General Patent Corporation v. Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett &dunner, Llp
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91227491-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo General Patent Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Nissenbaum +1 718 344 4406 sleeksensation@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David M. Kelly +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 docketing@finnegan.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney ELIZABETH A DUNN
Date in Location 4/25/2016
Status Code 2
Location Code 845
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None T
Bd Decision: Dismissed W/o Prej
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None N
    W/draw Of Opposition
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None S
      Susp Pend Disp Of Outstndng Mot
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None T
        Paper Received At Ttab
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None T
          Change Of Corresp Address
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None T
            Pending, Instituted
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None T
              Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None N
                Filed And Fee
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 3 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?