Rose Jacques v. Chase Bank USA NA, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 16-1318

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 11:50 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012266939 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None
APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant Ms. Rose M. Jacques, filed. Volumes: 2 (Volume I attached to brief). Service by Clerks Office on 04/18/2016 by ECF. (RM)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012266924 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None
    PRO SE BRIEF with Volume I of appendix attached on behalf of Appellant Ms. Rose M. Jacques, filed. Pages: 19, Service by Clerks Office on 04/18/2016 by ECF. (RM)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012224211 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None
      ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Chase Bank USA NA, filed. (JCC)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012224028 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None
        ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Federal National Mortgage Association, filed. (JAD)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012224024 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None
          ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Seterus Inc, filed. (JAD)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012224021 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None
            ECF FILER: CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for attorney Appearance , attorney Appearance. Service made on 02/29/2016 by ECF, US mail. (JAD)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012223752 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None
              ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John C. Cordrey on behalf of Appellee(s) Chase Bank USA, N.A.. (JCC)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012221549 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None
                ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeffrey A. Dougherty on behalf of Appellee(s) Seterus Inc., and Federal National Mortgage Association. (JAD)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012220582 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None
                  ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Chava Brandriss on behalf of Appellee(s) Seterus Inc., and Federal National Mortgage Association. (CB)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012216246 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None
                    BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Rose M. Jacques due on or before 04/04/2016. Appendix due on or before 04/04/2016. (ARR)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012211998 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None
                    TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER FORM (Part 1), filed. Transcripts unnecessary for appeal purposes. (ARR)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012211949 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None
                      CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Ms. Rose M. Jacques in District Court No. 1-15-cv-00548. (ARR)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 189 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?