Madison Oslin, Inc. v. Interstate Resources, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 16-1434

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 23, 2017 at 11:14 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None
BRIEF by Appellants Madison Oslin Research, Inc. and Madison Oslin, Inc. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: REPLY. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 07/20/2016. [999892114] [16-1434] Perry Yancey
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None
    BRIEF by Appellees John Cristos, Interstate Corrpack, LLC, Interstate Resources, Inc. and James Morgan in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 07/05/2016. [999878767] [16-1434] Gail Westover
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None
      FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellants Madison Oslin Research, Inc. and Madison Oslin, Inc.. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 06/01/2016. [999838307] [16-1434] Perry Yancey
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 16 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None
        BRIEF by Appellants Madison Oslin Research, Inc. and Madison Oslin, Inc. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 06/01/2016. [999838294] [16-1434] Perry Yancey
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Madison Oslin Research, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999810493] [16-1434] Perry Yancey
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
            DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Madison Oslin, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999810492] [16-1434] Perry Yancey
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by James M. Terrell for Madison Oslin Research, Inc. and Madison Oslin, Inc..[999810488] [16-1434] Perry Yancey
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Rodney E. Miller for Madison Oslin Research, Inc. and Madison Oslin, Inc..[999810487] [16-1434] Perry Yancey
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by P. Michael Yancey for Madison Oslin Research, Inc. and Madison Oslin, Inc..[999810484] [16-1434] Perry Yancey
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                    DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants Madison Oslin Research, Inc. and Madison Oslin, Inc.. [16-1434] Perry Yancey
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None
                      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee James Morgan. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999805445] [16-1434] Gail Westover
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None
                        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Interstate Resources, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999805444] [16-1434] Gail Westover
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None
                          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Interstate Corrpack, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999805443] [16-1434] Gail Westover
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None
                            DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee John Cristos. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999805442] [16-1434] Gail Westover
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None
                              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Kristine M. Ellison for John Cristos, Interstate Corrpack, LLC, Interstate Resources, Inc. and James Morgan.[999805441] [16-1434] Gail Westover
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None
                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Gail L. Westover for John Cristos, Interstate Corrpack, LLC, Interstate Resources, Inc. and James Morgan.[999805440] [16-1434] Gail Westover
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None
                                  BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/31/2016. Response Brief due 07/05/2016. [16-1434] (ALC)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None
                                    DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed. Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-03041-MJG. [16-1434] (ALC)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None
                                      Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-03041-MJG. Case manager: ACarlheim. [16-1434] (ALC)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 120 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?