Meridian Investments, Inc. v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 16-1384

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 30, 2017 at 5:42 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2190 - Contract: Other Contract Action
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Mandate issued. Referencing: [53] Judgment Order , [52] Published Authored Opinion. Originating case number: 1:15-cv-01463-JCC-TCB.. [16-1384] (TF)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method: 16-1384 opn.p.arg. Decision: Affirmed. Originating case number: 1:15-cv-01463-JCC-TCB. Entered on Docket Date: 04/28/2017. [1000071558] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency.. [16-1384] (TF)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 1:15-cv-01463-JCC-TCB. [1000071554]. [16-1384] (TF)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellant Meridian Investments, Inc.. Counsel arguing: Jay Ian Igiel Opening argument time: 15 Rebuttal argument time: 5 [1000008166] [16-1384] Jay Igiel
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellee Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. Counsel arguing: Howard N. Cayne Answering argument time: 20 minutes [1000008120] [16-1384] Howard Cayne
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 03/22/2017. Registration Time: 9:15 - 9:30.. Oral argument acknowledgment form due within 5 days. [16-1384] (JLC)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 3/21/17 - 3/24/17 argument session. Additional copies due: 12/21/2016. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 12/26/2016. [16-1384] (JLC)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                CASE CONTINUED FROM TENTATIVE CALENDAR TO AWAITING CALENDAR. [999971918] [16-1384] (JLC)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Unknown Document Type
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Unknown Document Type
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None
                      ORDER filed [999872471] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [26]. Disclosure Statement filed (if corporate amicus)? Y. Appearance Form filed? Y. Copies to all parties.. [16-1384] (DL)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None
                        REPLY by Timothy Howard to Response [32].. [16-1384] Geoffrey Hervey
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None
                          ORDER filed [999862385] updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Response brief due 07/21/2016 Copies to all parties.. [16-1384] (DL)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None
                            NOTICE by Potential Amicus Curiae Timothy Howard that a reply will be filed.[999862075].. [16-1384] Geoffrey Hervey
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None
                              RESPONSE/ANSWER by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation and Federal Housing Finance Agency to Motion to file amicus curiae brief [26]. Nature of response: in opposition. [16-1384] Howard Cayne
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None
                                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Potential Amicus Curiae Timothy Howard. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999848046] [16-1384] Geoffrey Hervey
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None
                                  DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Attorney Mr. Geoffrey Townsend Hervey for Potential Amicus Curiae Timothy Howard re: filing of disclosure form (Loc.R. 26.1).. [16-1384] (TF)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE ISSUED to Mr. David Block Bergman for Federal Housing Finance Agency, Mr. Howard N. Cayne for Federal Housing Finance Agency, Mr. Taylor Thomas Lankford for Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Merritt Ellen McAlister for Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation and Graciela Maria Rodriguez for Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation requesting response to Motion to file amicus curiae brief [26]Response due: 06/20/2016.[999847461].. [16-1384] (TF)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None
                                      AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Timothy Howard in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 06/08/2016. [999846348] [16-1384] Geoffrey Hervey
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None
                                        MOTION by Timothy Howard, amicus curiae to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) without consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 06/07/2016 ecf. [999846317] [16-1384] Geoffrey Hervey
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None
                                          FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Meridian Investments, Inc.. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 05/31/2016. [999837760] [16-1384] Jay Igiel
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None
                                            BRIEF by Appellant Meridian Investments, Inc. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/31/2016. [999837754] [16-1384] Jay Igiel
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None
                                              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Federal Housing Finance Agency. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999814135] [16-1384] David Bergman
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Mr. David Block Bergman for Appellee Federal Housing Finance Agency and Mr. Howard N. Cayne for Appellee Federal Housing Finance Agency re: filing of disclosure form (Loc.R. 26.1) Disclosure statement due from Federal Housing Finance Agency on 05/09/2016.. [16-1384] (TF)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405920032 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                  (ENTRY RESTRICTED) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Merritt McAlister for Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.[999798223] [16-1384]--[Edited 04/19/2016 by TF] Merritt McAlister
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405913988 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                    (ENTRY RESTRICTED) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Robert B. Nealon for Meridian Investments, Inc..[999795483] [16-1384]--[Edited 04/18/2016 by TF] Jay Igiel
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                      Initial mediation conference scheduled. [16-1384] (LP)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) for Meridian Investments, Inc..[999798341] [16-1384] Robert Nealon
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Taylor Lankford for Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.[999798249] [16-1384] Taylor Lankford
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Merritt McAlister for Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.[999798241] [16-1384] Merritt McAlister
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999798201] [16-1384] Graciela Rodriguez
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Graciela Rodriguez for Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.[999798194] [16-1384] Graciela Rodriguez
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                  BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Nealon. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/31/2016. Response Brief due 06/30/2016 [16-1384] (TF)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                    Docket correction requested from Mr. Robert Bernard Nealon for Meridian Investments, Inc.. Re: [6] appearance of counsel. Access to appearance of counsel has been restricted to case participants.. Mailed to: Nealon. [16-1384] (TF)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                      DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Meridian Investments, Inc.. [16-1384] Jay Igiel
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Meridian Investments, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999795485] [16-1384] Jay Igiel
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Jay Ian Igiel for Meridian Investments, Inc..[999795482] [16-1384] Jay Igiel
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by David B. Bergman for Federal Housing Finance Agency.[999791255] [16-1384] David Bergman
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Howard N. Cayne for Federal Housing Finance Agency.[999791254] [16-1384] Howard Cayne
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:15-cv-01463-JCC-TCB. Mailed to: Nealon, Rodriguez. [16-1384] (TF)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                  Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:15-cv-01463-JCC-TCB. Case manager: TFischer. [16-1384] (TF)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 144 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?