Bank of Commerce v. Kenneth Hoffman, Jr.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit, Case No. 15-3326

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 4, 2017 at 3:34 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 1220 - Foreclosure
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None
ORDER: This Court has received 3 electronic files, document nos. 43,79, 104, 129 and 141, under seal from the district court. All documents filed in this Court, except those required to be sealed by statute or rule are considered public. Pursuant to 7th Circuit Operating Procedure 10(b), documents sealed in the district court will be maintained under seal in this Court for 14 days, to afford time to request the approval required by section (a) of this operating procedure. Absent a motion from a party these sealed documents will be placed in the public record on 04/26/2016. Motion shall be filed by 04/25/2016 [35] [6742304] [15-3326] (RT)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None
    Received argument confirmation from Kathy M. Sons for Appellee Bank of Commerce in 15-3326. [34] [6739546] [15-3326, 15-3327] (Richards, Paul)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None
      Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kathy M. Sons for Appellee Bank of Commerce in 15-3326. [33] [6739539] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [15-3326, 15-3327] (Richards, Paul)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None
        Received argument confirmation from Jaclyn C. Taner for Appellee FDIC in 15-3327. [32] [6739179] [15-3327, 15-3326] (Taner, Jaclyn)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None
          Original record on appeal filed electronically. Contents of record : 19 vol. of pleadings; 5 sealed documents. [31] [6739142] [15-3326] (NR)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None
            Received argument confirmation from Jerry J Pepping for Appellant Kenneth E. Hoffman, Jr. in 15-3326, 15-3327. [30] [6738273] [15-3326, 15-3327] (Kincaid, Jennifer)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None
              CORRECTED Appellee's brief filed by Appellee Bank of Commerce in 15-3326, Appellee FDIC in 15-3327. Paper copies due on 03/28/2016 Electronically Transmitted. [29] [6737412] [15-3326, 15-3327] (GW)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None
                Re-Submitted appellee brief by Paul J. Richards for Appellee Bank of Commerce in 15-3326, Appellee FDIC in 15-3327. [28] [6737365] [15-3326, 15-3327] (Richards, Paul)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 106 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?