S.L. v. Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-00242
District Judge J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 16, 2017 at 2:18 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo S.L., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenberg & McKay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(Inactive), LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Moana A. Yost +5330 533 533 0434 myost@hawaii.rr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenberg McKay Hoffman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles E. McKay +5330 533 533 0434 charles@rmhlawhawaii.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randall L.K.M. Rosenberg +5330 533 533 0434 randall@rmhlawhawaii.com
v.
No Logo Brian R. Pickett, Defendant
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Koshiba Agena & Kubota

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle J. Bento mbento@koshibalaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E.T. Koshiba +5233 523 523 3900 jkoshiba@koshibalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pauahi Tower

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles A. Price cprice@koshibalaw.com
No Logo JOHN DOES 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Maui Land & Pineapple Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Youth Development Enterprises, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
Circuit Court of the Second Circuit, State of Hawaii's ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of documentation re: 9 STIPULATION TO REMAND CASE TO THE SECOND CIRCUIT COURT OF THE STATE OF HAWAII. (afc) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
    Clerk's TRANSMITTAL COVER LETTER addressed to the Court Administrator, Circuit Court of the Second Circuit, State of Hawaii re: 9 STIPULATION TO REMAND CASE TO THE SECOND CIRCUIT COURT OF THE STATE OF HAWAII. (afc) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
      STIPULATION TO REMAND CASE TO THE SECOND CIRCUIT COURT OF THE STATE OF HAWAII. Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/12/2014. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 06/13/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CIV NO 14-00242 JMS-RLP on all further filings. (eps )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. (Entered: 06/12/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          EO: The Court directs the Clerk's Office to reassign this case to a District Judge. Judge Puglisi will remain as the Magistrate Judge. (JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 06/12/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Price, Charles) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
              EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 6/23/2014 before JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. (JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE . (Attachments: # 1 Election Form To Consent)(eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Order Setting RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE : TO BE SET before Magistrate Judge Richard L Puglisi . Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 05/22/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Memo re: Corporate Disclosure Statements)(eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO: Re CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                    CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 1 Notice of Removal, . (Price, Charles) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints from Second Circuit Court, State of Hawaii, case number 14-1-0254(1). ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-1393156), filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Complaint)(Price, Charles) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 58 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?