Cellular Communications Equipment LLC v. ZTE Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:16-cv-00375
Magistrate Judge K Nicole Mitchell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 24, 2019 at 11:51 PM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cellular Communications Equipment LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bragalone Conroy PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Ray Bragalone +1 214 785 6671 +1 214 785 6680 jbragalone@bcpc-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan H. Rastegar +1 214 785 6670 +1 214 785 6680 jrastegar@bcpc-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Afif Saad +1 214 785 6670 +1 214 785 6680 tsaad@bcpc-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Christopher Cecil +1 817 806 3812 +1 817 377 3485 tcecil@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley Wayne Caldwell +1 214 593 7129 bcaldwell@caldwellcc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Dodd Cassady +1 214 810 4705 +1 214 481 1757 jcassady@cassadycurry.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Austin Curry +1 214 888 4848 +1 214 888 4849 acurry@caldwellcc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Warren Joseph McCarty, III +1 214 888 4848 +1 214 888 4849 wmccarty@caldwellcc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
v.
AT&T Mobility LLC AT&T Mobility LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Wood Kennerly +1 650 320 1800 +1 650 320 1900 chriskennerly@paulhastings.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Herbert A Yarbrough, III +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 trey@yw-lawfirm.com
No Logo Boost Mobile, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Weber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert William Weber +1 903 223 5656 +1 903 223 5652 bweber@smithweber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark W McGrory +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 mark.mcgrory@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan J Redmond +1 913 777 5613 +1 913 777 5601 megan.redmond@eriseip.com
No Logo Cellco Partnership, Defendant
Officially listed as "Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless"

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV +1 903 597 8311 patrickclutter@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas M Dunham +1 202 282 5852 +1 202 282 5100 tdunham@winston.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah J. Kalemeris skalemeris@winston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles B. Molster +1 202 282 5988 +1 202 282 5100 cmolster@winston.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corrine M Saylor +1 202 282 5000 +1 202 282 5100 csaylor@winston.com
No Logo Sprint Solutions, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Weber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert William Weber +1 903 223 5656 +1 903 223 5652 bweber@smithweber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark W McGrory +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 mark.mcgrory@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan J Redmond +1 913 777 5613 +1 913 777 5601 megan.redmond@eriseip.com
No Logo Sprint Spectrum, LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Weber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert William Weber +1 903 223 5656 +1 903 223 5652 bweber@smithweber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark W McGrory +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 mark.mcgrory@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan J Redmond +1 913 777 5613 +1 913 777 5601 megan.redmond@eriseip.com
T-Mobile USA, Inc. T-Mobile USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas James Dixon +1 949 226 6741 +1 888 775 0898 DDixon@hueston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas James Dixon +1 949 226 6741 +1 888 775 0898 DDixon@hueston.com
ZTE USA, Inc. ZTE USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED william.atkins@pillsburylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Callie McCarthy Bjurstrom +1 619 544 3107 +1 619 819 4363 callie.bjurstrom@pillsburylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole S Cunningham +1 619 544 3112 +1 858 236 1995 nicole.cunningham@pillsburylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Inge Larish +1 619 234 5000 +1 619 236 1995 inge.larish@pillsburylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven A Moore +1 619 544 3112 +1 858 346 9392 steve.moore@pillsburylaw.com
ZTE Corporation ZTE Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED william.atkins@pillsburylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole S Cunningham +1 619 544 3112 +1 858 236 1995 nicole.cunningham@pillsburylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Inge Larish +1 619 234 5000 +1 619 236 1995 inge.larish@pillsburylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven A Moore +1 619 544 3112 +1 858 346 9392 steve.moore@pillsburylaw.com
ZTE Solutions, Inc. ZTE Solutions, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Callie McCarthy Bjurstrom +1 619 544 3107 +1 619 819 4363 callie.bjurstrom@pillsburylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole S Cunningham +1 619 544 3112 +1 858 236 1995 nicole.cunningham@pillsburylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Inge Larish +1 619 234 5000 +1 619 236 1995 inge.larish@pillsburylaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sarah Joyce Kalemeris terminated as counsel of record with respect to Defendant Cellco Partnership Inc. d/b/a Verizon Wireless. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 1/5/18. (mjc, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
    Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Sara J. Kalemeris by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: 11/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
      AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants, filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rastegar, Jonathan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2017: # 3 Exhibit A Searchable, # 4 Exhibit B Searchable) (mjc, ).
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: 11/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jerry Tice, II on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Tice, Jerry)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 10/31/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER granting Motion to Sever and Consolidate Claims, Defenses and Counterclaims Regarding U.S. Patent No. 7,941,174 from cases 6:16-cv-475 and 6:16-cv-476 and to consolidate those claims, defenses and counterclaims as they relate to HTC Corporation and HTC America Inc. into 6:16-cv-363, and as they relate to ZTE (USA), Inc. into 6:16-cv-375. Motion was filed in consolidated lead case 6:16-cv-475. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/31/17. (mjc, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Status Conference held on 10/24/2017. (Court Reporter Tammy Goolsby.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (leh, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: 10/23/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER granting 15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Corrine Saylor Davis terminated as counsel for Defendant Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/23/17. (mjc, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Corrine Saylor Davis by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER TO SEVER AND STAY CLAIMS AGAINST THE CARRIER DEFENDANTS. Plaintiff's claims against the Carrier Defendants are hereby SEVERED and STAYED. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/18/17. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: 9/29/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER LIFTING STAY AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. It is ORDERED that this case, along with Case No. 6:16-CV-363, are placed back on the active docket. It is further ordered that this case is set for a Status Conference as follows: Status Conference set for 10/24/2017 02:00 PM in Ctrm 353 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 9/29/2017. (rlf)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. The above-styled civil actions are ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Within ten days of the final written decision by the PTAB on the IPR petition, the parties shall file a joint status report in this case. The joint status report shall address the status of the IPR petition and state whether the case should be placed back on the Court's active docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/11/17. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None
                        ANSWER to 2 Complaint, by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless.(mll, ) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None
                          ANSWER to 2 Complaint, by Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum, L.P..(mll, ) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None
                            REPLY TO 7 COUNTERCLAIMS by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC.(mll, ) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None
                              ANSWER to 2 Complaint, by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc..(mll, ) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None
                                ANSWER to 2 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Cellular Communications Equipment LLC by ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions, Inc..(mll, ) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None
                                  ANSWER to 2 Complaint, by AT&T Mobility, LLC.(mll, ) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/10/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None
                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation (mll, ) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC - Joint Notice Designating Docket Entries (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None
                                          COMPLAINT against AT&T Mobility, LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions, Inc., filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F)(mll, ) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER TO SEVER. All claims pertaining to U.S. Patent No. 7,218,923 are hereby severed from the above-captioned cases into separate causes of action. The Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to assign a new case number for each of the severed actions, as set forth in the Motion. The Clerk is ORDERED to consolidate the new actions for pre-trial purposes, with the first case opened to serve as the lead case. Upon consolidation, the Clerk is ORDERED to stay the consolidated proceedings pending the resolution of IPR2015-01927 by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board. The Clerk shall docket this Order as well as the most recent Complaint in each newly-created case. The parties have five (5) days from the date of entry of this Order to agree on what documents they will designate to be carried over from the above-captioned actions and docketed in the newly-created causes of action. Payment of a filing fee for the severed cases is waived. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 04/20/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Space Space

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 162 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?