TRUMP, et al v. BABBITT, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:93-cv-01882
District Judge Nicholas H. Politan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 26, 2017 at 12:03 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "DONALD J. TRUMP"
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN J. BARRY +1 973 622 4444
Trump Organization, Inc. Trump Organization, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "TRUMP ORGANIZATION, THE"

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN J. BARRY +1 973 622 4444
Trump Plaza Associates, GP Trump Plaza Associates, GP, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "TRUMP PLAZA ASSOCIATES"

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN J. BARRY +1 973 622 4444
Trump Taj Mahal Associates, LP Trump Taj Mahal Associates, LP, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "TRUMP TAJ MAHAL ASSOCIATES"

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN J. BARRY +1 973 622 4444
Trump's Castle Associates, LP Trump's Castle Associates, LP, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "TRUMP'S CASTLE ASSOCIATES"

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN J. BARRY +1 973 622 4444
v.
No Logo ANTHONY HOPE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BETTE E. UHRMACHER +1 973 645 2920
No Logo BRUCE BABBITT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BETTE E. UHRMACHER +1 973 645 2920
No Logo CHARLES KEECHI, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER for Administrative Termination. ( Signed by Judge Nicholas H. Politan ) (bl) (Entered: 11/30/1994)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/21/1994, Entered: None
    ORDER, setting status conference for 10/14/94 ( signed by Magistrate Ronald J. Hedges ) (mn) (Entered: 09/23/1994)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/1/1994, Entered: None
      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE mailing of first set of "Federal defts" interrogatories, etc. (sr) (Entered: 09/02/1994)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/11/1994, Entered: None
        Substitute attorney for TRUMP'S CASTLE, TRUMP ORGANIZATION, TRUMP PLAZA ASSO., DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP TAJ MAHAL ; Terminated attorney JOHN J. BARRY for TRUMP TAJ MAHAL, attorney JOHN J. BARRY for DONALD J. TRUMP, attorney JOHN J. BARRY for TRUMP PLAZA ASSO., attorney JOHN J. BARRY for TRUMP ORGANIZATION, attorney JOHN J. BARRY for TRUMP'S CASTLE ; Added, JOHN J. BARRY (change of firm) (bl) (Entered: 08/12/1994)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/11/1994, Entered: None
          CONSENT ORDER, reset scheduling conference for 12:00 9/15/94 etc. ( signed by Magistrate Ronald J. Hedges ) n/m (ar) (Entered: 05/12/1994)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/4/1994, Entered: None
            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BRUCE BABBITT, ANTHONY HOPE of initial disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 (bl) (Entered: 03/08/1994)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/22/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER denying defendant's [7-1] motion to dismiss, etc. ( signed by Judge Nicholas H. Politan ) (bl) (Entered: 02/25/1994)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/15/1994, Entered: None
                ANSWER to Complaint by BRUCE BABBITT, ANTHONY HOPE and cert. of service. (bl) (Entered: 02/17/1994)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/10/1994, Entered: None
                  ORDER, set scheduling conference for 5/10/94 , etc. ( signed by Magistrate Ronald J. Hedges ) (bl) (Entered: 02/15/1994)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/26/1994, Entered: None
                    ORDER, reset status conference for 5/10/94 ( signed by Magistrate Ronald J. Hedges ) (bl) (Entered: 01/27/1994)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/26/1994, Entered: None
                      TRACK ONE ORDER OF DESIGNATION signed by Magistrate Ronald J. Hedges FILED (bl) (Entered: 01/27/1994)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/14/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 1/14/94; The following actions were taken, Ordered minutes of 1-10-94 amended and to read as follows: Hrg. on defts motion to dismiss. Ordered motion denied. Ordered motion denied. Ordered matter referred to Mag. for discovery proceedings. By Judge Nicholas H. Politan (bl) (Entered: 01/18/1994)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/10/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: S. Rizman; Minutes of: 1/10/94; The following actions were taken, [7-1] motion to dismiss taken under advisement, Decision Reserved. Ordered summary judgment motions to be filed after discovery has been completed. answer to be filed. By Judge Nicholas H. Politan (bl) (Entered: 01/11/1994)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/7/1993, Entered: None
                            AFFIDAVIT of Holly Reckord (bl) (Entered: 12/08/1993)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/29/1993, Entered: None
                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of brief in opposition to defts' motion to dismiss & decl. of LEON Friedman (bl) (Entered: 12/01/1993)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/29/1993, Entered: None
                                DECLARATION of Leon Friedman in opposition to Federal defts' motion to dismiss (bl) (Entered: 12/01/1993)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/25/1993, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 10/25/93; The following actions were taken, resetting motion hearing on [7-1] motion to dismiss by ANTHONY HOPE, BRUCE BABBITT for 12/13/93 By Judge Nicholas H. Politan (bl) (Entered: 10/27/1993)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/18/1993, Entered: None
                                    ORDER that status conference is adjourned until after conclusion of defts' mtoion to dismiss first amended complaint ( signed by Magistrate Ronald J. Hedges ) (bl) (Entered: 10/19/1993)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/1/1993, Entered: None
                                      Notice of MOTION to dismiss by BRUCE BABBITT, ANTHONY HOPE, Motion hearing set for 10/25/93 on [7-1] motion and cert. of service . (brief submitted) (bl) (Entered: 10/04/1993)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/14/1993, Entered: None
                                        Conent ORDER, extending time , set answer due for 9/30/93 for ANTHONY HOPE, for BRUCE BABBITT ( signed by Magistrate Ronald J. Hedges ) (bl) (Entered: 09/20/1993)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/10/1993, Entered: None
                                          ORDER, set status conference for 10/14/93 ( signed by Magistrate Ronald J. Hedges ) (bl) (Entered: 09/14/1993)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/19/1993, Entered: None
                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to U.S. ATTORNEY ON 6/10/93 (bl) (Entered: 08/20/1993)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/4/1993, Entered: None
                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT by DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP ORGANIZATION, TRUMP'S CASTLE, TRUMP PLAZA ASSO., TRUMP TAJ MAHAL , amending [1-1] complaint against ANTHONY HOPE (bl) (Entered: 05/06/1993)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/30/1993, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate RONALD J. HEDGES (femp) (Entered: 05/05/1993)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/30/1993, Entered: None
                                                  COMPLAINT filed FILING FEE $ 120. RECEIPT # 170152 (femp) (Entered: 05/05/1993)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 121 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?