Stevick et al v. Monsanto Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-02341
Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 24, 2020 at 5:21 PM DT (1.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Christopher Stevick, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy A Litzenburg +1 560 672 4224 +1 540 672 3055 tlitzenburg@millerfirmllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Accessories International LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Miller +1 540 672 4224 +1 540 672 3055

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Collins, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Curtis George Hoke +1 540 672 4224 +1 540 682 3055 cghoke@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 950

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Brent Wisner +1 310 207 3233 +1 310 820 7444 rbwisner@baumhedlundlaw.com
No Logo Elaine Stevick, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy A Litzenburg +1 560 672 4224 +1 540 672 3055 tlitzenburg@millerfirmllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Collins, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Curtis George Hoke +1 540 672 4224 +1 540 682 3055 cghoke@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 950

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Brent Wisner +1 310 207 3233 +1 310 820 7444 rbwisner@baumhedlundlaw.com
v.
Monsanto Company Monsanto Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hollingsworth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Gordon Lasker +1 202 898 5843 +1 202 682 1639 elasker@spriggs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker Milliken Clark O'Hara & Samuelian APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Robert Platt +1 213 683 6500 +1 213 683 6669 splatt@pmcos.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker, Milliken, Clark, O'Hara & Samuelian

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Alden Clark +1 213 683 6500 +1 213 683 6669 rclark@pmcos.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
  Entries (74) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/24/2020, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Pretrial Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Proposed Form of Verdict
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Statement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Proposed Voir Dire
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/20/2020, Entered: None In Limine
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/20/2020, Entered: None Pretrial Conference Statement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/27/2019, Entered: None Strike
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/27/2019, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: None Pretrial Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: None Letter Brief
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Witness List
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/27/2017, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, rhondaaquilina@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (175 in 3:16-md-02741-VC) Transcript Order, (174 in 3:16-md-02741-VC) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/8/2017. (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 3/10/2017) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/24/2017, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (173 in 3:16-md-02741-VC) Transcript Order, (170 in 3:16-md-02741-VC) Transcript Order,,,,, ) Redaction Request due 3/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/7/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/5/2017. (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 3/7/2017) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE vacating any deadlines and hearing date set prior to the consolidation of this case into the MDL case, 16-md-2741-VC. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DISCOVERY LETTER. Motions terminated: (80 in 3:16-cv-00525-VC) Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Edward Hardeman. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 9/30/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE CHANGING THE TIME OF THE TELEPHONIC FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court will be in trial on the date of the conference and therefore needs to reset matters on his calendar. If there is any change to the conference dial-in information, the party previously responsible for providing the conference line number is required to update the number with the Court and opposing counsel by no later than 9/30/2016, at 2:00 p.m. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2016 02:15 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER REGARDING POSSIBLE APPOINTMENT OF AN INDEPENDENT EXPERT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/20/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  RULE 502(d) ORDER. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/1/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                    Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Miller.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                      Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Hollingsworth.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                        Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Lasker.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                          Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Litzenburg.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                            Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Platt, Steven) (Filed on 6/27/2016) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                              Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 21 Stipulation Governing Privilege Logs.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 19 Stipulated Protective and Confidentiality Order.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 18 Stipulation re Electronically Stored Information.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER. Dispositive and Daubert Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/24/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Vince Chhabria: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/21/2016. The Court will issue a scheduling order and review all of the pending stipulations and proposed orders. Case Management Statement due by 9/27/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Monsanto Company must provide the Court and opposing counsels in both matters a telephone conference line by no later than three court days prior to the CMC by way of email to the Court (vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov) and cc'ing opposing counsel. Total Time in Court 25 minutes. Hearing not reported or recorded. Plaintiff Attorney Lori Andrus, David Wool, and Aimee Wagstaff for Hardeman; Timothy Litzenburg, Robert Wisner, and Curtis Hoke for Stevick. Defendant Attorney Eric Lasker, Rosemary Stewart, and in-house counsel, Jennifer Kingston. This is a text only Minute Entry (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/21/2016) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Michael J Miller ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10544797.) filed by Christopher Stevick, Elaine Stevick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Litzenburg, Timothy) (Filed on 6/21/2016) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 14 Joint Case Management Statement [PROPOSED] RULE 502(d) ORDER by Monsanto Company. (Platt, Steven) (Filed on 6/16/2016) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 14 Joint Case Management Statement STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER GOVERNING PRIVILEGE LOGS filed by Monsanto Company. (Platt, Steven) (Filed on 6/16/2016) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting (48) Motion to Bifurcate in case 3:16-cv-00525-VC and in associated case 3:16-cv-02341-VC(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 14 Joint Case Management Statement STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE AND CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER filed by Monsanto Company. (Platt, Steven) (Filed on 6/16/2016) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 14 Joint Case Management Statement STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER GOVERNING PROTOCOL FOR DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION filed by Monsanto Company. (Platt, Steven) (Filed on 6/16/2016) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Joe G. Hollingsworth ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10530810.) filed by Monsanto Company. (Clark, Richard) (Filed on 6/15/2016) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE vacating the hearing re 48 MOTION to Bifurcate Discovery and rescheduling the case management conference in both related cases. The Court will issue a written ruling on the papers filed in relation to the motion to bifurcate. The CMC will be held telephonically. Monsanto Company must provide the Court and opposing counsels in both matters a telephone conference line by no later than three court days prior to the CMC by way of email to the Court (vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov) and cc'ing opposing counsel. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Eric G. Lasker ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10524055.) filed by Monsanto Company. (Clark, Richard) (Filed on 6/13/2016) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Attachments One through Five filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: # 1 Attachments 1 to 5 to Joint CMS)(Platt, Steven) (Filed on 6/9/2016) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company. (Platt, Steven) (Filed on 6/9/2016) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company (Platt, Steven) (Filed on 6/9/2016) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Robert Platt for Defendant Monsanto Company (Platt, Steven) (Filed on 6/9/2016) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Alden Clark for Defendant Monsanto Company (Clark, Richard) (Filed on 6/9/2016) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10505294.) filed by Christopher Stevick, Elaine Stevick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing)(Litzenburg, Timothy) (Filed on 6/6/2016) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Brent Wisner (Wisner, Robert) (Filed on 6/6/2016) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE SPECIALLY SETTING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN THIS MATTER TO BE HEARD WITH THE RELATED CASE ON 6/16/2016. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 6/9/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria to Relate Cases 16-cv-525-VC, Hardeman v. Monsanto Company, and 16-cv-2341-LB, Stevick v. Monsanto Company. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/20/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge due by 5/31/2016. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/21/2016. Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 5/13/2016. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10411003.). Filed byElaine Stevick, Christopher Stevick. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Hoke, Curtis) (Filed on 4/29/2016) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 411 times.

                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?