Ex Parte application of Guy Gi
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 16-370

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 23, 2016 at 11:09 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3899 - Other Statutes
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Alan Freedman, LM Moore SP Investments, Ltd. and Moore Capital Management, LLC, FILED. Service date 04/12/2016 by CM/ECF. [1748071] [16-370] [Entered: 04/12/2016 11:49 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None
    NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Guy Gissin, FILED. Service date 04/11/2016 by CM/ECF. [1747599] [16-370] [Entered: 04/11/2016 05:08 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None
      REVISED ARGUMEN NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1747522] [16-370] [Entered: 04/11/2016 04:22 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None
        ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Christopher Michael Egleson for Appellant Alan Freedman, LM Moore SP Investments, Ltd. and Moore Capital Management, LLC, FILED. Service date 04/11/2016 by CM/ECF. [1747258] [16-370] [Entered: 04/11/2016 02:37 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None
          LETTER, dated 04/08/2016 requesting that the Court allot 15 minutes to Appellee for oral argument, on behalf of Appellee Guy Gissin, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2016 by CM/ECF.[1746507] [16-370]--[Edited 04/11/2016 by BM] [Entered: 04/08/2016 05:06 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None
            ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Michael S. Devorkin, Esq. for Appellee Guy Gissin, FILED. Service date 04/08/2016 by CM/ECF. [1746505] [16-370] [Entered: 04/08/2016 05:03 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None
              REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Alan Freedman, LM Moore SP Investments, Ltd. and Moore Capital Management, LLC, FILED. Service date 04/05/2016 by CM/ECF. [1743705] [16-370] [Entered: 04/05/2016 06:55 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Guy Gissin, FILED. Service date 04/01/2016 by CM/ECF. [1741479] [16-370] [Entered: 04/01/2016 02:23 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Alan Freedman, LM Moore SP Investments, Ltd. and Moore Capital Management, LLC, FILED. Service date 03/31/2016 by CM/ECF. [1740742] [16-370] [Entered: 03/31/2016 04:21 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None
                    ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1740564] [16-370] [Entered: 03/31/2016 03:09 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 60 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None
                      BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Guy Gissin, FILED. Service date 03/29/2016 by CM/ECF. [1738661] [16-370] [Entered: 03/29/2016 04:31 PM]
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Guy Gissin, FILED. Service date 03/29/2016 by CM/ECF. [1738381] [16-370] [Entered: 03/29/2016 01:34 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None
                          MOTION ORDER, denying motion to stay without prejudice to renewal at or after oral argument [20] filed by Appellant Moore Capital Management, LLC, LM Moore SP Investments, Ltd. and Alan Freedman, FILED. [1736679][58] [16-370] [Entered: 03/25/2016 04:25 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None
                            JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-261), on behalf of Appellant Alan Freedman, LM Moore SP Investments, Ltd. and Moore Capital Management, LLC, FILED. Service date 03/14/2016 by CM/ECF.[1726805] [16-370] [Entered: 03/14/2016 09:25 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 52 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None
                              BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Alan Freedman, LM Moore SP Investments, Ltd. and Moore Capital Management, LLC, FILED. Service date 03/14/2016 by CM/ECF.[1726798] [16-370] [Entered: 03/14/2016 09:15 PM]
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None
                                LETTER, dated 03/10/2016 re: Letter filed 03/09/2016 on behalf of Appellee Guy Gissin, RECEIVED. Service date 03/10/2016 by email, CM/ECF.[1723650] [16-370]--[Edited 03/10/2016 by BM]- [Entered: 03/10/2016 09:46 AM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None
                                  LETTER, dated 03/09/2016, re: dates for oral argument, on behalf of Appellee Guy Gissin, RECEIVED. Service date 03/09/2016 by email, CM/ECF.[1722778] [16-370]--[Edited 03/09/2016 by BM] [Entered: 03/09/2016 11:19 AM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None
                                    CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 03/09/2016, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[1722526] [16-370] [Entered: 03/09/2016 09:11 AM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None
                                      MOTION ORDER, granting a temporary stay of the district court’s order and referring the motion to the merits panel to reconsider the stay application if it deems it appropriate [20] filed by Appellant Moore Capital Management, LLC, LM Moore SP Investments, Ltd. and Alan Freedman. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the appeal is expedited and it shall be heard as soon as possible after briefing is completed, by RCW, FILED. [1722502][40] [16-370] [Entered: 03/09/2016 08:53 AM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
                                        REPLY TO OPPOSITION [33], on behalf of Appellant Alan Freedman, LM Moore SP Investments, Ltd. and Moore Capital Management, LLC, FILED. Service date 03/07/2016 by CM/ECF.[1721221][35] [16-370] [Entered: 03/07/2016 09:25 PM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None
                                          OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to stay [20], on behalf of Appellee Guy Gissin, FILED. Service date 03/04/2016 by CM/ECF. [1719796] [16-370] [Entered: 03/04/2016 04:09 PM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None
                                            SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting LM Moore, L.P., Appellant Alan Freedman, LM Moore SP Investments, Ltd., Moore Capital Management, LLC , Brief & Joint Appendix due date as 03/14/2016, Appellee Guy Gissin Brief due date as 03/29/2016. Appellant reply brief due date as 04/05/2016; FILED.[1717313] [16-370] [Entered: 03/02/2016 04:08 PM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None
                                              NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[1717308] [16-370] [Entered: 03/02/2016 04:04 PM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                MOTION, to stay, on behalf of Appellant Alan Freedman, LM Moore SP Investments, Ltd. and Moore Capital Management, LLC, FILED. Service date 03/01/2016 by CM/ECF. [1715523] [16-370] [Entered: 03/01/2016 09:39 AM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                  LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Guy Gissin, informing Court of proposed due date 03/14/2016, RECEIVED. Service date 02/29/2016 by CM/ECF.[1715201] [16-370] [Entered: 02/29/2016 04:23 PM]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alan Freedman, LM Moore SP Investments, Ltd. and Moore Capital Management, LLC, FILED. Service date 02/19/2016 by CM/ECF. [1709126] [16-370] [Entered: 02/19/2016 06:59 PM]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alan Freedman, LM Moore SP Investments, Ltd. and Moore Capital Management, LLC, FILED. Service date 02/19/2016 by CM/ECF. [1709125] [16-370] [Entered: 02/19/2016 06:55 PM]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                        FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Alan Freedman, LM Moore SP Investments, Ltd. and Moore Capital Management, LLC, FILED. Service date 02/19/2016 by CM/ECF.[1709124] [16-370] [Entered: 02/19/2016 06:52 PM]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                          FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Alan Freedman, LM Moore SP Investments, Ltd. and Moore Capital Management, LLC, FILED. Service date 02/19/2016 by CM/ECF.[1709123] [16-370] [Entered: 02/19/2016 06:51 PM]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                            ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Alan Freedman, LM Moore SP Investments, Ltd. and Moore Capital Management, LLC, FILED. Service date 02/19/2016 by CM/ECF.[1709122] [16-370] [Entered: 02/19/2016 06:49 PM]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None
                                                              ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Guy Gissin, FILED. Service date 02/16/2016 by CM/ECF.[1704984] [16-370] [Entered: 02/16/2016 12:07 PM]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None
                                                                CAPTION, Guy Gissin, AMENDED.[1704980] [16-370] [Entered: 02/16/2016 12:06 PM]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                  ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1701573] [16-370] [Entered: 02/09/2016 12:22 PM]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                    DISTRICT COURT STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER, dated 02/05/2016, RECEIVED.[1701568] [16-370] [Entered: 02/09/2016 12:19 PM]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                      DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/07/2016, RECEIVED.[1701563] [16-370] [Entered: 02/09/2016 12:16 PM]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant LM Moore SP Investments, Ltd., LM Moore, L.P. and Moore Capital Management, LLC, FILED. [1701549] [16-370] [Entered: 02/09/2016 12:07 PM]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 169 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?