Gaydos v. TJX Companies, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10217
District Judge William Young, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 2, 2017 at 3:11 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Thomas J. Gaydos, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Fantini +1 215 875 3000 mfantini@bm.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon J Lambiras +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4636 jlambiras@bm.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sherrie R. Savett +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 ssavett@bm.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Stern, Shapiro, Weissberg & Garin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Shapiro +1 617 742 5800 +1 617 742 5858 jshapiro@sswg.com
v.
Fifth Third Bancorp Fifth Third Bancorp, Defendant
Officer/Director, Vantiv, Inc.
No Logo Tjx Companies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan Investments Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Szpak +1 617 951 7606 +1 617 951 7050 mszpak@ropesgray.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian R. Blais +1 617 951 7186 +1 212 596 9090 bblais@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harvey J. Wolkoff +1 617 951 7000 +1 617 951 7050 hwolkoff@ropesgray.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1391
Nature of Suit 380 - Personal Property: Other Personal Property Damage
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
Remark: cc of order from MDL Panel advising case will be transferred when order is received. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10162-WGY, 1:07-cv-10169-WGY, 1:07-cv-10209-WGY, 1:07-cv-10217-WGY(Hassett, Kathy) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None
      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/30/07 to File Answer re 1 Complaint by TJX Companies, Inc..(Blais, Brian) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: None
        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Thomas J. Gaydos. Fifth Third Bancorp served on 2/8/2007, answer due 3/29/2007. Acknowledgement filed by Thomas J. Gaydos. (Shapiro, Jonathan) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2007 (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 03/21/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: None
          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Thomas J. Gaydos. TJX Companies, Inc. served on 2/7/2007, answer due 3/29/2007. Acknowledgement filed by Thomas J. Gaydos. (Shapiro, Jonathan) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2007 (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 03/21/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Appearance by Harvey J. Wolkoff on behalf of TJX Companies, Inc. (Wolkoff, Harvey) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Szpak on behalf of TJX Companies, Inc. (Szpak, Mark) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: None
                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sherrie R. Savett, Michael T. Fantini, Jon Lambiras Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 1428479. by Thomas J. Gaydos.(Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/01/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TJX Companies, Inc.. (Blais, Brian) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/29/07 to File Answer re 1 Complaint by TJX Companies, Inc..(Blais, Brian) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                      COMPLAINT against TJX Companies, Inc. , filed by Thomas J. Gaydos. (Attachments: # 1)(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 55 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?