Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC v. Bernier et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-00916-MEH-NYW
District Judge Michael E. Hegarty, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 27, 2019 at 9:24 PM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew C. Arentsen +1 303 223 1152 +1 303 223 0952 marentsen@bhfs.com
Space Lisa A. Hogan +1 303 223 1185 +1 303 223 1111 lhogan@bhfs.com
Space Mitchell J. Langberg +1 702 382 2101 +1 702 382 8135 mlangberg@bhfs.com
v.
No Logo Charles McMillin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fairfield & Woods, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John 'Jack' Markham Tanner +1 303 830 2400 +1 303 830 1033 jtanner@fwlaw.com
No Logo Fitness Opportunities Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fairfield & Woods, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John 'Jack' Markham Tanner +1 303 830 2400 +1 303 830 1033 jtanner@fwlaw.com
No Logo Gregory Mack, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fairfield & Woods, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John 'Jack' Markham Tanner +1 303 830 2400 +1 303 830 1033 jtanner@fwlaw.com
No Logo Jacques Henri Taylor, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fairfield & Woods, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John 'Jack' Markham Tanner +1 303 830 2400 +1 303 830 1033 jtanner@fwlaw.com
No Logo Kevin Dunn, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fairfield & Woods, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John 'Jack' Markham Tanner +1 303 830 2400 +1 303 830 1033 jtanner@fwlaw.com
No Logo Matthew Bernier, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wessels & Arsenault, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Allan Arsenault +1 303 459 7898 +1 888 317 8582 john.arsenault@frontrangelegalservices.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Office Denver
Filed 4/22/2016
Jury Demand None
Demand
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Denver
Terminated 4/3/2018
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case 2016cv31084[Denver County District Court]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CONMAG,MJ CIV PP,STLMT,TERMED
  Entries (117) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 clerk's judgment
FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk on 4/3/18. (rkeec)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 Settlement Agreement
    SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Defendant Matthew Bernier. (tsher, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
      ORDER on [114] Joint Motion for Approval, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/3/2018. The Court enters the Settlement Agreement (ECF No. 114-1) as an Order of the Court and, by operation of this entry of final judgment, the Court dismisses this action with prejudice as to all claims and all remaining Parties. (tsher, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: 3/29/2018, Terminated: 4/3/2018 Motion for order
        Joint MOTION for Order to For Approval of Settlement Agreement as Stipulated Final Judgment by Counter Claimant Matthew Bernier. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Arsenault, John)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 Order on Motion to dismiss partyCourt Filing
          ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE granting [111] Joint Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims Between MAT and Mack, Dunn, Taylor, McMillin, and Fitness Opportunities, Inc. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/28/2018. The Clerk of the Court is directed to remove Defendants Mack, Dunn,Taylor, McMillin, and Fitness Opportunities, Inc. from the case caption. (mdave, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: 3/27/2018 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
            COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 3/27/2018. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: 3/27/2018, Terminated: 3/28/2018 Motion to dismiss party
              Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Mack, Dunn, Taylor, McMillin and Fitness Opportunities Inc d/b/a Physicians Fitness by Plaintiff Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Langberg, Mitchell)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 110 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: 3/27/2018 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/27/2018. A Telephone Status Conference set for 3/27/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All parties shall conference together and call Chambers at 303-844-4507 at the scheduled time. (mdave, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: 3/21/2018 Order on Motion for JudgmentCourt Filing
                  MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice [108] Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement as Stipulated Final Judgment by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/21/2018. (mdave, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018, Terminated: 3/21/2018 ~Motion for Judgment
                    Joint MOTION for Judgment by Defendant Matthew Bernier. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Arsenault, John)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
                      MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice [106] Joint MOTION for Order to /For Approval of Settlement Agreement as Stipulated Final Judgment (Joint with Defendant Matthew Bernier) by Plaintiff Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/16/2018. (mdave, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018, Terminated: 3/16/2018 Motion for order
                        Joint MOTION for Order to /For Approval of Settlement Agreement as Stipulated Final Judgment (Joint with Defendant Matthew Bernier) by Plaintiff Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- Agreement)(Arentsen, Matthew)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                          MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/09/2018. Dismissal Paper due by 3/26/2018. (mdave, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/8/2018 Status report
                            Joint STATUS REPORT Second Status Report re Settlement by Plaintiff Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC. (Arentsen, Matthew)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: 2/21/2018 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                              MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 02/21/2018. Dismissal Paper deadline is extended to 3/7/2018. (mdave, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 Status report
                                Joint STATUS REPORT re Settlement by Plaintiff Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC. (Arentsen, Matthew)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                  MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 01/17/2018. Dismissal Paper due by 2/20/2018. (mdave, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Notice of settlement
                                    NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) by Counter Claimants Kevin Dunn, Fitness Opportunities Inc., Gregory Mack, Charles McMillin, Jacques Henri Taylor, Defendants Kevin Dunn, Fitness Opportunities Inc., Gregory Mack, Charles McMillin, Jacques Henri Taylor (Tanner, Jack)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: 1/10/2018 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                      COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 1/10/2018. Parties will call Chambers on or before 1/17/2018 to advise them of the status of settlement negotiations and whether additional hearings will need to be set. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: 11/15/2017 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                        COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 11/15/2017. ORDERED that the STAY is lifted. Discovery due by 3/15/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 3/29/2018. Status Conference set for 1/10/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: 11/7/2017 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                          MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/07/2017. Status Conference set for 11/15/2017 03:30 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: 11/6/2017 Status report
                                            Joint STATUS REPORT by Counter Claimants Gregory Mack, Gregory Mack, Gregory Mack, Gregory Mack, Charles McMillin, Charles McMillin, Charles McMillin, Charles McMillin, Jacques Henri Taylor, Jacques Henri Taylor, Jacques Henri Taylor, Jacques Henri Taylor, Defendants Gregory Mack, Charles McMillin, Jacques Henri Taylor. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Tanner, Jack)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: 6/7/2017 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                              MINUTE ORDER granting [94] Joint Motion for a Limited Stay of Proceedings by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/07/2017. Status Report due by 11/6/2017. (mdave, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017, Terminated: 6/7/2017 Motion To Stay
                                                Joint MOTION to Stay ; Limited Stay of Proceedings (also filed on behalf of Defendants) by Plaintiff Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Letter, # (2) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Arentsen, Matthew)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/4/2017 discovery hearingCourt Filing
                                                  COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Discovery Hearing held on 5/4/2017. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                    MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 05/03/2017. Discovery Hearing set for 5/4/2017 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Counsel for the parties may appear by telephone by first teleconferencing together, then calling my chambers at (303) 844-4507 at the appointed time. (mdave, )
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: 4/12/2017 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/ModifyCourt Filing
                                                      MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/12/17 GRANTING [90] Fourth Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Paragraphs 8 and 9 of the operative Scheduling Order are amended. All other aspects of the Scheduling Order will remain in effect. (nmarb, )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017, Terminated: 4/12/2017 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                                                        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify [17] Scheduling Order [Fourth Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order] by Plaintiff Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC, Counter Defendant Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC. (Arentsen, Matthew)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017 Answer/Reply to Counterclaim
                                                          ANSWER/REPLY to [86] Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC.(Arentsen, Matthew)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: 3/9/2017 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/ModifyCourt Filing
                                                            MINUTE ORDER granting [87] the third Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Extend Certain Pretrial Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/09/2017. Discovery due by 6/6/2017. Initial expert designation due 4/11/2017. Rebuttal expert designation due 5/12/2017. (mdave, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: 3/8/2017, Terminated: 3/9/2017 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                                                              Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify [79] Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify, Scheduling Order to Extend Certain Pretrial Deadlines by Plaintiff Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC. (Arentsen, Matthew)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: 3/6/2017 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                SECOND AMENDED ANSWER AND AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM re [3] Complaint, by Defendants Gregory Mack, Kevin Dunn, Jacques Henri Taylor, Charles McMillin, and Fitness Opportunities Inc. d/b/a Physicians Fitness. (slibi, )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: 3/6/2017 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/ModifyCourt Filing
                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [83] Unopposed Motion to Amend Amended Answer and Amended Counterclaim, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/06/2017. Plaintiff shall file an answer or other response to the Second Amended Counterclaim in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a). (slibi, )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: 3/3/2017 Supplement/Amendment
                                                                    SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to [83] MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify [62] Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, to Indicate Plaintiff's Non-Opposition by Defendants Kevin Dunn, Fitness Opportunities Inc., Gregory Mack, Charles McMillin, Jacques Henri Taylor. (Hirsekorn, Courtney)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: 2/24/2017, Terminated: 3/6/2017 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify [62] Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Defendants Kevin Dunn, Fitness Opportunities Inc., Gregory Mack, Charles McMillin, Jacques Henri Taylor. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Second Amended Answer and Amended Counterclaim, # (2) Exhibit B - Redlined Second Amended Answer and Amended Counterclaim, # (3) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Tanner, John (Jack))
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: 1/18/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Hearing held on January 10, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-117. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Stevens-Koenig Reporting, )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: 1/10/2017 discovery hearingCourt Filing
                                                                          COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Discovery Hearing held on 1/10/2017. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: 12/22/2016 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            MINUTE ORDER Discovery Hearing set for 1/10/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/22/2016. (slibi, )
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: 12/9/2016 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/ModifyCourt Filing
                                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting [78] Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. Discovery due by 5/16/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 7/7/2017. Initial expert designation: 3/14/2017. Rebuttal expert designation: 4/14/2017. Serve written discovery request: 4/12/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set 6/7/2017 is vacated and rescheduled for 9/7/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/9/2016. (jgonz, )
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: 12/8/2016, Terminated: 12/9/2016 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                                                                                Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify [70] Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify, to Amend Scheduling Order to Extend Pretrial Deadlines by Defendants Matthew Bernier, Kevin Dunn, Fitness Opportunities Inc., Gregory Mack, Charles McMillin, Jacques Henri Taylor, Counter Claimants Matthew Bernier, Matthew Bernier, Matthew Bernier, Kevin Dunn, Kevin Dunn, Kevin Dunn, Fitness Opportunities Inc., Fitness Opportunities Inc., Fitness Opportunities Inc., Gregory Mack, Gregory Mack, Gregory Mack, Charles McMillin, Charles McMillin, Charles McMillin, Jacques Henri Taylor, Jacques Henri Taylor, Jacques Henri Taylor. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Hirsekorn, Courtney)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: 10/28/2016 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                  STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/28/2016. (mdave, )
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: 10/28/2016 Order on Motion for protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting [75] Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/28/2016.(mdave, )
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: 10/27/2016, Terminated: 10/28/2016 Motion for protective order
                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information by Plaintiff Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC, Counter Defendant Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Stipulated Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information)(Arentsen, Matthew)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016 settlement conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                        MINUTE ENTRY for Settlement Conference held on 10/19/2016 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. A settlement conference was held on this date. No settlement was reached. The Parties will submit an updated settlement status report directly to Magistrate Judge Wang no later than November 11, 2016. FTR: Courtroom C-204. (bwilk, )
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: 9/28/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing Day 2 held on July 14, 2016 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-78. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Stevens-Koenig Reporting, )
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: 9/28/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on July 13, 2016 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-405. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Attachments: # (1) Continuation of Main Document, # (2) Continuation of Main Document, # (3) Continuation of Main Document) (Stevens-Koenig Reporting, )
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: 9/27/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/27/16. A Settlement Conference is set for 10/19/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Counsel shall have parties present at the SettlementConference who have full authority to negotiate all terms and demands presented by the case, and full authority to enter into a settlement agreement. Counsel shall submit Confidential Statements by e-mail in PDF format addressed to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 10/12/2016. In addition, each Confidential Statement must contain a specific offer of compromise, including the dollar amount or range each client will accept or pay in settlement and any essential noneconomic terms. (bwilk, )
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: 9/27/2016 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/ModifyCourt Filing
                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting [69] Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Extend Pretrial Deadlines, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/27/2016. Discovery due by 2/14/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 4/3/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/03/2017 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 6/6/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (slibi, )
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: 9/26/2016, Terminated: 9/27/2016 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                                                                                                  Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify [17] Scheduling Order to Extend Pretrial Deadlines by Plaintiff Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC, Counter Defendant Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC. (Arentsen, Matthew)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 68 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER: pursuant to the [67] Case Reassignment for purposes of convening a settlement conference, counsel are instructed to jointly contact Chambers at 303.335.2600 on or before 9/30/2016 to discuss setting the settlement conference. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/22/2016. Text Only Entry (nywlc1)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 67 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Case ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                      CASE REASSIGNED. This case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for settlement purposes. All future pleadings should be designated as 16-cv-00916-MEH-NYW. (Text Only Entry) (slibi, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER re drawing this case to another Magistrate Judge for the purpose of setting a settlement conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/22/2016. (slibi, )
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: 8/22/2016 Answer/Reply to Counterclaim
                                                                                                          ANSWER/REPLY to [63] Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC.(Arentsen, Matthew)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: 8/19/2016 Answer/Reply to Counterclaim
                                                                                                            ANSWER/REPLY to [62] Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC.(Arentsen, Matthew)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: 8/8/2016 Answer
                                                                                                              AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC by Matthew Bernier. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H)(Arsenault, John)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: 8/2/2016 Answer
                                                                                                                Amended ANSWER to Complaint and, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Fitness Opportunities Inc., Charles McMillin, Gregory Mack, Kevin Dunn, Jacques Henri Taylor. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit G)(Hirsekorn, Courtney)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: 8/2/2016 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/ModifyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [56] Renewed Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaim; granting [57] Renewed Motion to Amend Answer and Counterclaim, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/02/2016.(slibi, )
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: 8/1/2016 Supplement/Amendment
                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to Renewed Motion to Amend Answer and Counterclaim by Defendants Kevin Dunn, Fitness Opportunities Inc., Gregory Mack, Charles McMillin, Jacques Henri Taylor. (Hirsekorn, Courtney)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/30/2016, Entered: 7/30/2016 Certificate of compliance
                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE re [58] Minute Order, [57] Renewed MOTION for Leave to Amend/Correct/Modify [9] Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Defendant Matthew Bernier. (Arsenault, John)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: 7/29/2016 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER re: [56] Renewed Motion to Amend Answer and Counterclaim by Defendants Mack, Dunn, Taylor, McMillin, and Fitness Opportunities, Inc. and [57] Defendant Matthew Berniers Renewed Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaim, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/29/2016. On or before August 2, 2016, the Defendants shall file supplements to their motions. (slibi, )
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: 7/28/2016, Terminated: 8/2/2016 Motion for leave
                                                                                                                          Renewed MOTION for Leave to Amend/Correct/Modify [9] Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Defendant Matthew Bernier. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Scheduling Order, # (2) Exhibit B - Amended Answer and Counterclaim, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit A for present Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit B for present Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit C for present Exhibit B, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit D for present Exhibit B, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit E for present Exhibit B, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit F for present Exhibit B, # (9) Exhibit Exhibit G for present Exhibit B, # (10) Exhibit Exhibit H for present Exhibit B, # (11) Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Allowing Amendment to Answer and Counterclaim)(Arsenault, John)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: 7/28/2016, Terminated: 8/2/2016 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                                                                                                                            Renewed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify [35] MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify [8] Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, by Defendants Kevin Dunn, Fitness Opportunities Inc., Gregory Mack, Charles McMillin, Jacques Henri Taylor. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Renewed Motion to Amend Answer and Counterclaim, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit A to Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit B to Exhibit 1, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit C to Exhibit 1, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit D to Exhibit 1, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit E to Exhibit 1, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit F to Exhibit 1, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit G to Exhibit 1, # (9) Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Renewed Motion to Amend Answer and Counterclaim, # (10) Exhibit Exhibit A to Exhibit 2, # (11) Exhibit Exhibit B to Exhibit 2, # (12) Exhibit Exhibit C to Exhibit 2, # (13) Exhibit Exhibit D to Exhibit 2, # (14) Exhibit Exhibit E to Exhibit 2, # (15) Exhibit Exhibit F to Exhibit 2, # (16) Exhibit Exhibit G to Exhibit 2, # (17) Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Allowing Amendment to Answer and Counterclaim)(Tanner, John (Jack))
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: 7/26/2016 Order on Motion for leaveCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice [34] Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaim; denying without prejudice [35] Motion to Amend Answer and Counterclaim by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 07/26/2016.(mdave, )
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: 7/19/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                Partial TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Ruling by the Court held on July 14, 2016 before Magistrate JudgeHegarty. Pages: 1-16. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Stevens-Koenig Reporting, )
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: denying [26] Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Motion Hearing held on 7/14/2016. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, ) Modified on 7/14/2016 to edit text(mdave, ).
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                    Exhibit List re: Motion Hearing re [26] Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (mdave, )
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                      Witness List re: Motion Hearing re [26] Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (mdave, )
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016 stipulation
                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS. It is stipulated that at the conclusion of the preliminary injunction hearing, counsel for the parties shall retain custody of their respective exhibits until such time as all need for the exhibits has terminated and the time to appeal has expired or all appellate proceedings have been terminated plus sixty days. (mdave, )
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motion Hearing held on 7/13/2016 regarding [26] Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing/closing arguments regarding [26] Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 7/14/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, )
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: 7/13/2016 Conventionally Submitted Material
                                                                                                                                            Conventionally Filed Exhibit to Plaintiff Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC's Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Text Only Entry (slibi, )
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: 7/12/2016 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                              Proposed Findings of Fact by Defendant Matthew Bernier. (Arsenault, John)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: 7/12/2016 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                                Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Plaintiff Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC. (Arentsen, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: 7/12/2016 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Defendants Kevin Dunn, Fitness Opportunities Inc., Gregory Mack, Charles McMillin, Jacques Henri Taylor. (Tanner, John (Jack))
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: 7/12/2016 Restricted Document - Level 1
                                                                                                                                                    RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Exhibits to [42] by Plaintiff Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits to Plaintiff Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction- Supplemental Declaration of Greg Roskopf, # (2) Exhibit 24 to Roskopf Supplemental Declaration, # (3) Exhibit 25 to Roskopf Supplemental Declaration, # (4) Exhibit 26 to Roskopf Supplemental Declaration, # (5) Exhibit 27 to Roskopf Supplemental Declaration, # (6) Exhibit 28 to Roskopf Supplemental Declaration, # (7) Exhibit 29 to Roskopf Supplemental Declaration, # (8) Exhibit 30 to Roskopf Supplemental Declaration, # (9) Exhibit 31 to Roskopf Supplemental Declaration, # (10) Exhibit 32 to Roskopf Supplemental Declaration, # (11) Exhibit 33 to Roskopf Supplemental Declaration, # (12) Exhibit 34 to Roskopf Supplemental Declaration, # (13) Conventionally Submitted Exhibit, # (14) Supplemental Declaration of Aaron Lakanen, # (15) Declaration of Thomas Pruvis, # (16) Declaration of Susan Schneider, # (17) Declaration of Eryn Leslie Paetz, # (18) Declaration of Robert Blaich, # (19) Attachment to Declaration of Robert Blaich)(Arentsen, Matthew) Modified on 7/14/2016 to edit text (slibi, ).
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in Support to [26] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC. Public entry for [42]. Text only entry. (slibi, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: 7/12/2016 Restricted Document - Level 1
                                                                                                                                                        RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiff Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC.. (Attachments: # (1) Plaintiff Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC's Reply In Support of Motion For Preliminary Injunction)(Arentsen, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: 7/11/2016 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting [39] Motion for Extension of Time to File Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 07/11/2016. The parties shall file proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law on or before 7/12/2016 at 12:00 p.m. (MST). (mdave, )
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: 7/11/2016 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                            Exhibits in Support of [37] Exhibits, [36] Response to Motion, Supplemental Exhibits C-1 and D-1 by Defendants Kevin Dunn, Fitness Opportunities Inc., Gregory Mack, Charles McMillin, Jacques Henri Taylor. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Tanner, John (Jack))
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: 7/11/2016, Terminated: 7/11/2016 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Plaintiff Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC. (Arentsen, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: 7/8/2016 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [26] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Matthew Bernier. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 2002 Employment Agreement, # (2) Exhibit 2005 Practitioner Agreement, # (3) Exhibit 2008 Amended and Restated Confidentiality and Services Agreement, # (4) Exhibit 2011 Confidentiality Agreement, # (5) Exhibit Declaration of Curtis Van Wyck, # (6) Exhibit Declaration of Matthew Bernier, # (7) Exhibit Declaration of Charlie McMillin, # (8) Exhibit Declaration of Jeff Jones, # (9) Exhibit Email from Susan Schneider)(Arsenault, John)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: 7/8/2016 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibits in Support of [36] Response to Motion, Exhibit C - Affidavit of Charles McMillin by Defendants Kevin Dunn, Gregory Mack, Charles McMillin, Jacques Henri Taylor. (Tanner, John (Jack))
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: 7/8/2016 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [26] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Kevin Dunn, Fitness Opportunities Inc., Gregory Mack, Charles McMillin, Jacques Henri Taylor. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Affidavit of Kevin Dunn, # (2) Exhibit B - Affidavit of Gregory Mack, # (3) Exhibit D - Affidavit of Jacques Henri Taylor, # (4) Exhibit E - Roskopf Excerpts, # (5) Exhibit F - Affidavit of Craig Meyers)(Tanner, John (Jack))
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: 6/30/2016, Terminated: 7/26/2016 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify [8] Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, by Defendants Kevin Dunn, Fitness Opportunities Inc., Gregory Mack, Charles McMillin, Jacques Henri Taylor. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Amended Answer and Amended Counterclaim, # (2) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Tanner, John (Jack))
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: 6/29/2016, Terminated: 7/26/2016 Motion for leave
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Amend by Defendant Matthew Bernier. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Scheduling Order, # (2) Exhibit B - Amended Answer and Counterclaim, # (3) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Arsenault, John)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: 6/28/2016 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER re: striking Amended Answer and Amended Counterclaim filed by Defendants Gregory Mack, Kevin Dunn, Jacques Henri Taylor, Charles McMillin and Fitness Opportunities Inc. d/b/a Physicians Fitness [31] and Defendant Matthew Berniers Amended Answer and Counterclaim [32], by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/28/2016. (slibi, )
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: 6/27/2016 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                            STRICKEN AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC by Plaintiff Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H)(Arsenault, John) Modified on 6/28/2016 to strike pursuant to [33] (slibi, ).
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: 6/27/2016 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                              STRICKEN AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint and, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC by Counter Defendants Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC, Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC, Plaintiff Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A - MAT Practioner Contract, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B - Confidentiality Contract, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit C - Patient Position Comparisons, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit D - MAT Muscle Test Chart, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit E - The Carpals Dorsal View, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit F - Extensor Hallucis Longus, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit G - Thumb Muscle Test)(Tanner, John (Jack)) Modified on 6/28/2016 to strike pursuant to [33] (slibi, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: 6/23/2016 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Allan Arsenault on behalf of Matthew Bernier (Arsenault, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: 6/22/2016 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel by Courtney Paige Hirsekorn on behalf of Kevin Dunn, Fitness Opportunities Inc., Gregory Mack, Charles McMillin, Jacques Henri TaylorAttorney Courtney Paige Hirsekorn added to party Kevin Dunn(pty:dft), Attorney Courtney Paige Hirsekorn added to party Fitness Opportunities Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Courtney Paige Hirsekorn added to party Gregory Mack(pty:dft), Attorney Courtney Paige Hirsekorn added to party Charles McMillin(pty:dft), Attorney Courtney Paige Hirsekorn added to party Jacques Henri Taylor(pty:dft) (Hirsekorn, Courtney)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: 6/21/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 6/21/2016. The deadline for a response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due by 7/8/2016. The reply is due by 7/11/2016. Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law are due by all parties by 7/11/2016. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to [26] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: 6/21/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER re: [26] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/21/2016. Status Conference set for 6/21/2016 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Counsel for the parties may appear by telephone by first teleconferencing together, then calling Chambers at (303) 844-4507 at the appointed time. (mdave, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: 6/20/2016, Terminated: 7/14/2016 Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order on Muscle Activation Techniques LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # (2) Declaration of Greg Roskopf, # (3) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 1, # (4) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 2, # (5) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 3, # (6) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 4, # (7) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 5, # (8) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 6, # (9) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 7, # (10) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 8, # (11) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 9, # (12) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 10, # (13) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 11, # (14) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 12A, # (15) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 12B, # (16) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 12C, # (17) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 13A, # (18) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 13B, # (19) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 13C, # (20) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 14, # (21) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 15, # (22) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 16, # (23) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 17, # (24) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 18, # (25) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 19, # (26) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 20, # (27) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 21, # (28) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 22, # (29) Roskopf Decl. Exh. 23, # (30) Declaration of Craig Cavey, # (31) Cavey Decl. Exh. A, # (32) Cavey Decl. Exh. B, # (33) Declaration of Patrick Douglas, # (34) Douglas Decl. Exh. A, # (35) Declaration of Andrew Fawcett, # (36) Fawcett Decl. Exh. A, # (37) Declaration of Susie Jelinek, # (38) Jelinek Decl. Exh. A, # (39) Jelinek Decl. Exh. B, # (40) Jelinek Decl. Exh. C, # (41) Jelinek Decl. Exh. D, # (42) Jelinek Decl. Exh. E, # (43) Declaration of Aaron Lakanen, # (44) Lakanen Decl. Exh. 1, # (45) Affidavit of James Patrick Murphy of Hanzo Archives, Inc., # (46) Affidavit of Mindy Myhre)(Arentsen, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: 5/31/2016 Answer/Reply to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER/REPLY to [9] Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, [Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant Matthew Bernier's Counterclaim] by Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC.(Arentsen, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: 5/31/2016 Answer/Reply to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER/REPLY to [8] Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, [Plaintiff's Answer to Defendants' Counterclaim] by Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC.(Arentsen, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: 5/23/2016 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint - Respond to Defendants' Counterclaims - by Counter Defendant Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC. Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC answer due 5/31/2016. (Arentsen, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: 5/20/2016 Order on Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: 5/19/2016 Order on Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [20] Stipulation by All Parties to Withdraw Jury Demands and Waive Their Rights to a Jury Trial, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/19/2016.(slibi, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: 5/18/2016, Terminated: 5/19/2016 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulated MOTION to Withdraw Jury Demands by All Parties and Waive Rights to a Jury Trial by Plaintiff Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC, Counter Defendant Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC. (Arentsen, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: 5/18/2016 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC, Counter Defendant Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC All parties consent.. (Arentsen, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: 5/18/2016 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Tanner, John (Jack))
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/13/2016 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 05/12/2016. Discovery due by 12/16/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 2/1/2017. (mdave, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016 scheduling conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 5/12/2016. Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 4/3/2017 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, ) (Main Document 16 replaced on 5/26/2016) (mdave, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: 5/10/2016 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lisa A. Hogan on behalf of Muscle Activation Techniques, LLCAttorney Lisa A. Hogan added to party Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC(pty:pla) (Hogan, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: 5/10/2016 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mitchell J. Langberg on behalf of Muscle Activation Techniques, LLCAttorney Mitchell J. Langberg added to party Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC(pty:pla) (Langberg, Mitchell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: 5/5/2016 Proposed Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Joint Discovery Plan)(Arentsen, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: 5/4/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER Consent Form due by 5/18/2016, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/03/2016. (slibi, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: 5/2/2016 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 05/02/2016. Scheduling Conference is reset for 5/12/2016 10:00 at AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: 5/2/2016 Notice of Noncompliance with Court Procedures/Rules
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re:[9] Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, : The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases). (Text Only Entry) (slibi, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: 4/29/2016 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to [3] Complaint Attorney John Allan Arsenault added to party Matthew Bernier(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC by Matthew Bernier. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H)(Arsenault, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: 4/29/2016 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to [3] Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC by Charles McMillin, Kevin Dunn, Gregory Mack, Fitness Opportunities Inc., Jacques Henri Taylor. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Practitioner Contract, # (2) Exhibit B - Confidentiality Agreement, # (3) Exhibit C - MAT Information, # (4) Exhibit D - MAT Information, # (5) Exhibit E - MAT Information, # (6) Exhibit F - MAT Information, # (7) Exhibit G - MAT Information)(Tanner, John (Jack))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/24/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/26/2016. (slibi, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: 4/25/2016 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew C. Arentsen on behalf of Muscle Activation Techniques, LLCAttorney Matthew C. Arentsen added to party Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC(pty:pla) (Arentsen, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: 4/25/2016 Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ATTORNEY(S) IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED OR OTHER CASES: Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 11.1(a), an attorney must be a member of the U.S. District Court's bar to make an appearance and receive notice in any case before the court. The attorney records of the court reflect that the following counsel is a member of the U.S. District Courts Bar, but has not entered an appearance in this case: MATTHEW C. ARENTSEN. In order to make an appearance in this case and receive any further notice regarding this case, counsel must file an entry of appearance in this case. Absent any Notice of Entry of Appearance filed, no further direct notices to counsel will be sent. Text only entry. (dbera, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: 4/25/2016 Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (dbera, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: 4/25/2016 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Matthew Bernier, Kevin Dunn, Fitness Opportunities Inc., Gregory Mack, Charles McMillin, Jacques Henri Taylor, filed by Muscle Activation Techniques, LLC.(dbera, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: 4/25/2016 Case Assigned to JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: 4/22/2016 notice of removal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Charles McMillin, Kevin Dunn, Gregory Mack, Fitness Opportunities Inc. d/b/a Physicians Fitness, Jacques Henri Taylor from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2016CV31084. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-4941234), filed by Charles McMillin, Kevin Dunn, Gregory Mack, Fitness Opportunities Inc. d/b/a Physicians Fitness, Jacques Henri Taylor. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - District Court Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Exhibit B - District Court Civil Summons for all Defendants, # (3) Exhibit C - Complaint, # (4) Exhibit D - Delay Reduction Order, # (5) Exhibit E - Verified Motion Requesting Pro Hac Vice Admission, # (6) Exhibit F - Pro Hac Vice from Atty Registration Office, # (7) Exhibit G - Proposed Order re: Pro Hac Admission, # (8) Civil Cover Sheet, # (9) Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Tanner, John (Jack))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 3,645 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?