Cemex Construction Materials South LLC v. Grady's Quality Excavating Incorporated
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-08012
District Judge Frederick J Martone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 2, 2018 at 4:30 AM EST (3.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Cemex Construction Materials South, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frances J Haynes +1 602 262 5710 +1 602 734 3913 fhaynes@lrrc.com
v.
No Logo Cheryl L Hopson, Defendant

Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cody Maryl Hall +1 602 200 1289 +1 602 230 8985 minute-entries@soarizonalaw.com

Represented by Schneider & Onofry PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dee Roland Giles +1 602 200 1297 +1 602 230 8985 dgiles@soarizonalaw.com
No Logo Grady L Hopson, Defendant

Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cody Maryl Hall +1 602 200 1289 +1 602 230 8985 minute-entries@soarizonalaw.com

Represented by Schneider & Onofry PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dee Roland Giles +1 602 200 1297 +1 602 230 8985 dgiles@soarizonalaw.com
No Logo Grady's Quality Excavating Incorporated, Defendant

Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cody Maryl Hall +1 602 200 1289 +1 602 230 8985 minute-entries@soarizonalaw.com

Represented by Schneider & Onofry PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dee Roland Giles +1 602 200 1297 +1 602 230 8985 dgiles@soarizonalaw.com
No Logo Montana Builders LLC, Defendant
No Logo Ronald F Wilson, Defendant
No Logo Cheryl L Hopson, Cross Claimant

Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cody Maryl Hall +1 602 200 1289 +1 602 230 8985 minute-entries@soarizonalaw.com

Represented by Schneider & Onofry PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dee Roland Giles +1 602 200 1297 +1 602 230 8985 dgiles@soarizonalaw.com
No Logo Grady L Hopson, Cross Claimant

Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cody Maryl Hall +1 602 200 1289 +1 602 230 8985 minute-entries@soarizonalaw.com

Represented by Schneider & Onofry PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dee Roland Giles +1 602 200 1297 +1 602 230 8985 dgiles@soarizonalaw.com
No Logo Grady's Quality Excavating Incorporated, Cross Claimant

Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cody Maryl Hall +1 602 200 1289 +1 602 230 8985 minute-entries@soarizonalaw.com

Represented by Schneider & Onofry PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dee Roland Giles +1 602 200 1297 +1 602 230 8985 dgiles@soarizonalaw.com
No Logo Montana Builders LLC, Cross Defendant
No Logo Ronald F Wilson, Cross Defendant
Citation Section 40 U.S.C. § 270
Nature of Suit 130 - Contract - Surety
  Entries (58) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Before the court is plaintiff's motion to vacate trial dates (doc. 56 ). The docket demonstrates that all claims in this case have been resolved. Therefore, IT IS ORDERED GRANTING plaintiff's motion to vacate trial dates (doc. 56). The pretrial conference and trial dates are vacated. The clerk shall close this case. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/4/2012. (KMG) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None
    NOTICE re Lodging Proposed Order by Cemex Construction Materials South LLC re 56 MOTION to Vacate Trial . (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haynes, Frances) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None
      MOTION to Vacate Trial by Cemex Construction Materials South LLC. (Haynes, Frances) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER pursuant to the 54 Stipulation for Dismissal, it is ordered that all claims in this matter asserted by Plaintiff the United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Cemex Construction Materials South, LLC ("Use Plaintiff Cemex") against Defendants Grady's Quality Excavating, Inc., Grady L. Hopson and Cheryl L. Hopson (the Grady Defendants) are dismissed, with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorney's fees and costs; that this Order for Dismissal does not affect the Grady Defendants' claims against Defendants Ronald F. Wilson and Montana Builders, LLC. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 01/06/12. (ESL) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None
          STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Cemex Construction Materials South LLC. (Haynes, Frances) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
            AMENDED DEFAULT JUDGMENT, Pursuant to Rule 55(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and upon instruction by the Court, default judgment is hereby entered against Cross Defendants Ronald F. Wilson and Montana Builders, LLC in the amount of $61,963.05, plus interest at the rate of one and one half percent per month from the date the payment was due until paid in full. Signed on 11/1/2011. (KMG) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 51 Motion to Amend/Correct - modifying the default judgment to read that default judgment is entered against cross defendants Ronald F. Wilson and Montana Builders, LLC in the amount of $61,963.05, plus interest at the rate of one and one half percent per month from the date the payment was due until paid in full. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/1/11.(KMG) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                MOTION to Amend/Correct Clerical Mistake, Oversight or Omission in Default Judgment by Grady's Quality Excavating Incorporated. (Giles, Dee) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                  JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Pursuant to the Order dated October 6, 2011 (doc. 48), judgment is entered for The United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Grady's Quality Excavating Incorporated and against Montana Builders, LLC and Ronald F. Wilson in the amount of $6,969.90 for attorneys fees and costs. (ESL) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                    AMENDED by doc. # 53 ...DEFAULT JUDGMENT Pursuant to Rule 55(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and upon instruction by the Court, default judgment is hereby entered against Cross Defendants Montana Builders LLC and Ronald F. Wilson in the amount of $61,963.05, plus interest at the rate of one and one half percent from the date the payment was due until paid in full. (ESL) Modified on 4/4/2012 (KMG). (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting Grady's 44 motion for default judgment against Montana Builders and Ronald Wilson in the amount of $61,963.05, plus interest at the rate of one and one half percent from the date the payment was due until paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting Grady's 45 motion for attorney's fees and costs against Montana Builders and Wilson in the amount of $6,969.90. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/05/11. (ESL) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                        NOTICE re Lodging Proposed Form Of Judgment by Grady's Quality Excavating Incorporated. (Giles, Dee) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                          STATEMENT of of Costs by Cross Claimant Grady's Quality Excavating Incorporated. (Giles, Dee) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                            *MOTION for Attorney Fees of the United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Grady's Quality Excavating Inc by Cross Claimant Grady's Quality Excavating Incorporated. (Giles, Dee) *Modified on 8/30/2011 to correct event "Motion for Attorney Fees". *(KMG). (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                              *MOTION for Default Judgment as to Cross-Defendants Montana Builders LLC and Ronald F Wilson by Cross Claimant Grady's Quality Excavating Incorporated. (Giles, Dee) *Modified on 8/30/2011 to correct event "Motion for Default Judgment".* (KMG). (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                DEFAULT JUDGMENT Pursuant to Rule 55(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and upon instruction by the Court, default judgment is hereby entered against Defendants Ronald F. Wilson and Montana Builders, LLC in the amount of $48,465.58 plus interest at the legal rate of 10% annum. (ESL) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting Cemex's 37 motion for entry of default judgment in the amount of $48, 465.58, plus interest at the legal rate of 10% per annum. IT IS ORDERED denying Cemex's 39 motion for attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 08/22/11. (ESL) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                    STATEMENT of Costs by Plaintiff Cemex Construction Materials South LLC. (Haynes, Frances) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                      DECLARATION of Frances J. Haynes in Support of Motion for Attorney's Fees re 39 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Cemex Construction Materials South LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Summary of Fees)(Haynes, Frances) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Attorney Fees by Cemex Construction Materials South LLC. (Haynes, Frances) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE re Lodging Proposed Judgment by Cemex Construction Materials South LLC re 37 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Ronald F. Wilson and Montana Builders, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Haynes, Frances) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Ronald F. Wilson and Montana Builders, LLC by Cemex Construction Materials South LLC. (Haynes, Frances) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                              Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Cross-Defendants Montana Builders LLC, and Ronald F Wilson (KMG) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Cross Claimant Grady's Quality Excavating Incorporated against Ronald Wilson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support of Application for Entry of Default)(Giles, Dee) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grady's Quality Excavating Incorporated. Ronald F Wilson served on 6/21/2011. (Kelly, Jason) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grady's Quality Excavating Incorporated. Montana Builders LLC served on 5/5/2011. (Kelly, Jason) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                      *APPLICATION for Entry of Default as to Montana Builders by Grady's Quality Excavating Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Giles, Dee)*Entry modified to remove default judgmnet. Modified on 6/29/2011 (ESL). *Modified on 7/15/2011 to revert back to an Application - certs of service filed at docket 33 and 34.* (KMG). (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Mediation Location - Please report to the Chambers of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, located in suite 614 of the Sandra Day OConnor United States Courthouse, 401 W. Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona for the mediation with Roxane Ashe on June 29, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Roxanne G. Ashe, Circuit Mediator. (LSP) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE re of Service of Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure Statement by Grady's Quality Excavating Incorporated. (Kelly, Jason) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE re Service of Its Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure Statement by Cemex Construction Materials South LLC. (Haynes, Frances) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: Pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, default is entered as to Defendants Montana Builders, LLC and Ronald F. Wilson.(LAD) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                DECLARATION of Frances Haynes In Support of Application for Entry of Default re 26 Application for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Cemex Construction Materials South LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Haynes, Frances) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Cemex Construction Materials South LLC against Montana Builders, LLC and Ronald F. Wilson. (Haynes, Frances) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION. Mediation Hearing set for 6/29/2011 10:00 AM before Mediator Roxanne Ashe (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 5/17/11. (REW) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      MEMORANDUM Regarding The "Miller Act" 40 USC 3131 et seq. by Defendants Grady's Quality Excavating Incorporated, Cheryl L Hopson, Grady L Hopson, Cross Claimants Grady's Quality Excavating Incorporated, Cheryl L Hopson, Grady L Hopson. (Kelly, Jason) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/24/2011. Dispositive motions due by 11/18/2011. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/27/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2012 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Frederick J Martone. Jury Trial set for 5/15/2012 at 9:00 AM in U.S. Post Office Building, 101 W. Goodwin St, Prescott, AZ 86303 before Judge Frederick J Martone. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 5/13/2011. (KAR) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederick J Martone: Scheduling Conference held on 5/13/2011. Appearances by telephone: Frances Haynes for plaintiff and Jason Kelly for defendant. Case management plan as set forth on the record. Rule 16 Scheduling Order to follow. Parties shall submit a supplemental memorandum in support of their case management plan addressing federal/state jurisdiction no later than May 27, 2011. (Court Reporter Linda Schroeder.)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)(KAR) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Cemex Construction Materials South LLC, Grady's Quality Excavating Incorporated, Cheryl L Hopson, Grady L Hopson. (Kelly, Jason) (Entered: 05/05/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE SETTING ASSESSMENT CONFERENCE - A telephone assessment conference, with counsel only, is scheduled for May 9, 2011 at 2:00 p.m. Arizona Time to discuss whether this case is appropriate for participation in the Mediation Program. (NOTE: see attached pdf for complete details) (KMG) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                ORDER - This case is referred to the Circuit Mediation Office of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals to explore whether it might be suitable for mediation. An order scheduling a conference call between all counsel and the mediator will issue shortly. If, after conferring with the mediator, counsel agree that mediation is appropriate, the court will schedule a mediation in Phoenix. All future motions or other pleadings that relate to this referral are to be copied to ca09_Mediation@ca9.uscourts.gov. If there is no agreement to proceed with mediation, this referral will terminate. Additional information about the Ninth Circuit Mediation Program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. This reference is not a reason to delay the processing of the case as was or will be established in the Rule 16 scheduling order. LRCiv 83.10. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)(KAR) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Montana Builders LLC, Ronald F Wilson. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(MHU). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    SUMMONS Submitted by Grady's Quality Excavating Incorporated. (Kelly, Jason) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      SUMMONS Submitted by Grady's Quality Excavating Incorporated. (Kelly, Jason) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Ronald Wilson on March 27, 2011, filed by Cemex Construction Materials South LLC. (Haynes, Frances) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Service for Miller Act Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement, and Summons to Ronald F. Wilson served on Ronald F. Wilson on February 15, 2011, filed by Cemex Construction Materials South LLC. (Haynes, Frances) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/2011 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Frederick J Martone. Parties shall submit their joint proposed case management plan not less than five days before the conference. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/3/2011. (KAR) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grady's Quality Excavating Incorporated. (Kelly, Jason) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Grady's Quality Excavating Incorporated, Cheryl L Hopson, Grady L Hopson. (Kelly, Jason) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint, First CROSSCLAIM against Montana Builders LLC, Ronald F Wilson by Cheryl L Hopson, Grady's Quality Excavating Incorporated, Grady L Hopson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3)(Kelly, Jason) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement and Summons to Montana Builders, LLC served on Dan Payne, Statutory Agent on February 13, 2011, filed by Cemex Construction Materials South LLC. (Haynes, Frances) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Service for Miller Act Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement and Summons to Grady's Quality Excavating, Inc. served on Cheryl L. Hopson on February 8, 2011, filed by Cemex Construction Materials South LLC. (Haynes, Frances) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Service for Miller Act Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement and Summons to Grady L. Hopson served on Cheryl L. Hopson on February 8, 2011, filed by Cemex Construction Materials South LLC. (Haynes, Frances) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Service for Miller Act Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement, and Summons to Cheryl L. Hopson served on Cheryl L. Hopson on February 8, 2011, filed by Cemex Construction Materials South LLC. (Haynes, Frances) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Grady's Quality Excavating Incorporated, Cheryl L Hopson, Grady L Hopson, Montana Builders LLC, Ronald F Wilson. (MHA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              This case has been assigned to the Honorable Frederick J. Martone. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 11-8012-PCT-FJM. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cemex Construction Materials South LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cemex Incorporated, Corporate Parent CEMEX Materials LLC for Cemex Construction Materials South LLC (submitted by Frances Haynes). (REK) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Submitted by Cemex Construction Materials South LLC (submitted by Frances Haynes). (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(REK) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT, filed by Cemex Construction Materials South LLC (submitted by Frances Haynes). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 61 times.

                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?