ROLSHOVEN v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:14-vv-00439

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 6:21 PM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo LEIGH ROLSHOVEN, Petitioner

Represented by Mark T. Sadaka, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARK T. SADAKA +1 201 266 5670 +1 201 266 5671 mark@sadakafirm.com
as the court-appointed Guardian and Conservator of HANNAH HUELSENBECK MARK T. SADAKA +1 201 266 5670 +1 201 266 5671 mark@sadakafirm.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Debra A. Filteau Begley +1 202 616 4181 +1 202 616 4310 debra.begley@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 300
Nature of Suit 498 - Other Action
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
EXPERT REPORT of Dr. Steinman (Ex. no. 26) filed by LEIGH ROLSHOVEN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
    MOTION for Extension of Time until April 22, 2016 to file supplemental expert report , filed by LEIGH ROLSHOVEN.Response due by 5/2/2016. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None
      MOTION for Extension of Time until April 14, 2016 to file supplemental expert report , filed by LEIGH ROLSHOVEN.Response due by 4/18/2016. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None
        MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #A, Tab 1 through A Tab 11] filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Tab 1, # 2 Exhibit A, Tab 2, # 3 Exhibit A, Tab 3, # 4 Exhibit A, Tab 4, # 5 Exhibit A, Tab 5, # 6 Exhibit A, Tab 6, # 7 Exhibit A, Tab 7, # 8 Exhibit A, Tab 8, # 9 Exhibit A, Tab 9, # 10 Exhibit A, Tab 10, # 11 Exhibit A, Tab 11)(Begley, Debra) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None
          EXPERT REPORT (Ex. no. A) filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Begley, Debra) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None
            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/19/16 to file expert report , filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Response due by 1/7/2016. (Begley, Debra) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/15/2015, Entered: None
              EXPERT REPORT of Prof. Lawrence Steinman, M.D. (Ex. no. 25) filed by LEIGH ROLSHOVEN. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 08/15/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until August 15, 2015 to file an expert report , filed by LEIGH ROLSHOVEN.Response due by 7/6/2015. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Report , filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 5/4/2015. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None
                    SCHEDULING ORDER : Petitioner's Expert Report is due on or before 4/17/2015. Signed by Special Master Brian H. Corcoran. (ag) Copy to parties. (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None
                      Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Begley, Debra) (Entered: 02/10/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF INTENT to Remain in the Program by Petitioner. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                          ORDER Regarding the statutory 240-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired: Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed on or before 2/19/2015. Signed by Special Master Brian H. Corcoran. (ag) Copy to parties. (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
                            STATEMENT of Completion by. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
                              MEDICAL RECORDS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 23, # 2 Exhibit 24)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None
                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Medical Records , filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 11/17/2014. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                                  MEDICAL RECORDS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 21, # 2 Exhibit 22)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
                                    AMENDED PETITION re: 1 Petition filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT , filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT , filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                                          MEDICAL RECORDS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 20.1, # 2 Exhibit 20.2, # 3 Exhibit 20.3, # 4 Exhibit 20.4, # 5 Exhibit 20.5, # 6 Exhibit 20.6)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF FILING Petitioner's School Records by. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 19)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Intent to File on Compact Disc pursuant to Vaccine General Order #13 filed by All Plaintiffs.Compact Disc due by 7/21/2014. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Intent to File on Compact Disc pursuant to Vaccine General Order #13 filed by All Plaintiffs.Compact Disc due by 7/7/2014. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Debra A. Filteau Begley for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES .. (Begley, Debra) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE OF FILING by. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EyeCare Center of St. James, # 2 Exhibit Hartberg Medical Clinic, # 3 Exhibit Mayo Clinic Health System-Makato, # 4 Exhibit Windom Area Hospital (Pages 1 - 60), # 5 Exhibit Windom Area Hospital (Pages 61 120), # 6 Exhibit Windom Area Hospital (Pages 121 196), # 7 Exhibit Mayo Clinic Health System- St. James Hospital, # 8 Exhibit Sanford Neurology Clinic, # 9 Exhibit Ophthalmology Associates (Pages 1 20), # 10 Exhibit Ophthalmology Associates (Pages 21 41), # 11 Exhibit Mankato Clinic - Ophthalmology Department, # 12 Exhibit Hartberg Medical Clinic (Updated), # 13 Exhibit Windom Area Hospital (Updated))(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                      INITIAL ORDER: (Signed by Special Master Brian H. Corcoran.)(mpj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jb) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Brian H. Corcoran. (jb) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                            PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $400, Receipt number 076676) [Vaccination date: 6/27/2011], filed by LEIGH ROLSHOVEN. Respondents Report due by 8/20/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jb) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 181 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?