Kaur et al v. Long et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-00658
District Judge James C. Mahan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 23, 2017 at 7:59 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kanchan Paul, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley L Kenny +1 702 380 2800 +1 702 380 2833 bkenny@cpklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie A. Mersch +1 702 387 5868 +1 702 387 0109 jam@merschlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Mittin +1 702 380 2800 +1 702 380 2833 lmittin@cpklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leon R. Symanski +1 702 380 2800 +1 702 380 2833 lsymanski@cpklaw.com
No Logo Krishan Lal, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley L Kenny +1 702 380 2800 +1 702 380 2833 bkenny@cpklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie A. Mersch +1 702 387 5868 +1 702 387 0109 jam@merschlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Mittin +1 702 380 2800 +1 702 380 2833 lmittin@cpklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leon R. Symanski +1 702 380 2800 +1 702 380 2833 lsymanski@cpklaw.com
No Logo Kuldip Kaur, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Julie A. Mersch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie A. Mersch +1 702 387 5868 +1 702 387 0109 jam@merschlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White Meany & Wetherall, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley L Kenny +1 702 380 2800 +1 702 380 2833 bkenny@cpklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Mittin +1 702 380 2800 +1 702 380 2833 lmittin@cpklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leon R. Symanski +1 702 380 2800 +1 702 380 2833 lsymanski@cpklaw.com
No Logo Ranjana Paul, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley L Kenny +1 702 380 2800 +1 702 380 2833 bkenny@cpklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie A. Mersch +1 702 387 5868 +1 702 387 0109 jam@merschlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Mittin +1 702 380 2800 +1 702 380 2833 lmittin@cpklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leon R. Symanski +1 702 380 2800 +1 702 380 2833 lsymanski@cpklaw.com
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carbajal & McNutt, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel R McNutt +1 702 384 1170 +1 702 384 5529 drm@cmlawnv.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew C Wolf +1 702 384 1170 +1 702 384 5529 mcw@cmlawnv.com
No Logo Corporation Of The Presiding Bishop Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carbajal & McNutt, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel R McNutt +1 702 384 1170 +1 702 384 5529 drm@cmlawnv.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew C Wolf +1 702 384 1170 +1 702 384 5529 mcw@cmlawnv.com
v.
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carbajal & McNutt, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel R McNutt +1 702 384 1170 +1 702 384 5529 drm@cmlawnv.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew C Wolf +1 702 384 1170 +1 702 384 5529 mcw@cmlawnv.com
No Logo Corporation Of The Presiding Bishop Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carbajal & McNutt, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel R McNutt +1 702 384 1170 +1 702 384 5529 drm@cmlawnv.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew C Wolf +1 702 384 1170 +1 702 384 5529 mcw@cmlawnv.com
No Logo Marina Long, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KOLESAR & LEATHAM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/25/2015 NATALIE M. COX +1 702 362 7800 +1 702 362 1281 ncox@klnevada.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan J. Lefebvre +1 702 362 7800 +1 702 362 9472 alefebvre@klnevada.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William D. Schuller +1 702 362 7800 +1 702 362 9472 wschuller@klnevada.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of NILE LEATHAM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/25/2015 Ryan S Petersen +1 702 362 7800 +1 702 362 9472 rpetersen@klnevada.com
No Logo Krishan Lal, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley L Kenny +1 702 380 2800 +1 702 380 2833 bkenny@cpklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Mittin +1 702 380 2800 +1 702 380 2833 lmittin@cpklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leon R. Symanski +1 702 380 2800 +1 702 380 2833 lsymanski@cpklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 140

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Ernest Harper +1 702 948 9240 +1 702 778 6600 eservice@harperlawlv.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Counter Claimants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (Wolf, Matthew) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 44 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Settlement by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (McNutt, Daniel) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Change of Address by James Ernest Harper. (Harper, James) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER Granting 41 Joint Status Report Concerning the Discovery Stay and Medation Date. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER Granting 45 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice and for the parties to bear their own fees and costs. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None
            Joint STATUS REPORT Concerning the Discovery Stay and Mediation Date by Plaintiffs Kuldip Kaur, Krishan Lal, Kanchan Paul, Ranjana Paul. (Mersch, Julie) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER Granting 39 Stipulation to Stay Discovery and Motion Practice Pending a Private Mediation between the parties. Status Report due by 3/1/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None
                STIPULATION by Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Counter Claimants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (Wolf, Matthew) (Entered: 12/31/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 28 Motion Hearing held on 10/23/2015, before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc., 361-949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's Transcript Order form available on our website, at www.nvd.uscourts.gov, before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 1/4/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/14/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/13/2016. (ABB) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    SCHEDULING ORDER Granting 36 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines re Discovery due by 3/8/2016. Motions due by 4/8/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/7/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/11/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None
                      STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) re Discovery by Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Counter Claimants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (Wolf, Matthew) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None
                        Interim STATUS REPORT Joint by Plaintiffs Kuldip Kaur, Krishan Lal, Kanchan Paul, Ranjana Paul. (Mersch, Julie) (Entered: 12/08/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                          SCHEDULING ORDER re 33 Stipulation concerning the Deadlines in the Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/8/2016. Motions due by 3/8/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/7/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
                            STIPULATION re Discovery by Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Counter Claimants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (Wolf, Matthew) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER Granting 31 Stipulation to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims for Lost Wages. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None
                                STIPULATION by Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Counter Claimants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (Wolf, Matthew) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Julie A. Mersch on behalf of Plaintiffs Kuldip Kaur, Krishan Lal, Kanchan Paul, Ranjana Paul. (Mersch, Julie) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None
                                    SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Dr. Jeffery Muir (Wolf, Matthew) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 10/23/2015 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: E. Garcia; Pla Counsel: Lawrence Mittin; Def Counsel: Daniel McNutt, Matthew Wolfe and William Schuller; Court Reporter/FTR #: 9:24a.m. - 9:53a.m.; Courtroom: 3A; The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel as to 21 Emergency Motion to Extend Time Regarding Discovery/Nondispositive Matter (First Request).The Court grants in part the emergency motion. The discovery period and all other relevant deadlines are extended by eight (8) weeks. Plaintiff Lal shall supplement and amend his answers to interrogatories regarding his claimed head injury.Within two (2) weeks, plaintiffs' shall provide a computation of their special damages, including medical expenses and loss of income claims if applicable, past and future.The Court will not award attorneys' fees or costs or Interpreter's fees as discussed in open court today. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EMG) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None
                                        REPLY to Response to 21 Motion to Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Discovery or Nondispositive matter, filed by Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Counter Claimants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Wolf, Matthew) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                          RESPONSE to 21 Motion to Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Discovery or Nondispositive matter,, filed by Plaintiffs Kuldip Kaur, Krishan Lal, Kanchan Paul, Ranjana Paul. Replies due by 10/25/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1, # 2 Exhibit No. 2, # 3 Exhibit No. 3, # 4 Exhibit No. 4, # 5 Exhibit No. 5, # 6 Exhibit No. 6, # 7 Exhibit No. 7, # 8 Exhibit No. 8, # 9 Exhibit No. 9, # 10 Exhibit No. 10, # 11 Exhibit No. 11, # 12 Exhibit No. 12, # 13 Exhibit No. 13, # 14 Exhibit No. 14, # 15 Exhibit No. 15, # 16 Exhibit No. 16, # 17 Exhibit No. 17, # 18 Exhibit No. 18, # 19 Exhibit No. 19, # 20 Exhibit No. 20)(Symanski, Leon) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
                                            JOINDER to 21 Motion to Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Discovery or Nondispositive matter, ; filed by Defendant Marina Long. (Schuller, William) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr, on 10/13/2015. By Judicial Assistant: Julia Wright. RE: 21 Defendants' Emergency MOTION to Extend Discovery Deadlines or Exclude Evidence Motion Hearing set for Friday, October 23, 2015, at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr.If the Court denies the Motion to Exclude Evidence, it will grant a reasonable extension of the rebuttal expert deadline. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JBW) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                Joint STATUS REPORT Interim Status Report by Plaintiff Krishan Lal. (Symanski, Leon) (Entered: 10/12/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                  APPENDIX to 21 Motion to Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Discovery or Nondispositive matter, ; filed by Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Counter Claimants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T)(Wolf, Matthew) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                    Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/nondispositive matter (First Request) by Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Counter Claimants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (Wolf, Matthew) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 17 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines in the Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order 15 . (First Request) New Deadlines: Discovery cut-off: 12/14/2015; Deadline to Amend the Pleadings and Add parties: 9/14/2015; Initial Expert Disclosure: 10/13/2015; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure: 11/13/15; Interim Status Report: 10/13/2015; Dispositive Motions: 12/11/2015; and Proposed Joint Pretrial Order: 1/11/2016., Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/26/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Change of Attorney by Marina Long. (Schuller, William) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William D. Schuller on behalf of Defendant Marina Long. (Schuller, William) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                            STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Counter Claimants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (Wolf, Matthew) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                              ANSWER to 14 Counterclaim filed by Krishan Lal.(Harper, James) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER re 12 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order,. Discovery due by 10/12/2015. Motions due by 11/11/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/11/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/7/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  COUNTERCLAIM against Krishan Lal, filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (Wolf, Matthew) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint re 1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Marina Long.(Cox, Natalie) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints . (Wolf, Matthew) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (Wolf, Matthew) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          STATEMENT RE: REMOVAL filed by Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (Wolf, Matthew) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Marina Long. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Cox, Natalie) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint re 1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Marina Long.(Cox, Natalie) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiffs Kuldip Kaur, Krishan Lal, Kanchan Paul, Ranjana Paul . (Kenny, Bradley) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Kuldip Kaur, Krishan Lal, Kanchan Paul, Ranjana Paul. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Kenny, Bradley) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/25/2015. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/30/2015.(Wolf, Matthew) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 4/10/2015. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/28/2015. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (EDS) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Wolf, Matthew) Corrected filing party. (ASB) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-15-714996-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-3624298), filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. Proof of service due by 7/8/2015. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/20/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit) (Wolf, Matthew) Corrected filing party. (ASB) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 65 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?