. Kross Center ("AMKC"), Defendant
No Logo John and Jane Does 1 Through 10, Defendant
Officially listed as "John and Jane Does"
No Logo NYC Dept. of Corr. Joseph Ponte, Defendant
No Logo Rikers Island Correctional Facility, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City Of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carolyn Elizabeth Kruk +1 212 788 1165 +1 212 788 0940 ckruk@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Russell Bergman +1 212 356 5051 zbergman@law.nyc.gov
No Logo The New York City Department of Corrections, Defendant
No Logo The New York City Department of Health, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Service
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Reply in Support
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Letter
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Initial Conference Hearing
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 10 MOTION for pre motion conference re 1 Complaint, Leave to Move to Dismiss filed by Lamont Tate. (Squillace, Joann) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Pre Motion Conference
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer The City Of New York answer/reponse is due 8/12/2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 6/10/2016. (Richardson, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Elizabeth Kruk on behalf of The City Of New York (aty to be noticed) (Kruk, Carolyn) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                    Summons Issued as to The City Of New York. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by The City Of New York. (Bergman, Zachary) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                        This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Russell Bergman on behalf of The City Of New York (aty to be noticed) (Bergman, Zachary) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                            In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:30 a.m. on August 23, 2016 before the undersigned in courtroom 13DS. Counsel are directed to refer to and comply with the attached Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 6/8/2016. (Attachments: # 1 CHAMBERS INDIVIDUAL RULES) (Richardson, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against City of New York filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-8542138 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by LAMONT TATE. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement CONT'D COMPLAINT, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, # 3 Proposed Summons, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Squillace, Joann) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 136 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?