Paulsen v. Communications Workers of America
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-02312
District Judge Ann M. Donnelly, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 3:47 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James G. Paulsen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy B. Lipin +1 718 330 7705 +1 718 330 7579 nancy.lipin@nlrb.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Walters +1 718 330 7713 +1 718 330 7579 kimberly.walters@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo Communications Workers Of America, Defendant
No Logo Empire City Subway Company (Limited), Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Kastin +21232 639 39x3293 +1 212 755 7306 jkastin@jonesday.com
No Logo Verizon Corporate Service Corp., Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Kastin +21232 639 39x3293 +1 212 755 7306 jkastin@jonesday.com
Verizon New York Inc. Verizon New York Inc., Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Kastin +21232 639 39x3293 +1 212 755 7306 jkastin@jonesday.com
Verizon Services Corporation Verizon Services Corporation, Interested Party
Officially listed as "Verizon Services Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Kastin +21232 639 39x3293 +1 212 755 7306 jkastin@jonesday.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5-9-2016, before Judge Ann M. Donnelly. Court Reporter/Transcriber Annette M. Montalv o, Telephone number 718-804-2711. Email address: annette.montalvo@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 5/30/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2016. (Montalvo, Annette) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Hearing set for 5/12/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4G North. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 5/9/2016. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 3 Motion for TRO. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 5/9/2016. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Kastin on behalf of Verizon New York Inc., Verizon Corporate Service Corp., Verizon Services Corp., Empire City Subway Company (Limited) (aty to be noticed) (Kastin, Jessica) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None
          In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None
            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James G. Paulsen. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None
              DECLARATION by James G. Paulsen (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None
                MEMORANDUM in Support re 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by James G. Paulsen. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by James G. Paulsen. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None
                    Unsigned Order to Show Cause by James G. Paulsen (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None
                      COMPLAINT against Communications Workers of America, filed by James G. Paulsen. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 141 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?