Ketterling v. Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-00864
Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 23, 2017 at 12:04 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jean Q. Ketterling, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Pippin +1 503 639 9626 +1 503 598 0909 pippinandbocci@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Keith Dozier, Jr. +1 503 594 0333 +1 503 697 0841 keith@wkd-law.com
v.
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy M. Cunningham +1 503 778 5386 +1 503 778 5299 timcunningham@dwt.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Ernst +1 503 778 5385 +1 503 778 5299 daveernst@dwt.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3696306. The request has been granted and the amount of $400.00 will be refunded to John F. McGrory. Related Doc 5 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (ljp) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
    Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by All Plaintiffs (Dozier, William) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
      Notice of Appearance of William Keith Dozier, Jr appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs Filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dozier, William) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
        Amended Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Notice of Removal, 1 . Filed by Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Ernst, David) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
          Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Notice of Removal, 1 . Filed by Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Ernst, David) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 9/25/2014. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/27/2014. Pretrial Order is due by 10/27/2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel. (cib) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
              Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Ernst, David) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                Notice of Removal of Case Number 1404-04800 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3696375 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Ernst, David) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 26 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?