Carter v. Jones et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-00322
Magistrate Judge M Hannah Lauck(MJ), presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 30, 2016 at 12:54 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Eileen Carter, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rumsey & Bugg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Albert Davis Bugg, Jr. +1 804 438 5588 +1 804 438 5599 adb@rumseyandbugg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Albert Davis Bugg, Jr. +1 804 438 5588 +1 804 438 5599 adb@rumseyandbugg.com
v.
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Taylor & Walker PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E. Brydges +1 757 625 7300 +1 757 625 1504 jbrydges@taylorwalkerlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHRISTOPHER JOHN WIEMKEN +1 757 625 7300 cwiemken@taylorwalkerlaw.com
No Logo Spencer Jones, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Taylor & Walker PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E. Brydges +1 757 625 7300 +1 757 625 1504 jbrydges@taylorwalkerlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHRISTOPHER JOHN WIEMKEN +1 757 625 7300 cwiemken@taylorwalkerlaw.com
No Logo Mary Elizabeth Davis, Guardian ad litem

Toggle Switch Represented by Spotts Fain PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Elizabeth Skora Davis +1 804 697 2035 mdavis@spottsfain.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND COMPROMISE OF CLAIM FOR WRONGFUL DEATH; Granting 16 Motion for Settlement Approval; Granting 18 Amended Motion for Settlement Approval. See Order for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 8/14/12. (tdai, ) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge M. Hannah Lauck: Appearances: Pltf. w/counsel, deft. by counsel, guardian ad litem. Matter came on for settlement approval hearing. Court to enter order approving settlement and granting amended petition. (Tape #FTR.)(lcha, ) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
      STATUS REPORT (Amended Report of the Guardian Ad Litem) by Mary Elizabeth Davis. (Davis, Mary) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
        Amended MOTION for Settlement Approval by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Spencer Jones. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Wiemken, Christopher) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
          NOTICE by Mary Elizabeth Davis of Filing Report of Guardian Ad Litem (Davis, Mary) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
            MOTION for Settlement Approval by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Wiemken, Christopher) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM; The parties have indicated that they have reached a compromise settlement in the above-referenced matter. According to the Plaintiff, Donte Javon Carter, one of three adult children of the deceased, is incarcerated in the Haynesville Correctional Center in Haynesville, Virginia. ACCORDINGLY, to ensure the interests of the foregoing incarcerated adult are protected, it is hereby, ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Mary Elizabeth (Betsy) Davis, Esq., an attorney with the Richmond-based law firm Spotts Fain, is hereby appointed as guardian ad litem to represent the interestsof Donte Javon Carter in the present action. Signed by Magistrate Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 8/3/12. (tdai, ) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER Based on the parties' representation that they have reached a settlement in this wrongful-death case, the Court hereby schedules this matter for a settlement approval hearing on August 14, 2012, at 4:00 p.m. The parties shall file the petition for approval of the wrongful-death settlement no later than August 6, 2012. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 8/2/12. (tdai, ) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                  LETTER received from counsel case settled in mediation (lcha, ) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge M. Hannah Lauck for all purposes except settlement negotiations, which are hereby referred to Magistrate Judge David J. Novak. It is further ORDERED that the Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled on the undersigned's docket for 11:15 a.m. June 25, 2012 is cancelled. District Judge Robert E. Payne no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 6/20/12. It is so ORDERED.(tdai, ) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Eileen Carter, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Spencer Jones. (filed on Consent Form) (jtho, ) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Eileen Carter. (Bugg, Albert) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Spencer Jones. (Brydges, James) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER It appears that this action would be sooner resolved if the parties consent to referral of the case in its entirety to a Magistrate Judge as the presiding judicial officer (of course, preserving the right to trial by jury if such has been demanded). It is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall confer with their respective clients and with each other to determine whether both parties will consent to assignment of the case to a Magistrate Judge as the presiding judicial officer. See Order for complete details. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 5/31/12. (tdai, ) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/25/2012 at 11:15 AM before District Judge Robert E. Payne.. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 5/16/12. (sneal, ) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                ORDER entered by the Clerk at the direction of the Court setting an Initial Pretrial Conference to be held at 11:15 a.m. on June 25, 2012.. (sneal, ) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                  Response to 1 Notice of Removal, filed by Eileen Carter. (Bugg, Albert) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Albert Davis Bugg, Jr on behalf of Eileen Carter (Bugg, Albert) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by James Edward Brydges, Jr on behalf of Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Spencer Jones (Brydges, James) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                        Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (tdai, ) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Northumberland County, case number CL12-012 ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34683016853.), filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Receipt)(tdai, ) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 61 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?