Welt v. Latter-Day Saints
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:01-cv-06362
District Judge Joan A. Lenard, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 2:15 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kenneth A Welt, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BERGER SINGERMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexandra Marisela Sarmiento +1 305 714 4361

Toggle Switch Represented by Common Ground Mediation, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Harris Fierberg +1 305 804 4262 jfierberg@rprslaw.com
v.
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott L Baena, Esq +1 305 350 2403 +1 305 374 7593 sbaena@bilzin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard J. Bernard +1 212 338 3586 +1 212 687 2329 rbernard@foley.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 0157
Nature of Suit 423 - Bankruptcy Withdrawal, Rule 28 U.S.C. ยง 157
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying [1-1] complaint/motion to withdraw reference; this case is CLOSED (Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 8/17/01) [EOD Date: 8/20/01] (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/20/2001)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None
    RESPONSE to [3-1] Order to Show Cause by Kenneth A. Welt (Attorney Alexandra Marisela Sarmiento) (sk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/10/2001)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE plaintiff to show why the motion to withdraw reference should not be granted; Response to Order to Show Cause due 8/20/01 ( Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 8/2/01) [EOD Date: 8/3/01] (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/03/2001)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/8/2001, Entered: None
        Transmittal of Motion to Withdraw Reference to the District Court Filed in BKC on: 1/24/01 and Acknowledgment by District Court of receipt of documents Entered on Docket in USDC: 3/8/01 CCAP. (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/08/2001)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/8/2001, Entered: None
          Complaint for Withdrawal of Referenc; A-7; WCT (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/08/2001)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 81 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?