Enrique Perez, et al v. Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 16-15647

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 10, 2017 at 11:56 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None
Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [9941136] (CKP) [Entered: 04/15/2016 08:33 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None
    DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Bella Perez and Enrique Perez opening brief due 07/20/2016. Appellee Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC answering brief due 08/19/2016. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9936233] (WL) [Entered: 04/12/2016 12:01 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 105 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?