USA v. Great SL Council
Federal Civil Lawsuit Utah District Court, Case No. 2:04-cv-00604
District Judge Tena Campbell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 5, 2017 at 11:42 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Eric A. Overby

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric A. Overby +1 801 325 3233

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jeannette F. Swent

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeannette F. Swent +1 801 524 5682

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Stephen J. Sorenson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/13/2006 Stephen J. Sorenson +1 801 524 5682

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Jo Oliver +1 801 524 5796 +1 801 524 3558 olivera@sec.gov
v.
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kipp & Christian

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael F. Skolnick +1 801 521 3773 mfskolnick@kippandchristian.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of J. Kevin Murphy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Kevin Murphy +1 801 983 9800 kmurphy@eolawoffice.com
No Logo Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kipp & Christian

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael F. Skolnick +1 801 521 3773 mfskolnick@kippandchristian.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirton & McConkie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason W. Beutler +1 801 328 3600
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian S. Collins +1 801 328 3600
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert R Wallace +1 801 328 3600 rwallace@kmclaw.com
No Logo Peoa Corporation of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kipp & Christian

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael F. Skolnick +1 801 521 3773 mfskolnick@kippandchristian.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of J. Kevin Murphy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Kevin Murphy +1 801 983 9800 kmurphy@eolawoffice.com
No Logo Does I - III, ThirdParty Defendant
No Logo Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America, ThirdParty Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirton & McConkie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert R Wallace +1 801 328 3600 rwallace@kmclaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1345
Nature of Suit 240 - Real Property: Torts to Land
  Entries (135) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 11, 2007-Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment before Judge Tena Campbell. Court Reporter: Raymond P. Fenlon. (jmr) (Entered: 08/20/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 134 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice - CASE CLOSED. Judge Samuel Alba no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 5/17/07 (alt) (Entered: 05/18/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None
      Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Defendant Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal with Prejudice)(Wallace, Robert) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 131 Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion. The filer selected the wrong filing event as a "Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion" is only to be used when replying in further SUPPORT of one's own motion. The court asks the filer of the original document to review the e-filing newsletter of February 2006 re: proper use of motion-related filing events and then refile the pleading using a filing event that would relate to an opposing partys motion. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket (alt) (Entered: 02/20/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
          RESPONSE re 106 Objections,, (United States' Second Objections to Defendants' Pretrial Disclosures) filed by Defendant Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (1 of 4) Affidavit of Michael F. Skolnick# 2 Exhibit A (2 of 4) Affidavit of Michael F. Skolnick# 3 Exhibit A (3 of 4) Affidavit of Michael F. Skolnick# 4 Exhibit A (4 of 4) Affidavit of Michael F. Skolnick# 5 Exhibit B - deposition notices)(Skolnick, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
            WRONG FILING EVENT USED TO RELATE TO OPPOSING PARTYS MOTION - REPLY to Response to Motion re 113 Third MOTION in Limine to Exclude from Trial the Expert Testimony of Stephen Hagland filed by Defendant Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (1 of 4) Affidavit of Michael F. Skolnick# 2 Exhibit A (2 of 4) Affidavit of Michael F. Skolnick# 3 Exhibit A (3 of 4) Affidavit of Michael F. Skolnick# 4 Exhibit A (4 of 4) Affidavit of Michael F. Skolnick# 5 Exhibit B - deposition notices)(Skolnick, Michael) Modified on 2/20/2007: broke link to motion and added error text per Notice 133 (alt) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
              Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Support re 129 Defendant's MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Relating to Breach of Duty filed by Defendant Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America. (Wallace, Robert) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                Defendant's MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Relating to Breach of Duty filed by Defendant Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America. (Wallace, Robert) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                  Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Support re 127 Defendant's MOTION in Limine to Exclude Documents from Jolie Pollet and Contracts from BLM and USDA Forest Service filed by Defendant Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Wallace, Robert) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                    Defendant's MOTION in Limine to Exclude Documents from Jolie Pollet and Contracts from BLM and USDA Forest Service filed by Defendant Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America. (Wallace, Robert) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                      Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 96 MOTION to Bifurcate Trial filed by Defendant Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Wallace, Robert) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 124 Sixth MOTION in Limine re testimony of Eggett and Marchant filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exb A Eggett Deposition transcript# 2 Exhibit B Marchant deposition transcript)(Overby, Eric) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                          Sixth MOTION in Limine re testimony of Eggett and Marchant filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Overby, Eric) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 122 Fifth MOTION in Limine re lightning witness and data filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Overby, Eric) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                              Fifth MOTION in Limine re lightning witness and data filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Overby, Eric) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 120 Fourth MOTION in Limine re Ritucci and dirt samples filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Overby, Eric) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                                  Fourth MOTION in Limine re Ritucci and dirt samples filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Overby, Eric) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                                    Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Support re 118 Defendant's MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Insurance Coverage filed by Defendant Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wallace, Robert) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                                      Defendant's MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Insurance Coverage filed by Defendant Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America. (Wallace, Robert) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                                        Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 103 Second MOTION in Limine regarding Fire Restriction Order Violation filed by Defendant Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America. (Wallace, Robert) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: None
                                          Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 98 First MOTION in Limine regarding discretionary function exception of Comparative Fault or Failure to Mitigate Damages filed by Defendant Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America. (Wallace, Robert) (Entered: 02/14/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Tena Campbell: Final Pretrial Conference held on 2/12/2007. The Court sets motion filing deadline for 2/15/2007. The Court will hear pending motions on 2/20/2007 at 1:00 PM, re: 98 First MOTION in Limine regarding discretionary function exception, 103 Second MOTION in Limine regarding Fire Restriction Order Violation, 113 Third MOTION in Limine, 96 MOTION to Bifurcate. 10 day jury trisl is set for 3/5/2007 at 8:30 a.m. Attorney for Plaintiff: Amy Oliver, Eric Overby Jeannette Swent, Attorney for Defendant Michael Skolnick, Robert Wallace.Court Reporter: Ray Fenlon. (mjm) (Entered: 02/14/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None
                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 113 Third MOTION in Limine filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Overby, Eric) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                Third MOTION in Limine filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Overby, Eric) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Skolnick on behalf of Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America (Skolnick, Michael) (Entered: 02/08/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                    Modification of Docket: Error: wrong filer of 3rd-pty complaint was named in entry text. Correction: GSLC-BSA named as filer of 3rd-pty complaint, re: 110 Order on Motion to Dismiss (alt) (Entered: 02/07/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 107 Motion to Dismiss LDS Church Defendants and the GSLC-BSA's third-party complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 2/6/06 (alt) Modified on 2/7/2007: corrected text to indicate actual filer of 3rd-pty complaint (alt) (Entered: 02/07/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                        RESPONSE to Defendants' Objection to Plaintiff's Pretrial Disclosures filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Overby, Eric) (Entered: 02/06/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF FILING of Statement of Breach of Duty by The Defendant Great Salt Lake Council, Inc. filed by Defendant Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America. (Wallace, Robert) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints., Peoa Corporation of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Stipulation to Dismissal# 2 Appendix Proposed Order of Dismissal)(Skolnick, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                              OBJECTIONS to 91 Witness List(Proposed), Witness List(Proposed) filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Letter to Counsel, August 31, 2006# 2 Exhibit B Letter to Counsel September 6, 2006# 3 Exhibit C Draft Report# 4 Exhibit D Disclaimer)(Overby, Eric) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 101 Stipulation. The document requires the judge's ruling and so should have been filed as a Motion in order for a ruling to issue. The 'Stipulation' filing event cannot be used in most instances due to the constraints of DUCivR 83-6. The court asks the filer of the original document to refile the pleading as a Motion to Dismiss. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket (alt) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 103 Second MOTION in Limine regarding Fire Restriction Order Violation filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Order)(Overby, Eric) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                    Second MOTION in Limine regarding Fire Restriction Order Violation filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Overby, Eric) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Amy J. Oliver on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Oliver, Amy) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                        ERROR: MUST BE REFILED AS MOTION - STIPULATION (for dismissal of LDS Church defendants) by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints., Peoa Corporation of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Proposed Order to dismiss LDS Church defendants)(Skolnick, Michael) Modified on 2/5/2007: error text added per Notice #105 (alt) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          OBJECTIONS to 91 Witness List(Proposed), Witness List(Proposed) filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Overby, Eric) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 98 First MOTION in Limine regarding discretionary function exception filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Overby, Eric) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                              First MOTION in Limine regarding discretionary function exception filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Overby, Eric) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 96 MOTION to Bifurcate filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Overby, Eric) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION to Bifurcate filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Motions referred to Samuel Alba.(Overby, Eric) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    TRIAL ORDER with instructions to counsel: 10-day Jury Trial set for 3/5/2007 08:30 AM before Judge Tena Campbell; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2007 03:00 PM before Judge Tena Campbell; In Chambers Conference set for 3/5/2007 08:00 AM before Judge Tena Campbell. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 1/29/07 (alt) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Def Objections to Pltf's Disclosures of Witnesses & Exhibits by Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Wallace, Robert) (Entered: 01/29/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting 89 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Samuel Alba on 1/17/07 (alt) (Entered: 01/22/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER & MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 1/22/07 (alt) (Entered: 01/22/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                            Proposed Witness List and Exhibits (Pretrial Disclosures of all Defendants) by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints., Peoa Corporation of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Skolnick, Michael) (Entered: 01/18/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Tena Campbell : Motion Hearing held on 1/11/2007, re: 72 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. The Court hears oral argument and takes the motion under advisement. Attorney for Plaintiff: Amy Oliver, Eric Overby, Jeannette Swent, Attorney for Defendant Michal Skolnick, Robert Wallace. Court Reporter: Ray Fenlon.(mjm) (Entered: 01/17/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Serve Rule 26(A)(3) Disclosures filed by Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints., Peoa Corporation of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File and Serve Rule 26(A)(3) Disclosures) Motions referred to Samuel Alba.(Skolnick, Michael) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Proposed Witness List (Pretrial Disclosures) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Overby, Eric) (Entered: 01/03/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time Serving Rule 26 Disclosures filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting extension)(Overby, Eric) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 85 Motion for Stephen J. Sorenson to Withdraw as attorney. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 12/13/06 (alt) (Entered: 12/14/2006)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw Counsel filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sorenson, Stephen) (Entered: 12/12/2006)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 72 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Overby, Eric) (Entered: 12/07/2006)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints., Peoa Corporation of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints on Notice of Continued Deposition of Cynthia Czabolzadeh (Skolnick, Michael) (Entered: 12/01/2006)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 80 Motion for Extension of Time for USA to file reply re: Motion for Partial Summary Jgm. Reply due: 12/7/06. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 11/20/06.(blk, ) (Entered: 11/20/2006)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints., Peoa Corporation of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints on Amended Notices of Depositions of Ron Raley and Gene Mannelin (Skolnick, Michael) (Entered: 11/15/2006)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time Reply to Opposition to Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting extension)(Overby, Eric) (Entered: 11/14/2006)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America of Modified Rule 26 Disclosures (Wallace, Robert) (Entered: 11/10/2006)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. of Deposition Notice duces Tecum of Tina Ledger (Skolnick, Michael) (Entered: 11/08/2006)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. On Notice of Depositions (Skolnick, Michael) (Entered: 11/08/2006)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: 72 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Dft GSLC and BSA : Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2007 at 3:00 PM in Room 230 before Judge Tena Campbell. (mjm) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 72 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P# 17 Exhibit Q# 18 Exhibit R# 19 Exhibit S# 20 Exhibit T)(Wallace, Robert) (Entered: 11/01/2006)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's re 73 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order of United States' Motion to Seal its Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Attached Exhibits)(Swent, Jeannette) (Entered: 10/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 72 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - White depo# 2 Exhibit B Stage I FRO# 3 Exhibit C - Springer declaration# 4 Exhibit D - Jepson depo# 5 Exhibit E - Edwards depo# 6 Exhibit F - Guide to SS# 7 Exhibit G - Guide to SS IX# 8 Exhibit H - Anderson statement# 9 Exhibit I - Dunford declaration# 10 Exhibit J - Jones depo# 11 Exhibit K - Bone depo# 12 Exhibit L - Hansen depo# 13 Exhibit M - Jorgensen depo# 14 Exhibit N - Boyd statement# 15 Exhibit O - Anderson depo# 16 Exhibit P - Phillips depo# 17 Exhibit Q -Phillips statement# 18 Exhibit R - Querry depo# 19 Exhibit S - Clark declaration# 20 Exhibit T - SEmbry depo# 21 Exhibit U - Marchant depo# 22 Exhibit V - BoyScout manual# 23 Exhibit W - CAnderson statement)(Overby, Eric) (Entered: 10/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Overby, Eric) (Entered: 10/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America on Amended Notice of Deposition of Earl O'Driscoll (Wallace, Robert) (Entered: 08/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America on Notice of Deposition of Earl O'Driscoll (Wallace, Robert) (Entered: 08/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints., Peoa Corporation of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints on Notice of Deposition of Robert Toneoli (Skolnick, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Subpoena served on Timothy Wilson on 7/27/06, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (alt) (Entered: 08/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints., Peoa Corporation of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints on Notice of Deposition of James Thomas (Skolnick, Michael) (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America Responses to Plaintiffs 2nd Request for Production of Documents to Defendant (Wallace, Robert) (Entered: 07/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 64 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Samuel Alba on 6/12/06 (alt) (Entered: 06/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants Second Set of Interrogatories and for Production of Documents filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Overby, Eric) (Entered: 06/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints., Peoa Corporation of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America of Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff and Request for Production of Documents (Skolnick, Michael) (Entered: 05/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America on Notice of Deposition of Jim Thomas (Wallace, Robert) (Entered: 05/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF RECUSAL: Judge David Nuffer recused. Case referral reassigned to Judge Samuel Alba for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 4/28/06 (alt) (Entered: 04/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David Nuffer under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 4/26/06 (alt) (Entered: 04/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTIONS to Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice to Defendants filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America, Defendant Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America. (Wallace, Robert) (Entered: 04/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America, Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America ON NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF RICK SCHULER AND LARRY JOHNSON (Wallace, Robert) (Entered: 04/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America Amended Notice of Deposition of Tom Tidwell & Jim Thomas (Wallace, Robert) (Entered: 03/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America, Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America on Notice of Depositions of Tom Tidwell and Jim Thomas (Wallace, Robert) (Entered: 03/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Subpoena served on Mike Johnson on 3/7/06, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (alt) (Entered: 03/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Subpoena served on Michael Jarmin on 2/16/06, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (alt) (Entered: 02/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Subpeona served on David Walker, John Mcgroarty on 2/3/06, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (jmr ) (Entered: 02/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Subpeona served on Wes Bone, Spencer Querry, Cody Marchant on 2/2/06, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (jmr ) (Entered: 02/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Subpeona served on Sarah Marchant, Christopher Anderson and Paden Phillipps on 2/1/06, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (jmr ) (Entered: 02/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURNS OF SERVICE Executed for Subpoenas served on Robert Jorgensen & Cassidy J. Hansen on 11/17/05, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (alt) (Entered: 11/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints., Peoa Corporation of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America (Wallace, Robert) (Entered: 11/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Modification of Docket: Error: Discovery materials are not to be filed with the court per DUCIvR 26-1(b). Correction: Document image removed, re: 47 Answer to Interrogatories (alt) (Entered: 11/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2006. Joinder of Parties due by 1/30/2006. Discovery due by 9/30/2006. Motions due by 9/30/2006. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2007 03:00 PM before Judge Tena Campbell. 10-day Jury Trial set for 3/5/2007 08:30 AM before Judge Tena Campbell. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/10/05 (alt) (Entered: 11/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Overby, Eric) (Entered: 11/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Peoa Corporation of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints (alt) (Entered: 09/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer 38 Amended Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, answer due 9/6/2005; Peoa Corporation of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, answer due 9/6/2005. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 8/23/05 (alt) (Entered: 08/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 38 Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Peoa Corporation of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (alt) (Entered: 08/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America (alt) (Entered: 08/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints served on 8/4/2005 c/o Sarah Checketts: answer due 8/24/2005 (alt) (Entered: 08/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to Peoa Corporation of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints served on 8/4/2005 c/o Sarah Checketts; answer due 8/24/2005 (alt) (Entered: 08/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Peoa Corporation of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (2 dfts added) (alt) (Entered: 08/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 32 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 7/21/05 (alt) (Entered: 07/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 35 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 7/4/05 (alt) (Entered: 07/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT MOTION to Amend 8 Scheduling Order, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Defendant Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America (alt) (Entered: 06/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Does 1-3, filed by Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America (alt) (Entered: 06/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support of 32 MOTION to Amend 1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (alt) (Entered: 06/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Amend 1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (alt) (Entered: 06/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of: Summonses returned as to amended complaint: no amended complaint has been allowed for filing under Rule 15 (alt) (Entered: 06/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: subpoena, by Great Salt Lake Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America (alt) (Entered: 06/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order granting [28-1] joint motion to amend [8-1] Scheduling order, scheduling order deadlines: resetting amended pleadings and fact disovery to 6/30/05 signed by Judge David Nuffer, 4/25/05 cc:atty (alt) (Entered: 04/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint motion by USA, Great SL Council to amend [8-1] Scheduling order (alt) (Entered: 04/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order granting [26-1] joint motion to extend time to 4/25/05 for pla to move to add additional ptys; signed by Judge David Nuffer, 3/17/05 cc:atty (alt) (Entered: 03/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint motion by USA, Great SL Council to extend time to 4/25/05 for pla to move to add additional ptys (alt) (Entered: 03/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of service re: 3rd Set of Reqs for Prod/Docs by Great SL Council (alt) (Entered: 02/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of service re: 3rd Set of Interrogs by Great SL Council (alt) (Entered: 02/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of service executed re: subp served upon Thomas Bushell on 2/6/05 (alt) (Entered: 02/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of service executed re: subp served upon Pete Grimm c/o Glenna Nielson on 2/6/05 (alt) (Entered: 02/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of service executed re: subp served upon Kerry Oliphant c/o wife (no date indicated for svc) (alt) (Entered: 01/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of service executed re: subp served upon Jeff Hatch c/o Jennifer Hatch on 1/28/05 (alt) (Entered: 01/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order granting [18-1] joint motion to amend [8-1] Scheduling order deadline re: adding ptys to 3/14/05; signed by Judge David Nuffer, 1/27/05 cc:atty (alt) (Entered: 01/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint motion by USA, Great SL Council to amend [8-1] Scheduling order deadline re: adding ptys (alt) (Entered: 01/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of service re: 2nd set of interrogs & reqs for prod/docs by Great SL Council (alt) (Entered: 01/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order granting [15-1] joint motion to amend [8-1] Scheduling order: deadline for pla to move to add additional ptys is extended to 1/30/05; signed by Judge David Nuffer, 12/1/04 cc:atty (alt) (Entered: 12/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint motion by USA, Great SL Council to amend [8-1] Scheduling order (alt) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of service re: resp to dft's 1st disc reqs by USA (alt) (Entered: 11/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order granting [12-1] stipulation re: dual-use of depo transcripts & disc responses; signed by Judge Tena Campbell, 9/27/04 cc:atty (alt) (Entered: 09/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Stipulation filed by USA, Great SL Council RE: dual-use of depo transcripts & disc responses (alt) (Entered: 09/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of service re: subp directed to Channel 13 News by USA (alt) (Entered: 09/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of service re: 1st set of interrogs and reqs for prod/docs by Great SL Council (alt) (Entered: 09/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of service by Great SL Council re: Rule 26 Disclosures. (jmr) (Entered: 09/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Scheduling order Setting Joining of parties 11/30/04-pla 12/30/04-dft, amending of pleadings on 5:00 1/30/05-pla 2/20/05-dft; Deadline for filing of all motions 5:00 8/30/05; Discovery cutoff 5:00 5/30/05-fact, 8/30/05-expert; Special Attorney Conference by 12/19/05; Final Pretrial Conference for 3:00 1/9/06; 10-Day Jury Trial for 8:30 1/30/06 Signed by Judge David Nuffer 8/2/04 cc:atty. (alt) (Entered: 08/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT of Attorney Planning Meeting (alt) (Entered: 07/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Magistrate Notice of Hearing Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2:30 10/6/04 To be held before Judge Nuffer cc:atty (Ntc generated by: IPT Sheet) (alt) (Entered: 07/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of election filed by defendant Great SL Council Refer to: Normal Litigation Track (alt) (Entered: 07/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of election filed by plaintiff USA Refer to: Normal Litigation Track (alt) (Entered: 07/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer to Complaint by Great SL Council; jury demand (alt) (Entered: 07/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of summons executed as to Great SL Council c/o Earl Armstrong, 6/29/04. Answer due on 7/19/04 for Great SL Council (alt) (Entered: 06/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Complaint filed, assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (kla) (Entered: 06/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 34 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?