Ryan et al v. The City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-01564
District Judge Richard J. Sullivan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 25, 2017 at 10:42 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Adam Bunn, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Minna Weber +1 212 748 3355 +1 212 233 5633 rose_weber@juno.com
No Logo Andrew Mahoney, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Minna Weber +1 212 748 3355 +1 212 233 5633 rose_weber@juno.com
No Logo Anna Ogden-Nussbaum, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Minna Weber +1 212 748 3355 +1 212 233 5633 rose_weber@juno.com
No Logo Craig Weltha, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Rose Minna Weber +1 212 748 3355 +1 212 233 5633 rose_weber@juno.com
No Logo Daniel Wood, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Minna Weber +1 212 748 3355 +1 212 233 5633 rose_weber@juno.com
No Logo David Muelken, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Minna Weber +1 212 748 3355 +1 212 233 5633 rose_weber@juno.com
No Logo Eva Prokop, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Minna Weber +1 212 748 3355 +1 212 233 5633 rose_weber@juno.com
No Logo India D'Arthenay-Adams, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Minna Weber +1 212 748 3355 +1 212 233 5633 rose_weber@juno.com
No Logo Jacquelyn Vendetti, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Minna Weber +1 212 748 3355 +1 212 233 5633 rose_weber@juno.com
No Logo Jessica Partnow, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Minna Weber +1 212 748 3355 +1 212 233 5633 rose_weber@juno.com
No Logo Joel Dodge, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Minna Weber +1 212 748 3355 +1 212 233 5633 rose_weber@juno.com
No Logo Joshua Haglund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Minna Weber +1 212 748 3355 +1 212 233 5633 rose_weber@juno.com
No Logo Juliette Consigny, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Minna Weber +1 212 748 3355 +1 212 233 5633 rose_weber@juno.com
No Logo Kathleen McEldowney, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Minna Weber +1 212 748 3355 +1 212 233 5633 rose_weber@juno.com
No Logo Lindsay, Ryan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Minna Weber +1 212 748 3355 +1 212 233 5633 rose_weber@juno.com
No Logo Luke Meyer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Minna Weber +1 212 748 3355 +1 212 233 5633 rose_weber@juno.com
No Logo Michael Moren, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Rose Minna Weber +1 212 748 3355 +1 212 233 5633 rose_weber@juno.com
No Logo Michael Muench, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Minna Weber +1 212 748 3355 +1 212 233 5633 rose_weber@juno.com
No Logo Paisley Davidson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Minna Weber +1 212 748 3355 +1 212 233 5633 rose_weber@juno.com
No Logo Paul Bekavac, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Minna Weber +1 212 748 3355 +1 212 233 5633 rose_weber@juno.com
No Logo Rebecca Vaughn, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Minna Weber +1 212 748 3355 +1 212 233 5633 rose_weber@juno.com
No Logo Sarah Glidden, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Minna Weber +1 212 748 3355 +1 212 233 5633 rose_weber@juno.com
No Logo Steven Phillips, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Minna Weber +1 212 748 3355 +1 212 233 5633 rose_weber@juno.com
No Logo Tila Duhaime, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Rose Minna Weber +1 212 748 3355 +1 212 233 5633 rose_weber@juno.com
v.
No Logo Chief Bruce Smolka, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Chief Joseph Esposito, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Chief Nicholas Estavillo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Chief Patrick Devlin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Chief Thomas Purtell, Defendant
No Logo Deputy Chief Terence Monahan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Deputy Commissioner David Cohen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Raju Sundaran +1 212 788 0467 +1 212 788 9776 rsundara@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Deputy Commissioner John Colgan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Deputy Commissioner Stephen Hammerman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Deputy Commissioner Thomas Doepfner, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Deputy Inspector Kerry Sweet, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Insp. Gerald Dieckmann, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Insp. Thomas Galati, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Insp. Thomas Graham, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo LT. Daniel Albano, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mayor Michael Bloomberg"

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo P.O. Bart Pipcinski, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo P.O. Brian Martin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo P.O. Christopher Krutys, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo P.O. Ebony Huntley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo P.O. Francesco Belluscio, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo P.O. John Belluscio, Defendant
No Logo P.O. John Fong, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo P.O. John Hamer, Defendant
No Logo P.O. John Martinez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo P.O. Linda Araque, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo P.O. Mark Steiner, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo P.O. Mark Vazquez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo P.O. Robert Hamer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo P.O. Thomas McDonnell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo P.O. Timothy Spies, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo P.O.s John and Jane Doe, Defendant
No Logo Police Commissioner Raymond Kelly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Police Officer Jacqueline DeCarlo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Police Officer Neil Stumpf, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Police Officers John and Jane Does 1-50, Defendant
No Logo Senior Counsel Ruby Marin-Jordan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay Alan Kranis +1 212 788 8683 +1 212 788 9776 jkranis@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Mirro +1 212 788 8026 +1 212 788 9776 jmirro@law.nyc.gov
Space Raju Sundaran +1 212 788 0467 +1 212 788 9776 rsundara@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jed Matthew Weiss +1 212 908 1210 +1 866 832 7206 jmweiss@cozen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred Michael Weiler +1 212 788 1817 +1 212 788 9776 fweiler@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo The Hudson River Park Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred Michael Weiler +1 212 788 1817 +1 212 788 9776 fweiler@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
No Logo All Defendants, All Defendants

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cheryl Leah Shammas +1 212 788 1570 +1 212 788 9776 cshammas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo All Plaintiffs, All Plaintiffs

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Minna Weber +1 212 748 3355 +1 212 233 5633 rose_weber@juno.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (235) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Sealed Legal Document 241 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
SEALED MATERIALS RETRIEVED: Document(s) 139 and 221 were retrieved on 04/29/2015.(mps) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
    NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RETRIEVE SEALED MATERIAL: Notice to the attorney of record for the filing party to retrieve sealed document number NYC Law Department within thirty (30) days, or the Court will dispose of them. Sealed Records Retrieval due by 4/24/2015. (mps) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
      NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RETRIEVE SEALED MATERIAL: Notice to the attorney of record for the filing party to retrieve sealed document number 139 within thirty (30) days, or the Court will dispose of them. Sealed Records Retrieval due by 4/24/2015.(mps) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Cheryl L. Shammas dated 5/29/2014 re: Given the volume of the evidence in these RNC cases, particularly on the Monell issues, defendants respectfully request permission to submit their Rule 56.1 Statement of Undisputed Fact with citations to the documents and with only select supporting documents, rather than providing copies of all supporting documents. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/30/2014) (cd) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Cheryl L. Shammas dated 3/12/2014 re: Defendants request that the Court adjourn the summary judgment deadline sine die. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the deadline for summary judgment motions regarding the five Plaintiffs named below is adjourned to 5/30/2014. Responses shall be due 6/30/2014 and replies shall be due 7/14/2014. No further extensions shall be given. ( Motion due by 5/30/2014. Responses due by 6/30/2014. Replies due by 7/14/2014.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/13/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(cd) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER: The Court has been informed that all RNC claims have been settled except for those brought by: (1) Brian Conley; (2) Yusuke Banno; (3) Valarie Brar; (4) Joshua Russell; (5) Kate Freitag; (6) Steven Ekberg; (7) Howard Gale; (8) Andrew St. Laurent; and (9) Robert Siegel. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT all RNC cases, with the exception of the claims brought by the Plaintiffs listed above, are dismissed with prejudice but without costs. However, within thirty days of the date of this Order, any party may send a letter requesting to restore any action to the undersigned's calendar. Upon receipt of such a letter, the action will be restored. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/12/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(cd) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER: The clerk of the court is respectfully directed to unseal and docket the six attached orders. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/31/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(cd) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER: (Docket in all Related cases): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT all motions for reconsideration pending in the Consolidated RNC Cases are dismissed without prejudice, subject to renewal at any party's request. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the parties shall submit a joint letter to the Court by September 9, 2013 advising it of the status of any efforts to resolve these actions without further litigation. In light of this Order, the Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the following motions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/09/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(ama) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Raju Sundaran dated 11/16/12 re: Counsel writes on behalf of the parties to propose the following schedule concerning the motions for reconsideration: oppositions due on Wednesday, December 12, 2012; and Replies due on Friday, December 21, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Responses due by 12/12/2012. Replies due by 12/21/2012.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/19/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Entry made pursuant to Order Doc. No. 636 in Case No. 04cv7922. (rjm). (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendants shall respond to Mr. Meyerson's letter proposing that the Court set trials for his clients' cases by December 12, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the parties in Dudek v. City of New York, et al., No. 04 Civ. 10178 (RJS), Bell v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 3705 (RJS), Starin v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 5152 (RJS), Lahn Sheen Lee v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 5528 (RJS), and Cohen v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 6780 (RJS) shall appear for a pretrial conference on Friday, January 4, 2013 at 4:15 p.m. Mr. Meyerson also requests that the Court make specific findings concerning the circumstances of Plaintiffs Carol Dudek, Julia Cohen and Jennifer Lahn Sheen Lee. the Court denied the parties' summary judgment cross-motions as further set forth in this order. Thus, Mr. Meyerson's requests are HEREBY DENIED. Finally, the Clerk of the Court is respectfully requested to docket the motion for reconsideration submitted in case No. 04 Civ. 9216 (RJS) in the following cases: Dudek v. City of New York, et al., No. 04 Civ. 10178, Bell v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 3705, Starin v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 5152, Lahn Sheen Lee v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 5528, Meehan, et al., v. Stanich, et al., No. 05 Civ. 5268, Cohen v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 6780, Pagoda v. Caban, et al., No. 05 Civ. 7546, Coburn, et al., v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 7623, Phillips, et al., v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 7624, Sloan, et al., v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 7688, Galitzer v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 7699, Bastidas, et al., v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 7670, Xu, et al., v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 7672, Sikelianos v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 7673, Drescher v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 7541, Abdell v. City of New York, No. 05 Civ. 8453, Concepcion v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 8501, Eastwood v. City of New York, No. 05 Civ. 9483, Adams v. City of New York, No. 05 Civ. 9484, Araneda v. City of New York, No. 05 Civ. 9738, Tikkun v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 9901, Kennedy v. City of New York, No. 07 Civ. 7678, Manders, et al. v. City of New York, et al., No. 07 Civ. 7752, Jusick, et al. v. City of New York, et al., No. 07 Civ. 7683, and Rigby v. City of New York, et al., No. 07 Civ. 7751. In addition, the Clerk of the Court is respectfully requested to docket the scheduling order issued in the above-captioned action as Doc. No. 635 in all related RNC actions. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/4/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(rjm) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER: To avoid the need to issue separate extensions in the many consolidated actions, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties in all related RNC cases shall have until November 7, 2012 to submit motions for reconsideration. ( Motions due by 11/7/2012.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/15/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(cd) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 9/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth above,Defendants motions for summary judgment with respect to the false arrest claims at Fulton Street are HEREBY DENIED, and Plaintiffs motions for summary judgmentwith respect to the false arrest claims at Fulton Street are GRANTED. With respect to the false arrest claims at East 16th Street, Defendants and Plaintiffs cross-motions for summary judgment are DENIED. Defendants motions for summary judgment with respect to the constitutionality of the No-Summons and Fingerprinting Policies are GRANTED. Plaintiffs motions for summary judgment with respect to their state law fingerprinting claims are GRANTED, and Defendants motions are DENIED. Plaintiffs motion to strike is DENIED. re: (107 in 1:05-cv-05152-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Elizabeth Starin, (214 in 1:05-cv-01563-RJS-JCF, 81 in 1:05-cv-07575-RJS-JCF, 88 in 1:05-cv-07548-RJS-JCF, 80 in 1:05-cv-07536-RJS-JCF, 267 in 1:04-cv-07921-RJS-JCF, 129 in 1:05-cv-09930-RJS -JCF, 180 in 1:05-cv-07624-RJS-JCF, 193 in 1:05-cv-07623-RJS-JCF, 202 in 1:05-cv-01571-RJS-JCF, 85 in 1:05-cv-01574-RJS-JCF, 146 in 1:05-cv-07672-RJS-JCF, 176 in 1:05-cv-09484-RJS-JCF, 57 in 1:07-cv-07741-RJS-JCF, 134 in 1:05-cv-09483-RJS-JCF, 105 in 1:05-cv-05268-RJS-JCF, 74 in 1:07-cv-07752-RJS-JCF, 211 in 1:05-cv-06780-RJS-JCF, 184 in 1:05-cv-01567-RJS-JCF, 178 in 1:05-cv-07673-RJS-JCF, 169 in 1:05-cv-01562-RJS-JCF, 105 in 1:05-cv-09985-RJS-JCF, 83 in 1:05-cv-02927-RJS-JCF, 181 in 1:05-cv-07670-RJS-JCF, 81 in 1:05-cv-05150-RJS-JCF, 204 in 1:05-cv-05080-RJS-JCF, 118 in 1:05-cv-03705-RJS-JCF, 175 in 1:05-cv-07579-RJS-JCF, 62 in 1:05-cv-09940-RJS-JCF, 214 in 1:05-cv-07577-RJS-JCF, 68 in 1:05-cv-10010-RJS-JCF, 135 in 1:04-cv-10178-RJS-JCF, 88 in 1:05-cv-03616-RJS-JCF, 50 in 1:05-cv-09987-RJS-JCF, 43 in 1:08-cv-09098-RJS-JCF, 77 in 1:05-cv-07025-RJS-JCF, 105 in 1:05-cv-07546-RJS-JCF, 72 in 1:07-cv-07751-RJS-JCF, 578 in 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF, 97 in 1:05-cv-07626-RJS-JCF, 167 in 1:05-cv-01568-RJS-JCF, 79 in 1:05-cv-06193-RJS-JCF, 124 in 1:05-cv-07026-RJS-JCF, 66 in 1:05-cv-10024-RJS-JCF, 94 in 1:07-cv-07683-RJS-JCF, 181 in 1:05-cv-01565-RJS-JCF, 98 in 1:05-cv-01573-RJS-JCF, 56 in 1:06-cv-01779-RJS-JCF, 74 in 1:05-cv-06918-RJS-JCF, 450 in 1:04-cv-09216-RJS -JCF, 131 in 1:05-cv-04949-RJS-JCF, 51 in 1:05-cv-07789-RJS-JCF, 84 in 1:05-cv-07625-RJS-JCF, 82 in 1:07-cv-07678-RJS-JCF, 109 in 1:05-cv-07541-RJS-JCF, 105 in 1:06-cv-00433-RJS-JCF, 109 in 1:05-cv-09738-RJS-JCF, 96 in 1:05-cv-01569-RJS-JCF, 78 in 1:05-cv-03478-RJS-JCF, 267 in 1:05-cv-08453-RJS-JCF, 86 in 1:05-cv-09974-RJS-JCF, 146 in 1:05-cv-07668-RJS-JCF, 87 in 1:05-cv-07547-RJS-JCF, 119 in 1:05-cv-05528-RJS-JCF, 111 in 1:05-cv-05152-RJS-JCF, 193 in 1:05-cv-01566-RJS-JCF, 87 in 1:05-cv-02910-RJS-JCF, 204 in 1:05-cv-01570-RJS-JCF, 138 in 1:05-cv-07669-RJS-JCF, 150 in 1:05-cv-07580-RJS-JCF, 208 in 1:05-cv-01564-RJS-JCF, 191 in 1:05-cv-01572-RJS-JCF, 51 in 1:07-cv-07583-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding No Summons Policy & Fingerprinting Policy. filed by The City of New York, (101 in 1:05-cv-05268-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing False Arrest Claims at Church/Fulton Streets. filed by The City of New York, (262 in 1:05-cv-08453-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing False Arrest Claims at Church/Fulton Streets. filed by The City of New York, (565 in 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing False Arrest Claims At Church/Fulton Streets. filed by All Defendants, (178 in 1:05-cv-09484-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Joseph Lamendola, David Cohen, James Essig, Thomas Doepfner, Ruby Marin-Jordan, Kerry Sweet, Jeremiah Malone, Stephen Hammerman, Jonathan Quimby, John Colgan, Cuong Nguyen, Gerald Dieckmann, John and Jane Does, The City of New York, Remy Randall, Victor Perez, Daniel Ryan, James Rufle, (178 in 1:05-cv-07670-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Betty Bastidas, Gregg Ross, Lauren Caspar, Jerel Walden, (262 in 1:04-cv-07921-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by James Essig, Raymond Kelly, City of New York, (76 in 1:07-cv-07678-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. filed by Janine Altongy, Debasri Ghosh, Megan Kennedy, Carre Adams, (187 in 1:05-cv-01572-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing False Arrest Claims at Church/Fulton Streets. filed by All Defendants, (258 in 1:05-cv-08453-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. filed by Katharine Krassan, Adam Richins, John M. Miller, Barrett Z. Gross, Thomas Catchpole, Susan D'Ornellas, Selma Spritzer, Jeffrey A. Paterson, Adam Feinstein, Nathaniel Parry, Jennifer Janney, Jay Marx, Daniel Burns, Ruth Benn, Daniel W. Parrott, Ann Trudell, Susan Crane, Thomas Ivors, Frantz Walker, Sarah Kanouse, Tristan Migliore, Raissa Wu, Devon Rueckner, John Trinkl, Bruce Renwick, Stephen Gamboa, Lois A. Doggett, James J. White, Kathleen Burick, Joan Cavanagh, Christine Pardew, Oren Goldenberg, Edward F. Kinane, James Flynn, Lawrence Paris, Felton Davis, Patricia Debruhl, Gary Ashbeck, Kimberly Kern, Steven Scofield, Alexander Holley Drummond, David Barrows, Ellen Grady, Raymond Robinson, Howard J. Gale, John Behling, Andrew St. Laurent, Katherine Poe, Sarah Tepsic, Jonothan Logan, Ed Hedemann, Gordon William Sensiba, Teran Wilson, Benjamin Bernard, Diane Beeny, James Williamson, Jason Dorais, Anais Sensiba, David Gordon, Roger Hill, Chris G. Murray, Calla Evans, Shana Rigby, Edward Hotchkiss, Linnea Capps, Ryan D. Hottle, John Larson, Blossom Nicinski, Walter Ditman, James Wilson, Mark Colville, Matthew Wright, Tobiah Gaster, Daniel O'Reilly-Rowe, Ronald W. San Marchi, John Theodore Glick, Ellen Barfield, Michael Palmer, Steven Ekberg, Jay Kantor, Arun Bhalla, Edward Gibbons, Marc F. Church, Benjamin Hunt, Kathleen D. Hernandez, Joshua Knapp, Thomas Zambeck, Zachary Vreeland, Matthew Dietzen, Jennifer Wong, James Noonan, Laura Kressly, Richard Hardie, Tessa M. Lalonde, Stephen Petrick, Marielle Lovecchio, Laura Raymond, Pepper Judd, Theresa Swink, Dewayne Dickerson, Jared Lanctot, Lambert Rochfort, Dwight Jenkins, Janet S. Howe, Tarasik Abdell, Shannon Petrello, Joseph Amato, Colleen Cook, Matthew Kocek, Gabriel Gaster, Michael Joseph, Brian Kavanagh, Robert J. Siegel, Polly A. Davies, Deborah Riverbend, Ryan McGee, Barbara Ann Meisinger, Andrew Laken, Zachary C. Miller, Mora MI-OK Stephens, Charles Goldberg, Jeffery J. Cohen, Ronald E. Rosenberg, Frank Sanchez, III, Michael Becker, Mark Nechay, Theodore Glick, Christy Ann Turner, William Conwell, (210 in 1:05-cv-07577-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by All Defendants, (442 in 1:04-cv-09216-RJS -JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing False Arrest Claims at Church/Fulton Streets. filed by City of New York, (568 in 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. filed by Francesca Firoentini, Robert Curely, Michael Schiller, Neal Curley, (114 in 1:05-cv-03705-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion. filed by William Tracey, Terrence Monahan, Matthew Delguadio, John J. Colgan, Raymond Kelly, New York City Police Officer Jose Perez, The City of New York, Bruce Smolka, James Franzo, James Essig, Joseph Esposito, Thomas Graham, Michael Bloomberg, Thomas Galati, Gerald Dieckmann, (127 in 1:04-cv-10178-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. filed by Carol Dudek, (209 in 1:05-cv-07577-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by All Defendants, (206 in 1:05-cv-05080-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion. filed by Abdiel Anderson, Mark E. Keegan, Timothy Rogers, Kerry R. Sweet, Francisco Alcantara, John J. Colgan, Jane and John Does, Raymond Kelly, The City of New York, Eunpa Chun, Jessica Knatz, Linda Holmes, Charles Chaplar, Cynthia Rosario, Jorge Encarnacion, Sulman Zaheer, John Weiser, Stephen Hammerman, James Essig, Ruby Marin-Jordan, Joseph Esposito, David Cohen, Prince Williams, Thomas Doepfner, Darren Rock, Derrick Baity, Gregory Bell, Frank Marousek, Steven Ricca, Michael Bloomberg, Diane Hayes, Thomas Galati, Nicholas Gravino, Jack McManus, James Galati, Gerald Dieckmann, Julio Calle, (206 in 1:05-cv-07577-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (E. 16th Street). filed by All Plaintiffs, (174 in 1:05-cv-09484-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. filed by Brian Hurley, Rue Sakayama, Gabriel Cohn, Clifford Kaplan, Jaie Bosse, Robert Pietri, Althea Lewis, Haideen Anderson, James Steitz, Daniel Perry, David Zalk, Naimah Fowler, Michael Reilly, Nadgia Lara, Daniel Zarrella, Seth Wessler, Erica Mitrano, David Hill, David Maddox, Erik Henriksen, Nancy Diamond, Denise Rubinfeld, Emily Paine, Jesse Rosemoore, Scott O'Dierno, Benjamin Cody, Ryan Doxtader, Jessica Taft, Zachary Goldstein, Sada Stipe, Courtney Lee Adams, John Flanigan, Barbara Jane Harden Jones, Kristin Kojis, Michael Fix, Scott Beibin, Miho Schutzenhofer, Richard Lovejoy, Eric Corley, Adrianne Wilcox, Sarah Palmer, Sandor Katz, Edward Codel, Marlene Flaton, Trevor Giuliani, Dominick Sassone, Michelle Kaye, Greg Griffith, Nazie Shekarchi, Rebecca Sutton, Christopher Shortridge, Michael Gindi, Steven Black, David Geocos, Christina Argyros, Alexis Shotwell, Juanpablo Juarez, Jeffrey Parrott, Thomas Adamson, Daniel Gingold, Cynthia Rosin, Brian Lucrezia, Lily Hughes-Dunn, Yasmine Farhang, Aisha Jabour, Ellen Tuzzolo, Sidney Vault, Jennifer Lahn, Rebecca Wood, Daniel Reed, Thomas Bacon, Robert Ponce, Chris Agnese, Dana Pryor, Lisa Martin, Noah Weiss, Roger Vilanova Marques, Aaron Maret, Sabine Aronowsky, Eugeni Averbakh, Christina Benson, Angel Rivera, James Graham, Marian Geocos, Arielle Soloff, Jennifer Giles, Joel Viertel, (117 in 1:05-cv-09901-RJS-JCF) FIRST MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. filed by Kaitlyn Tikkun, (186 in 1:05-cv-07670-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Richard Roes, John J. Colgan, Hudson River Park Trust, Perez, Lorenzo Johnson, Raymond Kelly, The City of New York, Daniel Albano, Kevin Sam, Bruce Smolka, Salvatore DiMaggio, Stephen Hammerman, James Essig, Ruby Marin-Jordan, Mark Keegan, Joseph Esposito, Thomas Graham, David Cohen, Thomas Doepfner, Kerry Sweet, Derrick Baity, Michael Bloomberg, Patrick Cortright, James Rufle, Terence Monahan, Thomas Galati, Jack McManus, Gerald Dieckmann, John Does, Beatty, (136 in 1:05-cv-08501-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment To Dismiss The False Arrest Claims Of Plaintiffs Arrested On East 16th Street. filed by John Fernandez, The Republican National Committee, John Does 1-15, The City of New York, Jane Fernandez, Alexis Fernandez, (447 in 1:04-cv-09216-RJS -JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Erika Biddle, Sonia Chandra, Deepa Majmudar, Celine Malanum, Danielle Walsh and Emily Friedman. filed by Erika Biddle, (201 in 1:05-cv-05080-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. filed by Noel Grosso, (184 in 1:05-cv-01572-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Fulton Street). filed by Aubryn Sidle, (133 in 1:05-cv-08501-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Jody Concepcion, (256 in 1:04-cv-07921-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. filed by Ann Maurer, Ashley Waters, Hacer Dinler, (78 in 1:07-cv-07678-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by The City of New York, John Colgan, Stephen Hammerman, James Essig, Ruby Marin-Jordan, David Cohen, Thomas Doepfner, Kerry Sweet, Gerald Dieckmann, (116 in 1:05-cv-05152-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment To Dimiss The False Arrest Claims Of Plaintiffs Arrested On East 16th Street. filed by New York City Police Officer Abdiel Anderson, William Tracey, John J. Colgan, Raymond Kelly, Joseph Delguardo, The City of New York, Bruce Smolka, Matthew Delgaudio, James Franzo, James Essig, Joseph Esposito, Thomas Graham, Michael Bloomberg, Terence Monahan, Thomas Galati, Gerald Dieckmann, (463 in 1:04-cv-09216-RJS -JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of Simon Harak, Diana Raimondi and William Steyert and all others similarly situated. filed by Simon Harak, (114 in 1:05-cv-09901-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Richard Roes, Hernandez, Ann Rubio, Diane Edwards, Works, Felice Sims, James Does, James Doe, Robert N. Davoren, John J. Colgan, Julie Does, Nicholas Estavillo, Raymond Kelly, Debra Stremel, Deborah Jacques, Alexander Laera, The City of New York, Daniel Albano, Giovannia Cancel, Bruce Smolka, Martin F. Horn, Sheila Veerapen, Autuam Carr, Saldo, Constance Blakeney, Jane Does, Stephen Hammerman, Williams-Anderson, Thomas Purtell, Sonia Pagan, James Essig, Williams-Robinson, Ruby Marin-Jordan, Mark Keegan, Joseph Esposito, Thomas Graham, Joseph Lamendola, Patrick Devlin, Gelinda Gethers, Chandra Barnes, Cheri Gatling, Paul Deentremont, Thomas Doepfner, Pamela Harris, Kerry Sweet, Evelyn Rivera, Willa Campbell, Michael Bloomberg, Patrick Cortright, Terence Monahan, Robert Roes, Thomas Galati, Anthony Johnson, Sharon Feaggins, John Connolly, Jacqueline Harrison, Gerald Dieckmann, John Does, (110 in 1:05-cv-03705-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. filed by Cathie L. Bell, (131 in 1:04-cv-10178-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Terrence Monahan, John J. Colgan, Raymond Kelly, Sally Rowes, Bruce Smolka, "Joe" Franzo, Fackler, James Essig, City of New York, Joseph Esposito, Thomas Graham, Quimby, "Joe" Tracey, N. Perez, Gerald Dieckmann, John Does. By October 31, 2012, the parties shall submit a joint letter regarding the proposed next steps in these actions. In doing so, the parties should take this opportunity to reflect on this litigation and the prospects for a fair resolution of the remaining claims. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/30/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(ago) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER: Plaintiffs shall open with argument on their summary judgment motions concerning mass arrests at Fulton Street and East 16th Street. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs arguments and present argument regarding their motion for summary judgment on the no summons policy. Plaintiffs may then use their remaining time to reply. Finally, Defendants may use their remaining time to reply regarding the no summons policy. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (pl) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER: It is hereby Ordered that the oral argument is adjourned to 5/31/12 at 3:30 p.m. ( Oral Argument set for 5/31/2012 at 03:30 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/23/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (jfe) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties shall appear for oral argument regarding the parties' cross-motions on May 14, 2012 at 3:00 p.m. Each side will have one hour to argue. Plaintiffs in the related cases shall consult among themselves to determine who will argue on behalf of Plaintiffs, and submit a letter no later than May 7, 2012 advising the Court as to that determination. ( Oral Argument set for 5/14/2012 at 03:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/10/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (mro) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Jeffrey A. Dougherty dated 12/6/2011 re: Accordingly, Defendants respectfully request that Your Honor "so order" the Clerk of Court to accept and file discs "under seal" containing Defendants' rely papers regarding their motion for summary judgment consisting of: (1) Defendants' Reply Brief; (2) Defendants' Reply 56.1 Statement; and (3) the Declaration of Jeffrey A. Dougherty dated November 23, 2011 in each of the forty-three RNC Consolidated Cases listed in Appendix A. annexed hereto. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/7/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(djc) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                  DVD of Fulton Street Video by Jon Fine dated 8/31/04. ***Accepted for filing by the Honorable Richard J. Sullivan on 12/14/11, document #619. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(mro) (Entered: 12/27/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER: no later than December 19, 2011, all Plaintiffs in related RNC cases shall submit a joint letter to the Court definitively setting forth which Plaintiffs join which motions and briefing. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/14/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (cd) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs' motion is deemed made. The Court reserves judgment on the motion and will rule on it when it rules on Defendants' motion for summary judgment on the no-summons and fingerprinting policies. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/14/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (cd) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs may physically file the DVD described in their letter with the Clerk of the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs shall file any documents in support of disputed facts in their Rule 56.1 Statements no later than December 21, 2011. As stated in the Court's November 22, 2011 Order, Plaintiffs are directed to limit such exhibits to provide only the relevant and necessary portions. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/14/2011) Copies Mailed By ChambersFiled In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(cd) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Sealed Legal Document 221 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                            DECLARATION of Jeffrey Dougherty in Support re: (43 in 1:08-cv-09098-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding No Summons Policy & Fingerprinting Policy.. Document filed by The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to C, # 2 Exhibit D, E, # 3 Exhibit F, # 4 Exhibit F Continued, # 5 Exhibit G, H, # 6 Exhibit I to N, # 7 Exhibit O to S, # 8 Exhibit T to V)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(Shammas, Cheryl) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                              RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by The City of New York. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(Shammas, Cheryl) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (43 in 1:08-cv-09098-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding No Summons Policy & Fingerprinting Policy.. Document filed by The City of New York, The City of New York, The City of New York, The City of New York, The City of New York. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(Shammas, Cheryl) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the following submissions: (1) a letter from Defendants, dated November 18, 2011, requesting that the Court permit Defendants to file enlarged submissions in their forthcoming reply briefing; and (2) a letter from Plaintiffs, dated November 21, 2011, consenting to Defendants' request and also requesting leave to file expanded submissions. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT each side shall submit reply briefs totaling no more than seventy-five (75) pages. For the sake of clarification, this means that all Plaintiffs, collectively, shall submit no more than 75 pages of briefing in total. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, to the extent that the parties file exhibits not previously submitted to support facts in their Rule 56.1 Statements that an opposing party has disputed, the limits on the number and length of exhibits do not apply. However, the parties are directed to limit such exhibits to provide only the relevant and necessary portions. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/22/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. ***as per Chambers. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (mro) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendants' request to prevent Plaintiffs from relying on documents not submitted to the Court is denied. To the extent that Defendants dispute facts set forth in Plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 statements, they may require Plaintiffs to produce supportive documents. Because enlarged briefing is likely necessary to allow the parties to respond to one another's voluminous submissions accompanying the summary judgment motions, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the parties may file opposition submissions consistent with the limitations set forth in the Court's September 30, 2011 Order. However, because the briefing schedule has been in place since July, and the Court sees no need for an extension of time, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs' request for an extension of the briefing schedule is denied. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/20/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (jfe) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                      DECLARATION of David Cohen in Support re: (214 in 1:05-cv-01563-RJS-JCF, 81 in 1:05-cv-07575-RJS-JCF, 88 in 1:05-cv-07548-RJS-JCF, 80 in 1:05-cv-07536-RJS-JCF, 267 in 1:04-cv-07921-RJS-JCF, 129 in 1:05-cv-09930-RJS -JCF, 180 in 1:05-cv-07624-RJS-JCF, 193 in 1:05-cv-07623-RJS-JCF, 202 in 1:05-cv-01571-RJS-JCF, 85 in 1:05-cv-01574-RJS-JCF, 146 in 1:05-cv-07672-RJS-JCF, 176 in 1:05-cv-09484-RJS-JCF, 57 in 1:07-cv-07741-RJS-JCF, 134 in 1:05-cv-09483-RJS-JCF, 105 in 1:05-cv-05268-RJS-JCF, 74 in 1:07-cv-07752-RJS-JCF, 211 in 1:05-cv-06780-RJS-JCF, 184 in 1:05-cv-01567-RJS-JCF, 178 in 1:05-cv-07673-RJS-JCF, 169 in 1:05-cv-01562-RJS-JCF, 105 in 1:05-cv-09985-RJS-JCF, 83 in 1:05-cv-02927-RJS-JCF, 181 in 1:05-cv-07670-RJS-JCF, 81 in 1:05-cv-05150-RJS-JCF, 204 in 1:05-cv-05080-RJS-JCF, 118 in 1:05-cv-03705-RJS-JCF, 175 in 1:05-cv-07579-RJS-JCF, 62 in 1:05-cv-09940-RJS-JCF, 214 in 1:05-cv-07577-RJS-JCF, 68 in 1:05-cv-10010-RJS-JCF, 135 in 1:04-cv-10178-RJS-JCF, 88 in 1:05-cv-03616-RJS-JCF, 50 in 1:05-cv-09987-RJS-JCF, 43 in 1:08-cv-09098-RJS-JCF, 77 in 1:05-cv-07025-RJS-JCF, 105 in 1:05-cv-07546-RJS-JCF, 72 in 1:07-cv-07751-RJS-JCF, 578 in 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF, 97 in 1:05-cv-07626-RJS-JCF, 167 in 1:05-cv-01568-RJS-JCF, 79 in 1:05-cv-06193-RJS-JCF, 124 in 1:05-cv-07026-RJS-JCF, 66 in 1:05-cv-10024-RJS-JCF, 94 in 1:07-cv-07683-RJS-JCF, 181 in 1:05-cv-01565-RJS-JCF, 98 in 1:05-cv-01573-RJS-JCF, 56 in 1:06-cv-01779-RJS-JCF, 74 in 1:05-cv-06918-RJS-JCF, 450 in 1:04-cv-09216-RJS -JCF, 131 in 1:05-cv-04949-RJS-JCF, 51 in 1:05-cv-07789-RJS-JCF, 84 in 1:05-cv-07625-RJS-JCF, 82 in 1:07-cv-07678-RJS-JCF, 109 in 1:05-cv-07541-RJS-JCF, 105 in 1:06-cv-00433-RJS-JCF, 109 in 1:05-cv-09738-RJS-JCF, 96 in 1:05-cv-01569-RJS-JCF, 78 in 1:05-cv-03478-RJS-JCF, 267 in 1:05-cv-08453-RJS-JCF, 86 in 1:05-cv-09974-RJS-JCF, 146 in 1:05-cv-07668-RJS-JCF, 87 in 1:05-cv-07547-RJS-JCF, 119 in 1:05-cv-05528-RJS-JCF, 111 in 1:05-cv-05152-RJS-JCF, 193 in 1:05-cv-01566-RJS-JCF, 87 in 1:05-cv-02910-RJS-JCF, 204 in 1:05-cv-01570-RJS-JCF, 138 in 1:05-cv-07669-RJS-JCF, 150 in 1:05-cv-07580-RJS-JCF, 208 in 1:05-cv-01564-RJS-JCF, 191 in 1:05-cv-01572-RJS-JCF, 51 in 1:07-cv-07583-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding No Summons Policy & Fingerprinting Policy.. Document filed by The City of New York. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(Dougherty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (43 in 1:08-cv-09098-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding No Summons Policy & Fingerprinting Policy.. Document filed by The City of New York. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(Dougherty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                          DECLARATION of Jeffrey A. Dougherty in Support re: (43 in 1:08-cv-09098-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding No Summons Policy & Fingerprinting Policy.. Document filed by The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - B, # 2 Exhibit B (cont.) - D, # 3 Exhibit D (cont.) - E, # 4 Exhibit E (Cont.) - F, # 5 Exhibit G - H, # 6 Exhibit H (cont.) - J, # 7 Exhibit K - L, # 8 Exhibit L (cont.) - N, # 9 Exhibit N (cont.), # 10 Exhibit N (cont.) - O, # 11 Exhibit O (cont.), # 12 Exhibit P, # 13 Exhibit Q, # 14 Exhibit Q (cont.) - R)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(Dougherty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                            DECLARATION of David Cohen in Support re: (43 in 1:08-cv-09098-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding No Summons Policy & Fingerprinting Policy.. Document filed by The City of New York. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(Dougherty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                              DECLARATION of Brian M. Jenkins in Support re: (43 in 1:08-cv-09098-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding No Summons Policy & Fingerprinting Policy.. Document filed by The City of New York. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(Dougherty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                DECLARATION of Carl R. Holmberg in Support re: (43 in 1:08-cv-09098-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding No Summons Policy & Fingerprinting Policy.. Document filed by The City of New York. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(Dougherty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by The City of New York. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(Dougherty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding No Summons Policy & Fingerprinting Policy. Document filed by The City of New York. Responses due by 11/3/2011Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(Dougherty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER: Accordingly, It is hereby ordered that the parties shall submit Rule 56.1 Statements of Undisputed Facts and Declarations with citations but with only select supporting documents within the limit articulated in the Court's earlier September 30, 2011 Order. In the event that a fact is disputed by an opposing party, the party asserting the fact shall have an opportunity to produce the relevant document. Additionally, parties may refer to documents already in the record without providing them again. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/30/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (js) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER: It is hereby ordered that each side shall submit briefs totaling no more than one hundred and fifty (150) pages. For the sake of clarification, this means that all Plaintiffs, collectively, shall submit no more than 150 pages of briefing in total. It is further ordered that each side (as defined above) shall submit with their briefs no more than a total of 100 exhibits and 25 affidavits or declarations. No exhibit shall exceed 30 pages, and no declaration shall exceed 20 pages. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/30/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (js) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs shall submit a joint letter to the Court no later than Friday, September 30, 2011 indicating: (1) whether they consent to Defendants' request, and (2) the number, and expected length, of briefs Plaintiffs expect to file in connection with the summary judgment motions. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/29/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (rjm) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV from Curt P. Beck dated 8/5/2011 re: Counsel for the Defendants writes to request an Order precluding plaintiffs from relying upon in any fashion the document (or the information contained therein) attached as Exhibit A and bates stamped DM 3000-3003. ENDORSEMENT: Docket and file in 04 Civ. 7922(RJS) and all related cases. Application granted. The document at issue was created in 2004 and yet was not disclosed to defendants' counsel until well after the fact discovery period has closed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 8/19/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. (ab) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV from Jeffrey A. Dougherty dated 8/11/11 re: counsel for defendants request that Your Honor "so order" the parties agreement that the RNC Plaintiff's identified in Appendix A, will provide responses to Defendants' contention interrogatories on or before August 19, 2011. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. So Ordered. Docket & file in all related cases. ( Answer to Interrogatories due by 8/19/2011.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 8/11/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(pl) Modified on 8/12/2011 (pl). (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Michael L. Spiegel dated 7/12/11 re: counsel for plaintiff writes re Your Honor's July 5, 2011, Order, which states that counsel "who intend to proffer any liability expert and who have not previously produced an expert report for any such expert shall notify the Court in writing by July 8, 2011. (With respect to the deadline set, I respectfully request that the Court accept this tardy notification-I was out of my office for the past week.) Plaintiffs read this Court's July S, 2011, Order, however, to require the production by August 1, 2011, of disclosures under F.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(2)(C), i.e., a "summary of the facts and opinions to which the witness is expected to testify." ENDORSEMENT: Mr. Kahl will not be excluded from testifying based on the minimal delay in responding to my July 5, 2010 order, since the defendants have already deposed him and have suffered no prejudice. However, prior to the August 1, 2011 deadline for submission of expert material, plaintiffs should reconsider whether they wish to proffer him as an expert, since it appears unlikely that he will pass muster under Daubert. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 7/15/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(pl) Modified on 7/18/2011 (pl). (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER: It is hereby ordered that, 1. Any counsel other than the New York City Law Department I the New York Civil Liberties Union, Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP, and Jeffrey A. Rothman who intend to proffer any liability expert and who have not previously produced an expert report for any such expert shall notify the Court in writing by July 8, 2011; 2. With respect to the issues of group probable cause, the "no summons" policy, and blanket fingerprinting, plaintiffs have represented that they will not proffer expert evidence on their case in chief. The defendants shall therefore produce their expert reports and related materials for these issues by August 1, 2011. Plaintiffs shall produce any rebuttal expert reports and related materials by August 24, 2011. All expert discovery shall be completed by September 16, 2011; 3. With respect to the issues of conditions of confinement and excessive detention, the plaintiffs have represented that they will proffer expert evidence on their case in chief. The plaintiffs shall therefore produce their expert reports and related materials for these issues by August 1, 2011. Defendants shall produce any rebuttal expert reports and related materials by August 24, 2011. All expert discovery shall be completed by September 16, 2011. ( Discovery due by 9/16/2011., Request for Production of Documents due by 8/1/2011.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 7/5/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (laq) Modified on 7/15/2011 (laq). (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER. The Court HEREBY ORDERS that the deadline to complete all expert discovery is adjourned to September 16, 2011. However, the parties are advised that the briefing schedule set forth in the Court's Order dated June 20, 2011 remains unchanged: Opening Briefs: October 3, 2011. Opposition Briefs: November 3, 2011. Reply Briefs: November 23, 2011. No further extensions will be granted. (All Expert Discovery due by 9/16/2011.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/1/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (rjm) Modified on 7/5/2011 (rjm). (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER: The Court is in receipt of a letter from Plaintiffs' counsel in Schiller v. City of New York, 04 Civ. 7922 (RJS), and Dinler v. City of New York, 04 Civ. 7921 (RJS), dated June 27, 2011, proposing the following expert discovery schedule: (1) initial expert disclosures by all parties by July 15, 2011; (2) rebuttal expert disclosures by August 12, 2011; and (3) completion of all expert discovery by September 1, 2011. The Court is also in receipt of a letter from Defendants dated June 28, 2011, opposing Plaintiffs' proposal and suggesting the following expert discovery schedule: (1) Plaintiffs' expert disclosures by July 15, 2011; (2) Defendants' expert disclosures by August 12, 2011; and (3) completion of all expert discovery by September 1, 2011. The Court is also in receipt of a letter from class counsel in MacNamara v. City of New York, 04 Civ. 9216 (RJS), dated June 28, 2011, concurring with the request for rebuttal experts but opposing the schedule proposed by Plaintiffs' counsel in Schiller and Dinler. Since the related RNC cases remain referred to Magistrate Judge Francis for discovery purposes, the parties are advised to consult Judge Francis with respect to the sequencing of expert discovery, which shall in any event be completed no later than September 1, 2011 pursuant to the Court's Orders dated June 20, 2011 and June 27, 2011. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/28/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (jfe) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER: The request to defer expert discovery with respect to the excessive detention and conditions claims is HEREBY DENIED. As set forth in the Court's Order dated 6/20/2011, the deadline to complete all expert discovery with respect to liability is 9/1/2011. (Discovery due by 9/1/2011.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/27/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tro) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER The parties shall make a joint submission no later than 7/1/11, confirming the two mass arrest locations to be briefed on summary judgment with respect to the issue of group probable cause. Expert Discovery due by 9/1/2011. Contention interrogatories to be completed by 9/1/11. Motions for summary judgment due by 10/3/2011. Responses due by 11/3/2011, Replies due by 11/23/2011. Class counsel in MacNamara v City of NY, 04cv9216 shall submit a revised version of the proposed class notice no later than 7/1/11. The request to amend the complaints in Coburn v City of NY, 05cv7623 and Phillips v City of NY, 05cv7624, is denied as untimely, since the time to amend expired on 6/30/09. Plaintiffs shall collaborate int he choice of their two additional representatives, and counsel to attend the conference shall contact the Court to confirm a conference date no later than 6/24/11. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/20/11) Copy mailed by ChambersFiled In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(cd) Modified on 6/22/2011 (ad). (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER Conference set for 6/15/2011 at 04:45 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/24/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(cd) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis, IV from Christopher Dunn dated May 3, 2011 re: I write to follow up on the telephone conference the Court had with the parties on April 21. Since that conference, a group of plaintiffs' counsel handling many of the pending RNC cases has met, and I have spoken with Mr. Farrell. Having conferred with Mr. Farrell and many of plaintiffs' counsel, it appears that the week of May 23 is the earliest reasonable time for the conference, and we therefore propose that you schedule a conference for that week. As for the status of fact discovery, we completed the deposition of Chief Esposito on April 22. On April 27 (the day after the meeting with other counsel), I sent to Mr. Farrell a list of requests for factual information bearing on the City's intelligence defense. ENDORSEMENT: The pretrial conference will be held May 26, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9-B. Counsel should be prepared to discuss scheduling of dispositive motion as well as completion of any residual discovery. SO ORDERED. ( Pretrial Conference set for 5/26/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 5/9/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(jmi) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Odile M. Farrell dated 3/11/2011 re: Accordingly, the parties respectfully request that the deadline for completing Chief Devlin's deposition be extended to April 7, 2011. the parties also request permission to complete Chief McManus' deposition on 3/17/2011. ENDORSEMENT: The request to complete Chief McManus' deposition on March 17, 2011 is granted. The request to complete Chief Devlin's deposition on April 6-7 is denied. Counsel had no reason to expect that I would grant plaintiffs' request to delay other depositions until Chief Esposito's was completed. Counsel shall make arrangements to complete Chief Devlin's deposition forthwith. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 3/14/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(js) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to James C. Francis, IV from Jonathan Moore dated 2/14/11 re: counsel for plaintiff, and on behalf of plaintiffs' counsel in all RNC cases with an interest in the continued depositions of current or former NYPD Chiefs Esposito, Devlin, Colgan and Graham and the deposition of retired Chief McManus, we write to request an extension of the February 15, 2011 deadline for completing these depositions and a status conference to address scheduling. See 11/22/10 Endorsed Order attached hereto as Exhibit A (granting request to extend completion date for 60 days from December 17, 2010). ENDORSEMENT: Application denied. The November 22, 2010 Memorandum Endorsement does not reference Chief Esposito, and there is no basis for delaying other depositions until it is determined whether his has been completed. All remaining policy depositions shall be completed by March 15, 2011. ( Deposition due by 3/15/2011.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 2/15/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(pl) Modified on 2/16/2011 (pl). (ENDORSEMENT: Docket in all RNC Cases. Docketed in lead case 04cv7922 as per instructions from Chambers). (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Peter G. Farrell dated 2/14/2011 re: request that the Court approve the briefing schedule agreen to by the parties to address the issues arising at the continued deposition of Chief of Department Joseph Esposito. Defendants will move by 2/18/2011. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Judge's Initials are to appear on all papers submited to this court. ( Motions due by 2/18/2011.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 2/15/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(jar) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis, IV from Christopher Dunn, dated 11/19/2010, re: On behalf of the plaintiffs and defendants in these two cases arising out of the Republican National Convention, counsel writes: Following the Second Circuit's October 22, 2010 order denying the plaintiffs' petition for rehearing en banc, we notified the City on November 4 that we did not intend to pursue further appeals (and the plaintiffs in MacNamara served a similar notice on November 8). With the 30-day clock having started, the parties immediately started discussing dates for resuming Deputy Commissioner Cohen's deposition. Because of prior commitments of counsel in MacNamara, however, the first available date turns out to be December 17. I therefore request that you modify your order to allow the policy depositions to resume by December 17, 2010. I also request that you extend the completion date to 60 days after that date, as the current cut-off of early January is simply unrealistic, given the upcoming holidays and that other high-level witnesses will need to be deposed whom we cannot even settle upon until we have deposed Deputy Commissioner Cohen. ENDORSEMENT: DOCKET AND FILE IN ALL RELATED CASES. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 11/22/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. (lnl) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER: Defendants' application is granted. Assuming that Deputy Commissioner Browne's deposition was noticed in a timely fashion, defendants reserved their right to object to it. Because Deputy Commissioner Browne has not been shown to possess unique, relevant information, he may avoid deposition as a high-ranking government official. Plaintiffs' application for an award of costs in connection with the instant application is denied. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 11/2/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (jpo) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the defendants' application for imposition of time limits on depositions is denied without prejudice to the defendants' moving for a protective order if the questioning becomes abusive. In addition, prior to questioning a witness, each plaintiff's attorney shall represent that he or she is familiar with that witness' prior testimony. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 10/29/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (cd) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Alexis L. Leist dated 7/22/2010 re: Counsel requests an extension until 7/30/2010 to reply to plaintiffs' opposition to defendants' 7/15/2010 letter motion concerning fact witness depositions in the RNC Cases. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 7/22/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(tro) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Michael Spiegel dated 7/16/2010 re: Counsel writes on behalf of both parties to respectfully propose a briefing schedule concerning defendants' 7/15/2010, application for a protective order barring the deposition of NYPD Commissioner of Public Information Paul Browne. With the Court's permission, plaintiff will submit their opposition on or before 8/20/2010, and defendants will reply by 8/31/2010. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Responses due by 8/20/2010, Replies due by 8/31/2010.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 7/19/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(tro) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER. The parties shall commence or continue the remaining policy depositions (witnesses Cohen, Esposito, Graham, Colgan, Devlin, Brown, and McManus) within 30 days of the date that all appeals of the intelligence document ("Field Reports") issue is resolved and shall complete those depositions within 60 days thereafter. By July 15, 2010, counsel shall advise the Court whether there are any disputes regarding the scope or duration of the remaining policy depositions, and, if so, defendants shall submit a letter motion requesting any appropriate relief. Pursuant to the mandate of the Second Circuit in In re City of New York, No. 10-0237, plaintiffs' motion to compel production of the Field Reports is denied. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 6/21/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers.(rjm) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER. Counsel's (Jeffrey C. Brooks) request to withdraw is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/16/10). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(djc) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cheryl Leah Shammas on behalf of All Defendants (Shammas, Cheryl) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER: Pretrial Conference adjourned 6/21/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 6/14/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers.(tve) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER Pretrial Conference for all Republican National Convention cases set for 6/16/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 18D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 6/10/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies sent by chambers.(cd) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Neil Stumpf, Francesco Belluscio, Robert Hamer, Mark Vazquez, Linda Araque, Christopher Krutys, Brian Martin, Jacqueline DeCarlo, Thomas McDonnell, Ebony Huntley, John Martinez, Michael Bloomberg, Raymond Kelly, Joseph Esposito, Nicholas Estavillo, Bruce Smolka, John Colgan, Patrick Devlin, Thomas Graham, Terence Monahan, Thomas Galati, Gerald Dieckmann, Stephen Hammerman, Thomas Doepfner, Daniel Albano, Kerry Sweet, Ruby Marin-Jordan, The City of New York, John Fong, Bart Pipcinski, Timothy Spies, Mark Steiner, The Hudson River Park Trust. Related document: 180 Amended Complaint,,,,, filed by David Muelken, Juliette Consigny, Jessica Partnow, Craig Weltha, Michael Muench, India D'Arthenay-Adams, Jacquelyn Vendetti, Lindsay Ryan, Sarah Glidden, Paisley Davidson, Joel Dodge, Daniel Wood, Rebecca Vaughn, Joshua Haglund, Eva Prokop, Andrew Mahoney, Adam Bunn, Kathleen McEldowney, Luke Meyer, Paul Bekavac, Steven Phillips, Anna Ogden-Nussbaum.(Brooks, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 98 Amended Complaint, against Neil Stumpf, Francesco Belluscio, Robert Hamer, Mark Vazquez, Linda Araque, Christopher Krutys, Brian Martin, Jacqueline DeCarlo, Thomas McDonnell, Ebony Huntley, John Martinez, Michael Bloomberg, Raymond Kelly, Joseph Esposito, Nicholas Estavillo, Bruce Smolka, John Colgan, Patrick Devlin, Thomas Graham, Terence Monahan, Thomas Galati, Gerald Dieckmann, John and Jane Doe, Stephen Hammerman, Thomas Doepfner, Daniel Albano, Kerry Sweet, Ruby Marin-Jordan, The City of New York, John Fong, Bart Pipcinski, Timothy Spies, Mark Steiner, The Hudson River Park Trust.Document filed by Craig Weltha, Adam Bunn, Paisley Davidson, Daniel Wood, Luke Meyer, India D'Arthenay-Adams, Steven Phillips, Joshua Haglund, Lindsay Ryan, Paul Bekavac, Juliette Consigny, Jessica Partnow, Joel Dodge, Sarah Glidden, Andrew Mahoney, Kathleen McEldowney, David Muelken, Michael Muench, Anna Ogden-Nussbaum, Eva Prokop, Rebecca Vaughn, Jacquelyn Vendetti. Related document: 98 Amended Complaint, filed by David Muelken, Juliette Consigny, Jessica Partnow, Craig Weltha, Michael Muench, India D'Arthenay-Adams, Jacquelyn Vendetti, Lindsay Ryan, Sarah Glidden, Paisley Davidson, Joel Dodge, Daniel Wood, Rebecca Vaughn, Joshua Haglund, Eva Prokop, Tila Duhaime, Adam Bunn, Andrew Mahoney, Kathleen McEldowney, Luke Meyer, Paul Bekavac, Michael Moren, Steven Phillips, Anna Ogden-Nussbaum.(rdz) Modified on 11/25/2009 (rdz). (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Rose Weber dated 11/21/09 re: Request that plaintiffs have until 12/7/09 to file amended complaints. ENDORSEMENT: Application denied. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 11/23/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(cd) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Rose M. Weber dated 10/27/2009 re: Requesting an additional three weeks until November 23, 2009 to file the complaints. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. No further extension. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 10/28/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(jpo) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The plaintiffs' motion to amend their pleadings is denied insofar as the proposed amended complaints include claims of disparate application of the parading without a permit statute or claims that have previously been dismissed. In all other respects the motion is granted. Plaintiffs shall file amended complaints that conform to this decision within two weeks. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 10/19/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers.(jfe) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MANDATE of USCA WITHDRAWING APPEAL (Certified Copy) as to 165 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Patrick Devlin, David Cohen, Linda Araque, All Defendants, Thomas Doepfner, Raymond Kelly, Kerry Sweet, Stephen Hammerman, John Hamer, Robert Hamer, Thomas Purtell, The City of New York, Michael Bloomberg, Mark Steiner, Daniel Albano, Terence Monahan, Timothy Spies, Jacqueline DeCarlo, Francesco Belluscio, Thomas Galati, Bruce Smolka, Neil Stumpf, Christopher Krutys, John Belluscio, Ruby Marin-Jordan, Brian Martin, John Fong, Mark Vazquez, John Martinez, Thomas McDonnell, Bart Pipcinski, John Colgan, Ebony Huntley, John and Jane Doe, John and Jane Does 1-50, Gerald Dieckmann, The Hudson River Park Trust, Joseph Esposito, Thomas Graham, Nicholas Estavillo USCA Case Number 09-2412-cv....that the appeal is hereby WITHDRAWN pursuant to Rule 42(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Certified: 9/25/2009. (nd) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Upon plaintiffs' application by letter dated September 4, 2009, and with defendants' consent, the deadline for submitting reply papers on plaintiffs' motion to amend the complaints is extended to September 21, 2009. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 9/8/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers.(tve) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER: For reasons further set forth in said Order, and on the record during the May 6, 2009 conference, the Court finds that Magistrate Judge Francis' February 20 Order quashing the Subpoena was not clearly erroneous or contrary to law. Accordingly, the Court affirms the February 20 Order and denies Defendants' Objections. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the following docket entries: No. 04 Civ. 7921, Doc. Nos. 153, 154, and 161. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/3/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(db) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER. Based on the request set forth in the letter of Rose M. Weber dated July 28, 2009, plaintiffs' time to submit a reply in connection with their motion to amend is extended to September 14, 2009. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 7/29/09) copies mailed by chambers.(djc) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Jeffrey Brooks in Opposition re: 167 MOTION to Amend/Correct 98 Amended Complaint,,,,,.. Document filed by All Defendants. (Brooks, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 167 MOTION to Amend/Correct 98 Amended Complaint,,,,,.. Document filed by All Defendants. (Brooks, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice against the defendant(s) David Cohen. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/22/2009) (jpo) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Jeffrey C. Brooks dated 6/30/2009 re: Requesting that Defendants' opposition shall be due July 24, 2009, Plaintiffs' reply shall be due August 14, 2009. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 7/1/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(jpo) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Rose M. Weber in Support re: 167 MOTION to Amend/Correct 98 Amended Complaint,,,,,.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Bunim Complaint (proposed), # 2 Exhibit B: Tremayne Complaint (proposed))(Weber, Rose) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct 98 Amended Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by All Plaintiffs.(Weber, Rose) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER...A pretrial conference having been held on June 5, 2009, it is hereby ORDERED that any plaintiff whose motion to amend the complaint was granted by my Memorandum and Order dated January 23, 2008 (Schiller v. City of New York, 2008 WL 200021), and who has not filed an amended pleading conforming to that order, may do so pursuant to a stipulation with defendants no later than June 30, 2009 or, if defendants do not agree to amendment, may serve and file a motion to amend by that date. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on June 5, 2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(ad) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL from 159 Order, 151 Order, 96 Order. Document filed by Neil Stumpf, Francesco Belluscio, Robert Hamer, Mark Vazquez, Linda Araque, Christopher Krutys, Brian Martin, Jacqueline DeCarlo, Thomas McDonnell, Ebony Huntley, John Martinez, Michael Bloomberg, Raymond Kelly, Joseph Esposito, Nicholas Estavillo, Bruce Smolka, Thomas Purtell, John Colgan, Patrick Devlin, Thomas Graham, Terence Monahan, Thomas Galati, Gerald Dieckmann, John and Jane Doe, All Defendants, Stephen Hammerman, David Cohen, Thomas Doepfner, Daniel Albano, Kerry Sweet, Ruby Marin-Jordan, The City of New York, John Belluscio, John Fong, John Hamer, Bart Pipcinski, Timothy Spies, Mark Steiner, The Hudson River Park Trust, John and Jane Does 1-50(individually), John and Jane Does 1-50(in their official capacities, (the names John and Jane Doe being fictitious, as the true names are presently unknown)). Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 689815. (tp) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Fred M. Weiler dated 5/27/2009 re: Pursuant to Your Honors Order dated February 14, 2008 and Judge Sullivan's Order dated May 8, 2009, defendants are timely answering certain amended complaints today. We have asked plaintiffs' counsel to provide us and file the requisite affidavits of service for each individual defendant indicating that they were served In the event that plaintiffs' counsel produces the requisite affidavit Corporation Counsel respectfully requests that they be given 7 days thereafter to respond to the amended complaint on behalf of that individual defendant. Your Honor previously endorsed the same request in the case of Tikkan v. NYC, et al., 05 CV 9901 (a copy of that Order dated March 25, 2009 is attached). ENDORSEMENT: Application granted as unopposed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 5/29/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(jmi) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Neil Stumpf, Francesco Belluscio, Mark Vazquez, Christopher Krutys, Brian Martin, Jacqueline DeCarlo, Thomas McDonnell, Ebony Huntley, John Martinez, Michael Bloomberg, Raymond Kelly, Joseph Esposito, Nicholas Estavillo, Bruce Smolka, John Colgan, Patrick Devlin, Thomas Graham, Terence Monahan, Thomas Galati, Gerald Dieckmann, Stephen Hammerman, David Cohen, Thomas Doepfner, Daniel Albano, Kerry Sweet, Ruby Marin-Jordan, The City of New York, John Fong, Bart Pipcinski, Timothy Spies, Mark Steiner, The Hudson River Park Trust. Related document: 98 Amended Complaint,,,,, filed by David Muelken, Juliette Consigny, Jessica Partnow, Craig Weltha, Michael Muench, India D'Arthenay-Adams, Jacquelyn Vendetti, Lindsay Ryan, Sarah Glidden, Paisley Davidson, Joel Dodge, Daniel Wood, Rebecca Vaughn, Joshua Haglund, Eva Prokop, Tila Duhaime, Adam Bunn, Andrew Mahoney, Kathleen McEldowney, Luke Meyer, Paul Bekavac, Michael Moren, Steven Phillips, Anna Ogden-Nussbaum.(Brooks, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV from Deborah Hrbek dated 5/7/09 re: As requested, I write to confirm the NLG-NYC's consent to the cover letter dated February I, 2008 that accompanied the in camera submission to Judge Francis being placed in the court file. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(ae) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV from Deborah Hrbek dated 2/1/08, Re: Further to this court's Order dated January 18, 2008, the non-party New York City Chapter of the National Lawyers Guild (NLG-NYC) respectfully submits the enclosed 574 pages of documents that are responsive to the above referenced subpoena duces tecum, as modified by the City of New York in Mr. Beck's letter dated September 13, 2007. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(ae) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket the attached letters dated February 1, 2008 and May 7, 2009. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/11/09) (tro) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record during the conference that was held on May 6, 2009, Defendants' motion for reconsideration of the Court's February 26, 2009 order is denied. The Clerk of Court is hereby directed to terminate the following motions set forth within. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/8/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 4/24/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(js) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL, that all claims by all plaintiffs against defendant Thomas Purtell in the within-referenced cases are dismissed with prejudice, without attorneys' fees, expenses, or costs. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/8/09) (pl) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Court affirms the December 2007 Order and denies the motions to dismiss filed by the nine Individual Defendants: Timothy Spies, Robert Hamer, Neil Rodriguez, Steven Choinski, Gerald Fitzpatrick, John Woods, Marvin Vasquez, Neil Stumpf, and Sal Sedita. The Court grants Defendant Martins motion to dismiss the Crotty Plaintiffs claims against him. To the extent that the nine Individual Defendants have not already been served, the Court hereby extends the time in they may be served until April 30, 2009. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Defendants counsel shall provide Plaintiffs counsel with these Defendants last known home addresses by April 14, 2009. No further extensions of time will be granted with respect to these nine Defendants. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the following motions: No. 05 Civ. 1563, Doc. Nos. 96, 97, 98; No. 05 Civ. 1564, Doc. No. 97; No. 05 Civ. 1565, Doc. No. 87; No. 05 Civ. 1566, Doc. No. 86; No. 05 Civ. 1567, Doc. No. 86; No. 05 Civ. 1572, Doc. No. 95; No. 05 Civ. 7577, Doc. No. 99. With respect to the Crotty action, No. 05 Civ. 7577, the Clerk of the Court is also directed to terminate Robert Martin as a Defendant. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/31/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that upon consent of the Parties, the conference that was scheduled for 4/17/09, is hereby adjourned to 5/6/09 at 4 pm. (Conference reset for 5/6/2009 at 04:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/25/09) (cd) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER The Court will hold a conference with respect to Defendants' motion for reconsideration of the Order. The Parties are directed to appear on April 17, 2009 at 4:30 p.m. at Courtroom 21C at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/19/09) (mme) (Entered: 03/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 152 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 151 Order,.. Document filed by David Cohen, The City of New York. (Sundaran, Raju) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration re; 151 Order,. Document filed by David Cohen, The City of New York.(Sundaran, Raju) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: The Court concludes that the January 23 Order is extremely thorough and well-reasoned. The Court, having found no clear error in either Judge Francis's analysis or his conclusions, rejects Defendants Objections and affirms the January 23 Order in its entirety. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 2/26/2009) (rw) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: According to the Parties in the above-captioned action and the related actions listed in this Order, the motions to compel depositions dated January 22, 2008 are now moot. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is hereby directed to close the motions in the following seven docket entries: No. 05 Civ. 1563, D.E. 92; No. 05 Civ. 1564, D.E. 95; No. 05 Civ. 1566, D.E. 84; No. 05 Civ. 1567, D.E. 84; No. 05 Civ. 1570, D.E. 92; No. 05 Civ. 1571, D.E. 93; No. 05 Civ. 7577, D.E. 96. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 2/11/2009) (tve) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY PARTIAL DISMISSAL: Plaintiffs Michael Moren and Tila Duhaime hereby stipulate to the dismissal, with prejudice, of all claims against all defendants for false arrest allegedly suffered by Plaintiffs Moren and Duhaime as a result of the incidents about which they complaint in this action, as stated in plaintiffs' "Second Claims for Relief" and "First Claim for Relied Under N.Y. State Law," without attorney's fees, costs or expenses. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/20/09) (tro) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM AND ORDER For the reasons set forth in this order, the Court denies Plaintiffs' appeals and affirms the discovery rulings and dismissal orders issued by Judge Francis in these cases. The Court also denies Plaintiffs' request for certification of this issue to the Second Circuit. Therefore, Plaintiffs' tort claims of non-garden variety emotional distress are dismissed. However, as noted above, Plaintiffs' garden variety damages claims for emotional distress relating to the incidents in question may proceed at trial as contemplated by the Second Circuit in Sims, notwithstanding the dismissal of Plaintiffs' emotional distress causes of action as ordered by Judge Francis. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions to appeal the dismissal of the emotional distress claims. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/8/09) (mme) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER The Court will hold a telephone conference with counsel for the parties named below with respect to this matter on Thursday, January 8, 2009 at 5:00 p.m. Counsel for all parties are directed to gather on one conference line at the appointed time and call chambers at (212) 805- 0264 when all are present. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/7/09) (mme) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Raju Sundaran in Opposition re: 134 MOTION for Report and Recommendations Plaintiffs' Rule 72 objections to Magistrate Judge's Order.. Document filed by Neil Stumpf, Francesco Belluscio, Robert Hamer, Mark Vazquez, Linda Araque, Christopher Krutys, Brian Martin, Jacqueline DeCarlo, Thomas McDonnell, Ebony Huntley, John Martinez, Michael Bloomberg, Raymond Kelly, Joseph Esposito, Nicholas Estavillo, Bruce Smolka, Thomas Purtell, John Colgan, Patrick Devlin, Thomas Graham, Terence Monahan, Thomas Galati, Gerald Dieckmann, John and Jane Doe, Stephen Hammerman, David Cohen, Thomas Doepfner, Daniel Albano, Kerry Sweet, Ruby Marin-Jordan, The City of New York, John Belluscio, John Fong, John Hamer, Bart Pipcinski, Timothy Spies, Mark Steiner, The Hudson River Park Trust. (Sundaran, Raju) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 134 MOTION for Report and Recommendations Plaintiffs' Rule 72 objections to Magistrate Judge's Order.. Document filed by Neil Stumpf, Francesco Belluscio, Robert Hamer, Mark Vazquez, Linda Araque, Christopher Krutys, Brian Martin, Jacqueline DeCarlo, Thomas McDonnell, Ebony Huntley, John Martinez, Michael Bloomberg, Raymond Kelly, Joseph Esposito, Nicholas Estavillo, Bruce Smolka, Thomas Purtell, John Colgan, Patrick Devlin, Thomas Graham, Terence Monahan, Thomas Galati, Gerald Dieckmann, Stephen Hammerman, David Cohen, Thomas Doepfner, Daniel Albano, Kerry Sweet, Ruby Marin-Jordan, The City of New York, John Belluscio, John Fong, John Hamer, Bart Pipcinski, Timothy Spies, Mark Steiner, The Hudson River Park Trust. (Sundaran, Raju) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: It is hereby ordered as follows: 1. Plaintiffs' counsel in all RNC cases who have identified non-party witnesses who are to be deposed pursuant to Court order shall, by October 17, 2008, provide defendants' counsel with each witness' address so that subpoenas may be served. 2. By October 17, 2008, plaintiffs' counsel in MacNamara shall advise defendants' counsel of the specific RNC arrestees interviewed on "Democracy Now" and the specific Legal Aid or National Lawyers Guild attorneys involved in the RNC state court proceedings upon whom plaintiffs intend to rely. 3. With respect to the Court-ordered non-party depositions, defendants' counsel need not provide advance notice to plaintiffs' counsel before serving subpoenas that calls for the production of documents, defendants' counsel shall give plaintiffs' counsel three days' notice prior to serving the subpoena. So Ordered, ( Deposition due by 10/17/2008.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 10/10/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers.(js) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER that Mr. Rothman's request (to submit a letter) is DENIED. Both plaintiffs and defendants have made submissions concerning this issue, and the Court sees no need for additional briefing. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/4/08) (cd) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Fifty-four plaintiffs in twenty of the consolidated RNC cases have filed objections to the dismissal of their emotional distress and physical injury claims. By 5:00 p.m. on Monday, July 28, 2008, any plaintiff who wishes to address the relevancy of the Second Circuit's decision in Sims to his or her objection shall submit a letter, not to exceed three pages, explaining his or her position. Thereafter, by 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, July 31, 2008, the City shall submit a single letter, not to exceed seven pages, responding to plaintiffs' letters on this issue. The Court will not alter these directives absent truly compelling circumstances. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/23/08) (tro) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Tonya Jenerette dated 6/30/2008 re: Counsel respectfully request that the Court grant this application so that the non party deposition consented to by the parties may proceed. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. There depositions shall be completed by September 30, 2008. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 7/11/2008) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(jfe) Modified on 7/21/2008 (jfe). (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW re: 138 Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Rule 72 Objections. Document filed by David Muelken, Michael Muench. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Under Seal re: 135 Objection (non-motion). Document filed by The City of New York, The Hudson River Park Trust. (Brooks, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Jeffrey C. Brooks dated 6/3/2008; counsel writes to request that Your Honor enter an Order permitting defendants to file their 1/22/2008 case-specific motions and any replies thereto under seal. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Any letters related to these applications may be filed under seal. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 6/3/2008) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(kkc) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: the parties in the actions listed herein shall abide by the following briefing schedule concerning plaintiffs' Rule 72 objections to the dismissal of their respective emotional distress and physical injury claims, which were filed on 5/22/08. Defendants shall submit their consolidated opposition brief by 6/20/08. Plaintiffs shall submit their respective reply briefs, if any, by 7/10/08. Thereafter the Court will schedule oral argument regarding plaintiffs' objections, if necessary. Defendants' request to file their opposition brief under seal, pursuant to Protective Order #1, is GRANTED. In addition, defendants shall electronically file a redacted version of their opposition papers. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/29/08) (tro) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Objection re: 118 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, pursuant to Rule 72. Document filed by David Muelken, Michael Muench. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - WRONG DOCUMENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Report and Recommendations Plaintiffs' Rule 72 objections to Magistrate Judge's Order (Objection to Order). Document filed by David Muelken, Michael Muench.(Weber, Rose) Modified on 5/22/2008 (jar). (Entered: 05/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,, served. David Cohen served on 5/12/2008, answer due 6/2/2008. Service was accepted by Det. O'Brien. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,, served. Stephen Hammerman served on 5/12/2008, answer due 6/2/2008; Thomas Doepfner served on 5/12/2008, answer due 6/2/2008; Daniel Albano served on 5/12/2008, answer due 6/2/2008; Kerry Sweet served on 5/12/2008, answer due 6/2/2008; Ruby Marin-Jordan served on 5/12/2008, answer due 6/2/2008. Service was accepted by Rebecca Chasan, Esq.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistate Judge James C. Francis IV from John Biedermann dated 4/29/08 re: Defendants write to requests that, pursuant to, inter alia, Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), Court issue an order precluding plaintiffs in the actions listed in this order from relying upon the testimony of any non-party fact witness. ENDORSEMENT: application denied as unnecessary. Should any party identify in the pretrial order witnesses who were not previously identified as required by my Orders of March 19 and March 26, 2008, they will be stricken at that time. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 5/8/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(pl) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge James C Francis IV from Rose M. Weber dated 4/18/08 re: plaintiff requests reconsideration of the Court's Order dated 4/4/08, dismissing plaintiff's emotional distress claims. ENDORSEMENT: Application denied. Mr. Muelkin received treatment prior to as well as after the RNC, and he unequivocally declined to produce relevant records. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 5/8/08) (pl) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Francis from Raju Sundaran dated 4/22/2008 re: Counsel writes to propose the following briefing schedule with respect to motions for reconsideration that were filed in the Ryan, Moran, and Crotty cases: Defendants consolidated opposition - due 5/2/2008 (in Ryan, Moran, and Crotty); and Plaintiffs' reply - to be determined by the Court. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants shall answer the applications by 4/30/2008, and plaintiffs shall reply by 5/5/2008. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 4/23/2008) (jp) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Rose M. Weber dated 4/7/08 re: Plaintiffs request that the deposition deadlines be extended until May 30, 2008 or until three weeks after the documents are received for any particular plaintiff, whichever date is later. Plaintiffs also request, with the consent of defendants, that the deadlines for production of releases, documents, affidavits, and so forth be extended until May 2, 2008. The current deadlines, which are either April 21, 2008 or April 30, 2008, are simply unworkable in some cases. Plaintiffs have already produced many documents and releases and expect to have complied substantially with the Orders by April 18th. ENDORSEMENT: Applications GRANTED. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 4/21/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(js) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate James C. Francis from Raju Sundaran dated 4/18/08 re: Accordingly, in the interest of judicial economy, defendants and Ms. Weber jointly propose the following briefing schedule for plaintiffs' motions for reconsideration. Defendants' consolidated opposition- due May 7, 2008 and Plaintiffs' reply due May 21, 2008. ENDORSEMENT: Application denied. Any motion for reconsideration can be addressed for more expeditiously. Defendants shall respond to Mr. Eifert's application by April 23, 2008. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 4/18/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(js) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Rose M. Weber dated 4/16/08 re: The plaintiffs whose Rule 72 Applications are now ripe respectfully request that the due dates be adjourned to a date ten days after Magistrate Judge Francis decides the reconsideration motions for the moving plaintiffs. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs' requests in the Ryan, Greenwald and Biddle actions are granted. Plaintiffs shall file their reconsideration motions forthwith. In the event that these motions are denied, plaintiffs shall file their respective objections within ten (10) days of the Judge Francis' order denying the motion(s). (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/16/08) (tro) (Entered: 04/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appellant's REPLY BRIEF. Document filed by The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit And Exhibits)(Mirro, James) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that defendants' reply brief is rejected due to defendants' failure to comply with this Court's directives regarding both the length of the reply brief and defendants' obligation to seek permission to file oversized briefs well in advance of the due date. By April 11, 2008, defendants shall file a reply that complies with the page limit of fifteen pages previously imposed by this Court. Defendants are not permitted to add any substantive material-including new arguments, or case or record citations-to the revised reply brief; this prohibition will be strictly enforced. Finally, the Court advises defendants that, pursuant to Rule 16(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, violations of pre-trial orders may be redressed with "any just orders" that the Court deems appropriate, including, but not limited to, the imposition of fees and costs. Fed.R.Civ.P.16(f)(1). Here, defendants have clearly failed to heed the Court's order regarding their obligation to seek an enlargement of page limits in advance of the due date. Repeated failures by defendants to abide by this instruction, or any other pre-trial order, will require this Court to consider the imposition of sanctions under Rule 16(f). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/8/2008) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(jmi) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Raju Sundaran in Support. Document filed by The City of New York. (Sundaran, Raju) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support. Document filed by The City of New York. (Sundaran, Raju) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Defendants' application for an order dismissing the complaint of plaintiff Sarah Glidden is denied. Ms. Glidden shall respond to defendants' document requests and interrogatories by April 21, 2008. Defendants' application to dismiss the emotional distress claims of Paul Bekavac and Paisley Davidson are denied. However, by April 30, 2008, these Plaintiffs shall each provide an affidavit demonstrating good faith efforts tto ascertain the identity of their therapists. The emotional distress claims of David Muelken and Michael Muench are dismissed, as they have declined to produce releases for relevant mental health records. Plaintiff Adam Bunn need not produce the requested medical release. Eva Prokop need not produce the requested medical release. Defendants' application to dismiss the physical injury claim of Andrew Mahoney is denied. By April 21, 2008, Mr. Mahoney shall provide a release for records of his post-arrest treatment, providing as much identifying detail as possible. By April 21, 2008, plaintiff Luke Meyer shall produce a release for records of his previous hand injury. Plaintiff David Muelkin shall be available for a continued deposition prior to April 30, 2008 on a date agreed upon by counsel. Defendants' application to dismiss the emotional distress claims of plaintiffs Adam Bunn and Lindsay Ryan are denied. Plaintiffs Adam Bunn, Joel Dodge, and Michael Moran shall be available for continued deposition prior to April 30, 2008 on dates agreed to by counsel. The deposition shall be conducted telephonically, with he plaintiffs bearing the costs of the calls. Defendants' application to dismiss the economic damages claims of Paisley Davidson, Joel Dodge, Joshua Hagland, Andrew Mahoney, Michael Moran, David Muelken, and Lindsay Ryan are denied. Defendants' application for orders compelling discovery from plaintiffs Paisley Davidson, Tila Duhaime, Eva Prokop, Kathleen McEldowney, Anna Ogden-Nussbaum, Luke Meyer, Jessica Partnow, Rebecca Vaughn, Criag Weltha, and Denial Wood are denied. Defendants' applcation for a preclusion order regarding plaintiffs' clothing is denied without prejudice to renewal at trial.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 4/4/08) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(tro) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from James Mirro dated 4/2/08 re: Defendants request that the Court permit them to file a brief of up to 20 pages in length, if necessary, in further support of their appeal of the 1/23/08 order of Magistrate Francis. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' reply brief shall not exceed 15 pages. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/3/08) (tro) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from James Mirro dated 3/31/08 re: Defendants request that the Court permit all parties until Friday, April 4, 2008 to serve the information required by Your Honor's order. Plaintiffs' counsel Jeffrey Rothman, James Meyerson, Daniel Alterman, Brian Raum, Beldock Levine, Stehpan Peskin, Michael Spiegel, Alan Levine and Alan D. Levine consent to this request. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 3/31/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(djc) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Raju Sundaran dated 3/12/2008 re: Defendants request permission to file one hard copy set of exhibits with Clerk's office in connection with their Rule 72 objections to the January 23, 2008 Order of Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV. Defendants have already filed and served their Memorandum of Law and Declaration in support via ECF in each of these 35 cases. Defendants request that this single set exhibits be docketed in all RNC case listed on the attached appendix in order to have a complete record in the event of an appeal. Due to their bulk, Your Honor previously excused defendants from filing their exhibits vis ECF by order dated March 3, 2008. A copy of that order (and appendix) is attached for the convenience of Your Honor and the Clerk's office. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' request is Granted.Defendants shall also submit a set of the exhibits as courtesy copies to chambers. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/14/2008) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(jmi) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 97 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants.. Document filed by The City of New York. (Mirro, James) (Entered: 03/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: It is hereby ordered as follows: 1. By March 31, 2008, counsel for all parties shall identify all non-party fact witnesses that they reasonably expect to testify at trial on behalf of their respective clients. 2. Absent exceptional circumstances, depositions of fact witnesses are concluded in all RNC cases, consistent with the case management orders. While some of the case management orders were extended de facto by the master deposition scheduling order, there was no basis for assuming that they had been abandoned altogether. This order does not preclude depositions necessitated by Judge Sullivan's determination of issues no pending before him. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 3/19/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers.(js) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION BRIEF re: 106 Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion) to M.J. Francis' Order concerning amendment of the complaint. Document filed by All Plaintiffs.(Weber, Rose) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re: 95 MOTION to Compel Depositions.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Raju Sundaran in Support of defendants' memorandum of law in support of defendants' appeal from the order of Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV's, dated 1/23/08, granting plaintiff's motion to amend in part. Document filed by All Defendants, All Plaintiffs. (this document relates to Case #04cv7922, document #267 Objection., MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(pl) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Raju Sundaran in Support re: 106 Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion). Document filed by The City of New York. (Brooks, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re: 97 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from James Mirro dated 2/25/2008 re: Defendants respectfully request that the Court permit the Brief in its current form. This appeal consolidates the arguments relating to some 37 separate cases. In addition, many of the issues discussed in the Brief, including the issues relating to the Deputy Commissioner for Intelligence David Cohen, are substantive issues that are of vital importance to defendants. In addition, due to the bulk of the Exhibits, defendants request permission not to file the Sundaran Declaration and Exhibits via ECF. Defendants have served these materials on opposing counsel in electronic form (on disks). ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' brief is accepted for filing. However the Court reminds defendants that requests to file over sized briefs should be filed well in advance of relevant due dates. Failure to do so in the future well result in rejection of the brief in this entirety. Defendants need not file the exhibits referenced herein via ECF. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/3/2008) (jmi) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Objection. Document filed by Neil Stumpf, Francesco Belluscio, Robert Hamer, Mark Vazquez, Linda Araque, Christopher Krutys, Brian Martin, Jacqueline DeCarlo, Thomas McDonnell, Ebony Huntley, John Martinez, Michael Bloomberg, Raymond Kelly, Joseph Esposito, Nicholas Estavillo, Bruce Smolka, Thomas Purtell, John Colgan, Patrick Devlin, Thomas Graham, Terence Monahan, Thomas Galati, Gerald Dieckmann, Stephen Hammerman, David Cohen, Thomas Doepfner, Daniel Albano, Kerry Sweet, Ruby Marin-Jordan, The City of New York, John Fong, Bart Pipcinski, Timothy Spies, Mark Steiner, The Hudson River Park Trust. (Sundaran, Raju) (Entered: 02/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Rose M. Weber dated 2/14/2008 re: Requesting reconsideration of the Court's memo endorsement, setting a deadline of February 29th for their opposition papers to January 22nd motions. ENDORSEMENT: Application denied. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 2/15/2008) (jpo) (Entered: 02/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Rose Weber dated 2/24/08 re: Request for reconsideration of the Court's memo endorsement 2/14/08, setting a deadline of 2/29 for their opposition papers to the 1/22 motions. ENDORSEMENT: Application denied. The application for reconsideration date 2/14/08 was denied the following day. See attached. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 2/25/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(cd) (Entered: 02/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from James Mirro dated 2/19/08 re: Defendants request that the Court permit defendants twenty (20) days until 3/17/08 in which to serve answer to any amended complaint as to which not objections are filed. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 2/20/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(tro) (Entered: 02/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Rose M. Weber dated 2/14/08 re: Plaintiffs request until 3/7/08 to respond to defendants' Rule 72 appeal of Magistrate Judge Francis' Order concerning service of process on certain retired police officers. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 3/7/2008) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 2/19/08) (tro) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV from James Mirro dated 2/4/08 re: Defendants request that the Court adjourn the defendants' time to answer the amended complaints until 20 days after Judge Sullivan's order on any appeal of the Order. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted only with respect to any case in which the amended complaint actually raises issues that are the subject of obections presented to Judge Sullivan. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 2/14/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(ae) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Rose M. Weber dated 2/6/2008 re: Requesting an extension of time until March 14, 2008 for plaintiffs opposition papers. ENDORSEMENT: Application denied. Responsive papers shall be submitted by February 29, 2008 and Replies by March 14, 2008. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 2/14/2008) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(jpo) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT: amending 54 against Stephen Hammerman, David Cohen, Thomas Doepfner, Daniel Albano, Kerry Sweet, Ruby Marin-Jordan, Neil Stumpf, Francesco Belluscio, Robert Hamer, Mark Vazquez, Linda Araque, Christopher Krutys, Brian Martin, Jacqueline DeCarlo, Thomas McDonnell, Ebony Huntley, John Martinez, Michael Bloomberg, Raymond Kelly, Joseph Esposito, Nicholas Estavillo, Bruce Smolka, Thomas Purtell, John Colgan, Patrick Devlin, Thomas Graham, Terence Monahan, Thomas Galati, Gerald Dieckmann, John and Jane Doe, The City of New York, John Fong, Bart Pipcinski, Timothy Spies, Mark Steiner, The Hudson River Park Trust.Document filed by Craig Weltha, Adam Bunn, Paisley Davidson, Daniel Wood, Luke Meyer, India D'Arthenay-Adams, Steven Phillips, Tila Duhaime, Joshua Haglund, Lindsay Ryan, Paul Bekavac, Juliette Consigny, Jessica Partnow, Joel Dodge, Sarah Glidden, Andrew Mahoney, Kathleen McEldowney, Michael Moren, David Muelken, Michael Muench, Anna Ogden-Nussbaum, Eva Prokop, Rebecca Vaughn, Jacquelyn Vendetti. Related document: 54 Amended Complaint,,,,, filed by David Muelken, Juliette Consigny, Jessica Partnow, Craig Weltha, Michael Muench, India D'Arthenay-Adams, Jacquelyn Vendetti, Lindsay Ryan, Sarah Glidden, Paisley Davidson, Joel Dodge, Daniel Wood, Rebecca Vaughn, Joshua Haglund, Eva Prokop, Tila Duhaime, Adam Bunn, Andrew Mahoney, Kathleen McEldowney, Luke Meyer, Paul Bekavac, Michael Moren, Steven Phillips, Anna Ogden-Nussbaum.(js) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants. Document filed by The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Declaration and Exhibits A-F, # 3 Exhibit G-H, # 4 Exhibit I-M)(Mirro, James) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The plaintiffs' Motion (Amend/Correct) are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as further set forth in said Order. Within 10 days, the plaintiffs shall serve and file amended complaints that conform with this Order (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 1/23/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed by Chambers. (db) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Depositions. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 letter-brief in support of motion)(Weber, Rose) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Curt Beck dated 1/22/08 re: Request that the time for defendants to answer to any RNC complaint in the RNC litigations that is a subject of her motion to amend to: (i) 20 days after this Court decides plaintiffs' motion to amend or (ii) 20 days after Ms. Weber informs defendants that she has served all the defendants in those cases, whichever date comes later. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 1/22/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(cd) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER; that Non-Party New York City Chapter of the National Lawyers Guild (NLG-NYC) having moved to quash defendants subpoena on the grounds that the information sought is subject to the attorney-client privilege; and NLG-NYC having represented that a preliminary search identified approximately 500 responsive documents, it is hereby ORDERED that NLG-NYC promptly submit these responsive documents to the Court for in camera review. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 1/18/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers.(pl) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Jeffrey A. Dougherty dated 1/14/08 re: Defendants request one additional week in which to comply with the deadline imposed by the November 26, 2007 Order, which would require submission of motions and service of non-party deposition notices on or before 1/22/08. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. No further extensions. Any motion filed without compliance with the meet and confer requirement will be summarily denied. ( Motions due by 1/22/2008.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 1/14/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(tro) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from James Mirro dated 1/7/2008 re: Counsel for Defendant I have asked your deputy whether Your Honor is amenable to rescheduling that conference. I understand that Your Honor is amenable to rescheduling the conference to Monday, January 14, 2008 at 2:15 p.m. Defendants respectfully request that Your Honor permit defendants until that same date, next Monday, to serve their Rule 72 appeal in these matter. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 1/14/2008 at 02:15 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/7/2008) (jmi) Modified on 1/8/2008 (jmi). (Entered: 01/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from James Mirro dated 1/3/08 re: Defendants request that the Court enter an Order permitting them until 1/25/08 in which to file and serve the appeal; permitting plaintiffs until 2/8/08 to serve any opposition and permitting defendants until 2/22/08 in which to serve their reply. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' time in which to appeal Judge Francis' December 18, 2007 Order is hereby extended to January 9, 2008. The parties are to appear before the Court for a status conference on January 9, 2008 at 2:30 pm. ( Status Conference set for 1/9/2008 at 02:30 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/4/08) (tro) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,, served. Neil Stumpf served on 12/13/2007, answer due 1/2/2008. Service was accepted by Kenny Stumpf. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 01/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge James C. Francis IV from James Mirro dated 12/11/07 re: Counsel writes to request to Rose Weber's letter of 12/3/07 requesting an extension- through the end of January 2008- to effect service of process on eleven retired officers in these cases. Document filed by Robert Curely, Neal Curley, Michael Schiller, Hacer Dinler, Ann Maurer, Ashley Waters, Francesca Firoentini, Scott Handleman, Ritu Kalra, David Cheung, Jordan Ferrand-Sapsis, Michael Epstein, Robert Flynn, Jonathon Lorusso, Andrew Lynn, Catherine Ryan, Craig Weltha, Adam Bunn, Paisley Davidson, Daniel Wood, Luke Meyer, Steven Phillips, Tila Duhaime, Joshua Haglund, Lindsay Ryan, Paul Bekavac, Juliette Consigny, Jessica Partnow, Joel Dodge, Sarah Glidden, Andrew Mahoney, Michael Moren, David Muelken, Michael Muench, Anna Ogden-Nussbaum, Eva Prokop, Rebecca Vaughn, Jacquelyn Vendetti, Jason Buhle, James Dyer, Izabela Norwid, Katherine Roberts, Mark Taylor, Tomas Melchor, Adrienne Garbini, Daine Anastasio, Nicole Crook, Miller Duvall, Michael Jordan, Leah Todd, James Langergaard, Marigny Lee, Amanda Luci, Ayala Rahm, Leah Rorvig, Matthew Roth, Joshua Russell, Aubryn Sidle, Colin Weatherby, William Weikart, Kelly Benjamin, Adam Greenwald, Jacob Albert, Jeremy Biddle, Philip Stone, Jay Hardesty, Cullen Nawalkowsky, Brian Pickett, James Edwards, Megan Peterson, Patricia Alexander, Hali Vik, Dyan Neary, Laurie Schoeman, Matthew Moran, Michelle Borok, John Elfrank-Dana, Megan Cox, Keith Mancuso, Emily Nella, Joshua Pelzek, Kyle Rettstadt, Emma Lang, Sacha Botbol, Valerie Kaur Brar, Charles Shaw, Alexander Bomstein, Jennifer Hasa.Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(jco) (Entered: 12/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge James C. Francis IV from Rose E. Weber dated 12/3/07 re: Plaintiff writes in response to Mr. Mirro's letter to the Court dated 12/11/07, concerning service on several retired police offiers. Document filed by Robert Curely, Neal Curley, Michael Schiller, Hacer Dinler, Ann Maurer, Ashley Waters, Francesca Firoentini, Scott Handleman, Ritu Kalra, David Cheung, Jordan Ferrand-Sapsis, Michael Epstein, Robert Flynn, Jonathon Lorusso, Andrew Lynn, Catherine Ryan, Craig Weltha, Adam Bunn, Paisley Davidson, Daniel Wood, Luke Meyer, India D'Arthenay-Adams, Steven Phillips, Tila Duhaime, Joshua Haglund, Lindsay Ryan, Paul Bekavac, Juliette Consigny, Jessica Partnow, Joel Dodge, Sarah Glidden, Andrew Mahoney, Kathleen McEldowney, Michael Moren, David Muelken, Michael Muench, Anna Ogden-Nussbaum, Eva Prokop, Rebecca Vaughn, Jacquelyn Vendetti, Jason Buhle, James Dyer, Izabela Norwid, Katherine Roberts, Mark Taylor, Tomas Melchor, Adrienne Garbini, Daine Anastasio, Nicole Crook, Miller Duvall, Michael Jordan, Leah Todd, James Langergaard, Marigny Lee, Amanda Luci, Ayala Rahm, Leah Rorvig, Matthew Roth, Joshua Russell, Aubryn Sidle, Colin Weatherby, William Weikart, Kelly Benjamin, Adam Greenwald, Jacob Albert, Jeremy Biddle, Philip Stone, Jay Hardesty, Cullen Nawalkowsky, Brian Pickett, James Edwards, Megan Peterson, Patricia Alexander, Hali Vik, Dyan Neary, Laurie Schoeman, Matthew Moran, Michelle Borok, John Elfrank-Dana, Megan Cox, Keith Mancuso, Emily Nella, Joshua Pelzek, Kyle Rettstadt, Emma Lang, Sacha Botbol, Valerie Kaur Brar, Charles Shaw, Alexander Bomstein, Jennifer Hasa.Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(jco) (Entered: 12/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge James C. Francis IV from Rose M. Weber dated 12/3/07 re: Plaintiffs in these matters write concerning their inability to effect service on several retired police officers. Plaintiffs respectfully request a) that the Court order defendants to inform me, on or before 12/7/07, for which retired officers Police Legal will be accepting service; b) that the Court order defendants to provide me, on or before 12/7/07, with addresses for any retired officers for whom Police Legal will not be accepting service; and c) that plaintiffs be permitted until 1/31/08 to serve any retired officers for whom Police Legal will not be accepting service. Document filed by Robert Curely, Neal Curley, Michael Schiller, Hacer Dinler, Ann Maurer, Ashley Waters, Francesca Firoentini, Scott Handleman, Ritu Kalra, David Cheung, Jordan Ferrand-Sapsis, Michael Epstein, Robert Flynn, Jonathon Lorusso, Andrew Lynn, Catherine Ryan, Craig Weltha, Adam Bunn, Paisley Davidson, Daniel Wood, Luke Meyer, India D'Arthenay-Adams, Steven Phillips, Tila Duhaime, Joshua Haglund, Lindsay Ryan, Paul Bekavac, Juliette Consigny, Jessica Partnow, Joel Dodge, Sarah Glidden, Andrew Mahoney, Kathleen McEldowney, Michael Moren, David Muelken, Michael Muench, Anna Ogden-Nussbaum, Eva Prokop, Rebecca Vaughn, Jacquelyn Vendetti, Jason Buhle, James Dyer, Izabela Norwid, Katherine Roberts, Mark Taylor, Tomas Melchor, Adrienne Garbini, Daine Anastasio, Nicole Crook, Miller Duvall, Michael Jordan, Leah Todd, James Langergaard, Marigny Lee, Amanda Luci, Leah Rorvig, Matthew Roth, Joshua Russell, Aubryn Sidle, Colin Weatherby, William Weikart, Kelly Benjamin, Adam Greenwald, Jacob Albert, Jeremy Biddle, Jay Hardesty, Cullen Nawalkowsky, Brian Pickett, James Edwards, Megan Peterson, Patricia Alexander, Hali Vik, Dyan Neary, Laurie Schoeman, Matthew Moran, Michelle Borok, John Elfrank-Dana, Megan Cox, Keith Mancuso, Emily Nella, Joshua Pelzek, Kyle Rettstadt, Emma Lang, Sacha Botbol, Valerie Kaur Brar, Charles Shaw, Jennifer Hasa.Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(jco) (Entered: 12/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER that by 12/31/07, defendants' counsel shall advise whether service will be accepted on behalf of PO Steven Choinski, Sgt. Gerald Fitzpatrick, Sgt. Thomas Crimmins, PO John Wood, PO Timothy Spies, PO Robert Hamer, PO Neil Stumpf, PO Remy Randell, PO Neil Rodriguez, and PO Marvin Vasquez....The time to effect service of these defendants is extended to 1/31/08 pursuant to FRCP 4(m). ( Service due by 1/31/2008.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 12/18/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. copies sent by chambers.(cd) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: It is hereby ordered as follows: 1. Any motion relating to a party deposition shall be submitted by Jauary 15, 2008. 2. Notices of deposition for any non-party witnesses identified as a result of party depositions shall be served by January 15, 2008. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 11/26/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(js) (Entered: 11/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 55 MOTION to Amend/Correct 54 Amended Complaint,,,,,. MOTION to Amend/Correct 54 Amended Complaint,,,,,. MOTION to Amend/Correct 54 Amended Complaint,,,,,.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,, served. Bruce Smolka served on 11/5/2007, answer due 11/26/2007; Patrick Devlin served on 11/5/2007, answer due 11/26/2007. Service was accepted by Evan Gluck, Esq.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 11/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,, served. Thomas McDonnell served on 10/30/2007, answer due 11/19/2007. Service was accepted by P.O. Thomas McDonnell. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Raju Sundaran in Opposition re: 55 MOTION to Amend/Correct 54 Amended Complaint,,,,,. MOTION to Amend/Correct 54 Amended Complaint,,,,,. MOTION to Amend/Correct 54 Amended Complaint,,,,,.. Document filed by The City of New York. (Brooks, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 55 MOTION to Amend/Correct 54 Amended Complaint,,,,,. MOTION to Amend/Correct 54 Amended Complaint,,,,,. MOTION to Amend/Correct 54 Amended Complaint,,,,,.. Document filed by The City of New York. (Brooks, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: for reasons further set forth in said Order, the defendants' application to dismiss the claims of 76 plaintiffs identified in the correspondence of defendants' counsel is DENIED. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 10/23/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(db) (Entered: 10/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Raju Sundaran dated 10/19/2007 re: Defendants request permission to file a 50 page memorandum of law in opposition. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted upon the representation that the proposed motion present varying issues and arguments. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 10/22/2007) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. (jar) (Entered: 10/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from James Mirro dated 10/2/07 re: counsel for dfts request that the Court enter an order dismissing the actions of those plaintiffs who have failed to comply with the Court's Order. Defendants shall submit a definitive listing of individuals who have failed to comply with that Order within 10 days of the Court's order on this application. ENDORSEMENT: I will consider the motion upon submission of the "definitive listing". So Ordered. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 10/5/07) (dle) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Judge Kenneth M. Karas is no longer assigned to the case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(fk) (Entered: 10/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,, served. Ebony Huntley served on 10/2/2007, answer due 10/22/2007. Service was accepted by Det. Ebony Huntley. Document filed by Craig Weltha; Adam Bunn; Paisley Davidson; Daniel Wood; Luke Meyer; India D'Arthenay-Adams; Steven Phillips; Tila Duhaime; Joshua Haglund; Lindsay Ryan; Paul Bekavac; Juliette Consigny; Jessica Partnow; Joel Dodge; Sarah Glidden; Andrew Mahoney; Kathleen McEldowney; Michael Moren; David Muelken; Michael Muench; Anna Ogden-Nussbaum; Eva Prokop; Rebecca Vaughn; Jacquelyn Vendetti. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER any party receiving documents form a non-party pursuant to subpoena shall maintain those documents on an attorneys' -eyes-only basis except insofar as the provisions of this Order permit disclosure. Counsel wishing to disseminate a document subpoenaed from a non-party shall provide notice to counsel for any party identified in the document. Counsel for the party identified in the document shall have 10 business days to deem the document (or a portion of it) confidential, in which case it shall be treated as such under the protective order. Until the ten days has elapsed or until the party identified in the document has otherwise consented to disclosure, the document shall be maintained on an attorneys'-eyes-only basis. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 9/28/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(jco)"Copies Mailed By Chambers" (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from James Mirro dated 9/19/07 re: a request by defendants to respond to all plaintiffs' motions on a consolidated basis by 10/19/2007. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. In addition reply papers are due 11/19/2007. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 9/27/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(kco) (Entered: 09/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,, served. Mark Steiner served on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. Service was accepted by P.O. Mark Steiner. Document filed by Craig Weltha; Adam Bunn; Paisley Davidson; Daniel Wood; Luke Meyer; India D'Arthenay-Adams; Steven Phillips; Tila Duhaime; Joshua Haglund; Lindsay Ryan; Paul Bekavac; Juliette Consigny; Jessica Partnow; Joel Dodge; Sarah Glidden; Andrew Mahoney; Kathleen McEldowney; Michael Moren; David Muelken; Michael Muench; Anna Ogden-Nussbaum; Eva Prokop; Rebecca Vaughn; Jacquelyn Vendetti. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,, served. John Martinez served on 9/24/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. Service was accepted by P.O. John Martinez. Document filed by Craig Weltha; Adam Bunn; Paisley Davidson; Daniel Wood; Luke Meyer; India D'Arthenay-Adams; Steven Phillips; Tila Duhaime; Joshua Haglund; Lindsay Ryan; Paul Bekavac; Juliette Consigny; Jessica Partnow; Joel Dodge; Sarah Glidden; Andrew Mahoney; Kathleen McEldowney; Michael Moren; David Muelken; Michael Muench; Anna Ogden-Nussbaum; Eva Prokop; Rebecca Vaughn; Jacquelyn Vendetti. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,, served. Linda Araque served on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. Service was accepted by Det. Linda Araque. Document filed by Craig Weltha; Adam Bunn; Paisley Davidson; Daniel Wood; Luke Meyer; India D'Arthenay-Adams; Steven Phillips; Tila Duhaime; Joshua Haglund; Lindsay Ryan; Paul Bekavac; Juliette Consigny; Jessica Partnow; Joel Dodge; Sarah Glidden; Andrew Mahoney; Kathleen McEldowney; Michael Moren; David Muelken; Michael Muench; Anna Ogden-Nussbaum; Eva Prokop; Rebecca Vaughn; Jacquelyn Vendetti. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,, served. Christopher Krutys served on 9/24/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. Service was accepted by P.O. Christopher Krutys. Document filed by Craig Weltha; Adam Bunn; Paisley Davidson; Daniel Wood; Luke Meyer; India D'Arthenay-Adams; Steven Phillips; Tila Duhaime; Joshua Haglund; Lindsay Ryan; Paul Bekavac; Juliette Consigny; Jessica Partnow; Joel Dodge; Sarah Glidden; Andrew Mahoney; Kathleen McEldowney; Michael Moren; David Muelken; Michael Muench; Anna Ogden-Nussbaum; Eva Prokop; Rebecca Vaughn; Jacquelyn Vendetti. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,, served. Mark Vazquez served on 9/19/2007, answer due 10/9/2007. Service was accepted by P.O. Mark Vazquez. Document filed by Craig Weltha; Adam Bunn; Paisley Davidson; Daniel Wood; Luke Meyer; India D'Arthenay-Adams; Steven Phillips; Tila Duhaime; Joshua Haglund; Lindsay Ryan; Paul Bekavac; Juliette Consigny; Jessica Partnow; Joel Dodge; Sarah Glidden; Andrew Mahoney; Kathleen McEldowney; Michael Moren; David Muelken; Michael Muench; Anna Ogden-Nussbaum; Eva Prokop; Rebecca Vaughn; Jacquelyn Vendetti. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,, served. Bart Pipcinski served on 9/19/2007, answer due 10/9/2007. Service was accepted by P.O. Bart Pipcinski. Document filed by Craig Weltha; Adam Bunn; Paisley Davidson; Daniel Wood; Luke Meyer; India D'Arthenay-Adams; Steven Phillips; Tila Duhaime; Joshua Haglund; Lindsay Ryan; Paul Bekavac; Juliette Consigny; Jessica Partnow; Joel Dodge; Sarah Glidden; Andrew Mahoney; Kathleen McEldowney; Michael Moren; David Muelken; Michael Muench; Anna Ogden-Nussbaum; Eva Prokop; Rebecca Vaughn; Jacquelyn Vendetti. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,, served. Brian Martin served on 9/17/2007, answer due 10/8/2007. Service was accepted by P.O. Brian Martin. Document filed by Craig Weltha; Adam Bunn; Paisley Davidson; Daniel Wood; Luke Meyer; India D'Arthenay-Adams; Steven Phillips; Tila Duhaime; Joshua Haglund; Lindsay Ryan; Paul Bekavac; Juliette Consigny; Jessica Partnow; Joel Dodge; Sarah Glidden; Andrew Mahoney; Kathleen McEldowney; Michael Moren; David Muelken; Michael Muench; Anna Ogden-Nussbaum; Eva Prokop; Rebecca Vaughn; Jacquelyn Vendetti. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,, served. John Fong served on 9/17/2007, answer due 10/8/2007. Service was accepted by P.O. Joseph Fong. Document filed by Craig Weltha; Adam Bunn; Paisley Davidson; Daniel Wood; Luke Meyer; India D'Arthenay-Adams; Steven Phillips; Tila Duhaime; Joshua Haglund; Lindsay Ryan; Paul Bekavac; Juliette Consigny; Jessica Partnow; Joel Dodge; Sarah Glidden; Andrew Mahoney; Kathleen McEldowney; Michael Moren; David Muelken; Michael Muench; Anna Ogden-Nussbaum; Eva Prokop; Rebecca Vaughn; Jacquelyn Vendetti. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,, served. Jacqueline DeCarlo served on 9/10/2007, answer due 10/1/2007. Service was accepted by P.O. Jacqueline DeCarlo. Document filed by Craig Weltha; Adam Bunn; Paisley Davidson; Daniel Wood; Luke Meyer; India D'Arthenay-Adams; Steven Phillips; Tila Duhaime; Joshua Haglund; Lindsay Ryan; Paul Bekavac; Juliette Consigny; Jessica Partnow; Joel Dodge; Sarah Glidden; Andrew Mahoney; Kathleen McEldowney; Michael Moren; David Muelken; Michael Muench; Anna Ogden-Nussbaum; Eva Prokop; Rebecca Vaughn; Jacquelyn Vendetti. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,, served. Francesco Belluscio served on 9/6/2007, answer due 9/26/2007. Service was accepted by P.O. Francesco Belluscio. Document filed by Craig Weltha; Adam Bunn; Paisley Davidson; Daniel Wood; Luke Meyer; India D'Arthenay-Adams; Steven Phillips; Tila Duhaime; Joshua Haglund; Lindsay Ryan; Paul Bekavac; Juliette Consigny; Jessica Partnow; Joel Dodge; Sarah Glidden; Andrew Mahoney; Kathleen McEldowney; Michael Moren; David Muelken; Michael Muench; Anna Ogden-Nussbaum; Eva Prokop; Rebecca Vaughn; Jacquelyn Vendetti. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas' White Plains Docket. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(fk) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,, served. Thomas Galati served on 8/31/2007, answer due 9/20/2007. Service was accepted by P.O. Beplat. Document filed by Craig Weltha; Adam Bunn; Paisley Davidson; Daniel Wood; Luke Meyer; India D'Arthenay-Adams; Steven Phillips; Tila Duhaime; Joshua Haglund; Lindsay Ryan; Paul Bekavac; Juliette Consigny; Jessica Partnow; Joel Dodge; Sarah Glidden; Andrew Mahoney; Kathleen McEldowney; Michael Moren; David Muelken; Michael Muench; Anna Ogden-Nussbaum; Eva Prokop; Rebecca Vaughn; Jacquelyn Vendetti. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 09/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,, served. John Colgan served on 8/31/2007, answer due 9/20/2007. Service was accepted by Det. Gloria Felix. Document filed by Craig Weltha; Adam Bunn; Paisley Davidson; Daniel Wood; Luke Meyer; India D'Arthenay-Adams; Steven Phillips; Tila Duhaime; Joshua Haglund; Lindsay Ryan; Paul Bekavac; Juliette Consigny; Jessica Partnow; Joel Dodge; Sarah Glidden; Andrew Mahoney; Kathleen McEldowney; Michael Moren; David Muelken; Michael Muench; Anna Ogden-Nussbaum; Eva Prokop; Rebecca Vaughn; Jacquelyn Vendetti. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,, served. Raymond Kelly served on 8/31/2007, answer due 9/20/2007; Joseph Esposito served on 8/31/2007, answer due 9/20/2007; Nicholas Estavillo served on 8/31/2007, answer due 9/20/2007. Service was accepted by Lt. Daniel Albano. Document filed by Craig Weltha; Adam Bunn; Paisley Davidson; Daniel Wood; Luke Meyer; India D'Arthenay-Adams; Steven Phillips; Tila Duhaime; Joshua Haglund; Lindsay Ryan; Paul Bekavac; Juliette Consigny; Jessica Partnow; Joel Dodge; Sarah Glidden; Andrew Mahoney; Kathleen McEldowney; Michael Moren; David Muelken; Michael Muench; Anna Ogden-Nussbaum; Eva Prokop; Rebecca Vaughn; Jacquelyn Vendetti. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,, served. Michael Bloomberg served on 8/31/2007, answer due 9/20/2007. Service was accepted by Madelyn Santana. Document filed by Craig Weltha; Adam Bunn; Paisley Davidson; Daniel Wood; Luke Meyer; India D'Arthenay-Adams; Steven Phillips; Tila Duhaime; Joshua Haglund; Lindsay Ryan; Paul Bekavac; Juliette Consigny; Jessica Partnow; Joel Dodge; Sarah Glidden; Andrew Mahoney; Kathleen McEldowney; Michael Moren; David Muelken; Michael Muench; Anna Ogden-Nussbaum; Eva Prokop; Rebecca Vaughn; Jacquelyn Vendetti. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis, IV from Raju Sundaran dated 7/25/07 re: defendants request the production of documentation as further set forth in said Order applying to all cases listed in the heading of this letter. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs in these cases shall provide complete discovery responses by 9/17/07. Answer to Interrogatories due by 9/17/2007. All Discovery Responses due by 9/17/2007. Response to Request to Production of Documents due by 9/17/2007. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 8/24/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al. (SEE LETTER RE:)(db) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Amend/Correct 54 Amended Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by Craig Weltha, Adam Bunn, Paisley Davidson, Daniel Wood, Luke Meyer, India D'Arthenay-Adams, Steven Phillips, Tila Duhaime, Joshua Haglund, Lindsay Ryan, Paul Bekavac, Juliette Consigny, Jessica Partnow, Joel Dodge, Sarah Glidden, Andrew Mahoney, Kathleen McEldowney, Michael Moren, David Muelken, Michael Muench, Anna Ogden-Nussbaum, Eva Prokop, Rebecca Vaughn, Jacquelyn Vendetti. (Attachments: # 1 letter-brief in support of motion# 2 proposed amended complaint)(Weber, Rose) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 16 Amended Complaint, against Francesco Belluscio, Robert Hamer, Mark Vazquez, Linda Araque, Christopher Krutys, Brian Martin, Jacqueline DeCarlo, Thomas McDonnell, Ebony Huntley, John Martinez, Michael Bloomberg, Raymond Kelly, Joseph Esposito, Nicholas Estavillo, Bruce Smolka, Thomas Purtell, John Colgan, Patrick Devlin, Thomas Graham, Terence Monahan, Thomas Galati, Gerald Dieckmann, John and Jane Doe, Neil Stumpf, The City of New York, John Fong, Bart Pipcinski, Timothy Spies, Mark Steiner, The Hudson River Park Trust. Document filed by Adam Bunn, Paisley Davidson, Daniel Wood, Luke Meyer, India D'Arthenay-Adams, Steven Phillips, Tila Duhaime, Joshua Haglund, Craig Weltha, Lindsay Ryan, Paul Bekavac, Juliette Consigny, Jessica Partnow, Joel Dodge, Sarah Glidden, Andrew Mahoney, Kathleen McEldowney, Michael Moren, David Muelken, Michael Muench, Anna Ogden-Nussbaum, Eva Prokop, Rebecca Vaughn, Jacquelyn Vendetti. Related document: 16 Amended Complaint, filed by David Muelken, Juliette Consigny, Jessica Partnow, Craig Weltha, Michael Muench, Jacquelyn Vendetti, Lindsay Ryan, Sarah Glidden, Joel Dodge, Rebecca Vaughn, Eva Prokop, Andrew Mahoney, Kathleen McEldowney, Paul Bekavac, Michael Moren, Anna Ogden-Nussbaum. (jco) (Entered: 08/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Alan Levine dated 8/3/07 re: a request for an order in advance of the depositions scheduled for the week of 8/13/2007 that the memo books be produced at those and other NYPD depositions. ENDORSEMENT: Non-arresting officer witnesses shall bring the relevant memo books to their depositions and defendants shall use their best efforts to produce copies one week in advance of each deposition. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 8/8/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(kco) (Entered: 08/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER; regarding the Court Issued Memorandum and Order requiring the dft's to produce certain documents as to which they had asserted the law enforcement privilege, it is hereby ordered as follows: 1. The order shall be stayed for ten days to permit the parties to submit any objections pursuant to Rule 72(a) of the F.R.C.P. 2. The stay shall not apply to hose documents that the defendants had agreed to produce in redacted form (except for those listed in footnote 18 of the Order, as to which I have directed that the redactions be modified) (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 8/6/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(pl) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Cheryl L. Shammas dated 7/24/2007 re: request protective order pursuant to FRCP 26(c), barring the deposition of: (1) Stephen Hammerman, Esq., former Deputy Commissioner of Legal Matters (2) three other members of the NYPD Legal Bureau whose depositions have been noticed by various plts. ENDORSEMENT: Application denied. At least some of these deponents had direct involvement in audits in ways that would not implicate any privilege. For example, Mr. Hammerman is alleged to have participated directly in plt Kyne's audit. Moreover, plts are entitled to test the assertion of the atty-client privilege, particularly in light of the disturbing testimony by Sergeant Cai. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 7/31/2007) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(jar) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Rose M. Weber dated 7/19/07 re: Plaintiffs write, with defendants consent, to request permission to file Third Amended Complaints in the above referenced action. Defendants request with plaintiffs consent, that they be given permission to file and serve an amended answer in each case (with all available defenses and affirmative defenses) within 20 days after the last newly-added defendant has been served. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 7/30/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(js) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER; Depositions shall be conducted in accordance with the schedule set forth in the Appendix to this order. Counsel may deviate from that schedule only upon written stipulation or further order of the Court. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 7/5/07) (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 7/5/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(djc) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that defense witnesses scheduled to be deposed on dates on or after 6/19/07...shal appear on the dates indicated in those letters. Counsel shall have until 6/29/07 to agree on specific deposition dates for any other defense witnesses identified by then and for all plaintiffs. The agreed upon dates shall not extend beyond 11/16/07, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 6/15/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al. copies sent by chambers.(cd) (Entered: 06/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Counsel in the consolidated RNC cases having failed to cooperate in the scheduling of depositions as anticipated by Discovery Order #2, it is hereby ordered as follows: The defense witnesses scheduled to be deposed on dates on or after June 19, 2007 as set forth in the letters of Jeffrey A. Rothman dated May 14, 2007, Michael L. Spiegel dated May 23, 2007, and Jonathan Moore and Clare Norins dated June 7, 2007 shall appear on the dates indicated in those letters. Counsel shall have until June 29, 2007 to agree on specific deposition dates for any other defense witnesses identified by then and for all plaintiffs. the agreed upon dates shall not extend beyond November 16, 2007. After June 29, 2007, no additional fact witnesses shall be noticed for deposition absent: (a) agreement of the parties or (b) a showing that the witness could not reasonably have been identified prior to that date. On July 2, 2007, counsel for each party noticing depositions shall provide a letter to the Court listing all dates agreed upon pursuant to paragraph 2 of this order, which letters shall be "So Ordered." On July 2, 2007, counsel for each party noticing depositions shall also provide a separate letter identifying all witnesses for whom no date has been agreed upon. i will then schedule all such depositions. That schedule shall, by necessity, be arbitrary and inflexible. Following the pretrial conference scheduled for June 29, 2007, counsel may utilize my Courtroom to discuss the master deposition schedule among themselves. This order applies to all RNC cases consolidated for discovery. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 6/15/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF, 1:04-cv-09216-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07623-KMK-JCF Copies Mailed By Chambers (js) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re letters concerning disputes over the depositions of David Norcorss and William Harris: defts' request that the depositions of Mr. Norcorss and Mr. Harris be conducted at the deponents' respective places of business is denied, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 5/25/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al. copies sent by chambers.(cd) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Liora Jacobi dated 5/15/07 re: counsel for dfts request that any disclosure and use of the documents set forth herein be subject to an "attorneys eyes only" protective order. application granted without prejudice to any future challenge to the designation. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 5/16/07) (dle) (Entered: 05/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CONSOLIDATED MANAGEMENT ORDER: All written Discovery due by 6/1/2007. All depositions due by 7/1/2007; All Fact Discovery due by 8/1/2007; Plts to identify Expert witness for trial and Disclosures contiplated by the federal rules due by 8/1/2007; Depositions of plts' trial experts due by 9/1/2007; Defts to identify Expert witness for trial and Disclosures contiplated by the federal rules due by 9/1/2007; Depositions of dfts' trial experts due by 10/1/2007; Responses to contention interrogatories and request to admit due by 11/1/2007; Counsel to meet for at least one hour to discuss settlement due by 11/15/2007. Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2007. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 5/10/2007) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(jar) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Charles Brooks on behalf of The City of New York, The Hudson River Park Trust (Brooks, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis, IV from Rose M. Webber dated 5/5/07 re: Application DENIED. Resubmit a schedule that provides for submissions of dispositive motions by 12/1/07. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 5/7/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(db) (Entered: 05/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from James Mirro dated 5/1/07 re: Application GRANTED. In addition, Ms. McNamara shall appear for deposition on 5/17/07. The delay in producing her treatment records does not warrant sanctions; defendants' cancellation of her previously scheduled deposition is not a waiver of their right to depose her. the deponents shall bring the clothing and footwear worn when they were arrested, regardless of its current condition. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 5/3/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(db) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Peter G. Farrell dated 5/4/07 re: Application GRANTED. I not however, that the decision issued today is no way based on Mr. Dunn's 5/3/07 letter. The City is still free to respond to that letter in connection with its application for sanctions in connection with the disclosure of (then) confidential documents. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 5/4/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(db) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER that defts may continue to produce arresting officer memo books in redacted form provided, however, that notations concerning duties related to the RNC are not redacted. Individualized verifications of discovery respones by arresting officers shall not be required. Disciplinary files of arresting officers shall be produced in ocnformity with my 12/2/05 order in Dudek v Cityof NY 04-10178. Charges of 'discourtesy" are not covered by that order. By 4/15/07 defts shall identify the drivers of the vehicles that transported the plntfs in the Coburn case. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 4/9/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al. copies sent by chambers.(cd) (Entered: 04/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Francis from Michael Spiegel dated 3/27/07 re 3/23/07 letter from Jeffrey Dougherty re defts' production of documents: based on the parties' representations, the DANY and DCJS documents previously in defts' possession should have been produced by now. Going forward, these documents shall be produced to plntfs on disc within two weeks of receipt by defts except under exceptional circumstances. Plntfs' application for costs and fees in connection with reopened depositions is denied without prejudice to renewal in connection with specific depositions. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 4/6/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(cd) (Entered: 04/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER that defts may continue to produce arresting officer memo books in unredacted form provided, however, that notiations concerning duties related to the RNC are not redacted. Individualized verifcations of discovery responses by arresting officers shall not be required. This issue, however, shall be revisited if it appears through deposition that the written discovery responses have been inaccurate. Disciplinary files of arresting officers shall be produced in conformity with my 12/2/05 order in Dudek v City of NY, 04-10178. Charges of "discourtesy" are not covered by that order. By 4/15/07 defts shall identify the drivers of the vehicles that transported the plntfs in the Coburn case. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 4/3/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al. copies sent by chambers.(cd) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Peter G. Farrell dated 1/10/07 re: Attorney for defendants request an order that the documents shall be subject to attorneys eyes only designation and shall be used in the litigation of the RNC cases consolidated before Your Honor. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 1/12/07) (js) (Entered: 01/16/2007)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-7922-KMK-JCF et al.(rag) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge James C. Francis IV from Curt P. Beck dated 1/18/07 re: that the parties have agreed to the following briefing schedule as follows:Dft's will file moving papers by 1/26/2007, NYCLU responses due by 2/14/2007, Dft's replies due by 2/23/2007. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 1/19/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(pl) (Entered: 01/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Jeffrey A. Dougherty dated 12/18/06 re: As an alternative to destroying the confidential records of a setting plaintiff at the time of settlement, defendants may return them to counsel for that plaintiff, to be maintained by that attorney until the completion of all RNC cases. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 12/21/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF,1:04-cv-09216-KMK-JCF,1:04-cv-10178-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01562-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01563-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01564-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01565-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01566-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01567-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01568-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01569-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01570-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01571-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01572-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01573-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01574-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-02910-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-02927-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-03478-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-03616-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-03705-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-04949-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05080-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05150-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-05152-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05268-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05528-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-06193-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-06780-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-06918-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07025-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07026-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07536-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07546-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07547-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07548-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07575-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07577-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07579-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07580-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07623-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07624-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07625-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07626-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07670-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07673-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-09974-KMK-JCF(db, ) (Entered: 12/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: re: Missing Documents - if the defendants are unable to produce a specific document of a type which they have agreed to produce, or have been ordered to produce, counsel for defendants shall provide a written sattement concerning the inability to produce the document ("statement"). The statement shall set forth the details further elaborated in this order as items 1-4. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 12/21/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF,1:04-cv-8453-KMK-JCF,1:04-cv-09216-KMK-JCF,1:04-cv-10178-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01562-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01563-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01564-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01565-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01566-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01567-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01568-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01569-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01570-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01571-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01572-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01573-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01574-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-02910-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-02927-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-03478-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-03616-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-03705-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-04949-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05080-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-05150-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05152-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05268-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05528-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-06193-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-06780-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-06918-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07025-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07026-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07536-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07546-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07547-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07548-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07575-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07577-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07579-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07580-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07623-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07624-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07625-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07626-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07670-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07673-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-09974-KMK-JCF(db, ) (Entered: 12/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DISCOVERY ORDER #2: It is hereby ordered as follows: counsel for any party seeking to take a deposition may serve a notice on counsel for the party to be deposed at any time in advance of the deadline for doing so as set forth in the case management order governing each individual action. All other rulings as set forth in this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 11/13/2006) Copies Mailed By Chambers (lb, ) (Entered: 11/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 10/20/2006) (lb, ) (Entered: 10/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Emails produced by defendants shall be provided to all RNC plaintiffs as Bates Stamped tiff images on CD-ROM disccs. The emails on shall be labeled to corrsponed to the Bates Numbers of the tiff images contained therein. The tiff images shall contain the following feilds: subject line, from,to, date,and time, where applicable. Plaintiffs shall produce emails in the manner described in paragraphs 1-3 above or as printed hard copy documents containing the same fields set forth in paragraph 3 above. Neither party is required to produce compardin emails meaning that the parties shall produce a single copy of an email to respresent both the sent and received emails. The parties shall provide an email production index which shall list the email's Bates Number, subject line, to field, from field, and the date/time fields. All email addresses produced by the parties shall be kept confidential and shall be restricted to attorney's eyes only and the staff of their respective offices. This Order shall govern all Consolidated RNC Actions, which are individually listed in Appendix A, and any further actons filed by sny of the current RNC plaintiff's Counsel. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 10/10/2006) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF,1:04-cv-09216-KMK-JCF,1:04-cv-10178-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01562-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01563-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01564-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01565-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01566-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01567-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01568-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01569-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01570-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01571-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01572-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01573-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01574-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-02910-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-02927-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-03478-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-03616-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-03705-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-04949-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05080-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05150-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-05152-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05268-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05528-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-06193-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-06780-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-06918-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07025-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07026-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07536-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07546-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07547-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07548-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07575-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07577-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07579-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07580-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07623-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07624-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07625-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07626-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07670-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07673-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-09974-KMK-JCF(jmi, ) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by The City of New York, The Hudson River Park Trust.(Weiler, Fred) (Entered: 10/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Fred M. Weiler dated 8/1/2006 re: to request that the City and HRPT's time to answer or otherwise respond to each complaint be extended to and including October 6, 2006., The Hudson River Park Trust answer due 10/6/2006; The City of New York answer due 10/6/2006. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 8/1/2006) (jmi, ) (Entered: 08/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPINION AND ORDER; defendants' Motions to Dismiss are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The state law claims asserted by Plaintiffs Jonathon Lorusso, Andrew Lynn, Juliette Consigny, Sarah Glidden, Michael Jordan, Jay Hardesty, Benjamin Kappel, Laney Barber, Phillip Ellmann, Andre Lebet, Joshua Pelzek, and Valerie Kaur Brar, and any other Plaintiffs who have not filed Notices of Claim as of the date of this Order, are DISMISSED without prejudice. The state law claims against all individually named Defendants are also DISMISSED without prejudice. The remaining state law claims against the Hudson River Park Trust and the municipal Defendants are permitted to go forward. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the Motions (05cv1562 doc #24; 05cv1563 doc #19, 05cv1564 doc #20, 05cv1565 doc #20, 05cv1566 doc #19, 05cv1567 doc # 18-19, 05cv1568 doc #20, 05cv1569 doc #19, 05cv1570 doc #19, 05cv1571 doc #19, 05cv1572 doc #20, 05cv1573 doc #20, 05cv1574 doc #14,17,18) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 7/21/06) (kco, ) (Entered: 07/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER; Oral Argument set for 7/18/2006 at 10:30 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/17/06) (sac, ) (Entered: 05/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Jay A. Kranis in Support re: 20 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Weiss, Jed) (Entered: 03/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 20 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by The City of New York. (Weiss, Jed) (Entered: 03/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 20 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Craig Weltha, Lindsay Ryan, Paul Bekavac, Juliette Consigny, Jessica Partnow, Sarah Glidden, Andrew Mahoney, Kathleen McEldowney, Michael Moren, David Muelken, Michael Muench, Anna Ogden-Nussbaum, Eva Prokop, Rebecca Vaughn, Jacquelyn Vendetti. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 03/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 20 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Weiss, Jed) (Entered: 02/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by The City of New York. Responses due by 1/9/2006 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Weiss, Jed) (Entered: 02/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - WRONG DOCUMENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Dismiss (MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION). Document filed by The City of New York. Responses due by 1/9/2006 (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Weiss, Jed) Modified on 2/2/2006 (kg). (Entered: 12/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - WRONG DOCUMENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Motion. Document filed by The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Weiss, Jed) Modified on 2/2/2006 (kg). (Entered: 12/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Fred Michael Weiler on behalf of The City of New York (Weiler, Fred) (Entered: 12/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 7 Amended Complaint,, against Neil Stumpf, The City of New York, John Belluscio, John Fong, John Hamer, Bart Pipcinski, Timothy Spies, Mark Steiner, The Hudson River Park Trust, John and Jane Does 1-50(individually).Document filed by Craig Weltha, Lindsay Ryan, Paul Bekavac, Juliette Consigny, Jessica Partnow, Joel Dodge, Sarah Glidden, Andrew Mahoney, Kathleen McEldowney, Michael Moren, David Muelken, Michael Muench, Anna Ogden-Nussbaum, Eva Prokop, Rebecca Vaughn, Jacquelyn Vendetti. Related document: 7 Amended Complaint, filed by Rebecca Vaughn, Lindsay Ryan, Jessica Partnow, Paul Bekavac, Juliette Consigny, Joel Dodge, Sarah Glidden, Andrew Mahoney, Kathleen McEldowney, Michael Moren, David Muelken, Michael Muench, Anna Ogden-Nussbaum, Eva Prokop, Jacquelyn Vendetti.(jco, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2005 (jco, ). (Entered: 11/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Alan Kranis on behalf of The City of New York (Kranis, Jay) (Entered: 11/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 12 Motion to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, granting 13 Motion to Amend/Correct . Plaintiffs' motion is granted, and they shall be permitted to serve and file the second amended complaints forthwith. So Ordered.(Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 11/22/05) (jco, ) (Entered: 11/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DISCOVERY ORDER #1: regarding procedures to be followed during this actions discovery procedures and deadlines. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 10/3/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-09216-KMK-JCF,1:04-cv-10178-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01562-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01563-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01564-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01565-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01566-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01567-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01568-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01569-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01570-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01571-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01572-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01573-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01574-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-02910-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-02927-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-03616-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-03705-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-04949-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-05080-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05150-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05152-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05268-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-05528-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-06193-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-06780-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07025-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07026-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07536-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07546-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07547-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07548-KMK-JCF(db, ) (Entered: 11/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 10/4/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF,1:04-cv-09216-KMK-JCF,1:04-cv-10178-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01562-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01563-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01564-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01565-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01566-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01567-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01568-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01569-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01570-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01571-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01572-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01573-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01574-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-02910-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-02927-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-03478-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-03616-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-03705-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-04949-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05080-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05150-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-05152-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05268-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05528-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-06193-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-06780-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-06918-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07025-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07026-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07536-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07546-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07547-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07548-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07577-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07579-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07580-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07623-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07624-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07625-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07626-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07670-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07673-KMK-JCF(jco, ) (Entered: 11/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. The Hudson River Park Trust served on 11/2/2005, answer due 11/22/2005. Service was accepted by Noreen Doyle. Document filed by Lindsay Ryan; Paul Bekavac; Juliette Consigny; Jessica Partnow; Joel Dodge; Sarah Glidden; Andrew Mahoney; Kathleen McEldowney; Michael Moren; David Muelken; Michael Muench; Anna Ogden-Nussbaum; Eva Prokop; Rebecca Vaughn; Jacquelyn Vendetti. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 11/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. The City of New York served on 11/2/2005, answer due 11/22/2005. Service was accepted by Rawle Delisle. Document filed by Lindsay Ryan; Paul Bekavac; Juliette Consigny; Jessica Partnow; Joel Dodge; Sarah Glidden; Andrew Mahoney; Kathleen McEldowney; Michael Moren; David Muelken; Michael Muench; Anna Ogden-Nussbaum; Eva Prokop; Rebecca Vaughn; Jacquelyn Vendetti. (Weber, Rose) (Entered: 11/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute - Discovery Disputes Only. Referred to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis. Original document filed in 04cv7922, document # 36. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/28/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-09216-KMK-JCF,1:04-cv-10178-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01562-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01563-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01564-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01565-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01566-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01567-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01568-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01569-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01570-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01571-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01572-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01573-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01574-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-02910-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-02927-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-03478-KMK-MDF,1:05-cv-03616-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-03705-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-04949-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05080-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05150-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05152-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-05268-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05528-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-06193-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-06780-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-06918-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07025-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07026-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07536-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07546-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07547-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07548-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07577-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07579-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07580-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07623-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07624-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07625-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07626-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07670-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07673-KMK-JCF(db, ) (Entered: 10/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER; this action 04cv7922 (Lead Case) is consolidated with 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF,1:04-cv-09216-KMK,1:04-cv-10178-KMK,1:05-cv-01562-KMK,1:05-cv-01563-KMK, 1:05-cv-01564-KMK,1:05-cv-01565-KMK,1:05-cv-01566-KMK,1:05-cv-01567-KMK,1:05-cv-01568-KMK, 1:05-cv-01569-KMK,1:05-cv-01570-KMK,1:05-cv-01571-KMK,1:05-cv-01572-KMK,1:05-cv-01573-KMK, 1:05-cv-01574-KMK,1:05-cv-02910-KMK,1:05-cv-02927-KMK,1:05-cv-03616-KMK,1:05-cv-03705-KMK, 1:05-cv-04949-KMK,1:05-cv-05080-KMK,1:05-cv-05150-KMK,1:05-cv-05152-KMK,1:05-cv-05268-KMK, 1:05-cv-05528-KMK,1:05-cv-06193-KMK,1:05-cv-06780-KMK,1:05-cv-06918-KMK,1:05-cv-07025-KMK, 1:05-cv-07026-KMK,1:05-cv-07536-KMK,1:05-cv-07546-KMK,1:05-cv-07547-KMK,1:05-cv-07548-KMK, 1:05-cv-07577-KMK,1:05-cv-07579-KMK,1:05-cv-07580-KMK,1:05-cv-07623-KMK,1:05-cv-07624-KMK, 1:05-cv-07625-KMK,1:05-cv-07626-KMK,1:05-cv-07670-KMK,1:05-cv-07673-KMK(Member Cases) for discovery purposes and any other case that is pending or will be filed before the undersigned and which is designated as related to the protest and arrest activity at the 2004 Republican National Convention in New York City. This caption will be the master file. These consolidated cases are referred to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis for discovery purposes. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/20/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF,1:04-cv-09216-KMK,1:04-cv-10178-KMK,1:05-cv-01562-KMK,1:05-cv-01563-KMK, 1:05-cv-01564-KMK,1:05-cv-01565-KMK,1:05-cv-01566-KMK,1:05-cv-01567-KMK,1:05-cv-01568-KMK, 1:05-cv-01569-KMK,1:05-cv-01570-KMK,1:05-cv-01571-KMK,1:05-cv-01572-KMK,1:05-cv-01573-KMK, 1:05-cv-01574-KMK,1:05-cv-02910-KMK,1:05-cv-02927-KMK,1:05-cv-03616-KMK,1:05-cv-03705-KMK, 1:05-cv-04949-KMK,1:05-cv-05080-KMK,1:05-cv-05150-KMK,1:05-cv-05152-KMK,1:05-cv-05268-KMK, 1:05-cv-05528-KMK,1:05-cv-06193-KMK,1:05-cv-06780-KMK,1:05-cv-06918-KMK,1:05-cv-07025-KMK, 1:05-cv-07026-KMK,1:05-cv-07536-KMK,1:05-cv-07546-KMK,1:05-cv-07547-KMK,1:05-cv-07548-KMK, 1:05-cv-07577-KMK,1:05-cv-07579-KMK,1:05-cv-07580-KMK,1:05-cv-07623-KMK,1:05-cv-07624-KMK, 1:05-cv-07625-KMK,1:05-cv-07626-KMK,1:05-cv-07670-KMK,1:05-cv-07673-KMK(sac, ) (Entered: 09/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against John Belluscio, John Fong, John Hamer, Bart Pipcinski, Timothy Spies, Mark Steiner, The Hudson River Park Trust, The City of New York, John and Jane Does 1-50(individually), John and Jane Does 1-50(in their official capacities, (the names John and Jane Doe being fictitious, as the true names are presently unknown)).Document filed by Paul Bekavac, Juliette Consigny, Joel Dodge, Sarah Glidden, Andrew Mahoney, Kathleen McEldowney, Michael Moren, David Muelken, Michael Muench, Anna Ogden-Nussbaum, Eva Prokop, Rebecca Vaughn, Jacquelyn Vendetti, Lindsay Ryan, Jessica Partnow. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Lindsay Ryan,, Jessica Partnow,.(lb, ) (Entered: 08/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: letter mailed to all counsel by Judge Kenneth M. Karas regarding joint letters to be filed that shall include the criteria numbered 1-7 on said Order. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/31/05) (db, ) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/14/2005 at 4:00 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/30/05) (sac, ) (Entered: 04/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: the 3/10/05 conference at 10:00 a.m. is cancelled. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/8/05) (db, ) (Entered: 03/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/10/2005 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 2/24/05) (kw, ) (Entered: 03/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (gf, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2005 (gf, ). (Entered: 02/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against The City of New York, John and Jane Does 1-50, John and Jane Does 1-50. (Filing Fee $ 150.00, Receipt Number 533700)Document filed by Lindsay Ryan, Jessica Partnow.(rdi, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2005 (jeh, ). (Entered: 02/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 292 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?