Alan Brinker v. JP Morgan Chase, N.A., et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 16-15790

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 10, 2017 at 7:08 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
Filed referral notice (Deputy Clerk:CKP): Referring to the district court for determination whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal. [9959915] (CKP) [Entered: 05/02/2016 10:25 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None
    DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 05/27/2016. Transcript due 06/27/2016. Appellant Alan Lee Brinker opening brief due 08/05/2016. Appellees California Reconvenance Company, JP Morgan Chase, N.A. and LPS Agency Sales and Posting, Inc. answering brief due 09/06/2016. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9958138] (IV) [Entered: 04/29/2016 10:17 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 212 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?