Jones v. Sorenson
Federal Civil Lawsuit Utah District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-00842
District Judge David Sam, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 5, 2018 at 2:30 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tammy Jones, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by HARRIS LAWYERS PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen K. Harris +1 435 635 9814

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF CHAD A BOWERS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad A. Bowers +1 702 457 1001
v.
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant
No Logo John Robert Sorenson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by RICHARDS BRANDT MILLER NELSON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lynn S. Davies +1 801 531 2010 lynn-davies@rbmn.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 16 Motion to Dismiss. Case Closed. Signed by Judge David Sam on 11/20/13. (jmr) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Tammy Jones, Defendant John Robert Sorenson. (jmr) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
      Plaintiff's MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Tammy Jones. (Harris, Stephen) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by Chambers) Status Conference is set for Thursday, 11/14/2013 at 02:30 PM in Judges Chambers before Judge David Sam. (kmj) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Sam: Status Conference held on 10/10/2013. The Court was advised that the case has settled but Mr. Davis' client has not signed the documents. A further Status Conference set for 11/7/2013 at 02:30 PM in Judges Chambers before Judge David Sam. Parties who have not signed the settlement agreement must attend the hearing or face contempt of Court. Mr. Bowers may appear telephonically and is directed to prepare an order reflecting the ruling of this court in this hearing. Attorney for Plaintiff: Chad Bowers, by phone. Attorney for Defendant: Lynn Davis. Court Reporter: Ray Fenlon. (kmj) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER re: Status Conference before this Court is set for November 7, 2013 at the hour of 2:30 p.m. to determine the status of finalizing the settlement in this matter. See Order for details. Signed by Judge David Sam on 10/16/13. (jmr) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by Chambers) Status Conference is set for Thursday, 10/10/2013 at 02:30 PM in Judges Chambers before Judge David Sam. (kmj) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER re: Settlement ( Status Conference set for 10/10/2013 02:30 PM in Room 420 before Judge David Sam.). Signed by Judge David Sam on 9/25/13. (jmr) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 9 Motion to Stay for 60 days, or until no earlier than June 20, 2013 to allow all parties to privately mediate this matter. Signed by Judge David Sam on 04/22/2013. (tls) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
                    Joint MOTION to Stay Stipulation for private mediation filed by Plaintiff Tammy Jones, Defendant John Robert Sorenson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Harris, Stephen) Modified on 4/22/2013 changed relief from for ADR to to Stay (asp). (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Tammy Jones, Defendant John Robert Sorenson. (jmr) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                        ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by John Robert Sorenson.(Davies, Lynn) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn S. Davies on behalf of John Robert Sorenson (Davies, Lynn) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                            **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tammy Jones as to John Robert Sorenson served on 10/12/2012, answer due 11/2/2012. (Harris, Stephen) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                              **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints.. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (rls) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                                **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to John Robert Sorenson. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (rls) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 1088-1668147), filed by Tammy Jones. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Sam (Harris, Stephen) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Sam. Plaintiff Tammy Jones is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 350.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jds) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 107 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?