USA v. Williams
Criminal Case Oklahoma Northern District Court, Case No. 4:00-cr-00056-CVE

Tags
Last Updated December 6, 2017 at 5:40 PM ST (3.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth P Snoke +1 918 382 2700 +1 918 560 7946 ken.snoke@usdoj.gov
Space Thomas Scott Woodward +1 918 382 2700 +1 918 560 7943 scott.woodward@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Dennis Earl Williams (1)
Office Tulsa
Filed 4/5/2000
County Tulsa
Terminated 2/20/2001
Reopened
Other Court Case :00-02-05122 10th Circuit
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
181341 Mail fraud.
Count 13
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
181341 Mail fraud.
Count 2-7
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
181341 Mail fraud.
Count 8
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
181341 Mail fraud.
Count 9-12
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
181341 Mail fraud.
Defendant Custody Status
Flags LC-1,TRANSF
  Entries (100) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 83 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: 1/28/2014 Order
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk pursuant to General Order 14-1, adding attorney Thomas Scott Woodward for United States of America terminating attorney Phil E Pinnell as to Dennis Earl Williams (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (hc-ad, Dpty Clk)
    LREF
    Blank  Mail returned
    MAIL to Dennis Earl Williams Returned - marked Not at this address, address changed to unknown. (Re: [79] Order, Transfer of Jurisdiction of Probation/Supervised Release (Out)) as to Dennis Earl Williams (tjc, Dpty Clk)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Remark
      ***Remark: receipt of Transcript of Proceedings from Western District Oklahoma (Re: [80] Letter) as to Dennis Earl Williams (kjp, Dpty Clk)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 letter
        Letter to USDC WD/OK re transfer as to Dennis Earl Williams (s-sac, Dpty Clk)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Minutes of Asset HearingCourt Filing
          MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Sam A Joyner : Asset Hearing held on 4/20/2005 deft does not appear as order and AUSA req BA be issued as to Dennis Earl Williams (Court Reporter: C1) (jcm, Dpty Clk)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan, TRANSFER by Judge Claire V Eagan of Jurisdiction of Probationer or Supervised Releasee to District of Western Oklahoma as to Dennis Earl Williams (sjm, Dpty Clk)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/17/2005 Minutes of Asset HearingCourt Filing
              MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy : Asset Hearing held on 3/16/2005, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): 4/20/05 9:30 as to Dennis Earl Williams (Court Reporter: C1) (lmc, Dpty Clk)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Notice - other
                NOTICE of Violation of condition of supervised release by United States of America as to Dennis Earl Williams (sjm, Dpty Clk)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: 2/16/2005 Minutes of Asset HearingCourt Filing
                  MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Sam A Joyner : Asset Hearing held on 2/16/2005, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): as to Dennis Earl Williams (Court Reporter: C2) (jcm, Dpty Clk)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Minutes of Asset HearingCourt Filing
                    MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Sam A Joyner : Asset Hearing held on 1/19/2005, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): 2/16/05 at 9:30 AM as to Dennis Earl Williams (Court Reporter: C1) (lmc, Dpty Clk)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank  Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Set/Reset
                      ***Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) set/reset: Asset Hrg 1/19/05 at 9:30 AM as to Dennis Earl Williams (lmc, Dpty Clk)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004 minutes - miscellaneousCourt Filing
                        MINUTES Asset Hrg by Magistrate Judge Paul J. Cleary as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams ; no appearance by dft at Asset Hrg; AUSA requests bench warrant; bench warrant will issue on proof of service (C1) (hbo, Dpty Clk)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004 minutes - miscellaneousCourt Filing
                          MINUTES Asset Hrg by Magistrate Judge Frank H. McCarthy ; at the request of AUSA, ASSET HRG reset for 9:30 12/15/04 for Dennis Earl Williams before Magistrate Judge Paul J. Cleary (C1) (hbo, Dpty Clk)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 minutes - miscellaneousCourt Filing
                            MINUTES Asset Hrg by Magistrate Judge Paul J. Cleary ; Ptys appear for Asset Hrg, are sworn, and hrg conducted; Pty requests dft be recognized back for CONTINUED ASSET HRG 9:30 11/17/04 for Dennis Earl Williams before Magistrate Judge Paul J. Cleary (C1) (hbo, Dpty Clk)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: 8/20/2004 minutes - miscellaneousCourt Filing
                              MINUTES Asset Hrg. by Magistrate Judge Paul J. Cleary ; at the request of AUSA, ASSET HRG reset for 9:30 9/15/04 for Dennis Earl Williams before Magistrate Judge Paul J. Cleary (C1) (hbo, Dpty Clk)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004 minutes - miscellaneousCourt Filing
                                MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Paul J. Cleary ; at the request of AUSA, ASSET HRG reset for 9:30 8/18/04 for Dennis Earl Williams before Magistrate Judge Paul J. Cleary (04-c2) (hbo, Dpty Clk)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 minutes - miscellaneousCourt Filing
                                  MINUTES Asset Hrg by Magistrate Judge Paul J. Cleary ; at the request of AUSA, ASSET HRG reset for 9:30 6/16/04 for Dennis Earl Williams before Magistrate Judge Paul J. Cleary (tape 04-c1-22) (hbo, Dpty Clk)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: 4/22/2004 minutes - miscellaneousCourt Filing
                                    MINUTES Asset Hrg by Magistrate Judge Paul J. Cleary ; Ptys appear for Asset Hrg, are sworn, and hrg conducted; Pty requests dft be recognized back for CONTINUED ASSET HRG 9:30 6/16/04 for Dennis Earl Williams before Magistrate Judge Paul J. Cleary (Tape 04-c1-15) (hbo, Dpty Clk)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Affidavit/Certificate/Proof/Return of Service (non summons/warrant)
                                      USM RETURN on order re ASSET HEARING as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams (sac, Dpty Clk)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                        EX PARTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J. Cleary as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams granting motion for hearing on assets and injunction [64-1], ASSET HEARING set for 9:30 4/21/04 for Dennis Earl Williams before Magistrate Judge Paul J. Cleary (cc: mvt counsel) (crp, Dpty Clk)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                          MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V. Eagan referring to Magistrate Judge Paul J. Cleary the motion for hearing on assets and injunction [64-1] (sac, Dpty Clk)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004, Terminated: 1/30/2004 Motion for Judgment Debtor to Appear on Assets
                                            MOTION by plaintiff USA for hearing on assets and injunction (O/MJ pjc) as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams (sac, Dpty Clk)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank  appeal record returned
                                              APPEAL RECORD returned by USCA as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams re: appeal [58-1] ( 10th Circuit Case No. 02-5122) (rcvd 1-our orig file folder, 4-transcripts and 1 sealed env containing PSI rpts) (PSI rpts rtrnd to USPO (crp, Dpty Clk)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 Decision from Circuit CourtCourt Filing
                                                CERTIFIED COPY of order from USCA as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams dismissing the appeal [58-1] ( 10th Circuit Case No. 02-5122 ) (cc: Judge) (crp, Dpty Clk)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank  Remark
                                                  REMARK: rcvd dfdt's mot to dismiss appeal from defendant Dennis Earl Williams (forwarded to USCA) (crp, Dpty Clk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 Clerk's Record on Appeal Sent
                                                    CLERK'S ORIGINAL FILE RECORD ON APPEAL sent to USCA re: appeal [58-1] (10th Circuit Case No. 02-5122) (ltr mld to all counsel) (sjm, Dpty Clk)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/16/2002 Appeal Number Information from Circuit Court
                                                      APPEAL NUMBER received from USCA regarding [58-1] ( Appeal Number: 02-5122 #58 pro se/fees pd) as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams (crp, Dpty Clk)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk This case is hereby reassigned to Judge Claire V. Eagan . The new case number is 00-CR-56-EA. (cc: counsel) (sac, Dpty Clk)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank  Remark
                                                          REMARK rcvd pro se dktg stmt from defendant Dennis Earl Williams; forwarded to the 10th Circuit (sac, Dpty Clk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Remark
                                                            REMARK: rcvd courtesy copy of Movants Motion to Expedite (to be filed w/USCA) as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams (crp, Dpty Clk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Appeal Fee Paid in Full
                                                              APPEAL fee received from defendant Dennis Earl Williams in the amount of $ 105.00 (Receipt # 103566) regarding [58-1] (crp, Dpty Clk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/6/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002 Preliminary Record Sent
                                                                PRELIMINARY RECORD on Appeal sent to USCA re: appeal [58-1] as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams (Includes: Docket Sheet, Notice of Appeal, and Decision being appealed) (cc: all cnsl) (sac, Dpty Clk)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002 Notice of Appeal to Circuit Court
                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL to USCA by defendant Dennis Earl Williams from District Court Decision [30-1] as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams ( fees paid/forms given/pro se ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/14/2001 Decision from Circuit CourtCourt Filing
                                                                    CERTIFIED COPY of order and judgment from USCA as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams affirming the decision of the District Court re: appeal [31-1] ( 10th Circuit Case No. 01-5031 ) (cc: Judge) (crp, Dpty Clk)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/17/2001 Affidavit/Certificate/Proof/Return of Service (non summons/warrant)
                                                                      USM RETURN re writ of cont garn; served Bancfirst 8/7/01 as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams (sac, Dpty Clk) Modified on 08/17/2001
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001 Garnishees Answer
                                                                        GARNISHMENT ANSWER by Bancfirst; re: [51-1] amount $ -0- as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams (sac, Dpty Clk)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001 Notice - other
                                                                          NOTICE (CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) by plaintiff USA as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams re mot for writ of garn (crp, Dpty Clk)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/23/2001, Entered: 7/25/2001 Writ IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                            WRIT of garnishment and subp issued/approved by Magistrate Judge Claire V. Eagan directed to BancFirst as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams (writs forwarded to movant) (sac, Dpty Clk)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/23/2001, Entered: 7/24/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk referring to Magistrate Judge Claire V. Eagan the motion for writ of garnishment [51-1] (sac, Dpty Clk) Modified on 07/26/2001
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/23/2001, Entered: 7/24/2001 Motion for Writ of Garnishment
                                                                                MOTION for writ of garnishment (writ/MJ cve) by plaintiff USA (sac, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: 6/4/2001 Clerk's Record on Appeal Sent
                                                                                  CLERK'S Record on Appeal to USCA re: [31-1] as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams (ltr mld to all counsel) (fe, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Transcript of Proceedings
                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Rule 35(c) Motion before Judge Michael Burrage for date(s) of: 2/20/01 (Re: appeal [31-1] ) as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams ( C/R Karla S McWhorter, 9 pages) (sac, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Transcript of Proceedings
                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conf before Judge Michael Burrage for date(s) of: 2/16/01 (Re: appeal [31-1] ) as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams ( C/R Karla S McWhorter, 17 pages) (sac, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank  Transcript of Proceedings
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Sentencing Hrg before Judge Michael Burrage for date(s) of: 2/7/01 (Re: appeal [31-1] ) as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams ( C/R Karla S McWhorter, 20 pages) (sac, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 Letter from Circuit Court
                                                                                          APPEAL Letter from USCA to Karla McWhorter, Crt Rptr advising transc was due 5/3/01; requesting transcript be field as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams re: [31-1] (crp, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 Letter from Circuit Court
                                                                                            APPEAL Letter from USCA to K McWhorter, Crt Rptr requesting that the transcript be filed as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams re: [31-1] (crp, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 4/30/2001 Transcript Order Form
                                                                                              APPEAL Transcript Order Form (TOF) for dates: 11/29/00 (sentencing), 2/7/01 (sentencing), 2/20/01 (judgment hrg), and 2/16/01 (Rule 35C hrg) re: [31-1] ; transcript(s) due 5/3/01 as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams (crp, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER by Chief Judge Terry C. Kern denying motion for withdrawal of attorney Marcia G Shein [45-1] (cc: counsel) (crp, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/9/2001, Terminated: 4/17/2001 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s)
                                                                                                  MOTION for withdrawal of attorney Marcia G Shein by defendant Dennis Earl Williams (crp, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: 3/30/2001 attorney appearance
                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Dennis Earl Williams by Attorney Warren Gotcher (crp, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: 3/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER by Chief Judge Terry C. Kern granting motion for withdrawal of attorney Patrick A Williams for dfdt Dennis Earl Williams [40-1] (cc: counsel) (crp, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: 3/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER by Chief Judge Terry C. Kern granting motion to ext time to 4/6/01 to report for incarceration [41-1]. Deft's date to rept to designated institution is extended from 3/30/01 to 4/6/01, Noon. [cc: counsel,USM,USP & PHONED] (fe, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/29/2001, Entered: 3/29/2001, Terminated: 3/30/2001 Motion to Extend Deadlines
                                                                                                          MOTION to ext time to 4/6/01 to report for incarceration (o/j) by defendant Dennis Earl Williams (crp, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/29/2001, Entered: 3/29/2001, Terminated: 3/30/2001 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s)
                                                                                                            MOTION for withdrawal of attorney (o/j) by counsel for defendant Dennis Earl Williams (sac, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/8/2001, Entered: 3/8/2001 Appeal Number Information from Circuit Court
                                                                                                              APPEAL NUMBER received from USCA regarding [31-1] ( Appeal Number: 01-5031) as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams (agc, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: 3/1/2001 minutes - miscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                MINUTES: before Judge Michael Burrage: HEARING HELD on deft's motion to permit dfdt to post bond pndg app [34-1]. Mo/bond DENIED. Ct to enter Order. [Karla McWhorter-cr] (fe, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: 3/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Michael Burrage denying motion to permit dfdt to post bond pndg app [34-1] (cc: counsel) (sac, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: 2/26/2001 Response to motion
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by plaintiff USA to motion to permit dfdt to post bond pndg app [34-1] as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams (sac, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER by Judge Michael Burrage setting motion to permit dfdt to post bond pndg app [34-1] for HEARING for 11:15 a.m., 2/28/01 (cc: counsel) (fe, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/22/2001 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                        MOTION to permit dfdt to post bond pndg app (o/j) by defendant Dennis Earl Williams (sac, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Michael Burrage denying motion Rule 35(c) [25-1] (cc: counsel) (sac, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001 Preliminary Record Sent
                                                                                                                            PRELIMINARY RECORD on Appeal sent to USCA re: appeal [31-1] (Includes: Docket Sheet, Notice of Appeal, and Decision being appealed) (cc: all counsel) (agc, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 30 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001 judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              JUDGMENT as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams, sentencing Dennis Earl Williams (1) count(s) 1, 8 , 13 . BOP-46 mos ea Ct., cc; 3 yrs SR ea ct cc; $200 SMA; $413,790.74 rest. , dismissing counts as to Dennis Earl Williams (1) count(s) 2-7, 9 -12 . dismissed , case terminated by Judge Michael Burrage (cc: all cnsl, USM, USP, Fin Clk) (fe, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001 minutes - miscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                MINUTES: before Judge Michael Burrage: Case called for Decision on Deft's Rule 35(c) motion. [25-1] Decision rendered. Deft's motion denied. Ct to enter appropriate order. Deft makes oral req/bond pending appeal & will file appropriate motion; govt to respond by 2/26/01.[K.McWhorter-cr] (fe, Dpty Clk) Modified on 02/21/2001
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/16/2001, Entered: 2/16/2001 minutes - miscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  MINUTES: before Judge Michael Burrage: Telep. conf. held 2/16/01 the Deft's motion Rule 35(c) [25-1]. Witness LaVon Dyer sworn & testifi ies for deft. Statements made. Motion taken under advisement & court will render decision on 2/20/01, at 2:30 p.m. Deft makes oral mo/appeal bond & directed to file appropriate motion.[Karla McWhorter-cr] (fe, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE AND BRIEF IN RESPONSE by plaintiff USA to motion Rule 35(c) [25-1] as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams (crp, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER by Judge Michael Burrage: Ordered that the Govt is directed to respond to Deft's Rule 35(c) [25-1] motion by 2/16/01. Further, HEARING on said Motion is set for 2/16/01, 10:30 a.m. The parties are permitted to appear by phone and the Courtroom Deputy will place the call from the Judge's chambers. Deft is directed to be present at counsel's office. [cc: counsel,USP & PARTIES PHONED] Dennis Earl Williams (cc: counsel) (fe, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001 Notice of Appeal to Circuit Court
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL to USCA by defendant Dennis Earl Williams from Dist. Ct Decision [30-1] ( fees pd) as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams (agc, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                          MOTION Rule 35(c) by defendant Dennis Earl Williams (sac, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Appeal Fee Paid in Full
                                                                                                                                            APPEAL fee received from defendant Dennis Earl Williams in the amount of $ 105.00 (Receipt # 95871) regarding [31-1] (agc, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  Remark
                                                                                                                                              REMARK; received NOA from deft cnsl; cannot process until judgment is filed. (agc, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001 response
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE TO SECOND ADDENDUM TO THE PSI RPT by defendant Dennis Earl Williams (crp, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 minutes - miscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES: before Judge Michael Burrage ; Continued sentencing held on 2/7/01 as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams . Deft's motion for downward departure [15-1] declined & denied by the Ct. Objs. to PSI ruled on & Ct adopts & makes findings. Deft SENTENCED - Cts 1, 8, 13 - BOP - 46 mos., cc; 3 yrs SR ea ct; no fine; $50 SMA as to Cts. 1, 13; SMA $100 as to Ct. 8; $413,790.74 restitution to victims as outlined on the record wo/int.; conds. of SR imposed; deft advised of appeal rights & permitted to self surrender to designated institution by Noon, 3/30/01. Ct recs facility where deft can be treated for his medical condition of diabetes. Remaining cts. ordered dismissed per plea agree. [K.McWhorter-cr] (fe, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER by Judge Michael Burrage ; Due to Court conflict, Sentencing of 2/1/01 is RESET for 2:00 p.m., 2/7/01 as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams (cc: counsel,USM,USP & PHONED) (fe, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Transcript of Proceedings
                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of sentencing hrg Vol. I before Judge Michael Burrage for date(s) of: 11/29/00 as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams (C/R Karla S McWhorter; 83 pgs) (crp, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER by Judge Michael Burrage ; Upon request of deft counsel, w/no objs by Prob. and USA, SENTENCING of 2/1/01 at 3:30 p.m. is RESET for 4:15 p.m., 2/1/01 as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams (cc: counsel) (fe, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER by Judge Michael Burrage ; CONTINUED SENTENCING HEARING is set for 3:30 p.m., 2/1/01 as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams (cc: counsel) (fe, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Financial Receipt
                                                                                                                                                            FINANCIAL ENTRY re [19-1]; PHV fee paid for Marcia G Shein in the amt of $50.00; receipt #94954 (sac, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Remark
                                                                                                                                                              REMARK rcvd cert of good standing re mot PHV for Marcia G Shein (sac, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for attorney Marcia G Shein to appear pro hac vice (no fees) by defendant Dennis Earl Williams (sac, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 attorney appearance
                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Dennis Earl Williams by Attorney Marcia G Shein (sac, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 11/29/2000 minutes - miscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES: before Judge Michael Burrage ; Evidentiary sentencing Hrg. held on 11/29/00 as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams. Witnesses sworn & testify; Govt Exhs 1 & 2 submitted. Arg. held. Ct takes U.A. Case to be set for decision and Sentencing by the Ct. Deft to remain on bond. Marcia Shein granted lve to appear for deft.[Karla McWhorter-cr] (fe, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/29/2000 sentencing memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                      SENTENCING memorandum by plaintiff USA as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams (sac, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 11/21/2000, Entered: 11/22/2000 Motion for Departure (Upward/Downward)
                                                                                                                                                                        ...MOTION for downward departure by defendant Dennis Earl Williams (crp, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/21/2000, Entered: 11/22/2000 sentencing memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                          DEFENSE SENTENCING mitigation memorandum by defendant Dennis Earl Williams... (crp, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/22/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER by Judge Michael Burrage ; Upon req/Prob. Office, w/no objs. by counsel, SENTENCING, heretofore set 9/27/00, is RESET for 9:30 a.m., 11/29/00 as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams (cc: all counsel) (fe, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/19/2000, Entered: 6/19/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER by Judge Michael Burrage ; SENTENCING set for 10:30 a.m., 9/27/00 as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams (cc: all counsel) (fe, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/19/2000, Entered: 6/19/2000 minutes - miscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES: before Judge Michael Burrage : Case called for CP by defendant Dennis Earl Williams. Deft wd/NG plea to Cts 1, 8, 13; pleads guilty & adj. guilty. Pet/PG/Order approved & filed. Jury waiver approved & filed. Plea Agree. submitted & acceptance reserved pending sentencing. PSI ordered. Sentencing set 9/27/00, 10:30 a.m. Deft to remain on bond.[Karla McWhorter-cr] (fe, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/13/2000 waiver
                                                                                                                                                                                  SPEEDY TRIAL WAIVER by defendant Dennis Earl Williams (crp, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: 6/1/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER by Judge Michael Burrage granting motion to continue PT/Trial dates [9-1] ; PRETRIAL/PLEA HRG , heretofore set for 6/8/00, is RESET for 9:30 a.m., 6/19/00 for Dennis Earl Williams. JURY TRIAL, heretofore set 6/19/00, is RESET for 9:30 a.m., 7/17/00. Deft is directed to file Waiver of Speedy Trial by 6/12/00. Pursu ant to 18 U.S.C., Sec. 3161(h)(8)(A) and (B)(ii) and because the best ints. of public & deft in a speedy trial are outweighed by the ints. of justice in granting said motion, Time excludable under Speedy Trial Act. [ XT] (cc: all counsel,deft,USM,USP) (fe, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: 6/1/2000, Terminated: 6/1/2000 Motion to Continue Hearing(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to continue PT/Trial dates by defendant Dennis Earl Williams and plaintiff USA.[o/j] (fe, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: 5/17/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER by Judge Michael Burrage ; Due to Court conflict, PRETRIAL/MOTION/PLEA HRG, heretofore set 5/24/00, is RESET for 2:30 p.m., 6/8/00 as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams (cc: all counsel,USM,USP & PHONED) (fe, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/3/2000, Entered: 5/3/2000 warrant returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                          ARREST WARRANT executed as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams on 4/13/00 (crp, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/14/2000, Entered: 4/14/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael Burrage ; motion filing ddl set for 4/28/00 for Dennis Earl Williams ; response filing ddl set for 5/15/00 for Dennis Earl Williams ; PRETRIAL/MOTION/PLEA HRG set for 2:30 5/24/00 for Dennis Earl Williams ; REQ. V.D., TRIAL BRIEFS due by 6/12/00; JURY TRIAL set for 9:30 6/19/00 for Dennis Earl Williams (cc: all counsel) (fe, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/13/2000, Entered: 4/13/2000 bondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              BOND Posted ($20,000 Unsecured) by defendant Dennis Earl Williams; approved by: Magistrate Judge Eagan (sjm, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/13/2000, Entered: 4/13/2000 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER setting conditions of release for defendant Dennis Earl Williams by Magistrate Claire V. Eagan (sjm, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/13/2000, Entered: 4/13/2000 minutes - miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES: before Magistrate Claire V. Eagan; as to defendant Dennis Earl Williams; initial appearance of defendant Dennis Earl Williams; retained Attorney Patrick A Williams present; dft Dennis Earl Williams arraigned; NG plea entered; sched dates to be mailed; $20,000 Unsecured Bond with cons of release set for defendant Dennis Earl Williams, same executed and filed in open court. (sjm, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ARREST of defendant Dennis Earl Williams on 4/13/00 (sjm, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/7/2000, Entered: 4/7/2000 warrant issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ARREST Warrant issued for defendant Dennis Earl Williams (crp, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/5/2000, Entered: 4/6/2000 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                        INDICTMENT by plaintiff USA naming Dennis Earl Williams (1) count(s) 1-13 (fe, Dpty Clk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 24 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?