SCHMIDT v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:11-vv-00620

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 10:14 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo DANIELLE SCHMIDT, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark T. Sadaka, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARK T. SADAKA +1 201 266 5670 +1 201 266 5671 mark@sadakafirm.com
Space MARK T. SADAKA +1 201 266 5670 +1 201 266 5671 mark@sadakafirm.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Debra A. Filteau Begley +1 202 616 4181 +1 202 616 4310 debra.begley@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 300
Nature of Suit 498 - Other Action
  Entries (134) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None
ORDER Removing Case from the ADR process. Signed by Chief Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (hj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 04/15/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None
    15-Week STIPULATION ORDER: Respondent shall, within 15 weeks, send petitioner the joint stipulation and file a status report. Within 30 days after the receipt of the stipulation, petitioner shall file a status report. Within 15 days after receiving the stipulation from petitioner, respondent shall file the signed stipulation. Respondent's Status Report due by 7/29/2016. Signed by Chief Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (hj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 04/15/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None
      ORDER granting 131 Motion for Extension of Time: Petitioner shall file her supplemental expert reports and a status report by 5/16/2016. Respondent shall file her supplemental expert report and a status report within sixty days thereafter. Signed by Chief Special Master Nora B. Dorsey. (hj) Copy to parties. Modified on 4/4/2016 (tjk). (Entered: 04/04/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None
        MOTION for Extension of Time until 05/16/2016 to file expert reports , filed by DANIELLE SCHMIDT.Response due by 4/18/2016. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None
          STATUS REPORT , filed by DANIELLE SCHMIDT. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None
            STATUS REPORT , filed by DANIELLE SCHMIDT. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 03/25/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None
              SCHEDULING ORDER: The hearing scheduled for 5/4-5/6/2016 is continued. The parties shall file a joint status report regarding availability for hearing dates by 3/25/2016. Petitioner shall file her supplemental expert reports and a status report by 4/1/2016. Respondent shall file her supplemental expert report and a status report within sixty days thereafter. Signed by Chief Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (hj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 03/15/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None
                ORDER REFERRING CASE to ADR. Case referred to outside mediator for ADR proceedings. Signed by Chief Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (hj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 03/04/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/02/2016 to Joint Stipulation , filed by DANIELLE SCHMIDT.Response due by 3/21/2016. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/02/2016 to Petitioner's Expert Report , filed by DANIELLE SCHMIDT.Response due by 3/21/2016. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None
                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on August 25, 2015 before Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. Total No. of Pages: 1-149. To purchase a copy, contact the clerk's office at (202) 357-6414. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2016. (ew) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None
                        Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript for proceedings held on August 25, 2015 in Washington, D.C. (ew) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None
                          SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall file a stipulation or a status report by 3/3/2016. Petitioner shall file a supplemental expert report by 3/3/2016. Respondent shall file her supplemental expert report within forty-five days thereafter. The parties shall contact chambers by 2/5/2016. All pre-hearing submissions shall be filed by 4/15/2016. Signed by Chief Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (hj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 02/03/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Intent to File on Compact Disc pursuant to Vaccine General Order #13 filed by DANIELLE SCHMIDT.Compact Disc due by 1/22/2016. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None
                              STATUS REPORT ORDER: Petitioner shall file a joint status report by 2/5/2016. Signed by Chief Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (hj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None
                                JOINT STATUS REPORT , filed by DANIELLE SCHMIDT. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
                                  ORDER granting 117 Motion to Issue Subpoena. Signed by Chief Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (hj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 12/17/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                    MOTION to Issue Subpoena , filed by DANIELLE SCHMIDT.Response due by 1/4/2016. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
                                      STATUS REPORT , filed by DANIELLE SCHMIDT. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: The entitlement hearing set for 5/3/2016, 5/4/2016, and 5/5/2016 is re-scheduled for 9:00 AM on 5/4/2016, 5/5/2016, and 5/6/2016, in Washington, D.C before Chief Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. Signed by Chief Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (hj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None
                                          PREHEARING ORDER: The parties shall file a joint status report by 1/4/2016. An entitlement hearing is scheduled for 9:00 A.M. (Eastern Standard Time) on 5/3/2016, 5/4/2016, and 5/5/2016, in Washington, D.C. before Chief Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. Petitioner shall file her amended prehearing submissions by 3/8/2016. Respondent shall file her amended prehearing submissions by 3/29/2016. Signed by Chief Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (Attachments: # 1 Videoconference Worksheet)(hj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 12/03/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None
                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT , filed by DANIELLE SCHMIDT. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                              ORDER WITHDRAWING 111 Order Striking Document. Signed by Chief Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (hj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                WITHDRAWN pursuant to 112 ORDER Striking 105 Notice of Intent to File on Compact Disc. Signed by Chief Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (hj) Copy to parties. Modified on 11/24/2015 (tjk). (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                  STATUS REPORT ORDER: Petitioner shall file a status report by 12/14/2015. Signed by Chief Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (hj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 11/16/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                    STATUS REPORT , filed by DANIELLE SCHMIDT. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF FILING Affidavits and Movement Report by DANIELLE SCHMIDT. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Affidavit from Kevin Schmidt, # 2 Affidavit Movement Report of Kevin Schmidt, # 3 Affidavit Supplemental Affidavit from Danielle Schmidt)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                        STATUS REPORT ORDER: Petitioner shall file a status report by 11/13/2015. Signed by Chief Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (hj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                          STATUS REPORT , filed by DANIELLE SCHMIDT. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Intent to File on Compact Disc pursuant to Vaccine General Order #13 filed by DANIELLE SCHMIDT.Compact Disc due by 11/5/2015. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: The hearing scheduled for November 17-18, 2015 is cancelled. Petitioner shall file the exhibits and supplemental affidavit as noted in this Order by 10/30/2015. The parties shall file a joint status report by 11/30/2015 regarding their plan for proceeding. The parties shall file a joint status report by 10/30/2015 notifying the court of their preferred proposed hearing date. Signed by Chief Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (hj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 09/30/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF FILING Notice of Intent to File on CD Exhibits 50 and 52 to 58 with Certificate of Service by DANIELLE SCHMIDT. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING News articles by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit HH, # 2 Exhibit II, # 3 Exhibit JJ, # 4 Exhibit KK, # 5 Exhibit LL)(Begley, Debra) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING Exhibits 48, 49 & 51 by DANIELLE SCHMIDT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Oregonian Battling For One More Shot (April 14, 2009), # 2 Exhibit Hillsboro 2008-2009 Womens Basketball Schedule, # 3 Exhibit The Argus, Game Recap: Hillsboro v. Sherwood, (January 27, 2009))(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER : Petitioner shall file the exhibits and affidavit as noted in this Order by 9/25/2015. Respondent shall file the exhibits as noted in this Order by 9/25/2015. Signed by Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (ca1) Copy to parties. (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER : Petitioner shall file the items noted in this Order by 9/24/2015. The parties shall file amended prehearing briefs by 10/26/2015. Signed by Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (ca1) Copy to parties. (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING Affidavit of Kevin Schmidt by DANIELLE SCHMIDT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 47)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/21/2015 to Affidavit of Kevin Schmidt , filed by DANIELLE SCHMIDT.Response due by 9/3/2015. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING Affidavit of Debbie Schmitd by DANIELLE SCHMIDT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Debbie Schmidt)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                HEARING ORDER: An Entitlement Hearing is set for 8/25/2015, 11/17/2015, and 11/18/2015 at 9:00 AM on all days before Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. Signed by Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (Attachments: # 1 Videoconference Worksheet)(ca1) Copy to parties. (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT , filed by DANIELLE SCHMIDT. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER : Petitioner shall file an affidavit by 8/17/2015. The parties shall file a joint status report by 8/7/2015. Signed by Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (ca1) Copy to parties. (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      PREHEARING SUBMISSIONS by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Begley, Debra) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        ORDER granting 90 Motion for Extension of Time Respondent shall file her prehearing submissions by 7/30/2015. Signed by Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (ca1) Copy to parties. (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until July 30, 2015 to file prehearing submissions , filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Response due by 8/10/2015. (Begley, Debra) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            PUBLIC DECISION (Originally filed: 6/12/2015) regarding 80 DECISION Interim Fees Stipulation. Signed by Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (ca1) Copy to parties. (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              Witness List, filed by DANIELLE SCHMIDT. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                PREHEARING SUBMISSIONS by DANIELLE SCHMIDT. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  ORDER granting 85 Motion for Extension of Time Petitioner shall file her Prehearing Submissions by 7/10/2015. Signed by Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (ca1) Copy to parties. (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/10/2015 to File Petitioner's prehearing Submissions and Witness List , filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 7/24/2015. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 83 Motion for Extension of Time Petitioner shall file Prehearing Submissions and Witness List by 7/7/2015. Signed by Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (ca1) Copy to parties. (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until July 7, 2015 to file her Prehearing Submissions and Witness List , filed by DANIELLE SCHMIDT.Response due by 7/13/2015. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                          JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded interim attorneys fees and costs in the lump sum amount of $47,000.00 in the form of a check jointly payable to petitioner and petitioners attorney, Mark T. Sadaka, of the law firm Mark T. Sadaka, LLC.(Copy to parties) (lld) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            JOINT NOTICE Not to Seek Review, filed by DANIELLE SCHMIDT re 80 DECISION Fees Stipulation/Proffer . (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              DECISION of Special Master - Interim Fees Stipulation. Redactions due by 6/26/2015. Signed by Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (ca1) Copy to parties. (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                STIPULATION for Fees , filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Begley, Debra) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  EXPERT REPORT of Joan Gill M.D. (Ex. no. VV) filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit VV, # 2 Exhibit WW)(Begley, Debra) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    EXPERT REPORT of Jeffrey Gordon, MD (Ex. no. 44-45) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 44, # 2 Exhibit 45)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      STATEMENT of Completion by. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file a Supplemental Statement of Completion by 10/31/2014. Petitioner's Supplemental Expert Report is due by 12/29/2014. Respondent shall file a responsive expert or status report within 60 days of the date that petitioner's expert report is filed. Signed by Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (fs) Copy to parties. (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/26/2014 to File Petitioner's Supplemental Statement of Completion and Responsive Expert Report , filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 11/13/2014. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MEDICAL RECORDS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 42.1, # 2 Exhibit 42.2, # 3 Exhibit 43)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              PREHEARING ORDER: Prehearing Submissions due by 6/30/2015. Entitlement Hearing set for 8/25/2015 at 09:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. Signed by Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (tlj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT , filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file updated medical records and a supplemental expert report by 10/27/2014. Respondent shall file an expert report within 60 days of the filing of petitioner's expert report. The parties shall file a joint status report by 10/27/2014. Signed by Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (mb) Copy to parties. (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Intent to File on Compact Disc pursuant to Vaccine General Order #13 filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Compact Disc due by 9/5/2014. (Begley, Debra) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT , filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Begley, Debra) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall file a joint status report by 8/21/2014. Signed by Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (mb) Copy to parties. (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          EXPERT REPORT of Dr. S. Michael Phillips and Dr. Joan Gill (Ex. no. EE and FF) filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EE, Supplemental Expert Report of S. Michael Phillips, M.D., # 2 Exhibit FF, Expert Report of Joan Gill M.D., # 3 Exhibit GG, C.V. of Joan Gill M.D.)(Begley, Debra) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent shall file her supplemental expert report(s) by 6/16/2014. The hearing currently set for 6/18/2014, and all pre-hearing deadlines, are hereby vacated. A status conference will be set after respondent's expert report(s) have been filed. Signed by Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (mb) Copy to parties. (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #40-41] filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 40, # 2 Exhibit 41)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER :Respondent's Response to Petitioner's supplemental expert report due by 4/18/2014. Signed by Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (ds) Copy to parties. (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  EXPERT REPORT of David Rosenstreich, MD (Ex. no. 39) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 39)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time Petitioner's Supplemental Expert Report due by 3/24/2014. Signed by Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (ds) Copy to parties. (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to To File a Supplemental Expert Report , filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 2/24/2014. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER : Petitioner shall file a supplemental expert report by Friday, February 7, 2014. Signed by Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (Johnson, Philip) Copy to parties. (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER : Respondent may file an expert report by Monday, January 27, 2014. Signed by Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (Johnson, Philip) Copy to parties. (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT , filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT , filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Begley, Debra) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER : Petitioner's request is GRANTED. Petitioner shall file a supplemental expert report by Friday, November 29, 2013. Signed by Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (Johnson, Philip) Copy to parties. (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Expert Report , filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 10/15/2013. (Sadaka, Mark) Modified on 1/7/2014 (tjk). (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER : Respondent shall file a status report updating the court on the status of the parties' settlement negotiations by Friday, October 25, 2013. Signed by Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (Johnson, Philip) Copy to parties. (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      PREHEARING ORDER:Pursuant to the agreement of the parties, an entitlement hearing in the above-captioned matter is scheduled for 9:00 A.M. (Eastern Time), on Wednesday, June 18, 2014. Petitioner shall file her prehearing submissions on or before Wednesday, April 23, 2014, and respondent shall file her prehearing submissions on or before Wednesday, May 14, 2014. The parties shall file a joint submission on or before Wednesday, May 14, 2014. Petitioner shall file her anticipated witness list on or before Wednesday, April 23, 2014, and respondent shall file her anticipated witness list on or before Wednesday, May 14, 2014. Signed by Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (Johnson, Philip) Copy to parties. (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT , filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Begley, Debra) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT , filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Intent to File on Compact Disc pursuant to Vaccine General Order #13 filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Compact Disc due by 8/5/2013. (Begley, Debra) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER : Respondent shall file the outstanding medical literature by Monday, July 29, 2013. Signed by Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (Johnson, Philip) Copy to parties. (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER : Petitioner shall file a joint status report by Friday, August 23, 2013, providing the court with dates on which the parties are available for a one-day hearing in June 2014 (excluding June 3-6, 2014). Signed by Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (Johnson, Philip) Copy to parties. (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until July 29, 2013 to to file medical literature , filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Response due by 8/12/2013. (Begley, Debra) Modified on 1/7/2014 (tjk). (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/23/2013 to File Joint Status Report , filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 8/12/2013. (Sadaka, Mark) Modified on 1/7/2014 (tjk). (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING Exhibit 38 by. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 38)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT of Completion by. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER : Petitioner shall file a statement of completion by Friday, June 28, 2013. Petitioner shall file a status report confirming that a demand has been communicated by Thursday, July 25, 2013. The parties shall file a joint status report by Thursday, July 25, 2013.Respondent shall file the medical literature Dr. Phillips referenced in his expert report by Thursday, July 25, 2013. The parties shall file a joint status report by Friday, August 23, 2013. Petitioner shall file a supplemental expert report within sixty days of respondent filing her medical literature. Respondent shall file a supplemental expert report within sixty days of petitioner filing her supplemental expert report or status report stating that she does wish to file a supplemental expert report. Signed by Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (Johnson, Philip) Copy to parties. (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING Expert Report by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Begley, Debra) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER :Respondent shall file her expert report by Friday, May 31, 2013. Signed by Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (Johnson, Philip) Copy to parties. (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT , filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Begley, Debra) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEDICAL RECORDS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 37)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEDICAL RECORDS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 36)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEDICAL RECORDS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 34, # 2 Exhibit 35)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEDICAL RECORDS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 33)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEDICAL RECORDS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 32)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEDICAL RECORDS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 31)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEDICAL RECORDS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 30)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #21-29] filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 21, # 2 Exhibit 22, # 3 Exhibit 23, # 4 Exhibit 24, # 5 Exhibit 25, # 6 Exhibit 26, # 7 Exhibit 27, # 8 Exhibit 28, # 9 Exhibit 29)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #11-20] filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11, # 2 Exhibit 12, # 3 Exhibit 13, # 4 Exhibit 14, # 5 Exhibit 15, # 6 Exhibit 16, # 7 Exhibit 17, # 8 Exhibit 18, # 9 Exhibit 19, # 10 Exhibit 20)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file all updated medical records as soon as reasonably practicable, but by no later than Tuesday, May 28, 2013. Respondent shall file an expert report by Tuesday, May 28, 2013. If respondent is unable to meet this deadline, she shall file a status report by Tuesday, May 28, 2013, explaining why she cannot do so and shall provide a date on which she anticipates she will file an expert report. A status conference will be scheduled once respondent files an expert report. Signed by Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (Johnson, Philip) Copy to parties. (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXPERT REPORT of David Rosenstreich, MD (Ex. no. 9-10) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9, # 2 Exhibit 10)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Special Master Nora B. Dorsey. Signed by Chief Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tpj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/4/2013 to File Petitioner's Expert Report, filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 12/21/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time: Petitioner's Expert Report now due by 12/4/2012. Signed by Special Master Denise Kathryn Vowell. (at3) Copy to parties. (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/4/2012 to File Petitioner's Expert Report, filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 10/22/2012. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/05/2012 to File Petitioner's Expert Report, filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 8/23/2012. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner's Expert Report due by 8/6/2012. Signed by Special Master Denise Kathryn Vowell. (at3) Copy to parties. (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF INTENT to Remain in the Program by Petitioner. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: the statutory 240-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master Denise Kathryn Vowell. (tpj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Special Master Denise Vowell. Signed by Chief Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (dlb) Copy to parties. (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Begley, Debra) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT of Completion by. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEDICAL RECORDS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8.1, # 2 Exhibit 8.2)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner shall file by no later than March 2, 2012, petitioners medical records, affidavits and a Statement of Completion regarding the filing of records. Respondents Rule 4(c) Report filing deadline remains ninety (90) days after the filing of the Statement of Completion. Petitioner shall confer with respondent and contact the undersigned's office within ten (10) days of the filing of the Rule 4(c) Report to schedule a status conference. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (ds8) Copy to parties. (Non-PDF Order) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 03/01/2012 to File Outstanding Medical Records, filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 2/17/2012. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEDICAL RECORDS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 7.1, # 4 Exhibit 7.2)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner shall file by no later than January 31, 2012, petitioners medical records, affidavits and a Statement of Completion regarding the filing of records. Respondents Rule 4(c) Report filing deadline remains ninety (90) days after the filing of the Statement of Completion.Petitioner shall confer with respondent and contact the undersigneds office within ten (10) days of the filing of the Rule 4(c) Report to schedule a status conference. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (ds8) Copy to parties. (Non-PDF Order) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/30/2012 to File Outstanding Medical Records.Response due by 12/19/2011. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEDICAL RECORDS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file within thirty (30) days, by no later than December 1, 2011, petitioners medical records, affidavits and a Statement of Completion regarding the filing of records. Respondents Rule 4(c) Report filing deadline is amended to ninety (90) days after the filing of the Statement of Completion. Petitioner shall confer with respondent and contact the undersigneds office within ten (10) days of the filing of the Rule 4(c) Report to schedule a status conference. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (ds8) Copy to parties. (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Debra A. Filteau Begley for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.. (Begley, Debra) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                INITIAL ORDER Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (dlb) Copy to parties. (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING Affidavit of Danielle Schmidt by. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEDICAL RECORDS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2.1, # 3 Exhibit 2.2)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Gary Golkiewicz. (ac7) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (ac7) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION OF COUNSEL by DANIELLE SCHMIDT. (ac7) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $350, Receipt number 072812) [Vaccination date: 11/07/2008], filed by DANIELLE SCHMIDT.Respondents Report due by 12/27/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac7) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 161 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?