Crowell v. Mannatech, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Mexico District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-00829-JAP-RLP
District Judge James A. Parker, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 13, 2017 at 6:02 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jonathan Crowell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Arthur Binkow +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 info@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Medrano, Hess, & Struck, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Raynard Struck +1 505 217 2200 +1 505 217 2205 struck@mhslawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Jude George +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 dgeorge@rgrdlaw.com
v.
No Logo Mannatech, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Freedman Boyd Hollander Goldberg Urias & Ward PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Goldberg +1 505 842 9960 +1 505 842 0761 jg@fbdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James Rasmussen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kurt Wihl +5 053 464 6464 +1 505 346 1370 kw@keleher-law.com
No Logo Samuel L Caster, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James Rasmussen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kurt Wihl +5 053 464 6464 +1 505 346 1370 kw@keleher-law.com
Office Albuquerque
Filed 8/1/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County -OUT OF STATE-
Terminated 1/29/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,LEADCS,REFER
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Letter
Letter by USDC DNM to the USDC Northern District of TX (Dallas Div) re: Memorandum, Opinion & Order of transfer (jrm) Modified on 1/31/2007 (modify text)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007 Memorandum, Opinion & OrderCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge James A. Parker granting [21] Motion to Change Venue (Eby, Lynn)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006 Notice of Change of Address
      NOTICE by plaintiff's counsel of change of address * (sl)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006 ~Notice (other)
        NOTICE by defts of completion of briefing on mtn to transfer venus [21-1] (jrm)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
          REPLY by defts to response to motion to transfer venue under 28:1404(a) [21-1] (jrm)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006 Response to Motion
            RESPONSE in opposition by pltf to motion to transfer venue under 28:1404(a) [21-1] (jrm)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER by Senior Judge James A. Parker granting Lead Pltfs' unoppose motion for leave to exceed page limits for exhibits supporting lead pltfs' opposition to defts' mtn to transfer venue [27-1]; Lead Pltfs may file not more than 175 pages of exhibits (cc: all counsel*) (jrm)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006, Terminated: 5/25/2006 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                UNOPPOSED MOTION by pltf for leave to exceed page limits for exhibits supporting lead pltfs' opposition to defts' mtn to transfer venue (*) (jrm)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi granting pltf's unopposed motion for attorney David J George & Robert J Robbins to appear pro hac vice [25-1] (cc: all counsel) (jrm)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006, Terminated: 5/3/2006 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                    UNOPPOSED MOTION by pltf for attorney David J George & Robert J Robbins to appear pro hac vice (*) (jrm)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: 4/11/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER by Senior Judge James A. Parker granting the joint motion to continue deadlines established in order of consolidation as further described herein [23-1] (cc: all counsel*) (jrm)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006, Terminated: 4/11/2006 Motion to Continue
                        JOINT MOTION by parties to continue deadlines established in order of consolidation (*) (jrm)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/5/2006 Memorandum in Support
                          MEMORANDUM of law by defts in support of motion to transfer venue under 28:1404(a) [21-1] (jrm)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/5/2006 Motion to Change Venue
                            MOTION by defts to transfer venue under 28:1404(a) (jrm)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Complaint
                              CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Securities Fraud by pltfs herein* (pr)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi granting the parties joint motion to continue deadlines established in initial scheduling order [17-1] (cc: all counsel) (jrm)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER by Senior Judge James A. Parker as described herein [15-1] (see Order for specifics) (cc: all counsel) (jrm)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005, Terminated: 1/6/2006 Motion to Continue
                                    JOINT MOTION by parties herein to continue deadlines established in initial scheduling order (*) (seal)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                      INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 1/18/06 @ 10:30 am; provisional discovery plan & IPTR due 1/11/06 (cc: all counsel*) (jrm)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER by Senior Judge James A. Parker granting the joint motion to consolidate cases, designate caption & enter scheduling order [14-1] with member cases 1:05-cv-924, 1:05-cv-975 & as further described herein (cc: all counsel) (jrm) Modified on 12/13/2005
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                          JOINT MOTION of proposed lead pltf & defts to consolidate cases, designate caption & enter scheduling order * (vv)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 13 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi granting defts' unopposed motion for attorney Edward S Koppman to appear pro hac vice [10-1] (cc: all counsel) (jrm)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                              NOTICE by deft Mannatech, Inc. of non-opposition to the Mannatech Group's mtn for appointment as lead pltf & approval of its selection of lead & liaison counsel & conferral w/counsel pursuant to D.NM.LR-CIV.7.3 (*) (jrm) Modified on 11/09/2005
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER by Senior Judge James A. Parker withdrawing motion to consolidate cases [5-1] & for appointment as lead counsel & approval of its selection of lead & liaison counsel [2-1] (cc: all counsel*) (jrm)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                  UNOPPOSED MOTION by defts for attorney Edward S Koppman to appear pro hac vice (jrm)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                    ENTRY OF APPEARANCE for defts by Kurt Wihl (jrm)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                      NOTICE by pltf of withdrawal of mtn by the Mannatech Investors Group for consolidation of related actions, appointment as lead pltf & approval of lead pltf's selection of co-lead counsel (jrm)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Declaration
                                                        DECLARATION by Raynard Struck re: motion to consolidate cases [5-1] (jrm)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                          MEMORANDUM of points & authorities by deft in support of motion to consolidate cases [5-1] (jrm)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                            MOTION by deft to consolidate cases 05-924 & 05-975 w/this one (jrm)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Affidavit
                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Joseph Goldberg [2-1] (*) (jrm)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                MEMORANDUM of law by deft in support of motion for appointment as lead counsel & approval of its selection of lead & liaison counsel [2-1] (*) (jrm) Modified on 10/26/2005
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                  MOTION by deft for appointment as lead counsel & approval of its selection of lead & liaison counsel (*) (jrm) Modified on 10/26/2005
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/2/2005 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                    COMPLAINT for securities violation (referred to Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi) (jmg)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  Filing Fee Received
                                                                      FILING FEE PAID: on 8/1/05 in the amount of $250.00, receipt #: 53419. (jmg)
                                                                        LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 68 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?