YAMAN v. MABUS

Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-00859
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 20, 2017 at 5:52 PM EDT (7.8 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo METIN YAMAN, Plaintiff

Represented by Almasri & Marzwanian Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Sebastian Montalvo +1 202 862 4360 emontalvo@fedpractice.com
Other Parties
No Logo RAYMOND EDWIN MABUS, JR., 2255
Attributes
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 551
Nature of Suit 899 - Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Timeline
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Mail Returned
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against METIN YAMAN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4515725) filed by METIN YAMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DC Summons, # 3 Summons Loretta Lynch Summons, # 4 Summons Mabus Summons)(Montalvo, Eric) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 124 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?