Cooke v. Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-08080
District Judge Mary H. Murguia, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 9, 2019 at 11:29 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Roland Cooke, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PO Box 291

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roland Cooke +1 435 212 0309
v.
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by WRIGHT & ASSOCIATES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence C Wright +1 480 969 9000 +1 480 969 9084 lcwright@qwestoffice.net
No Logo Corporation Of The Presiding Bishop Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by WRIGHT & ASSOCIATES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence C Wright +1 480 969 9000 +1 480 969 9084 lcwright@qwestoffice.net
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant
No Logo Mormon Church, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by WRIGHT & ASSOCIATES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence C Wright +1 480 969 9000 +1 480 969 9084 lcwright@qwestoffice.net
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA - The jgm of this Court, entered 9/7/10, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. The decision of the district court is AFFIRMED re 09-16960 as to 62 Notice of Appeal filed by Roland Cooke. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 nda)(SAT) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: None
    MANDATE of 9th Circuit (Certified Copy) dismissing the appeal for lack of jurisdiction, re: 09-16226 56 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory (Attachments: # 1 Order, # 2 NDA)(REW, ) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None
      ORDER of 9th Circuit, appeal case number 09-16226, denying the motions for reconsideration as to 56 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory filed by Roland Cooke. (Attachments: # 1 NDA)(LAD) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
        USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number PHX089468 re 62 Notice of Appeal filed by Roland Cooke (LAD) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
          ORDER of 9th Circuit, within 21 days appellant shall: (1) file a motion with this court to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) pay the fees to the district court for this appeal and provide proof of payment to this court; or (3) otherwise show cause why the appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute; if appellant fails to comply with this order, the appeal will be dismissed automatically by the Clerk, re: 09-16960 62 Notice of Appeal (REW, ) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
            Ninth Circuit Case Number 09-16960 for 62 Notice of Appeal. (ESL) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
              CERTIFICATE OF RECORD TRANSMITTED TO 9TH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS re 62 Notice of Appeal (ESL) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit as to the 60 Order and 61 Clerk's Judgment, by Roland Cooke. (ESL) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
                  CLERK'S JUDGMENT it is ordered and adjudged that the Court having granted Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, pursuant to this Court's Order, 60 , filed on August 11, 2009, Plaintiff take nothing. This Complaint and action are hereby dismissed. (LSP) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting Dfts' 36 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 38 Motion for Extension of Time; denying as moot 44 Motion for "the Judge to Declare the Confiscation of the United Effort Plan Illegal"; denying as moot 45 Motion for Negotiated Settlement; denying as moot 47 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 48 Motion to Amend Complaint: Damages; denying as moot 50 Amended Motion for "Immediate Judgment to Declare the Confiscation of the Unit Effort Plan Illegal. FURTHER ORDERED dismissing with prejudice pla's amended complaint 33 . However, the Court will permit pla - if he chooses - to file a motion for leave to amend his complaint. The motion for leave to amend complaint must be filed no later than 8/24/09. Dfts' response must be filed no later than 9/4/09; and any reply by pla no later than 9/11/09. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 8/5/2009. (LAD) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None
                      Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Case Number 09-16226 for 56 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory. (TLJ) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None
                        APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re: 56 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory filed by Roland Cooke. Filed dates for: Notice of Appeal *4/22/2009*, *Complaint* *6/30/2008*, Appealed Order *2/20/09***.** Fee Status: *Paid on 6/11/2009 in the amount of $455.00*. Hearing Dates of *None***********. Appellant Attorney: *none* *(pro se)***. Appellee Attorney: *Lawrence C Wright* *(ret)* *lcwright@qwestoffice.net***. Copies sent to all parties and 9th Circuit. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Record) (KMG, ) (Entered: 06/12/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                          USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number PHX085292 re 56 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory filed by Roland Cooke (KMG, ) (Entered: 06/12/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL to 9th Circuit as to 53 Order, by Roland Cooke. (Note: Same pdf as doc. #55. Redocketed with correct event)(KMG) (Entered: 06/12/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                              Notice of Intent to Appeal (on 5/6 unless there is action from Court returning homes and property) by Roland Cooke (LAD) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None
                                WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re 39 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff Roland Cooke (motions filed in both cases, CV 09-8003 and CV 08-8080). (REW, ) (Entered: 03/25/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER entered by Judge Mary H Murguia on 2/20/09. The Court notes that Plaintiff has filed and is continuing to file numerous motions and petitions in this action. The Court hereby ORDERS that Plaintiff may not file any new motion and/or petition without leave of the Court until such time as the Court is able to rule on the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate [docs. 36, 39]. Defendants are not required at this time to respond to the remaining motions/petitions. [This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.](KSP) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None
                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 50 MOTION for Judgment "Immediate Judgment to Declare the Confiscation of the Unit Effort Plan Illegal filed by The Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, The Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Mormon Church. (Wright, Lawrence) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 44 MOTION for for "the Judge to Declare the Confiscation of the United Effort Plan Illegal" filed by The Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, The Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Mormon Church. (Wright, Lawrence) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None
                                        AMENDED MOTION for "Immediate Judgment to Declare the Confiscation of the Unit Effort Plan Illegal" by Roland Cooke. (LSP) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for "Immediate Judgment to Declare the Confiscation of the Unit Effort Plan Illegal" by Roland Cooke. (LSP) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                            MOTION to Amend Complaint: Damages by Roland Cooke. (LSP) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment for Monetary Damages by Roland Cooke. (LSP) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 45 MOTION for Hearing or Conference re: Negotiated Settlement filed by The Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, The Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Mormon Church. (Wright, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION (3rd Petition) for a Negotiated Settlement by Roland Cooke. (SAT) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    MOTION(Petition) for "the Judge to Declare the Confiscation of the United Effort Plan Illegal" by Roland Cooke. (LSP) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                      RESPONSE re 40 Defendants Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Roland Cooke. (LSP) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 39 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by The Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, The Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Mormon Church. (Wright, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Further Petitions filed by The Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, The Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Mormon Church. (Wright, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                            REPLY in Support re 36 MOTION to Dismiss Case [Amended Complaint] MOTION to Dismiss Case [Amended Complaint] filed by The Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, The Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Mormon Church. (Wright, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION to Consolidate Cases (with CV 09-8003-PCT-LOA) by Roland Cooke. (REW, ) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Further Petitions by Roland Cooke. (REW, ) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 36 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Roland Cooke. (REW, ) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Case [Amended Complaint] by The Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, The Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Mormon Church. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Wright, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roland Cooke. The Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints served on 12/9/2008. (LSP) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roland Cooke. The Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints served on 12/9/2008. (LSP) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, The Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints ; Party Mormon Church terminated, filed by Roland Cooke.(TLJ) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 10 Motion to Dismiss Case. FURTHER ORDERED that the Complaint against the FBI is dismissed without preudice pursuant to FRCP 4(m). FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot 18 Motion for Default Judgment; denying as moot 19 Motion to change the name. FURTHER ORDERED granting 19 Motion to Amend/Correct. Pla must file an Amended Complaint with the Clerk no later than 12/23/08. No good cause appearing, Plaintiff's request for the Court to appoint a United States Marshal to effect service is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk to close this case if Pla should fail to comply. FURTHER ORDERED denying 21 Motion for Injunctive Relief; denying 24 Motion to Consolidate Cases and Dismiss Charges against Warren Jeffs; denying 26 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 27 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 11/25/08.(DNH) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 24 MOTION for "to Consolidate Cases and Dismiss Charges against Warren Jeffs" filed by Mormon Church. (Wright, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against the Mormon Church filed by Mormon Church. (Wright, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 27 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Relief filed by Mormon Church. (Wright, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 21 MOTION for Injunctive Relief filed by Mormon Church. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 and 2 to Response)(Wright, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      Second MOTION (titled "Petition") for Immediate Injunctive Relief by Roland Cooke. (SAT) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION (titled "Petition") for a Summary Judgment Against the Mormon Church by Roland Cooke. (SAT) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant may have to and including 11/26/08, to file its Response to Plaintiff's Petition for Injunctive Relief. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 11/12/08.(LSP) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION(Petition) "to Consolidate Cases and Dismiss Charges against Warren Jeffs" by Roland Cooke. (LSP) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time by Mormon Church. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wright, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                REPLY (entitled "Response") to Response to Motion re 19 MOTION to Amend/Correct re complaint MOTION for Change the Name (or add as a defendant) filed by Roland Cooke. (KMG, ) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION for Injunctive Relief by Roland Cooke. (KMG) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 19 MOTION to Amend/Correct re complaint MOTION for Change the Name (or add as a defendant) filed by Mormon Church. (Wright, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION to Change the Name (or add as a defendant), or in the alternative, MOTION to file an amended complaint by Roland Cooke. (TLJ) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION for Default Judgment as to FBI by Roland Cooke. (TLJ) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          REPLY in Support re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Mormon Church. (Wright, Lawrence) Modified on 9/12/2008 DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCivP 7.1(c). ATTORNEY NOTICED. (KMG). (Entered: 09/11/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            AMENDED DOCUMENT by Roland Cooke. Amendment to 15 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (LSP) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Roland Cooke. (DMT, ) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                AMENDED ORDER signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 8/29/08. Plaintiff shall file with the Clerk of the Court and serve on opposing counsel a responsive memorandum to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Case no later than September 11, 2008.(KSP) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER signed by Judge Mary H. Murguia on 8/29/08. Plaintiff shall file with the Clerk of the Court and serve on opposing counsel a responsive memorandum to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Case. (KSP) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER entered by Judge Mary H. Murguia on 8/29/08. Having reviewed Plaintiff's motion for default and the docket in this matter, the Court notes that Plaintiff has failed to seek default from the Clerk of the Court as required under Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. In addition, as Defendants establish in their opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, the Court notes that proof of service appears inadequate pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for default (Dkt. #9) is DENIED without prejudice. [This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.] (KSP) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Mormon church filed by Mormon Church. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B to Response in Opposition to Petition for Default Judgment)(Wright, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Case by Mormon Church. (Wright, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Default Judgment as to The Mormon Church by Roland Cooke. (TLJ) (Entered: 08/15/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed Mormon Church served on 7/15/2008. (REW, ) (Entered: 07/23/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed upon US Agency/Officer IRS (not party to case) served on 6/30/08. (REW, ) (Entered: 07/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed upon US Agency/Officer Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 6/30/08. (REW, ) (Entered: 07/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  AMENDED Minute Order (Amended to correct case division from PHX to PCT) Pursuant to Local Rule 3.8(a), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned byrandom draw to Judge Mary H. Murguia. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 08-8080-PCT-MHM. (MAP) (Entered: 07/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    Minute Order Pursuant to Local Rule 3.8(a), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Mary H. Murguia. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 08-8080-PHX-MHM.(MAP) (Entered: 07/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. TEXT ONLY ENTRY, NO PDF DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (MAP) (Entered: 07/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Election Form Deadline (Attachments: # 1 Instructions)(HIH) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number PHX072764, filed by Roland Cooke. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(HIH) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 17 times.

                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?