MOGENHAN v. RUBIN, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-00817
District Judge Jack D. Shanstrom, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 27, 2017 at 2:54 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANN MARIE MOGENHAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MORRIS E. FISCHER, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morris Eli Fischer +1 301 328 7631 +1 301 328 7638 morris@mfischerlaw.com
v.
No Logo JANET A. NAPOLITANO, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Clavijo, Mario Comin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lo +1 202 514 5134 +1 202 514 8780 Michelle.Lo2@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo ROBERT E. RUBIN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/05/1999 Stacy M. Ludwig +1 202 514 7147 +1 202 514 8780

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/29/2003 David J Ball, Jr. +1 202 223 7352 +1 202 240 7352 dball@paulweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/26/2008 Charlotte A. Abel +1 202 307 2332 +1 202 514 8780 charlotte.abel@usdoj.gov
No Logo THOMAS RIDGE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Clavijo, Mario Comin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lo +1 202 514 5134 +1 202 514 8780 Michelle.Lo2@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/26/2008 Charlotte A. Abel +1 202 307 2332 +1 202 514 8780 charlotte.abel@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (128) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
WITHDRAWAL of Motion by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN re 128 MOTION to Enforce Judgment and for sanctions filed by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN. (Fischer, Morris) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
    WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 03/05/12.....MOTION to Enforce Judgment and for sanctions by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischer, Morris) Modified on 3/5/2012 (rdj). (Entered: 02/21/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
      ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to 78 Notice of Appeal filed by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN ; ORDERED that the motion be granted, and this case is hereby dismissed. USCA Case Number 11-5351. (md, ) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by JANET NAPOLITANO re 124 MOTION to Stay re 122 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion to Alter Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lo, Michelle) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
          Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the fee was an Appeal by the Government re 123 Notice of Appeal. (rdj) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
            WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 01/06/2012.....MOTION to Stay re 122 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion to Alter Judgment by JANET NAPOLITANO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lo, Michelle) Modified on 1/9/2012 (rdj). (Entered: 12/21/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 122 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion to Alter Judgment by JANET NAPOLITANO. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Lo, Michelle) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 105 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 107 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge Jack D. Shanstrom on 11/23/11. (rje) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                  BILL OF COSTS AS TAXED by the Clerk in favor of plaintiff ANN MARIE MOGENHAN in the amount of $4,119.52 against defendant JANET NAPOLITANO. (jwb) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                    SURREPLY to re 105 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by JANET NAPOLITANO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(rdj) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                      TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Jack D. Shanstrom held on 04-11-2011; Page Numbers: 1-19. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Schwam, Telephone number 202-354-3238, Court Reporter Email Address : Lisa_Schwam@dcd.uscourts.gov.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2011.(Schwam, Lisa) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                        ERRATA re 117 Motion Amended Surreply in Further Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees by JANET NAPOLITANO. (Natiello, Christian) Modified on 7/12/2011 to add linkage (rdj). (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                          Consent MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply in Further Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees by JANET NAPOLITANO (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Surreply, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Defendant's Surreply)(Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 105 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees, 107 MOTION to Alter Judgment as to 102 Clerk's Judgment filed by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Snider and Associates Bills, # 2 Exhibit 2 Law Office of Morris E. Fischer Bills, # 3 Exhibit 3 Michael Snider Bio, # 4 Exhibit 4 Ari Taragan Bill, # 5 Exhibit 5 April 2011 Bill, # 6 Exhibit 5a June 2011 Bill, # 7 Exhibit U.S. Attorney Office Matrix)(Fischer, Morris) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER: Upon consideration of the defendant's 108 Motion for Extension of Time to File Post Trial Motions/Opposition to Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Plaintiff's 111 Motion for Leave to File Surreply; it is hereby ordered that both motion are DENIED. Signed by Judge Jack D. Shanstrom on 06/28/11. (tb, ) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                NOTICE re 113 of FIling of Exhibit 1 to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs and Plaintiff's Motion for Pre-judgment Interest by JANET NAPOLITANO (Natiello, Christian) Modified on 6/28/2011 to add linkage(rdj). (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 105 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees, 107 MOTION to Alter Judgment as to 102 Clerk's Judgment filed by JANET NAPOLITANO. (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Jack D. Shanstrom held on 04-12-11; Page Numbers: 1-40. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Schwam, Telephone number 202-354-3238, Court Reporter Email Address : LisaSchwam@aol.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/7/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/17/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/14/2011.(Schwam, Lisa) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Leave to File Surreply and Attached Surreply by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischer, Morris) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 108 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Any Post-trial Motions and an Opposition to Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by JANET NAPOLITANO. (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 108 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Any Post-trial Motions and an Opposition to Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Fischer, Morris) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Any Post-trial Motions and an Opposition to Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Attorneys' Fees by JANET NAPOLITANO (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                              MOTION to Alter Judgment as to 102 Clerk's Judgment by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischer, Morris) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                BILL OF COSTS by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Fischer, Morris) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                  Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit E-1, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischer, Morris) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs by JANET NAPOLITANO (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Morris Eli Fischer (Fischer, Morris) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant. Signed by Judge Jack D. Shanstrom on 5/5/11. (rje, ) Modified on 5/6/2011 (rje, ). (Entered: 05/05/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Order by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischer, Morris) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fischer, Morris) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Signature Page of Foreperson in Jury Verdict. (Access to the PDF Document is restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act. Access is limited to Counsel of Record and the Court.). (rje) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                Verdict Form. (rje) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  Trial Exhibit Lists. (rje, ) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    Signature Page of Foreperson in (1) Jury Note. (Access to the PDF Document is restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act. Access is limited to Counsel of Record and the Court.). (rje) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      (1) Jury Notes. (rje) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Signature Page of Foreperson in (1) Jury Note. (Access to the PDF Document is restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act. Access is limited to Counsel of Record and the Court.). (rje, ) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          (1) Jury Notes. (rje, ) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            TRIAL BRIEF in Response to Plaintiff's April 7, 2011, Motion in Limine by JANET NAPOLITANO, THOMAS RIDGE, ROBERT E. RUBIN. (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              ERRATA by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN 89 MOTION in Limine filed by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischer, Morris) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION in Limine by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischer, Morris) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  TRIAL BRIEF Objecting to Plaintiff's Proposed Jury Instruction Regarding "Proof of Retaliation" by THOMAS RIDGE, ROBERT E. RUBIN. (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Lo on behalf of THOMAS RIDGE (Lo, Michelle) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      PRETRIAL STATEMENT by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN. (Fischer, Morris) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION in Limine by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Statement of Points and Authorities, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fischer, Morris) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER setting a Settlement Conference for 12/21/2010, at 02:30 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 12/06/10. (DM) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for settlement. (kb) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER Motions in limine due by 2/15/2011. Joint Pretrial Statement and Proposed Jury Instructions due by 3/10/2011. Jury Trial set for 4/11/2011 09:00 AM in A courtroom to be determined at a later date. before Judge Jack D. Shanstrom. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2011 10:30 AM before Judge Jack D. Shanstrom. SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Jack D. Shanstrom on 11/10/10. (zlin, ) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER Telephone Conference set for 11/3/2010 08:30 AM Mountain Standard Time before Judge Jack D. Shanstrom.. Signed by Judge Jack D. Shanstrom on 10/1410. (lin, ) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MANDATE of USCA (certified copy)issued 9/24/10 as to 78 Notice of Appeal filed by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN ; USCA Case Number 08-5457; vacating the opinion of the District Court that was appealed; reversing the grant of summary judgment on appellant's claim that the Secret Service unlawfully retaliated against the appellant; affirming the grant of summary judgment on appellant's claim that the Service failed to reasonably accommodate the appellant's disability. (jeb, ) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    USCA JUDGMENT (certified copy) as to 78 Notice of Appeal filed by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN. ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the opinion of the District Court appealed from in this cause is hereby vacated; the grant of summary judgment on appellants claim that the Secret Service unlawfully retaliated against her is reversed; and the grant of summary judgment on appellants claim that the Service failed to reasonably accommodate her disability is affirmed, inaccordance with the opinion of the court filed herein this date. (kb) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 00900000000001647661. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Fischer, Morris) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        JUDGMENT in favor of defendant against plaintiff; granting defendant's motion for Summary Judgment as to all counts in Plaintiff's Complaint; dismissing case. (jeb, ) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Jack D. Shanstrom on 9/17/08. (jeb, ) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            Case Reassigned to Judge Jack D. Shanstrom, sitting by designation from the U.S. District Court for the District of Montana. Judge Thomas F. Hogan no longer assigned to the case. (gt, ) (Entered: 05/15/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER:Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2008 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Jack D. Shanstrom. Signed by Judge Jack D. Shanstrom on 4/10/08. (lctfh1) Modified on 4/23/2008 (nmw, ). (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christian Alexander Natiello on behalf of THOMAS RIDGE Substituting for attorney Charlotte Abel (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 65 filed by THOMAS RIDGE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Baltimore Orioles timesheets)(Abel, Charlotte) (Entered: 03/31/2005)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to motion re 70 filed by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Previous Order# 2 Exhibit B, Prior opposition)(Fischer, Morris) (Entered: 03/11/2005)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by THOMAS RIDGE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abel, Charlotte) (Entered: 03/10/2005)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by THOMAS RIDGE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abel, Charlotte) (Entered: 02/11/2005)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to motion re 65 Summary Judgment filed by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6 # 7 # 8 # 9 # 10 # 11 # 12 # 13 # 14 # 15 # 16 # 17 # 18 # 19 # 20 # 21 # 22 # 23 # 24 # 25 # 26 # 27 # 28 # 29 # 30)(Fischer, Morris) (Entered: 01/10/2005)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Oppositon to Motion for Summary Judgment by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN. (Fischer, Morris) (Entered: 12/06/2004)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Summary Judgment by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN. (Fischer, Morris) (Entered: 10/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment by THOMAS RIDGE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts Not In Dispute# 2 Memorandum of Points & Authorities# 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit # 8 Exhibit # 9 Exhibit # 10 Exhibit # 11 Exhibit # 12 Exhibit # 13 Exhibit # 14 Exhibit # 15 Exhibit # 16 Exhibit # 17 Exhibit # 18 Exhibit # 19 Text of Proposed Order)(Abel, Charlotte) (Entered: 10/07/2004)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to motion re 62 filed by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN. (Fischer, Morris) (Entered: 09/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Dispositive Motion by THOMAS RIDGE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abel, Charlotte) (Entered: 09/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Dispositive Motion by THOMAS RIDGE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abel, Charlotte) (Entered: 09/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Order by THOMAS RIDGE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abel, Charlotte) (Entered: 09/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 56 filed by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN. (Fischer, Morris) (Entered: 07/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to motion re 56 filed by THOMAS RIDGE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abel, Charlotte) (Entered: 07/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition by THOMAS RIDGE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abel, Charlotte) (Entered: 07/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 56 Second MOTION for Discovery Admissions be Deemed Admitted by THOMAS RIDGE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abel, Charlotte) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Second MOTION for Discovery Admissions be Deemed Admitted by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Fischer, Morris) (Entered: 06/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN, THOMAS RIDGE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abel, Charlotte) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 3/12/04. (AKG) (Entered: 03/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN. (Fischer, Morris) (Entered: 03/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          ENTERED IN ERROR.....Memorandum in opposition to motion re 49 filed by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN. (Fischer, Morris) Modified on 2/9/2004 (rje, ). (Entered: 02/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to motion re 49 filed by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN. (Attachments: # 1)(Fischer, Morris) Modified on 2/9/2004 (rje, ). (Entered: 02/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN, THOMAS RIDGE. (Abel, Charlotte) (Entered: 01/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Dispositive Motion by THOMAS RIDGE. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Abel, Charlotte) (Entered: 01/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Request for Admissions Deemed Admitted by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Minute Order# 2 Exhibit B1# 3 Exhibit B2# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D)(Fischer, Morris) (Entered: 01/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Continue by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN. (Fischer, Morris) (Entered: 01/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration re 40 Order on Motion to Compel by THOMAS RIDGE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit)(Bradley, Charlotte) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference and to Modify Scheduling Order by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN, THOMAS RIDGE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradley, Charlotte) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Third MOTION for Extension of Time to comply with order compelling production of documents by THOMAS RIDGE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradley, Charlotte) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Order Compelling Production of Documents by THOMAS RIDGE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradley, Charlotte) (Entered: 11/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Order Compelling Production by THOMAS RIDGE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradley, Charlotte) (Entered: 11/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT MOTION to Amend scheduling order by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN, THOMAS RIDGE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(jf, ) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 29 Motion to Compel . Signed by Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 10/24/2003. (glh, ) (Entered: 10/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by plaintiff ANN MARIE MOGENHAN to plaintiff's opposition to motion to compel discovery [29-1]; exhibits (2) (jf) (Entered: 09/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT [37-1] by federal defendant THOMAS RIDGE (jf) (Entered: 09/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT by plaintiff ANN MARIE MOGENHAN [1-1] .; jury demand (jf) (Entered: 09/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/17/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Mag. Judge Deborah A. Robinson (MJ) : granting motion to extend time to 9/12/03 to oppose motion to compel [33-1] by ROBERT E. RUBIN response to motion(s) due by 9/12/03;NPT 9/9/03; (N) (glh) (Entered: 09/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/17/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATED ORDER by Mag. Judge Deborah A. Robinson (MJ) : for protective order (N) (glh) (Entered: 09/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by federal defendant ROBERT E. RUBIN in opposition to motion to compel discovery [29-1] by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN ; exhibits (4) (bjsp) (Entered: 09/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION filed by federal defendant ROBERT E. RUBIN to extend time to 9/12/03 to oppose motion to compel (bcs) (Entered: 09/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Richard W. Roberts : granting in part, denying in part motion for leave to file amended complaint [26-1] (N) (lin) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by plaintiff ANN MARIE MOGENHAN to defendant's opposition to motion for leave to file amended complaint [26-1] (jf) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Richard W. Roberts : granting motion for a sixty-day continuance of discovery and dispositive motions deadlines [28-1] by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN status hearing set for 4:00 11/7/03 ; (N) (lin) (Entered: 08/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION filed by plaintiff ANN MARIE MOGENHAN to compel discovery (jf) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION filed by plaintiff ANN MARIE MOGENHAN for a sixty-day continuance ;exhibit (1) (rje) (Entered: 08/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by federal defendant ROBERT E. RUBIN in opposition to motion for leave to file amended complaint [26-1] by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN; exhibits (2) (mpt) (Entered: 08/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION filed by plaintiff ANN MARIE MOGENHAN for leave to file amended complaint ; exhibits (4); EXHIBIT (AMENDED COMPLAINT) (mpt) (Entered: 08/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL for federal defendant ROBERT E. RUBIN , substituting Charlotte Anne Bradley for attorney David Jackson Ball Jr. (jf) (Entered: 07/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiff ANN MARIE MOGENHAN by Morris Eli Fischer (nmr) (Entered: 05/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Richard W. Roberts : discovery closes 9/4/03 ; dispositive motions due 10/17/03 ; response to dispositive motions due 11/18/03 ; reply to dispositive motions due 12/5/03 ; status hearing set for 9:15 9/5/03 ; (N) (lin) (Entered: 05/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Richard W. Roberts : denying motion for reconsideration of the Court's order [19-1] [20-1] by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN, granting motion to dismiss paragraphs six and seven of complaint [1-1] [15-1] by ROBERT E. RUBIN, status hearing set for 9:15 4/29/03 ; (N) (lin) (Entered: 03/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT filed by federal defendant ROBERT E. RUBIN , regarding: mail service at the United States Attorney's Office. (tth) (Entered: 11/09/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/30/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION (REQUEST) filed by plaintiff ANN MARIE MOGENHAN for reconsideration of the Court's order [19-1] ; attachments (bjsp) (Entered: 12/01/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Richard W. Roberts : denying motion for appointment of counsel [2-1] by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN (N) (lin) (Entered: 11/22/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/5/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL for federal defendant ROBERT E. RUBIN , substituting David Jackson Ball Jr. for attorney Stacy M. Ludwig for ROBERT E. RUBIN (st) (Entered: 11/08/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by federal defendant ROBERT E. RUBIN to response to motion to dismiss complaint [1-1] [15-1] by ROBERT E. RUBIN, motion for summary judgment [15-2] by ROBERT E. RUBIN; Exhibit (1) (tth) (Entered: 01/20/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/11/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by plaintiff ANN MARIE MOGENHAN to motion to dismiss complaint [1-1] [15-1] by ROBERT E. RUBIN, motion for summary judgment [15-2] by ROBERT E. RUBIN (st) (Entered: 01/12/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/15/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION filed by federal defendant ROBERT E. RUBIN to dismiss complaint [1-1] , or, in the alternative, for summary judgment ; Declaration (1); Exhibits (4). (tth) (Entered: 12/16/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/18/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Richard W. Roberts : dispositive motions due 12/14/98 ; response to dispositive motions due 1/11/99 ; reply to dispositive motions due 1/19/99 ; , plaintiff's financial statement and credit report due by 12/14/98 (N) (lin) (Entered: 11/18/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/2/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Richard W. Roberts : denying motion to proceed in forma pauperis regarding appointment of counsel [12-1] by ANN MARIE MOGENHAN status hearing set for 9:45 11/16/98 ; at the status conference deadline for filing dispositive motions will be set (N) (st) (Entered: 11/04/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/4/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION by plaintiff ANN MARIE MOGENHAN to proceed in forma pauperis regarding appointment of counse (tb) (Entered: 09/08/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/7/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT/REPORT PURSUANT TO L.R. 206(d) filed by plaintiff ANN MARIE MOGENHAN, federal defendant ROBERT E. RUBIN . (JMF) (Entered: 08/10/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/8/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge John G. Penn for initial scheduling hearing, status hearing set for 9:30 8/18/98 ; (N) (rew) (Entered: 07/10/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/7/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER TO COMPLAINT [1-1] by federal defendant ROBERT E. RUBIN. (tth) (Entered: 07/08/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/2/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge John G. Penn: granting motion to extend time to 7/7/98 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint [1-1] [7-1] by ROBERT E. RUBIN ; Answer extended to 7/7/98 for ROBERT E. RUBIN (N) (kmk) (Entered: 07/02/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION filed by federal defendant ROBERT E. RUBIN to extend time to 7/7/98 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint [1-1] (tth) (Entered: 06/23/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/28/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for federal defendant ROBERT E. RUBIN by Stacy M. Ludwig; Attachment (1) (tth) Modified on 05/29/1998 (Entered: 05/29/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/13/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of summons and complaint executed upon U.S. Attorney General on 4/23/98 (tth) (Entered: 05/14/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/13/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of summons and complaint executed upon U.S. Attorney on 4/23/98 (tth) (Entered: 05/14/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/13/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of summons and complaint executed on 4/23/98 upon federal defendant ROBERT E. RUBIN (tth) (Entered: 05/14/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION filed by plaintiff ANN MARIE MOGENHAN for appointment of counsel (tth) (Entered: 04/02/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT filed by plaintiff ANN MARIE MOGENHAN (tth) (Entered: 04/02/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 50 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?