Rosemore v. Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Alaska District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-00014
District Judge Timothy M. Burgess, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 10:53 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ben E. Rosemore, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Kevin Williams +1 907 264 6630 +1 907 264 6602 lodkw@outlook.com
v.
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Paul H. Bratton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank S. Koziol Jr. +1 907 258 7706 +1 907 258 7707 koziol@gci.net
No Logo Corporation Of The Presiding Bishop Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Paul H. Bratton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank S. Koziol Jr. +1 907 258 7706 +1 907 258 7707 koziol@gci.net
No Logo Jacob D. Eliason, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Paul H. Bratton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank S. Koziol Jr. +1 907 258 7706 +1 907 258 7707 koziol@gci.net
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
Certifield Mail Returned Receipt received on 3/17/11 from State of Alaska. Certified #7003 0500 0004 1668 0583. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    JUDGMENT case is REMANDED back to the Alaska Superior Court for the State of Alaska, Third Judicial District at Anchorage, AK. Case No. 3AN-10-13117 CI. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 3/15/11. cc: Alaska Superior Court(RMC, COURT STAFF) (RMC, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/15/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 10 Stipulation; case is remanded back to Alaska Superior Court for the State of Alaska case 3AN-10-13117 CI. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 3/9/11. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
        Stipulation to Remand Case Back to Alaska Superior Court by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Jacob D. Eliason (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Koziol, Frank) Modified on 3/10/2011 to correct event type. (RMC, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/08/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None
          INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report by 3/8/2011. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Demand for Jury Trial by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Jacob D. Eliason (Koziol, Frank) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
              ANSWER to Complaint by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Jacob D. Eliason.(Koziol, Frank) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Appearance by Frank S. Koziol, Jr on behalf of Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Jacob D. Eliason (Koziol, Frank) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                  NOTICE Advising State Court Pleadings, Process and Orders Previously Filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Jacob D. Eliason (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Service of Process, # 2 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal)(Koziol, Frank) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Jacob D. Eliason (Koziol, Frank) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                      MINUTE ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal. Petitioners to file within 20 days state court docs and within 10 days service list, if not already done. (NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                        Civil Cover Sheet. (NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Jacob D. Eliason from State of Alaska 3rd Judicial District at Anchorage, case number 3AN-10-13117CI. ( Filing fee $ 350 Receipt #ANC003284) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-State Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - Summons, # 3 Exhibit C-Summons)(NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 60 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?