Tomaszewski v. Clayson et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:05-cv-01515
Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 5, 2017 at 3:07 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo George Tomaszewski, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Oregon Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M. Lippold +1 503 947 4700 +1 503 947 4791 Steve.Lippold@doj.state.or.us
v.
No Logo Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter Day Saints,, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilmer Voorhees & Laurick, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Muth +1 503 224 0055 +1 503 222 5290 rmuth@kilmerlaw.com
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Bradley Lewis +1 503 283 0766 +1 503 285 0674 Brad@lewis-solberg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilmer Voorhees & Laurick, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Muth +1 503 224 0055 +1 503 222 5290 rmuth@kilmerlaw.com
No Logo Corporation Of The Presiding Bishop Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilmer Voorhees & Laurick, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Muth +1 503 224 0055 +1 503 222 5290 rmuth@kilmerlaw.com
No Logo Jonathan L Clayson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Bradley Lewis +1 503 283 0766 +1 503 285 0674 Brad@lewis-solberg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilmer Voorhees & Laurick, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Muth +1 503 224 0055 +1 503 222 5290 rmuth@kilmerlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1446
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Stipulated Judgment of Dismissal. Signed on 1/23/07 by Judge Dennis J. Hubel. (ljl) (Entered: 01/24/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: None
    Proposed Proposed Form of Order Submitted Judgment of Dismissal. Filed by George Tomaszewski. (Lippold, Steven) (Entered: 12/13/2006)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
      Scheduling Order by Judge Dennis J. Hubel: The parties having reported that this case has settled, all deadlines and proceedings currently set, including the 2-day jury trial set to commence on December 19, 2006, are STRICKEN. A Final Paper Call is set at 9:30 a.m. on December 14, 2006, in Courtroom #9B. If final documents are filed before then, this proceeding will be removed from the court's calendar with no further notice to the parties. (kb) (Entered: 11/01/2006)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
        Jury Trial Management Order: PTC set 12/15/06 at 9:30 a.m. 2-day Jury Trial set to commence on 12/19/06 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom #9B. Trial documents due 11/17/06,11/24/06, and 12/1/06. (see formal order) Signed on 8/16/06 by Judge Dennis J. Hubel. (kb) (Entered: 08/16/2006)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
          Record of Proceedings held before Judge Dennis J. Hubel: Record of telephone hearing held on Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time 13 - ORDER granting the motion, as follows:The deadline for the completion of all discovery is October 20, 2006. (Parties to set their own expert disclosure deadlines.)The deadline for the filing of dispositive motions is October 20, 2006.The deadline for the filing of a Joint ADR Report is deemed satisfied per the parties' report at this proceeding.A Pretrial Order shall be lodged by November 17, 2006.The Pretrial Conference is RESET to December 15, 2006, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom #9B.The 2-day Jury Trial is RESET to commence on December 19, 2006, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom #9B.An amended jury trial management order will be issued. Steven Lippold present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Robert Muth present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: KB/FTR. (kb) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
            RECORD OF ORDER by Judge Dennis J. Hubel: A telephone hearing is set on Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time 13 on August 15, 2006, at 11:00 a.m. The court will place the call. (kb) (Entered: 08/07/2006)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None
              Affidavit of Steven M. Lippold in Support of Motion for Extension. Filed by George Tomaszewski. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 13 .)(ecp, ) (Entered: 08/02/2006)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None
                Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time (Unopposed). Filed by George Tomaszewski. (ecp, ) (Entered: 08/02/2006)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None
                  Affidavit of Service of Custodian of Records for Healhsound on 4/7/2006. Filed by George Tomaszewski. (ecp, ) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Jury Trial Management Order: Pretrial Conference is set on 10/4/06 at 9:30 a.m. A 2-day Jury Trial is set to commence on October 10, 2006, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom #9B. Trial documents are due 9/6/2006; 9/13/06, and 9/20/06. (see formal order) Signed on 1/27/06 by Judge Dennis J. Hubel. (kb, ) (Entered: 01/30/2006)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Record of Rule 16 Conference held before Judge Dennis J. Hubel: ORDER - The Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery and PTO Deadlines 7 is GRANTED. A new case schedule is set. (see formal order) Steven Lippold present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Robert Muth present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: KB/FTR. (kb, ) (Entered: 01/26/2006)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (ecp, ) (Entered: 01/26/2006)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: None
                          Declaration of Robert C. Muth. Filed by all parties. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 7 .)(Muth, Robert) (Entered: 01/17/2006)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: None
                            Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by all parties. (Muth, Robert) (Entered: 01/17/2006)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: None
                              Stipulation Regarding Substitution of Parties by Jonathan L Clayson, Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. Filed by Jonathan L Clayson, Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Muth, Robert) (Entered: 12/28/2005)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Scheduling Order by Judge Dennis J. Hubel: A Rule 16 Conference is set on January 25, 2006, at 9:30 a.m. by telephone. The court will place the call. Local Rules 16.2(b) and 26.1(a)(b) require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. Plaintiff shall advise the court at the conference whether or not there will be full consent to proceed before magistrate judge in the case. If consents are going to be filed, it is helpful if they are filed prior to the time of the conference, particularly with respect to the setting of trial. (kb, ) (Entered: 11/30/2005)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: None
                                  Answer of Defendants Jonathan Clayson and Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints (Related Doc. 1 ). Filed by Jonathan L Clayson, Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints.(Muth, Robert) (Entered: 11/02/2005)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: None
                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (ecp, ) (Entered: 10/06/2005)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment to the Honorable Dennis J. Hubel. Discovery to be completed by 1/27/2006. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 2/26/2006.Pretrial Order due by 2/26/2006. Ordered by Judge Dennis J. Hubel. (ecp, ) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: None
                                        Notice of Removal of Case Number 050808895 from Circuit Court for the County of Multnomah. Filing Fee in amount of $250 collected. Receipt No. 5702 issued.Filed by Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints against George Tomaszewski.(ecp, ) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 124 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?