Warfield v. Corporation of Pres
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:01-cv-00325
District Judge Jerry Buchmeyer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 5, 2017 at 6:37 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lawrence J Warfield, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 830

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
as Receiver for Monolith Management, Inc and Moroni, LLC Mark David Tillman +1 214 492 5722 + 214 492 5720 mark.tillman@tb-llp.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Mark David Tillman +1 214 492 5722 + 214 492 5720 mark.tillman@tb-llp.com
v.
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: None
AMENDED NOTICE of voluntary dismissal. (2) (jaw) (Entered: 10/25/2001)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/16/2001, Entered: None
    NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. (2) (jaw) (Entered: 10/17/2001)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: None
      NOTICE of ADDRESS CHANGE by counsel for plaintiff Lawrence J Warfield New address is: Wayne B Mason, 1717 Main Street, Suite 5400, Dallas, TX 75201 (2) (vdf) (Entered: 05/15/2001)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: None
        CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by plaintiff Lawrence J Warfield (3) (vdf) (Entered: 02/21/2001)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/16/2001, Entered: None
          SUMMONS(ES) issued for defendant Corporation of Pres (Issued-1) (vdf) (Entered: 02/20/2001)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/16/2001, Entered: None
            ORIGINAL COMPLAINT filed; Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # 136507 (15+) (vdf) (Entered: 02/20/2001)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 8 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?