Scott, et al v. Church of Jesus Chri, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 6:98-cv-00366
District Judge Ann L. Aiken, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 7:16 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jeremiah Scott, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dunn Carney Allen Higgins & Tongue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary E. Rhoades +1 503 224 6440 ger@ghlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Joel T Salmi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Joel T Salmi +1 425 646 2956

Toggle Switch Represented by Timothy D Kosnoff

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Timothy D Kosnoff +1 425 637 3070
No Logo Sandra Scott, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dunn Carney Allen Higgins & Tongue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY Gary E. Rhoades +1 503 224 6440 ger@ghlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Joel T Salmi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY Joel T Salmi +1 425 646 2956

Toggle Switch Represented by Timothy D Kosnoff

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY Timothy D Kosnoff +1 425 637 3070
v.
No Logo Boyd K Packer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bullivant Houser Bailey PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/02/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY Lori R. Metz +1 503 228 6351 +1 503 295 0915 lori.metz@bullivant.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mersereau & Shannon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/02/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY Karen M. Vickers +1 503 226 6400 +1 503 226 0383 kvickers@mershanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/02/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen F. English +1 503 727 2003 +1 503 346 2003 senglish@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter Day Saints,, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bullivant Houser Bailey PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Lori R. Metz +1 503 228 6351 +1 503 295 0915 lori.metz@bullivant.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mersereau & Shannon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Karen M. Vickers +1 503 226 6400 +1 503 226 0383 kvickers@mershanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen F. English +1 503 727 2003 +1 503 346 2003 senglish@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bullivant Houser Bailey PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Lori R. Metz +1 503 228 6351 +1 503 295 0915 lori.metz@bullivant.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mersereau & Shannon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Karen M. Vickers +1 503 226 6400 +1 503 226 0383 kvickers@mershanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen F. English +1 503 727 2003 +1 503 346 2003 senglish@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Corporation Of The Presiding Bishop Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bullivant Houser Bailey PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lori R. Metz +1 503 228 6351 +1 503 295 0915 lori.metz@bullivant.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mersereau & Shannon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Karen M. Vickers +1 503 226 6400 +1 503 226 0383 kvickers@mershanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen F. English +1 503 727 2003 +1 503 346 2003 senglish@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Gordon B Hinckley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bullivant Houser Bailey PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/02/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY Lori R. Metz +1 503 228 6351 +1 503 295 0915 lori.metz@bullivant.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mersereau & Shannon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/02/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY Karen M. Vickers +1 503 226 6400 +1 503 226 0383 kvickers@mershanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/02/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen F. English +1 503 727 2003 +1 503 346 2003 senglish@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Gregory Lee Foster, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bullivant Houser Bailey PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY Lori R. Metz +1 503 228 6351 +1 503 295 0915 lori.metz@bullivant.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilmer Voorhees & Laurick, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey M. Kilmer +1 503 224 0055 +1 503 222 5290 jkilmer@kilmerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mersereau & Shannon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY Karen M. Vickers +1 503 226 6400 +1 503 226 0383 kvickers@mershanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen F. English +1 503 727 2003 +1 503 346 2003 senglish@perkinscoie.com
No Logo James E Faust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bullivant Houser Bailey PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/02/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY Lori R. Metz +1 503 228 6351 +1 503 295 0915 lori.metz@bullivant.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mersereau & Shannon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/02/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY Karen M. Vickers +1 503 226 6400 +1 503 226 0383 kvickers@mershanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/02/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen F. English +1 503 727 2003 +1 503 346 2003 senglish@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Merrill J Bateman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bullivant Houser Bailey PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/02/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY Lori R. Metz +1 503 228 6351 +1 503 295 0915 lori.metz@bullivant.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mersereau & Shannon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/02/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY Karen M. Vickers +1 503 226 6400 +1 503 226 0383 kvickers@mershanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/02/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen F. English +1 503 727 2003 +1 503 346 2003 senglish@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Thomas S Monson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bullivant Houser Bailey PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/02/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY Lori R. Metz +1 503 228 6351 +1 503 295 0915 lori.metz@bullivant.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mersereau & Shannon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/02/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY Karen M. Vickers +1 503 226 6400 +1 503 226 0383 kvickers@mershanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/02/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen F. English +1 503 727 2003 +1 503 346 2003 senglish@perkinscoie.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1391
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/14/1999, Entered: None
JUDGMENT - This action is dismissed. Clerk Entered 1/14/99 DISMISS CASE Signed 1/14/99 microfilmed 1/21/99 (counsel notified) Copies mailed to Rhoades, Metz, Kilmer with entry date endorsed thereon (lf) (Entered: 01/14/1999)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/14/1999, Entered: None
    RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Ann L. Aiken Based on plaintiff's 1/8/99 letter advising that plaintiff has commenced a new action in Multnomah County Circuit Court this action is dismissed. (counsel notified) (lf) (Entered: 01/14/1999)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/5/1999, Entered: None
      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - plaintiff is ordered to show cause by 1/15/99 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Plaintiff is advised that a failure to respond to this order will result in the dismissal of this action. Honorable Ann L. Aiken (counsel notified) (sln) (Entered: 01/05/1999)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/1/1998, Entered: None
        RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Ann L. Aiken: Transferring this case to the Eugene Division for all further proceedings (counsel notified) (Kirk) (Entered: 12/03/1998)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/30/1998, Entered: None
          OPINION AND ORDER: GRANTING Church Defendants' MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF DIVERSITY JURISDICTION [35-1]; Defendant LDS Church defeats diversity jurisdiction in this case; Plaintiff allowed 10 days for the date of this Order to amend his complaint or refile this action in state court; Amended complaint due 12/14/98 Signed 11/30/98 by Honorable Ann L. Aiken (See formal 6-Page Opinion & Order) (microfilmed 11/30/98) (counsel notified) (Kirk) (Entered: 12/03/1998)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/24/1998, Entered: None
            RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Ann L. Aiken: SETTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF DIVERSITY JURISDICTION [35-1] on oral argument calendar at 9:30am on 12/18/98 in Portland (counsel notified) (Hickman) (Entered: 11/25/1998)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/10/1998, Entered: None
              REPLY TO RESPONSE by Church Defendants, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church, Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints & Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints on their MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF DIVERSITY JURISDICTION [35-1] (Oral Argument Requested) (Kirk) (Entered: 11/12/1998)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/29/1998, Entered: None
                RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Ann L. Aiken: Order ADOPTING parties proposed briefing schedule on Defendants Motion for Clarification; ORDER SETTING Defendants MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF DIVERSITY JURISDICTION [35-1] on the Not for Oral Argument Calendar of 11/16/98; Response due 10/20/98 & Reply due 11/10/98; Discovery on issues other than the diversity jurisdiction is stayed until resolution of that issue; (counsel notified) (Kirk) (Entered: 10/30/1998)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/20/1998, Entered: None
                  RESPONSE by Plaintiff to Church Defendants MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF DIVERSITY JURISDICTION [35-1]; Reply due 11/3/98 (Kirk) (Entered: 10/21/1998)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/19/1998, Entered: None
                    RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Ann L. Aiken: TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT on 10/26/98 Defendants MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF DIVERSITY JURISDICTION [35-1] (counsel notified) (Kirk) (Entered: 10/20/1998)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/8/1998, Entered: None
                      RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS (Scheduling Conference) before Honorable Ann L. Aiken: Parties to submit letter to court setting out briefing deadlines for defendants motion for judicial determination of diversity jurisdiction; Further scheduling will be set following ruling on Defendants MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF DIVERSITY JURISDICTION [35-1] (counsel notified) Court Rptr Kristi Anderson (Kirk) (Entered: 09/09/1998)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/2/1998, Entered: None
                        MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Defendants of MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF DIVERSITY JURISDICTION [35-1] (Kirk) (Entered: 09/03/1998)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/2/1998, Entered: None
                          MOTION by Defendant FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF DIVERSITY JURISDICTION (Kirk) (Entered: 09/03/1998)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/25/1998, Entered: None
                            SUBSTITUTION of Attorney Jeffrey M Kilmer replacing attorney Karen M Vickers, attorney Stephen F English & attorney Lori R Metz for Gregory Lee Foster (Kirk) (Entered: 08/26/1998)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: None
                              RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Ann L. Aiken: Resetting Scheduling & Discovery Conference to 1:30pm on 9/8/98 at the Eugene Courthouse (counsel notified) (Kirk) (Entered: 08/24/1998)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: None
                                RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Ann L. Aiken: Amending Minute Order of 8/12/98 to show Discovery & Pretrial Scheduling conference is set for 8:30am on 8/26/98 in Eugene rather than by telephone (counsel notified) (Kirk) (Entered: 08/19/1998)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/12/1998, Entered: None
                                  RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Ann L. Aiken: Resetting Telephone Discovery & Pretrial Scheduling Conference to 8:30am on 8/26/98 (counsel notified) (Kirk) (Entered: 08/13/1998)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/4/1998, Entered: None
                                    ANSWER by Defendants to Third Amended Complaint [29-1] (Kirk) (Entered: 08/04/1998)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/27/1998, Entered: None
                                      THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT [23-1] and JURY TRIAL DEMAND by Plaintiff Jeremiah Scott (Kirk) (Entered: 07/29/1998)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/23/1998, Entered: None
                                        RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Ann L. Aiken: GRANTING Stipulated MOTION TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT [26-1] (counsel notified) (Kirk) (Entered: 07/23/1998)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/22/1998, Entered: None
                                          RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Ann L. Aiken: GRANTING Defendants MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT TO & including 8/4/98 [25-1] Answer deadline reset to 8/4/98 (counsel notified) (Kirk) (Entered: 07/23/1998)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/20/1998, Entered: None
                                            STIPULATED MOTION by Plaintiff TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (Kirk) Modified on 07/21/1998 (Entered: 07/21/1998)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/17/1998, Entered: None
                                              MOTION by Defendants TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT TO & including 8/4/98 (Kirk) (Entered: 07/20/1998)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/8/1998, Entered: None
                                                RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Ann L. Aiken: Based on Plaintiffs letter it is ORDERED that the Discovery conference set 7/20/98 is vacated & a Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30am on 8/27/98 (counsel notified) (Kirk) (Entered: 07/09/1998)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/7/1998, Entered: None
                                                  SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT for Negligence & Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress [7-1] and JURY TRIAL DEMAND by Plaintiff Jeremiah Scott; terminating Plaintiff Sandra Scott (Kirk) (Entered: 07/08/1998)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                    RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Ann L. Aiken: GRANTING Plaintiffs MOTION TO ALLOW PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT [20-1] & GRANTING Plaintiffs MOTION TO WITHDRAW DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS [20-2]; GRANTING Plaintiffs MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF 3/19/98 DISCOVERY ORDER & ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT DEADLINES; REQUEST FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE [21-1]; Discovery to be completed by 5/3/99; WITHDRAWING Defendants MOTION TO DISMISS [14-1]; Telephone Conference set for 9:00am on 7/20/98 to set remaining deadlines & discuss discovery related issues; ORDER DISMISSING Defendants Gordon B Hinckley, Thomas S Monson, James E Faust, Boyd K Packer, & Merrill J Bateman without prejudice; (counsel notified) (Kirk) (Entered: 07/08/1998)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                      UNOPPOSED MOTION by Plaintiffs FOR EXTENSION OF 3/19/98 DISCOVERY ORDER & ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT DEADLINES; REQUEST FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE (Kirk) (Entered: 07/08/1998)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                        UNOPPOSED MOTION by Plaintiffs TO ALLOW PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT , and TO WITHDRAW DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS (Kirk) (Entered: 06/29/1998)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/10/1998, Entered: None
                                                          RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Ann L. Aiken: GRANTING Plaintiffs MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS to & including 6/22/98; ORDER SETTING MOTION TO DISMISS [14-1] on Not for Oral Argument Calendar of 7/13/98 (counsel notified) (Kirk) (Entered: 06/11/1998)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/5/1998, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION by Plaintiff FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS to & including 6/22/98; Response due 6/19/98 (former employee) (Entered: 06/08/1998)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/29/1998, Entered: None
                                                              RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Ann L. Aiken: TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT on 6/29/98 Defendants MOTION TO DISMISS [14-1] (counsel notified) (Kirk) (Entered: 06/01/1998)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/29/1998, Entered: None
                                                                ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE EXECUTED by Defendants of Amended Complaint & Summons on 5/14/98 (Kirk) (Entered: 06/01/1998)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/26/1998, Entered: None
                                                                  MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Defendants of MOTION TO DISMISS [14-1] (Kirk) (Entered: 05/27/1998)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/26/1998, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION by Defendants TO DISMISS Oral Argument Requested (Kirk) (Entered: 05/27/1998)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/21/1998, Entered: None
                                                                      RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Ann L. Aiken: GRANTING Defendants MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ENTER FIRST APPEARANCE to & including 5/26/98 [12-1]; Answer deadline reset to 5/26/98 for Merrill J Bateman, for Boyd K Packer, for James E Faust, for Thomas S Monson, for Gordon B Hinckley, for Corp/President for the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, for Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, for Gregory Lee Foster, for Corp/Bishop Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints (counsel notified) (Kirk) (Entered: 05/22/1998)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION by Defendants TO EXTEND TIME TO ENTER FIRST APPEARANCE to & including 5/26/98 (Affidavit of Lori R. Metz attached) (Kirk) (Entered: 05/18/1998)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/6/1998, Entered: None
                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED upon Defendant Gregory Lee Foster on 3/26/98 (Kirk) (Entered: 04/07/1998)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/6/1998, Entered: None
                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED upon Defendant Corp/Bishop Church on 3/25/98 (Kirk) (Entered: 04/07/1998)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/6/1998, Entered: None
                                                                              APPLICATION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE by attorney Joel T. Salmi; Local Counsel: Gary E. Rhoades representing Plaintiffs Jeremiah Scott & Sandra Scott ; Fee paid, receipt # 402785; Approved 4/6/98 by Honorable Ann L. Aiken (counsel notified) (Kirk) (Entered: 04/07/1998)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/3/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Ann L. Aiken: GRANTING Defendants MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER TO & INCLUDING 5/13/98 [6-1]; Answer due 5/13/98 (counsel notified) (Kirk) (Entered: 04/06/1998)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                  FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] and JURY TRIAL DEMAND by Plaintiffs; adding Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President Church of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints; Gordon B Hinckley, Thomas S Monson, James E Faust, Boyd K Packer, Merrill J Bateman (Kirk) (Entered: 04/03/1998)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/1/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION by Defendants TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER TO & INCLUDING 5/13/98 (Affidavit of Lori R. Metz attached) (Kirk) (Entered: 04/01/1998)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/30/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                      APPLICATION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE by attorney Timothy D. Kosnoff; Local Counsel: Gary E. Rhoades representing Plaintiffs Jeremiah Scott & Sandra Scott ; Fee paid, receipt # 402720; Approved 3/30/98 by Honorable Ann L. Aiken (counsel notified) (Kirk) (Entered: 04/01/1998)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                        SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendant Gregory Lee Foster (Kirk) (Entered: 03/20/1998)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                          SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendant Corporation of the Prsiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints (Kirk) (Entered: 03/20/1998)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                            DISCOVERY ORDER AND ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT: Discovery due 7/17/98; Joint status report due 7/20/98; Pretrial order due 8/17/98 (Kirk) (Entered: 03/20/1998)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                              COMPLAINT (Negligence) and JURY TRIAL DEMAND (Cause Code: 28:1391 ) ( Receipt # 402633) (Kirk) (Entered: 03/20/1998)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 89 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?