Garner v. Vaki et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-01283
District Judge Christine M. Arguello, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 8:46 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kassi Garner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Torbet +1 719 471 9300 +1 719 578 5671 JRTorbet@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 320

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hans Christian Tuft +1 719 475 9300 hctuft@torbetlaw.com
v.
No Logo Aloisia Vaki, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellis Jay Mayer +1 303 691 3737 +1 303 757 5106 emayer@nbdmlaw.com
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellis Jay Mayer +1 303 691 3737 +1 303 757 5106 emayer@nbdmlaw.com
No Logo Corporation Of The Presiding Bishopric Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellis Jay Mayer +1 303 691 3737 +1 303 757 5106 emayer@nbdmlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
Transmittal of Documents to El Paso County District Court re Order of Remand 3 . (cmacd ) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER REMANDING CASE to the District Court, El Paso County, Colorado, for further proceedings, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/21/2011. (erv, ) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
      COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishopric of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Aloisia Vaki, filed by Kassi Garner.(lyg, ) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF REMOVAL from El Paso County District Court, Case Number 2011-cv-2019. (Filing fee $ 350 Receipt Number 37872), filed by Corporation of the Presiding Bishopric of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Aloisia Vaki. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Receipt)(lyg, ) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 33 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?