District Appellate Supreme
Federal
District Of Columbia District Court Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
  1. Case No. 19-1081
    Filed on Unknown Date
  2. Case No. 18-154
    Filed 8/23/2018
  3. Case No. 18-155
    Filed 8/23/2018
  4. Case No. 19-1083
    Filed 10/16/2018
United States Supreme Court

NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM v. United States
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-00745-PLF
District Judge Paul L. Friedman, presiding

Tags
Last Updated June 16, 2021 at 4:53 PM DT (1.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alliance For Justice, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 17th Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
11 Dupont Circle, NW
Washington, DC 20036 William H. Narwold +1 860 882 1676 +1 860 882 1682 bnarwold@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gupta Beck PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deepak Gupta +1 202 888 1741 deepak@guptawessler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
11 Dupont Circle, NW
Washington, DC 20036 Elizabeth S. Smith +1 843 216 9240 +1 843 216 9430 esmith@motleyrice.com
No Logo National Consumer Law Center, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 17th Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
1001 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036 William H. Narwold +1 860 882 1676 +1 860 882 1682 bnarwold@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gupta Beck PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deepak Gupta +1 202 888 1741 deepak@guptawessler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
1001 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036 Elizabeth S. Smith +1 843 216 9240 +1 843 216 9430 esmith@motleyrice.com
No Logo National Veterans Legal Services Program, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 17th Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
1600 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006 William H. Narwold +1 860 882 1676 +1 860 882 1682 bnarwold@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gupta Beck PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deepak Gupta +1 202 888 1741 deepak@guptawessler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
1600 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006 Elizabeth S. Smith +1 843 216 9240 +1 843 216 9430 esmith@motleyrice.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530 Brian J. Field +1 202 252 2551 +1 202 234 2806 brian.field@usdoj.gov
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530 William Mark Nebeker +1 202 514 7230 +1 202 514 8780 mark.nebeker@usdoj.gov
No Logo AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF LAW LIBRARIES, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Relman, Dane & Colfax, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SASHA M. SAMBERG-CHAMPION +1 202 728 1888 +1 202 728 0848 ssamberg-champion@relmanlaw.com
No Logo American Society Of Newspaper Editors, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
The Associated Press The Associated Press, Amicus
Officially listed as "ASSOCIATED PRESS MEDIA EDITORS"

Toggle Switch Represented by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo ASSOCIATION OF ALTERNATIVE NEWS MEDIA, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo CENTER FOR INVESTIGATIVE REPORTING, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo DARRELL ISSA, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark I Bailen +1 202 861 1500 +1 202 861 1783 mbailen@bakerlaw.com
No Logo DEBORAH BEIM, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Relman, Dane & Colfax, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SASHA M. SAMBERG-CHAMPION +1 202 728 1888 +1 202 728 0848 ssamberg-champion@relmanlaw.com
No Logo FIRST AMENDMENT COALITION, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo First Look Media Works, Inc., Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo INTERNATIONAL DOCUMENTARY ASSOCIATION, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo INVESTIGATIVE REPORTING WORKSHOP, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo JONATHAN ZITTRAIN, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Relman, Dane & Colfax, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SASHA M. SAMBERG-CHAMPION +1 202 728 1888 +1 202 728 0848 ssamberg-champion@relmanlaw.com
No Logo JOSEPH I. LIEBERMAN, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark I Bailen +1 202 861 1500 +1 202 861 1783 mbailen@bakerlaw.com
No Logo MEDIA CONSORTIUM, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo MPA, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo NATIONAL PRESS PHOTOGRAPHERS ASSOCIATION, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo ONLINE NEWS ASSOCIATION, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo PHILLIP MALONE, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Relman, Dane & Colfax, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SASHA M. SAMBERG-CHAMPION +1 202 728 1888 +1 202 728 0848 ssamberg-champion@relmanlaw.com
No Logo RADIO TELEVISION DIGITAL NEWS ASSOCIATION, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo REPORTERS WITHOUT BORDERS, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo SEATTLE TIMES COMPANY, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo Senator JOSEPH I. LIEBERMAN, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark I Bailen +1 202 861 1500 +1 202 861 1783 mbailen@bakerlaw.com
No Logo SOCIETY OF PROFESSIONAL JOURNALISTS, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo Thomas, Bruce, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Relman, Dane & Colfax, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SASHA M. SAMBERG-CHAMPION +1 202 728 1888 +1 202 728 0848 ssamberg-champion@relmanlaw.com
No Logo TULLY CENTER FOR FREE SPEECH, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo DON KOZICH, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box 2032

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DON KOZICH +1 954 709 0537
No Logo ROB RAWSON, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by ROB RAWSON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROB RAWSON
No Logo ROSEMARIE HOWELL, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by ROSEMARIE HOWELL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROSEMARIE HOWELL +1 360 953 0798
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1346
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (161) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/18/2021. (tj)
    LREF
    Blank  Order
    MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties joint status report [112], this matter is STAYED until June 25, 2021. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before June 18, 2021 updating the Court on the status of any mediation. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 12/29/2020. (lceg)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: 12/23/2020 Status report
      Joint STATUS REPORT by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Gupta, Deepak)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank  Order
        MINUTE ORDER: In view of the recent decision by the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit remanding this case for further proceedings, it is ORDERED that the parties file a joint status report on or before December 23, 2020 addressing how they wish to proceed. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 12/11/2020. (lceg)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: 9/29/2020 USCA Mandate
          MANDATE of USCA as to [107] Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER ; USCA Case Number 19-1081, 19-1083. (Attachments: # (1) USCA Judgment)(zrdj)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: 9/11/2020 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
            Case directly reassigned to Judge Paul L. Friedman by consent. Judge Christopher R. Cooper is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: 9/11/2020 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
              ENTERED IN ERROR.....Case randomly reassigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. Judge Ellen S. Huvelle is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) Modified on 9/11/2020 (rj).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to Federal Circuit
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  Notice - other
                    USCA for the Federal Circuit Case Number 19-1083-SJ (zrdj)
                      LREF
                      Blank  Notice - other
                      USCA for the Federal Circuit Case Number 19-1083-SJ (zrdj)
                        LREF
                        Blank  Notice - other
                        USCA for the Federal Circuit Case Number 19-1081-SJ (zrdj)
                          LREF
                          Blank  Notice - other
                          USCA for the Federal Circuit Case Number 18-155-CP (zrdj)
                            LREF
                            Blank  Notice - other
                            USCA for the Federal Circuit Case Number 18-154-CP (zrdj)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: 8/20/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle held on 7-18-18; Page Numbers: 1-21. Date of Issuance:7-18-18. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/18/2018.(Wallace, Scott)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 105 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                MEMORANDUM OPINION accompanying August 13, 2018 Order, ECF No. [104], re certification of March 31, 2018 Order, ECF No. [88] for interlocutory appeal. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 13, 2018. (AG)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 104 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Order on Motion for Certification for Interlocatory AppealCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part [99] defendant's Motion for to Certify Orders for Interlocutory Appeal; amending Order filed on March 31, 2018, ECF No. [88], to certify for interlocutory appeal for the reasons stated in an accompanying Memorandum Opinion, ECF No. [105]; and granting [99] unopposed Motion to Stay. See order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 13, 2018. (AG)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 103 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: 8/2/2018 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re [99] MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal MOTION to Stay filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Field, Brian)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 Response to motion
                                      RESPONSE re [99] MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal MOTION to Stay filed by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Gupta, Deepak)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document 101 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Status report
                                        Joint STATUS REPORT by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Gupta, Deepak)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 100 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Notice - other
                                          NOTICE Regarding Annual Courtroom Technology Expenditures by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Field, Brian)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Status Conference
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle: Status Conference held on 7/18/2018. Parties should submit a report by the C.O.B. on Friday, 7/20/18. (Court Reporter: Scott Wallace) (gdf)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018, Terminated: 8/13/2018 Motion for Certification for interlocatory appeal
                                              MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal, MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Field, Brian). Added MOTION to Stay on 7/17/2018 (jf).
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 98 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 Status report
                                                Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Field, Brian)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 97 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER re discovery and future proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 7/13/2018. Status Conference set for 7/18/2018 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. See order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on May 17, 2018. (AG)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                    TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle held on 4-18-18; Page Numbers: 1-38. Date of Issuance:5-17-18. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Griffith, Telephone number (202) 354-3247, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/7/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2018.(Griffith, Lisa)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                      TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle held on 3-23-18; Page Numbers: 1-121. Date of Issuance:5-17-18. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Griffith, Telephone number (202) 354-3247, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/7/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2018.(Griffith, Lisa)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank  Status Conference
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 5/17/18 : Status Conference held. Order to be issued. Joint Status Report due by 7/13/18. Further Status Conference set for 7/18/18 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (Court Reporter: Lisa Griffith) (kk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 94 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Status report
                                                          Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Field, Brian)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                            MINUTE ORDER denying [93] Motion for Extension of Time to file Status Report; granting in part and denying in part [93] Motion to Continue Status Conference: Upon consideration of defendant's motion, plaintiffs' opposition thereto, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that defendant's motion for an extension of time to file a status report is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that defendant's motion to continue the Status Conference presently set for May 18, 2018, is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; and it is further ORDERED that the Status Conference presently scheduled for May 18, 2018, is RESCHEDULED to May 17, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 23A. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 27, 2018. (AG)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018, Terminated: 4/27/2018 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report, MOTION to Continue Status Conference by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Field, Brian)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document 92 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER setting Status Conference for May 18, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 23A. Joint Status Report due by May 11, 2018. See order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 18, 2018. (AG)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Status Conference
                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle: Status Conference held on 4/18/2018. Status Report due by 5/11/2018. Status Conference set for 5/18/2018 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (gdf)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: 4/16/2018 Status report
                                                                    Joint STATUS REPORT Proposing a Schedule to Govern Further Proceedings by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Narwold, William)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/16/2018. (gdf)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 90 Filed: 3/31/2018, Entered: 4/2/2018 Supplemental MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                        ATTACHMENT to [89] Memorandum & Opinion Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 31, 2018. (ztnr)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 89 Filed: 3/31/2018, Entered: 3/31/2018 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION accompanying Order, ECF No. [88], denying [52] plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and granting in part and denying in part defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 31, 2018. (AG) Modified on 4/2/2018 to remove attachment. Attachment docketed separately for opinion posting purposes.(ztnr)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/3/2021, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 88 Filed: 3/31/2018, Entered: 3/31/2018 Order on motion for summary judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER denying [52] plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part [73] defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; and setting Status Conference for 4/18/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 23A. Joint status report due by April 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 31, 2018. (AG)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 87 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: 3/29/2018 Reply to Document
                                                                                  REPLY re [86] Response to Document filed by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 86 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: 3/29/2018 Response to Document
                                                                                    RESPONSE re [85] Notice (Other) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Field, Brian)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 85 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                      RESPONSE to Defendant's supplemental authority by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM re [84] Notice (Other) (Gupta, Deepak) Modified event title on 3/29/2018 (znmw).
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 84 Filed: 3/24/2018, Entered: 3/24/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                        NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. A, # (2) Exhibit Ex. B, # (3) Exhibit Ex. C, # (4) Exhibit Ex. D, # (5) Exhibit Ex. E, # (6) Exhibit Ex. F, # (7) Exhibit Ex. G)(Field, Brian)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                          Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle: Oral Arguments held on 3/23/2018. Plaintiffs' [52] MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability and Defendant's [73] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment; heard and Taken Under Advisement. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (hs)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                            Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2018 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: 3/21/2018, Terminated: 3/21/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan Taylor, :Firm- Gupta Wessler PLLC, :Address- jon@guptawessler.com. Phone No. - 2028881741. Fax No. - 2028887792 Address: 1900 L Street NW, Suite 312, Washington DC 20036 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5383035. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jonathan Taylor, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: 3/21/2018, Terminated: 3/21/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Meghan Oliver, :Firm- Motley Rice LLC, :Address- 28 Bridgeside Blvd, Mt. Pleasant, SC 29464. Phone No. - 843-216-9492. Fax No. - 843-216-9430 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5382765. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Meghan Oliver, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Smith, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [83] Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Upon consideration of the Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Jonathan Taylor is admitted pro hac vice for the purpose of appearing in proceedings in the above-captioned case. Counsel is reminded that pursuant to LCvR 83.2(c)(2) "An attorney who engages in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia must be a member of the District of Columbia Bar and the Bar of this Court to file papers in this Court." Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 21, 2018. (AG)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting [82] Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Upon consideration of the above-referenced motion, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Meghan Oliver is admitted pro hac vice for the purpose of appearing in the above-captioned case. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 21, 2018. (AG)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the hearing on plaintiffs' MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability and defendant's Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment is CONTINUED from Wednesday, March 21, 2018, to Friday, March 23, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 21, 2018. (AG)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: 3/15/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Filing by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re [52] MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability, Order Setting Hearing on Motion, [73] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Tabs 1 through 40)(Nebeker, William)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion to continue
                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part [80] Consent Motion to Continue: Upon consideration of the Consent Motion to Continue, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is granted in part and denied in part; and it is further ORDERED that the Summary Judgment Motions Hearing presently set for 3/19/2018 is CONTINUED TO 3/21/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 23A. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 2, 2018. (AG)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018, Terminated: 3/2/2018 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                            Consent MOTION to Continue Motions Hearing by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Field, Brian)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on Motions: It is hereby ORDERED that a hearing on [52] plaintiffs' MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability and [73] defendant's Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment is set for Monday, March 19, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on February 27, 2018. (AG)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 79 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re [73] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Field, Brian)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 Leave to File DeniedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Declaration of Amended Service. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave To File Denied" Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 12/12/2017. (jf)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 77 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017, Terminated: 12/8/2017 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [73] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Field, Brian)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part [77] defendant's opposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re [73] Cross Motion for Summary Judgment: Upon consideration of the above-referenced motion, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; and it is further ORDERED that defendant shall have until January 5, 2018, to file its reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 8, 2017. (lcesh2)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 76 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re [73] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (See Docket Entry [75] to view document). (znmw)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: 12/5/2017 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re [52] MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability, filed by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Facts Response to Defendant's Statement of Facts)(Gupta, Deepak) Modified to remove link on 12/6/2017 (znmw).
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re [52] MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Declaration Decl. of W. Skidgel, # (3) Statement of Facts, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Field, Brian)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017, Terminated: 3/31/2018 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                              Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Declaration Decl. of W. Skidgel, # (3) Statement of Facts, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Field, Brian)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Rosemarie Howell's Verified Motion with Briefing [72] is STRICKEN from the docket as filed without leave of Court; it is further ORDERED that leave to file is denied because Rosemarie Howell has opted out of the class, see ECF 45; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall return the motion to Rosemarie Howell, along with a copy of this Minute Order. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 9, 2017. (lcesh2)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 71 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: 11/6/2017 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [70] Motion for Reconsideration of October 17, 2017 Order Denying Petitioners Motion for Clarification of September 13, 2017 Order and Denying Petitioners Motion to File Amicus Curiae; and granting Movant access to documents filed in this case. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 6, 2017. (lcesh2)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration re [68] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Clarify by DON KOZICH (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(jf)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting [69] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re [52] MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability: Upon Consideration of the Unopposed Motion For An Enlargement Of Time, AndMemorandum In Support Thereof in response thereto, and for the reasons set forth in support thereof, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion should be and is hereby GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant file its opposition to Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment As To Liability (ECF No. [52]) on or before November 17, 2017; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs may respond to Defendant's filing on or before December 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on October 31, 2017. (AG)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: 11/8/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                      STRIKEN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 11/9/17.....Verified MOTION with Briefing by ROSEMARIE HOWELL (Attachments: # (1) Appendix 1, # (2) Appendix 2, # (3) Appendix 3)(jf) Modified on 11/12/2017 (zgdf).
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: 10/30/2017, Terminated: 10/31/2017 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [52] MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 68 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: 10/17/2017 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [49] Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief and to Appear Telephonically; denying as moot [67] Motion to Clarify: see Order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on October 17, 2017. (lcesh2)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 67 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017 Motion to clarify
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Clarify Minute Order dated 09/13/2017 by DON KOZICH (jf)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 66 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: 10/2/2017 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING as moot [64] Motion for Free Access to PACER Until Final Disposition of this Case. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on October 2, 2017. (lcesh2,)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 65 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: 9/29/2017 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re [64] MOTION For Free Access To Pacer filed by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: 9/27/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                              Verified MOTION For Free Access To Pacer by DON KOZICH (jf)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part [57] defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re [52] plaintiffs' MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability: Upon consideration of defendant's motion, plaintiff's partial consent and partial opposition thereto, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that defendant shall have until November 2, 2017, to file its response to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiffs reply is due by November 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 14, 2017. (AG)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 63 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: 9/14/2017 Amicus Brief
                                                                                                                                                  AMICUS BRIEF by JOSEPH I. LIEBERMAN, DARRELL ISSA. (znmw)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: 9/14/2017 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                                                                                                    LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF LAW LIBRARIES. (See Docket Entry [61] to view document). (znmw)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 61 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: 9/14/2017 Amicus Brief
                                                                                                                                                      AMICUS BRIEF by AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF LAW LIBRARIES, DEBORAH BEIM, THOMAS BRUCE, PHILLIP MALONE, JONATHAN ZITTRAIN. (znmw)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 60 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: 9/14/2017 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                                                                                                        LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF NEWSPAPER EDITORS, ASSOCIATED PRESS MEDIA EDITORS, ASSOCIATION OF ALTERNATIVE NEWS MEDIA, CENTER FOR INVESTIGATIVE REPORTING, FIRST AMENDMENT COALITION, FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC., INTERNATIONAL DOCUMENTARY ASSOCIATION, INVESTIGATIVE REPORTING WORKSHOP, MEDIA CONSORTIUM, MPA, NATIONAL PRESS PHOTOGRAPHERS ASSOCIATION, ONLINE NEWS ASSOCIATION, RADIO TELEVISION DIGITAL NEWS ASSOCIATION, REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS, REPORTERS WITHOUT BORDERS, SEATTLE TIMES COMPANY, SOCIETY OF PROFESSIONAL JOURNALISTS, TULLY CENTER FOR FREE SPEECH identifying Other Affiliate SYRACUSE UNIVERSITY for TULLY CENTER FOR FREE SPEECH; Other Affiliate AMERICAN UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF COMMUNICATION for INVESTIGATIVE REPORTING WORKSHOP; Corporate Parent MCCLATCHY COMPANY for SEATTLE TIMES COMPANY. (znmw)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 59 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: 9/14/2017 Amicus Brief
                                                                                                                                                          AMICUS BRIEF by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF NEWSPAPER EDITORS, ASSOCIATED PRESS MEDIA EDITORS, ASSOCIATION OF ALTERNATIVE NEWS MEDIA, CENTER FOR INVESTIGATIVE REPORTING, FIRST AMENDMENT COALITION, FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC., INTERNATIONAL DOCUMENTARY ASSOCIATION, INVESTIGATIVE REPORTING WORKSHOP, MEDIA CONSORTIUM, MPA, NATIONAL PRESS PHOTOGRAPHERS ASSOCIATION, ONLINE NEWS ASSOCIATION, RADIO TELEVISION DIGITAL NEWS ASSOCIATION, REPORTERS WITHOUT BORDERS, SEATTLE TIMES COMPANY, SOCIETY OF PROFESSIONAL JOURNALISTS, TULLY CENTER FOR FREE SPEECH. (znmw)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 58 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: 9/13/2017 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re [57] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 57 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: 9/13/2017, Terminated: 9/14/2017 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Field, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank  order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting [53] [55] [56] Movants' Motions for Leave to File Briefs as Amicus Curiae: Upon consideration of the above-referenced motions, plaintiffs' consent and defendant's representation that it will not oppose, it is hereby ORDERED that the motions are GRANTED and movants are granted leave to file briefs as amicus curiae. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 13, 2017. (AG)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Reconsideration re 68 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Clarify by DON KOZICH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(jf) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/5/2017, Terminated: 9/13/2017 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by JOSEPH I. LIEBERMAN (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Bailen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/5/2017, Terminated: 9/13/2017 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae by AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF LAW LIBRARIES (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Brief, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Samberg-Champion, Sasha)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/5/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Sasha Samberg-Champion on behalf of AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF LAW LIBRARIES (Samberg-Champion, Sasha)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 67 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Clarify Minute Order dated 09/13/2017 by DON KOZICH (jf) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/5/2017, Terminated: 9/13/2017 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Certificate of Corporate Disclosure)(Brown, Bruce)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: 8/28/2017, Terminated: 3/31/2018 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Jonathan Taylor, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit F, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit G, # (9) Exhibit Exhibit H, # (10) Exhibit Exhibit I, # (11) Exhibit Exhibit J, # (12) Exhibit Exhibit K, # (13) Exhibit Exhibit L, # (14) Exhibit Exhibit M, # (15) Declaration Declaration of Thomas Lee and Michael Lissner, # (16) Statement of Facts Plaintiffs' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts)(Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 51 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: 8/24/2017 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Elizabeth S. Smith (Smith, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 64 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Verified MOTION For Free Access To Pacer by DON KOZICH (jf) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 50 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENT re [45] NOTICE to Exclude by ROSEMARIE HOWELL re [44] ORDER granting 42 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Approval of Revised Plan of Class Notice and Class Notice Documents filed by ROSEMARIE HOWELL. (jf)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 49 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: 7/18/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae, MOTION to Appear by Phone, by DON KOZICH (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(jf) Modified text on 7/19/2017 (znmw).
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Summary Judgment motion due by 8/28/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/18/2017. Plaintiff's Reply in support of Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/28/2017. (hs)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 48 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017, Terminated: 7/5/2017 motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Deepak Gupta (Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [48] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment: Upon consideration of the plaintiffs' unopposed motion to extend the briefing schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the time within which the plaintiffs may file their motion for summary judgment solely on the issue of liability, i.e., whether the fees charged to access records through PACER violate the E-Government Act of 2002, Pub. L. No. 107-347,
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  order on motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017, Terminated: 6/15/2017 Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Order for Exclusion by ROB RAWSON. "Let this be filed" signed by Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle on 06/09/2017 (jf) Modified event title on 6/16/2017 (znmw).
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail a copy of [46] NOTICE of and MOTION For An Order For Exclusion filed by ROB RAWSON to the PACER Fees Class Action Administrator, P.O. Box 43434, Providence, RI 02940-3434. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on June 15, 2017. (lcesh2)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Exclude by ROSEMARIE HOWELL re [44] ORDER granting [42] Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Approval of Revised Plan of Class Notice and Class Notice Documents (jf)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: 4/17/2017 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [42] Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Approval of Revised Plan of Class Notice and Class Notice Documents: See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 17, 2017. (lcesh2)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER finding as moot [37] Motion for Approval of Class Notice in light of approval of [42] Motion for Approval of Revised Class Notice. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 17, 2017. (AG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: 4/14/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing of Revised Notice Documents by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 Revised Email Notice, # (2) Exhibit 1A Revised and Blacklined Email Notice, # (3) Exhibit 2 Revised Postcard Notice, # (4) Exhibit 2A Revised and Blacklined Postcard Notice)(Narwold, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017, Terminated: 4/17/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Approval of Revised Plan of Class Notice and Class Notice Documents by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Email Notice, # (2) Exhibit 1-A - BLACKLINE Email Notice, # (3) Exhibit 2 - Postcard Notice, # (4) Exhibit 2-A - BLACKLINE Postcard Notice, # (5) Exhibit 3 - Website Notice, # (6) Exhibit 3-A - BLACKLINE Website Notice, # (7) Exhibit 4 - Online Exclusion, # (8) Exhibit 5 - Printable Exclusion, # (9) Exhibit 6 - Proposed Order, # (10) Exhibit 6-A - BLACKLINE Proposed Order)(Narwold, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017 Order on Motion for protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting [40] Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 3, 2017. (lcesh2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017, Terminated: 4/3/2017 Motion for protective order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Protective Order by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Narwold, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae, MOTION to Appear by Phone, by DON KOZICH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(jf) Modified text on 7/19/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 07/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Joint Filing of Proposed Order by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM re [37] Unopposed MOTION For Approval of Plan of Class Notice (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Narwold, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: 2/28/2017 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE re [37] Unopposed MOTION For Approval of Plan of Class Notice filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Nebeker, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: 2/23/2017, Terminated: 4/17/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION For Approval of Plan of Class Notice by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Email Notice, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Postcard Notice, # (3) Exhibit 2 - Website Notice, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Narwold, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: 2/21/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Exclude by ROSEMARIE HOWELL re 44 ORDER granting 42 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Approval of Revised Plan of Class Notice and Class Notice Documents (jf) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle held on 1-18-17; Page Numbers: (1-29). Date of Issuance:1-29-17. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2017.(Wallace, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 34 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: 1/24/2017 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: See Order for deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on January 24, 2017. (lcesh2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 33 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: 1/24/2017 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION in support of [32] Order Granting [8] Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on January 24, 2017. (lcesh2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: 1/24/2017 order on motion to certify classCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [8] Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class for the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on January 24, 2017. (lcesh2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: 1/20/2017 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT re [8] MOTION to Certify Class of Deepak Gupta (Second) by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: 1/20/2017 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT re [8] MOTION to Certify Class of Barton F. Stichman by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: 1/20/2017 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT re [8] MOTION to Certify Class of Stuart Rossman by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: 1/20/2017 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT re [8] MOTION to Certify Class of Daniel L. Goldberg by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle: Motion Hearing held on 1/18/2017, re [8] MOTION to Certify Class, heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Scott Wallace) (gdf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Nebeker, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion: It is hereby ORDERED that a motion hearing on [8] Plaintiffs' MOTION to Certify Class is set for 1/18/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 15, 2016. (lcesh2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: 12/6/2016 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM (Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact) to re [11] MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (znmw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: 12/5/2016 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION in support of [24] Order Denying [11] Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 5, 2016. (lcesh2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: 12/5/2016 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [11] Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment for the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 5, 2016. (lcesh2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part [21] Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs may file [21-2] Plaintiffs' Concise Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact, but plaintiffs may not file [21-1] Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply. A sur-reply is unnecessary because plaintiffs seek to reply to a statement that defendant originally presented in its motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 5, 2016. (lcesh2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/1/2016, Entered: 10/1/2016 Notice of Supplemental Authority
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Opinion in Fisher v. United States)(Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: 8/17/2016 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE re [21] MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: 8/17/2016, Terminated: 12/5/2016 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Sur-Reply, # (2) Statement of Facts, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: 8/16/2016 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re [11] MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Second Garcia)(Nebeker, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM (Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact) to re 11 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (znmw) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: 8/16/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties' [18] Joint Motion for Proposed Phased Schedule is hereby GRANTED. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 16, 2016. (lcesh2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendant's [14] Motion to Stay is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 16, 2016. (lcesh2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion for Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the [18] Joint Motion for Scheduling Order is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 16, 2016. (lcesh2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: 8/9/2016, Terminated: 8/16/2016 Motion for Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Narwold, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [16] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re [11] MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment : Upon consideration of the Unopposed Motion For An Enlargement Of Time, And Memorandum In Support Thereof, and for the reasons set forth in support thereof, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the time within which Defendant may file a reply to Plaintiffs' opposition to the pending Motion To Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment is enlarged up to and including August 16, 2016. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 5, 2016. (AG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: 8/4/2016 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re [8] MOTION to Certify Class filed by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: 8/4/2016, Terminated: 8/5/2016 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [11] MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: 7/29/2016 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE re [11] MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Govt's MTD in Fisher, # (2) Exhibit Complaint in NVLSP v. USA, # (3) Exhibit Complaint in Fisher)(Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: 7/26/2016, Terminated: 8/16/2016 Motion To Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Stay Discovery by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re [8] MOTION to Certify Class filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Declaration Garcia, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: 7/8/2016, Terminated: 7/8/2016 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [8] MOTION to Certify Class , [11] MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting [12] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re [8] MOTION to Certify Class and [11] MOTION to Dismiss: Upon consideration of the parties' joint motion to extend the briefing schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is FURTHER ORDERED that the time within which the defendant may file a memorandum of points and authorities in response to plaintiffs' motion for class certification is further extended though July 25, 2016, and no additional extensions shall be granted; and it isFURTHER ORDERED that the time within which the plaintiffs may file a memorandum of points and authorities in response to defendant's motion to dismiss is initially extended though July 29, 2016. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 7, 2016. (AG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: 6/27/2016, Terminated: 12/5/2016 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit (1 through 5), # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendant's unopposed [10] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply is GRANTED, and defendant's Response is due by July 11, 2016. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on May 17, 2016. (lcesh2 )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: 5/16/2016, Terminated: 5/17/2016 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [8] MOTION to Certify Class by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: 5/16/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Nebeker, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: 5/2/2016, Terminated: 1/24/2017 motion to certify class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Certify Class by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Deepak Gupta, # (2) Declaration of William Narwold, # (3) Declaration of Jonathan Taylor, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: 5/2/2016 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/02/2016. (Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016, Terminated: 4/26/2016 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- William H. Narwold, :Firm- Motley Rice LLC, :Address- 20 Church Street, 17th Floor, Hartford, CT 06103. Phone No. - 860-882-1676. Fax No. - 860-882-1682 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4500590. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth S. Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smith, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/26/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/25/2016. (Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [6] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: It is hereby ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that William H. Narwold is admitted pro hac vice for the purpose of appearing in the above-captioned case. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 26, 2016. (AG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: 4/22/2016 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # (1) Consent Forms)(jd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: 4/21/2016 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: 4/21/2016 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against All Defendants United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4495374) filed by NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM, ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summons to United States Attorney General, # (3) Summons to U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia)(Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case Assigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (jd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 538 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?