Angela Pettus v. The Servicing Company, LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 16-1145

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 16, 2017 at 11:08 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None
Rule 42(b) mandate issued. Originating case number: 3:15-cv-00479-HEH-DJN.. [16-1145] (JHM)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
    DISTRICT COURT UPDATE.ORDER that the Court hereby DENIES Plaintiff's Motion [29] to Compel as MOOT. The Court hereby CANCELS the evidentiary hearing previously scheduled for March 2, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. The Court hereby ORDERS the parties to immediately notify the fourth Circuit Court of Appeals that this case has been resolved and there is no longer any case or controversy pending before the Court. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Novak on 2/29/2016. Order distributed as directed. [16-1145] (JB)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None
      ORDER filed [999765139] granting Motion to dismiss appeal [17], dismissing appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [18] Copies to all parties.. [16-1145] (JHM)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None
        CONSENT/STIPULATION by Appellants Barbara Dolan and The Servicing Company, LLC to dismiss appeal [17] [16-1145] Thomas McKee
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
          DISTRICT COURT UPDATE.ORDER that the Court hereby DENIES the Motion [82] for Reconsideration. The Court will move forward with the evidentiary hearing on March 2, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. as previously scheduled. See Order for additional information and deadlines. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Novak on 2/26/2016. Order distributed as directed [16-1145] (JB)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
            DISTRICT COURT UPDATE.ORDER that the Court GRANTS Defendant The Servicing Company, LLC's Motion [80] for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that The Servicing Company, LLC shall file its reply in support of its Motion [49] to Retain Confidentiality of Documents on or before March 3, 2016. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Novak on 2/26/2016. Order electronically sent to all counsel of record. ( [16-1145] (JB)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None
              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Susan M. Rotkis for Michelle Campbell, Lawrence Mwethuku and Angela Pettus.[999761640] [16-1145] Susan Rotkis
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None
                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Leonard A. Bennett for Michelle Campbell, Lawrence Mwethuku and Angela Pettus.[999761634] [16-1145] Leonard Bennett
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None
                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellees Michelle Campbell, Lawrence Mwethuku and Angela Pettus. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999761631] [16-1145] Leonard Bennett
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                    DISTRICT COURT UPDATE. ORDER that the Court GRANTS Defendants' [73] Motion to Extend Time to Comply With Court's Order. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' time to comply with the Court's February 9, 2016 [58] Order is extended until 5:00 p.m. on February 29, 2016. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Novak on 2/17/2016. Order electronically sent to all counsel of record. [16-1145] (JB)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None
                      DISTRICT COURT UPDATE. JUDGMENT entered by Clerk, pursuant to Rule 68 and in accordance with Plaintiff Michelle Campbell's Notice of Acceptance of Offer of Judgment filed 2/11/2016. Signed by Clerk on 2/16/2016.16-1145] (JB)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None
                        COURT ORDER filed [999754553] denying Motion for stay pending appeal [4] Copies to all parties.. [16-1145] (JHM)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None
                          REPLY by Barbara Dolan and The Servicing Company, LLC to Response [6].. [16-1145] David Barger
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None
                            RESPONSE/ANSWER by Angela Pettus to Motion for stay pending appeal [4]. Nature of response: in opposition. [16-1145] Kristi Kelly
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None
                              NOTICE ISSUED to Mr. Leonard Anthony Bennett for Angela Pettus, Lawrence Mwethuku and Michelle Campbell, Andrew Joseph Guzzo for Angela Pettus, Lawrence Mwethuku and Michelle Campbell, Kristi Cahoon Kelly for Angela Pettus, Lawrence Mwethuku and Michelle Campbell, Ms. Susan Mary Rotkis for Angela Pettus, Lawrence Mwethuku and Michelle Campbell and Mr. James Wilson Speer for Angela Pettus, Lawrence Mwethuku and Michelle Campbell requesting response to Motion for stay pending appeal [4]Response due: 10:00 am 02/12/2016.[999754132].. [16-1145] (JHM)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None
                                MOTION by Appellants Barbara Dolan and The Servicing Company, LLC for stay pending appeal... [999754129] [16-1145] David Barger
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None
                                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant The Servicing Company, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999754015] [16-1145] David Barger
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None
                                    DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 3:15-cv-00479-HEH-DJN.. [16-1145] (JHM)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None
                                      Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:15-cv-00479-HEH-DJN. Case manager: JMoore. [16-1145] (JHM)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 289 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?