Hill et al v. Boy Scouts of America et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-00138
District Judge Thad Heartfield, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 4, 2017 at 12:49 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Marilyn Hill, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Moore Landrey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Everett H Sanderson +1 409 835 3891 +1 409 835 4525 esanderson@moorelandrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Moore Landrey LLP (Austin)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Cook Kinsel +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 skinsel@moorelandrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ethan L Shaw +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 elshaw@shawcowart.com
No Logo Marvin Lynn Hill, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Moore Landrey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Everett H Sanderson +1 409 835 3891 +1 409 835 4525 esanderson@moorelandrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Moore Landrey LLP (Austin)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Cook Kinsel +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 skinsel@moorelandrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ethan L Shaw +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 elshaw@shawcowart.com
v.
No Logo Boy Scouts Of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Orgain, Bell & Tucker - Beaumont

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Joseph Truncale +1 409 838 6412 +1 409 838 6959 mjt@obt.com
No Logo Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter Day Saints,, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kent Morrison Adams +1 713 353 2000 +1 713 785 7780 kent.adams@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kent Morrison Adams +1 713 353 2000 +1 713 785 7780 kent.adams@wilsonelser.com
No Logo David Ochoa, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry James Simmons, Jr. +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 ljsimmons@germer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Intermountain Health Care

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED H. Craig Hall, Jr. +1 801 387 6445 craig.hall2@imail.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Moore Landrey LLP (Austin)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Cook Kinsel +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 skinsel@moorelandrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sedgwick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Collin Grant Warren +1 832 426 7000 +1 832 426 7009 collin.warren@sdma.com
No Logo Stacy Abbott, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kent Morrison Adams +1 713 353 2000 +1 713 785 7780 kent.adams@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Harold Kip Glasscock, Jr, Mediator
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASEwith prejudice. Ordered that all costs of court, expenses, and attorney fees shall be borne by the party incurring same. Signed by Judge Thad Heartfield on 9/13/06. (bjc, ) (Entered: 09/14/2006)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 46 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: None
    Proposed Agreed Judgment (Final Take Nothing Judgment). (Adams, Kent) (Entered: 09/01/2006)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER denying as moot 39 Motion for Summary Judgment, 40 Motion for Summary Judgment, 41 Motion to Dismiss, 43 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, and 43 Motion for Summary Judgment . Signed by Judge Thad Heartfield on 8/14/06. (bjc, ) (Entered: 08/14/2006)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER on closing documents. Settlement papers due 9/1/06. Signed by Judge Thad Heartfield on 7/25/06. (bjc, ) (Entered: 07/25/2006)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None
          ***TWO PART DOC. SEE ALSO DOC# 41.*** MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Boy Scouts of America. (Truncale, Michael) Modified on 7/25/2006 (bjc, ). (Entered: 07/25/2006)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None
            REPORT of Mediation by Harold Kip Glasscock, Jr. Mediation result: Settled(Glasscock, Harold) (Entered: 07/25/2006)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: None
              ***TWO PART DOC. SEE ALSO DOC# 43.*** MOTION to Dismiss by Boy Scouts of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Truncale, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2006)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: None
                MOTION for Summary Judgment by David Ochoa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 8# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Simmons, Larry) (Entered: 07/24/2006)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support Thereof by Stacy Abbott. Responses due by 8/7/2006 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A"# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Kent) (Entered: 07/21/2006)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: None
                    FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to 30 Amended Complaint by Boy Scouts of America. (bjc, ) (Entered: 06/13/2006)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 33 Motion for Leave to File amended answer. Signed by Judge Thad Heartfield on 6/13/06. (bjc, ) (Entered: 06/13/2006)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry James Simmons, Jr on behalf of David Ochoa (Simmons, Larry) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None
                          Original ANSWER to Amended Complaint by David Ochoa.(Simmons, Larry) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: None
                            ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Stacy Abbott, Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints.(Adams, Kent) (Entered: 06/09/2006)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Answer Unopposed by Boy Scouts of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Truncale, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2006)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER granting dfts Boy Scouts of America and David Ochoa's 24 Motion for Leave to designate a responsible third party . Signed by Judge Thad Heartfield on 6/1/06. (bjc, ) (Entered: 06/01/2006)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 25 Motion to designate responsible third parties . Signed by Judge Thad Heartfield on 6/1/06. (bjc, ) (Entered: 06/01/2006)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 30 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: None
                                    SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Marvin Lynn Hill, Marilyn Hill.(bjc, ) (Entered: 05/31/2006)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting 22 Motion for Leave to File 2nd amended complaint. Signed by Judge Thad Heartfield on 5/31/06. (bjc, ) (Entered: 05/31/2006)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting 21 Motion to Appoint additiional cnsl Scott Cook Kinsel for Marilyn Hill; David Ochoa and Marvin Lynn Hill . Signed by Judge Thad Heartfield on 5/31/06. (bjc, ) (Entered: 05/31/2006)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by David Ochoa Case Specific Disclosure (Hall, Heber) (Entered: 05/25/2006)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Stacy Abbott, Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints Case Specific and Privilege Log (Adams, Kent) (Entered: 05/25/2006)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: None
                                              MOTION to designate responsible third parties by Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Stacy Abbott, Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Kent) (Entered: 05/25/2006)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                Joint MOTION for Leave to File Joint Motion for Leave to Designate a Responsible Third Party by Boy Scouts of America, David Ochoa (Attachments: # 1 proposed order)(Truncale, Michael) (Entered: 05/25/2006)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                  First Amended ANSWER to Complaint by David Ochoa.(Hall, Heber) (Entered: 05/25/2006)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Marvin Lynn Hill, Marilyn Hill. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint)(Shaw, Ethan) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/25/2006 (bjc, ). (Entered: 05/25/2006)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION to Appoint Counsel Scott C. Kinsel by Marvin Lynn Hill, Marilyn Hill. (Shaw, Ethan) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/25/2006 (bjc, ). (Entered: 05/25/2006)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Appoint Counsel Scott C. Kinsel by Marvin Lynn Hill, Marilyn Hill. (Shaw, Ethan) Modified on 5/25/2006 (bjc, ). (Entered: 05/25/2006)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to File first amended answer . Signed by Judge Thad Heartfield on 5/24/06. (bjc, ) (Entered: 05/24/2006)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer by David Ochoa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hall, Heber) (Entered: 05/22/2006)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Boy Scouts of America Amended Mandatory Disclosure (Truncale, Michael) (Entered: 05/18/2006)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/9/2006. Motions due by 7/24/2006. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/6/2006. Signed by Judge Thad Heartfield on 4/25/06. (mrp, ) (Entered: 04/25/2006)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thad Heartfield : Management Conference held on 4/25/2006. (mfr, ) (Entered: 04/25/2006)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Boy Scouts of America (Truncale, Michael) (Entered: 04/19/2006)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Boy Scouts of America (Truncale, Michael) (Entered: 04/19/2006)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                        REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Adams, Kent) (Entered: 04/18/2006)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Marvin Lynn Hill, Marilyn Hill (Shaw, Ethan) (Entered: 04/18/2006)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Stacy Abbott, Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints identifying none as Corporate Parent. (Adams, Kent) (Entered: 04/17/2006)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Stacy Abbott, Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints (Adams, Kent) (Entered: 04/17/2006)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by David Ochoa (Hall, Heber) (Entered: 04/17/2006)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heber Craig Hall on behalf of David Ochoa (Hall, Heber) (Entered: 03/29/2006)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing:Management Conference set for 4/25/2006 10:00 AM in (Beaumont) before Judge Thad Heartfield. (mfr, ) (Entered: 03/20/2006)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Ron Clark recused. Case reassigned to Judge Thad Heartfield for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/15/06. (mrp, ) (Entered: 03/15/2006)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                        Magistrate Consent Form sent electronically to plas' atty Ethan Shaw & atty Ken Adams for dfts Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, a Utah Corporation Sole & Stacy Abbott and atty Larry Simmons, Jr for dft David Ochoa and atty Michael Truncale for dft Boy Scouts of America (aam, ) (Entered: 03/13/2006)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                          DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Stacy Abbott, Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints (aam, ) (Entered: 03/13/2006)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, David Ochoa, Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Boy Scouts of America re 1 Notice of Removal,, (aam, ) Modified on 3/13/2006 (aam, ). (Entered: 03/13/2006)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Stacy Abbott from Orange County TX, case number D050549. (Filing fee $ 250; Receipt #1-1-1778) (Attachments: # 1 Index of Documents# 2 Plas' Orig Petition # 3 Orig Ans By Dft David Ochoa to Plas' Orig Pet # 4 Orig Ans by Dft Boy Scouts of America to Plas' Orig Petition # 5 Orig Ans by Dft Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints# 6 Exhibit 1-4 # 7 Plas' 1st Amd Orig Petition # 8 Dfts' Orig Ans to Plas' 1st Amd Orig Petition # 9 Exhibit Motion to Substitute Atty of Record # 10 Certified Copy of State Court Docket Sheet # 11 List of Parties & Current Status of Case # 12 List of Attorneys # 13 Record of Parties Requesting Trial by Jury)(aam, ) (Entered: 03/13/2006)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 41 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?