Bartels v. Gardner
Federal Civil Lawsuit Alaska District Court, Case No. 3:06-cv-00184
District Judge Timothy M. Burgess, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 10, 2019 at 12:59 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John Bartels, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry R Conybeare +1 269 983 0561 +1 269 983 5327 barry@conybearelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 202

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Schneider +1 907 277 9306 +1 907 274 8201 mschneider@aktriallaw.com
v.
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Paul H. Bratton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank S. Koziol Jr. +1 907 258 7706 +1 907 258 7707 koziol@gci.net
No Logo Richard Gardner, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Paul H. Bratton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank S. Koziol Jr. +1 907 258 7706 +1 907 258 7707 koziol@gci.net
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Richard Gardner, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Koziol Jr., Frank) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None
    TMB ORDER GRANTING 18 Fourth Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due 6/21/2007. (SRL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/25/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
      AFFIDAVIT re 18 Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by John Bartels. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order To Extend Time To Answer)(Conybeare, Barry) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
        Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by John Bartels.(Conybeare, Barry) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER GRANTING 15 Third Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint. Answer due 4/13/2007. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 02/12/07. (SRL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: None
            AFFIDAVIT re 15 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer cOMPLAINT, UNOPPOSED In Support Of by John Bartels. (Conybeare, Barry) (Entered: 01/04/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: None
              Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer cOMPLAINT, UNOPPOSED by John Bartels. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Extend time to answer Complaint)(Conybeare, Barry) (Entered: 01/04/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: None
                TMB ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Complaint-Unopposed. Richard Gardner answer due 1/8/2007; Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints answer due 1/8/2007. (LSC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/22/2006)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: None
                  AFFIDAVIT re 12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint-Unopposed of Barry Conybeare by John Bartels. (Conybeare, Barry) (Entered: 11/22/2006)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: None
                    Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint-Unopposed by John Bartels. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order for extenstion of time to answer)(Conybeare, Barry) (Entered: 11/22/2006)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: None
                      Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion to Extend Time Within Which the Defendants may Answer The Complaint by John Bartels. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Affidavit)(Conybeare, Barry) Modified on 11/21/2006 to reflect errors: affidavit filed as motion, word "proposed" not reflected on the proposed order, affidavit filed an attachment to the motion; correction: motion terminated, atty to refile motion with proposed order as an attachment, completed affidavit to be filed as a separate document using event "Other Documents(Affidavit)." (LSC, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/21/2006)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: None
                        ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion for Permission to Appear as Non-Resident Attorney on behalf of Plaintiff John Bartels by Barry Conybeare. (SRL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/03/2006)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: None
                          Docket Annotation; Receipt for Non-Resident Atty fee $150.00 re 8 MOTION Application of Non-Resident Attorney Barry R. Conybeare for Permission to Appear and Participate in the US District Court on behalf of plaintiff John Bartels. (PLD, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/02/2006)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: None
                            MOTION Application of Non-Resident Attorney for Permission to Appear and Participate in the US District Court on behalf of plaintiff John Bartels by John Bartels. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(PLD, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/02/2006)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: None
                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Bartels Motion Pro Hac Vice (Schneider, Michael) (Entered: 11/01/2006)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Frank S. Koziol Jr. on behalf of Richard Gardner, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints (Koziol Jr., Frank) (Entered: 10/31/2006)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: None
                                  ORDER Plaintiff's unopposed ex parte motion to extend the time in which Defendants may answer the complaint at Docket No. 4 is hereby GRANTED in part. Defendants shall have 45 days to answer or to move for a further extension of time in which to answer. Any future requests for extensions of time to answer shall be accompanied by a status report informing the Court about the progress of the case. (EKS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/13/2006)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/9/2006, Entered: None
                                    Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by John Bartels. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Extention of Time to Answer)(Schneider, Michael) (Entered: 10/09/2006)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/9/2006, Entered: None
                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Bartels. Richard Gardner waiver sent on 9/18/2006, answer due 11/17/2006; Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints waiver sent on 9/14/2006, answer due 11/13/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Waiver of Service of Summons)(Schneider, Michael) (Entered: 10/09/2006)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
                                        COMPLAINT against all defendants (Filing fee $ 350/receipt # 00128691) , filed by John Bartels.(SMF) Modified on 10/13/2006 Create relationship to document #5 (DPM, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/10/2006)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 94 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?