Pirente v. GAB Robins, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Idaho District Court, Case No. 4:98-cv-00341
District Judge B. Lynn Winmill, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 2:51 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo David Bryan Pirente, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Norman Grant Reece, Jr. +1 208 233 0128 +1 208 233 4895 normreecelaw@aol.com
v.
No Logo Bryan Davis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COOPER & LARSEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R Ron Kerl +1 208 235 1145 Ron@cooper-larsen.com
No Logo Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, The, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COOPER & LARSEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R Ron Kerl +1 208 235 1145 Ron@cooper-larsen.com
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COOPER & LARSEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R Ron Kerl +1 208 235 1145 Ron@cooper-larsen.com
No Logo Corporation Of The Presiding Bishop Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COOPER & LARSEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R Ron Kerl +1 208 235 1145 Ron@cooper-larsen.com
No Logo GAB Robins North American Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by BOWEN & BAILEY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/05/2000, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert D Bowen +1 208 344 7200

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Howard B. Cohen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David V Nielsen +1 208 336 5525 +1 208 336 8848 nielsendavidv@qwestoffice.net
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (106) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: None
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re judgment [105-1] as to Church of Latter Day, Corp of the Pres, Corp of the Presid (wm) (Entered: 11/04/2004)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT: by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill Judgment that dft shall pay pla in the amount of $ 5,043.15 in back wages, reduced by the costs of $1,385.45; (cc: all counsel) (JUDGMENT SCANNED) (wm)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: None
      MEMORANDUM, DECISION, AND ORDER: by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill ; Case Mgmt ddl set for 1/2/03 for dft to pay pla the back wages less the $1,385.45 of costs plus interest (cc: all counsel) (wm)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None
        AFFIDAVIT of David Berrett regarding memorandum [101-1] (wm) (Entered: 10/15/2002)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None
          AFFIDAVIT of Ron Kerl regarding memorandum [101-1] (wm) (Entered: 10/15/2002)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None
            LDS DFTS MEMORANDUM re Pirente wage claim (wm) (Entered: 10/15/2002)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None
              AFFIDAVIT of Norman G. Reece, Jr. regarding [98-1] (wm) (Entered: 10/15/2002)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None
                SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of D. Bryan Pirente regarding [98-1] (wm) (Entered: 10/15/2002)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None
                  SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN BACK WAGES by pla (wm) (Entered: 10/15/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: None
                    ORDER by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill granting stipulation that the deadline for submitting affidavits or other evidence on the issue of back wages be extended 14 days to 10/11/02 [96-1] (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 09/26/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: None
                      STIPULATION that the deadline for submitting affidavits or other evidence on the issue of back wages be extended 14 days to 10/11/02 (ja) (Entered: 09/25/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF HEARING ; Teleconf set for 10/1/02 is VACATED (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 08/30/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/29/2002, Entered: None
                          ORDER by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill ; Case Mgmt ddl set for 9/27/02 for parties to submit affidavits and/or supplemental briefs re: back wages (cc: all counsel) (wm) Modified on 09/30/2002
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/23/2002, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ; Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10:00 10/1/02 before BLW (wm)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: None
                              MANDATE from Circuit Court of Appeals affirming in part, reversing in part and remanding the decision of the District Court on appeal [85-1] (rr)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/8/2001, Entered: None
                                ORDER of the 9th Circuit cancelling the intended in-person mediation. Briefing schedule reinstated. (rr)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: None
                                  CERTIFICATE of Record; cc: attys, 9CCA (rr)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/1/2000, Entered: None
                                    TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering Form - Transcripts Necessary 2/9/00 (rr)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: None
                                      TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering Form - Transcripts Necessary 2/9/00 (rr) (Entered: 10/18/2000)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None
                                        COSTS taxed for def Corp of the Presid in the amount of $ 1385.45 against pla David Bryan Pirente (cc: all counsel) (dkh)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/28/2000, Entered: None
                                          Representation Statement by plaintiff David Bryan Pirente (rr) (Entered: 10/02/2000)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/28/2000, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff David Bryan Pirente from Dist. Court decision [83-2], [82-1], [70-1] (Receipt # 11791) (rr) (Entered: 10/02/2000)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: None
                                              BILL OF COSTS by def Corp of the Presiding Bishop, LDS Church re judgment [83-2] ; Taxation ddl set for 10/10/00 (dkh)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: None
                                                JUDGMENT: by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill Judgment for defs ; dismissing case (cc: all counsel) (JUDGMENT SCANNED) (dkh) (Entered: 09/07/2000)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: None
                                                  ORDER by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill adopting REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION [70-1] granting motion for summary judgment [19-1], granting motion for summary judgment [17-1] (cc: all counsel) (dkh) (Entered: 09/07/2000)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: None
                                                    ORDER by Magistrate Mikel H. Williams granting stipulation for substitution of counsel for pla [79-1] (cc: all counsel) (dkh) (Entered: 09/07/2000)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: None
                                                      BRIEF by pla David Bryan Pirente in opposition re: motion to strike the second affidavit of Nick L. Nielson [78-1] (dkh) (Entered: 08/30/2000)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: None
                                                        STIPULATION for substitution of counsel for pla (dkh) (Entered: 08/30/2000)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION by def GAB Robins to strike the second affidavit of Nick L. Nielson (wm) (Entered: 07/25/2000)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: None
                                                            RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by def GAB Robins re: Report and Recommendation [70-1] (wm) (Entered: 07/25/2000)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: None
                                                              RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by dfts Church of Latter Day, Corp of the Pres, Corp of the Presid, Bryan Davis re: Report and Recommendation [70-1] (wm) (Entered: 07/25/2000)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                                SECOND AFFIDAVIT of Nick L Nielson re: REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that motion for summary judgment should be granted [17-1], motion for summary judgment should be granted [19-1] and pla's complaint should be dismissed in its entirety [70-1] (dkh) (Entered: 07/19/2000)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                                  OBJECTION by pla David Bryan Pirente to Report and Recommendation [70-1] (dkh) (Entered: 07/19/2000)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/3/2000, Entered: None
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Nick L. Nielson regarding motion to extend time to file objection to R&R [72-1] (dkh) (Entered: 07/07/2000)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/3/2000, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION by pla David Bryan Pirente to extend time to file objection to R&R (dkh) (Entered: 07/07/2000)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: None
                                                                        ORDER by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill ; re Report and Recommendation [70-1] ; obj to rpt and rec ddl extended to 7/14/00 (cc: all counsel) (dkh) (Entered: 07/06/2000)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: None
                                                                          REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that motion for summary judgment should be granted [17-1], motion for summary judgment should be granted [19-1] and pla's complaint should be dismissed in its entirety by Magistrate Mikel H. Williams (cc: all counsel) (dkh) Modified on 07/17/2000
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/5/2000, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of taking deposition duces tecum of Anna Lee Ashcraft 5/24/00 (dkh) (Entered: 05/10/2000)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: None
                                                                              ORDER by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill ; Jury trial set for 1/29/01 1:30 Pocatello ; Pretrial conference set for 8:00 (cc: all counsel) (dkh) (Entered: 04/21/2000)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/11/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                ORDER by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill ; Teleconf set for 4/13/00 11:00 to establish new trial date ; Jury trial vacated 4/11/00 ; Pretrial conference vacated 4/11/00 (cc: all counsel) (dkh) (Entered: 04/13/2000)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/31/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                  ORDER by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill denying motion to continue trial date of 4/24/00 [63-1] (cc: all counsel) (dkh) (Entered: 04/03/2000)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/31/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                    REPLY by pla David Bryan Pirente to response to motion to continue trial date of 4/24/00 [63-1] (dkh) (Entered: 04/03/2000)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                      OBJECTION by defs to motion to continue trial date of 4/24/00 [63-1] (dkh) (Entered: 04/03/2000)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION by pla David Bryan Pirente to continue trial date of 4/24/00 (dkh)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER by Magistrate Mikel H. Williams to complete discovery depositions by 3/24/00 (cc: all counsel) (dkh)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/9/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                            SUPPLEMENT TO EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE by defs (dkh) (Entered: 02/11/2000)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/9/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                              MINUTES OF PENDING MOTIONS - finding moot the motion to extend time to file a reply brief [48-1], taking under advisement on 2/9/00 the motion for summary judgment [19-1], and the motion for summary judgment [17-1] ; All Pending Motions Hrg held 2/9/00 MHW (dkh)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/28/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING (Time Change) ;All Pending Motions Hrg set for 2/9/00 10:30 Pocatello (cc: all counsel) (dkh) (Entered: 02/01/2000)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                  REBUTTAL WITNESS DISCLOSURE by pla David Bryan Pirente (dkh) (Entered: 01/26/2000)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/18/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING ; All Pending Motions Hrg set for 2/9/2000 8:00 Pocatello (cc: all counsel) (dkh) (Entered: 01/19/2000)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/21/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENT by dfts Church of Latter Day, Corp of the Pres, Corp of the Presid, Bryan Davis re list [52-1] (wm) (Entered: 12/28/1999)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/15/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Ron Kerl regarding motion for summary judgment [17-1] (dkh) (Entered: 12/20/1999)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/15/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                          REPLY by LDS defs to response to motion for summary judgment [17-1] (dkh) (Entered: 12/20/1999)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/10/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                            EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE by def GAB Robins (dkh)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/2/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                              DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Church defs (dkh) (Entered: 12/09/1999)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/6/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                ORDER by Magistrate Mikel H. Williams granting motion to extend time to file disclosure of expert witnesses [50-1] DDL 12/10/99 (cc: all counsel) (dkh) (Entered: 12/07/1999)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/2/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION by def GAB Robins to extend time to file disclosure of expert witnesses (dkh) (Entered: 12/03/1999)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/29/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    REPLY by pla David Bryan Pirente to response to motion for summary judgment [19-1] (dkh)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/23/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION by "Church" defs to extend time to file a reply brief (dkh) (Entered: 11/29/1999)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/24/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS by pla David Bryan Pirente in support of motion for summary judgment [19-1], in support of motion for summary judgment [17-1] (dkh)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/24/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          ORDER by Magistrate Mikel H. Williams granting motion to exceed page limit on statement of facts [40-1] (cc: all counsel) (dkh)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Nick L Nielson regarding motion for summary judgment [19-1], regarding motion for summary judgment [17-1] (Exhibits not scanned) (dkh)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Jerry Hastings regarding motion for summary judgment [19-1], regarding motion for summary judgment [17-1] (dkh)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Glenn Walker regarding motion for summary judgment [19-1], regarding motion for summary judgment [17-1] (dkh)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of David Bryan Pirente regarding motion for summary judgment [19-1], regarding motion for summary judgment [17-1] (dkh)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by pla David Bryan Pirente to motion for summary judgment [19-1], motion for summary judgment [17-1] (dkh)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION by pla David Bryan Pirente to exceed page limit on statement of facts (dkh)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of taking deposition duces tecum of Richard Saxton 11/8/99 (dkh) (Entered: 10/29/1999)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of taking deposition duces tecum of Dennis M Charney 11/8/99 (dkh) (Entered: 10/29/1999)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/15/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT [2-1] by plaintiff; jury demand (wm) (Entered: 10/19/1999)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/12/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE by pla David Bryan Pirente (dkh) (Entered: 10/13/1999)
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/1/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION by def GAB Robins re: motion to extend time to respond to LDS Def's and GAB's motions for summary judgment [30-1] (dkh) (Entered: 10/04/1999)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/1/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Magistrate Mikel H. Williams granting motion to extend time to respond to LDS Def's and GAB's motions for summary judgment [30-1] motion for summary judgment [19-1] ; Response to motion ddl extended to 11/15/99, motion for summary judgment [17-1] ; Response to motion ddl extended to 11/15/99 (cc: all counsel) (dkh)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/1/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by def GAB Robins in support of motion for summary judgment [19-1] (dkh)
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/1/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Magistrate Mikel H. Williams granting motion to exceed page limit on memorandum in support of motion for summary judgment [16-1] (cc: all counsel) (dkh)
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/27/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Nick L Nielson regarding motion to extend time to respond to LDS Def's and GAB's motions for summary judgment [30-1] (dkh) (Entered: 09/29/1999)
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/27/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by pla David Bryan Pirente to extend time to respond to LDS Def's and GAB's motions for summary judgment (dkh) (Entered: 09/29/1999)
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/22/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by defs in support of motion for summary judgment [17-1] (dkh)
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/22/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill granting motion to exceed page limit on memorandum in support of motion for summary judgment [27-1] (cc: all counsel) (dkh)
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by def GAB Robins to exceed page limit on memorandum in support of motion for summary judgment (dkh)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by def GAB Robins regarding motion for summary judgment and related pleadings (dkh)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Dennis Charney regarding motion for summary judgment [19-1] (dkh)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Pat Ramey regarding motion for summary judgment [19-1] (dkh)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Robie Arnell regarding motion for summary judgment [19-1] (dkh)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Shellie Martin regarding motion for summary judgment [19-1] (dkh)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of David V Nielsen regarding motion for summary judgment [19-1] (dkh)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS by def GAB Robins in support of motion for summary judgment [19-1] (dkh)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by def GAB Robins for summary judgment (dkh)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Ron Kerl regarding motion for summary judgment [17-1] (dkh) (Entered: 09/13/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by defs for summary judgment (dkh) (Entered: 09/13/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by defs to exceed page limit on memorandum in support of motion for summary judgment (dkh) (Entered: 09/13/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/3/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Magistrate Mikel H. Williams granting motion to amend verified amended complaint and demand for jury trial [13-1] (cc: all counsel) (dkh)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/26/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION by defs to motion to amend verified amended complaint and demand for jury trial [13-1] (dkh) (Entered: 08/30/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by pla David Bryan Pirente to amend verified amended complaint and demand for jury trial (dkh) (Entered: 08/26/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of taking deposition duces tecum of Shellie Martin on 8/17/99 (wm) (Entered: 08/03/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of taking deposition duces tecum of Rob Arnell on 8/17/99 (wm) (Entered: 08/03/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/19/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Magistrate Mikel H. Williams granting motion to extend time to file motion to amend pleading [8-1] DDL 8/24/99 (cc: counsel) (dkh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/23/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Nick L Nielson regarding motion to extend time to file motion to amend pleading [8-1] (dkh) (Entered: 06/24/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/23/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by pla David Bryan Pirente to extend time to file motion to amend pleading (dkh) (Entered: 06/24/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/23/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill ; Telephonic Status Conference held 3/10/99 ; Discovery ddl set for 2/25/2000 ; Disp Motion ddl set 11/19/99 ; Jury Trial 4/24/2000 1:30 Pocatello ; Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2000 8:30 Case referred to Magistrate Mikel H. Williams for all pretrial matters. (cc: all counsel) (dkh) (Entered: 03/24/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/3/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by pla and def (dkh) (Entered: 03/04/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/5/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE VIA TELEPHONE ; Teleconf set for 3/10/99 11:00 (cc: all counsel) (dkh) (Entered: 02/08/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER by defs Church of Latter Day, Corp of the Pres, Corp of the Presid and Bryan Davis; jury demand (dkh) (Entered: 01/19/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER by def GAB Robins to amended complaint; jury demand (dkh) (Entered: 01/19/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/13/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  VERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by pla David Bryan Pirente; jury demand (dkh) (Entered: 10/14/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT No Summons Issued (rkb) (Entered: 09/03/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 34 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?