Michael J. v. Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:08-cv-07553
District Judge Percy Anderson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 2, 2018 at 4:56 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michael J., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Boucher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond Paul Boucher +1 818 340 5400 +1 818 340 5401 ray@boucher.la

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Anthony M. De Marco

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony M De Marco +1 626 844 7700 +1 626 449 5572 annette@demarcolawfirm.com
v.
No Logo 2nd Ward of Redding Stake of Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Defendant
No Logo 2nd Ward of the Redding Stake of the Church of Jesus Crhist of Latter-Day Saints, Defendant
No Logo 3rd Ward of Redding Stake of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Defendant
No Logo Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter Day Saints,, Defendant
No Logo Corporation of the President of the California Los Angeles Mission, The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Defendant
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Dale Crockett +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 bob@bobcrockettlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Mark Skanchy +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Courtney Elena Vaudreuil +1 213 688 1000 +1 213 243 6330 cvaudreuil@mckennalong.com
No Logo Corporation Of The Presiding Bishop Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Dale Crockett +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 bob@bobcrockettlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Mark Skanchy +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Courtney Elena Vaudreuil +1 213 688 1000 +1 213 243 6330 cvaudreuil@mckennalong.com
No Logo DOES, Defendant
No Logo Frederick Hilliard, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Frederick Hilliard, Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frederick Hilliard, Jr.
No Logo Los Angeles Stake of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Defendant
No Logo Los Angeles Stake of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Defendant
No Logo Redding California Stake of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Defendant
No Logo Redding Stake of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Defendant
No Logo Simi Valley Stake of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Defendant
No Logo Simi Valley Stake of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error the letter of remand attached to the 11/21/08 minutes, lacked date and had wrong naming convention, was removed and replaced with a letter of remand with 11/24/08 date and correct naming convention of "letter of remand". (lc) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
    MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Percy Anderson: Court remands this action to Los Angeles Superior Court, Case Number LC 080889 for lack of subject matter jurisdiction.Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints Motion to Dismiss [7), and Request for Judicial Notice 10 , are both denied as moot.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.)cc order of remand, remand letter and docket to Los Angeles Superior Court, NW District, Van Nuys, Case number LC 080889, (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order of remand) (lc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/24/2008: # 1 Letter of remand) (lc). (Entered: 11/24/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
      REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 7 filed by defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Crockett, Robert) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
        DECLARATION of Courtney E. Vaudreuil in Support of Motion to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 7 filed by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Crockett, Robert) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
          MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 7 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Crockett, Robert) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. Motion set for hearing on 12/15/2008 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Crockett, Robert) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
              NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PILOT PROGRAM filed.(car) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defenants Corporation of The Presiding Bishop of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, re Notice of Removal, 1 served on 11/14/08. (car) (ds). (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Corporation of The Presiding Bishop of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, (car) (ds). (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                    DECLARATION of Robert D. Crockett re Notice of Removal, 1 filed by Defendants Corporation of The Presiding Bishop of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (car) (ds). (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                      JOINDER in Notice of Removal, 1 ,filed by defendant Frederick Hilliard, Jr. (car) (ds). (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court State of CA County of Los Angeles, case number LC080889 with Conformed copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Percy Anderson, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Charles F Eick. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID), filed by Defendants Corporation of The Presiding Bishop of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints.(car) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2008: # 1 Exhibit A, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A, Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Notice of Assignment, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (ds). (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 65 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?