SICILIANO et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:15-vv-00253

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 26, 2017 at 3:04 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo KATHLEEN SICILIANO, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark T. Sadaka, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of E.S. MARK T. SADAKA +1 201 266 5670 +1 201 266 5671 mark@sadakafirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARK T. SADAKA +1 201 266 5670 +1 201 266 5671 mark@sadakafirm.com
No Logo SCOTT SICILIANO, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark T. Sadaka, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
and MARK T. SADAKA +1 201 266 5670 +1 201 266 5671 mark@sadakafirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARK T. SADAKA +1 201 266 5670 +1 201 266 5671 mark@sadakafirm.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Mary Becer +1 202 616 3665 +1 202 305 2988 christine.m.becer@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 300
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None
15-Week STIPULATION ORDER: Respondent shall, within 15 weeks, send petitioners the joint stipulation and file a status report. Within 30 days after the receipt of the stipulation, petitioners shall file a status report. Within 15 days after receiving the stipulation from petitioners,respondent shall file the signed stipulation. Respondent's Status Report due by 9/7/2016. Signed by Special Master Thomas L Gowen. (hj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 05/25/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None
    STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties shall file a joint status report by 5/25/2016. Signed by Special Master Thomas L Gowen. (hj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 04/25/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
      JOINT STATUS REPORT , filed by KATHLEEN SICILIANO, SCOTT SICILIANO. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None
        STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties shall file a joint status report by 4/22/2016. Signed by Special Master Thomas L Gowen. (hj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 03/23/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None
          MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #7, 8, 9, and 10] filed by KATHLEEN SICILIANO, SCOTT SICILIANO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None
            STATUS REPORT , filed by KATHLEEN SICILIANO, SCOTT SICILIANO. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None
              EXPERT REPORT of M. Eric Gershwin (Ex. no. 6) filed by KATHLEEN SICILIANO, SCOTT SICILIANO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Expert Report)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None
                STATUS REPORT , filed by KATHLEEN SICILIANO, SCOTT SICILIANO. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None
                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioners shall file an expert report by 2/8/2016. Signed by Special Master Thomas L Gowen. (hj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None
                    STATUS REPORT , filed by KATHLEEN SICILIANO, SCOTT SICILIANO. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF INTENT to Remain in the Program by Petitioner. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioners shall file an expert report or status report by 1/8/2016. Signed by Special Master Thomas L Gowen. (hj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
                          ORDER re: the statutory 240-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. (Signed by Special Master Thomas L. Gowen.)(mpj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None
                            STATUS REPORT , filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Becer, Christine) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                              STATUS REPORT , filed by SCOTT SICILIANO. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
                                SCHEDULING ORDER : Petitioner shall file a status report by 8/31/2015. Respondent's status report is due thirty days thereafter. Signed by Special Master Thomas L Gowen. (ca1) Copy to parties. (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                  Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Becer, Christine) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                    STATUS REPORT , filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Becer, Christine) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
                                      SCHEDULING ORDER : Respondent shall file a status report on whether she believes this case is appropriate for settlement discussions by 5/21/2015. Signed by Special Master Thomas L Gowen. (ca1) Copy to parties. (Entered: 04/21/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
                                        STATEMENT of Completion by. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None
                                          MEDICAL RECORDS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3.1, # 4 Exhibit 3.2, # 5 Exhibit 3.3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Mary Becer for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES .. (Becer, Christine) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Thomas Gowen. (afn) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (tjk) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                  PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $400, Receipt number CFC100000476) [Vaccination date: 1/23/13], filed by SCOTT SICILIANO, KATHLEEN SICILIANO.Respondents Report due by 6/9/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Coversheet)(tjk) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: A Status Conference has been set for 11/24/2015 at 01:00 PM (EST) in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Thomas L. Gowen. (NON-PDF ORDER) (Signed by Special Master Thomas L. Gowen.)(mpj) Copy to parties. Modified on 11/10/2015 (afn). (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 206 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?