Unknown

Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Middle District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-00425
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 4, 2017 at 9:11 PM EDT (7.7 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DWAYNE J. BENSING +1 202 616 2679 +1 202 514 8337 Dwayne.Bensing@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Torey Brooks Cummings +1 202 305 4204 +1 202 514 8337 torey.cummings@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LORI KISCH +1 202 305 4422 Lori.Kisch@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WHITNEY PELLEGRINO +1 202 616 9939 +1 202 514 8337 Whitney.Pellegrino@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CANDYCE PHOENIX +1 202 616 3871 +1 202 514 1005 candyce.phoenix@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RIPLEY RAND +1 336 333 5351 +1 336 333 5438 ripley.rand@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED COREY L. STOUGHTON +1 202 514 0293 corey.stoughton@usdoj.gov
No Logo PHIL BERGER, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART K. DUNCAN +1 202 714 9492 +1 571 730 4429 KDuncan@Schaerr-Duncan.com

Represented by Law Office of Susan E Hamm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT D. POTTER, JR. +1 704 552 7742 +1 704 552 9287 rdpotter@bellsouth.net
No Logo TIM MOORE, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART K. DUNCAN +1 202 714 9492 +1 571 730 4429 KDuncan@Schaerr-Duncan.com

Represented by Law Office of Susan E Hamm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT D. POTTER, JR. +1 704 552 7742 +1 704 552 9287 rdpotter@bellsouth.net
v.
No Logo NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, Defendant
No Logo PATRICK MCCRORY, Defendant
No Logo STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, Defendant
No Logo University Of North Carolina, Defendant
No Logo UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, Defendant
Other Parties
No Logo NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY, Intervenor Defendant

Represented by ALLIANCE DEFENDING FREEDOM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A. Campbell +1 480 444 0020 +1 480 444 0028 jcampbell@alliancedefendingfreedom.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Cortman +1 770 339 0774 +1 770 339 6744 dcortman@alliancedefendingfreedom.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Caleb Dalton +1 480 444 0028 +1 480 444 0028 cdalton@alliancedefendingfreedom.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph E. La Rue +1 480 444 0020 jlarue@alliancedefendingfreedom.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Matthew Sharp +1 770 339 0774 msharp@ADFlegal.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy D. Tedesco +1 480 388 8051 jtedesco@telladf.org

Represented by Suite B

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah J. Dewart +1 910 326 4554 +1 877 326 4585 debcpalaw@earthlink.net
No Logo Phil Berger, Intervenor Defendant

Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART K. DUNCAN +1 202 714 9492 +1 571 730 4429 KDuncan@Schaerr-Duncan.com

Represented by Law Office of Susan E Hamm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT D. POTTER, JR. +1 704 552 7742 +1 704 552 9287 rdpotter@bellsouth.net
No Logo Tim Moore, Intervenor Defendant

Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART K. DUNCAN +1 202 714 9492 +1 571 730 4429 KDuncan@Schaerr-Duncan.com

Represented by Law Office of Susan E Hamm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT D. POTTER, JR. +1 704 552 7742 +1 704 552 9287 rdpotter@bellsouth.net
No Logo PROPOSED AMICI CURIAE 68 COMPANIES, Amicus

Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark James Kleinschmidt +1 919 240 7089 +1 919 967 4953 mkleinschmidt@tinfulton.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Luke Largess +1 704 338 1220 +1 704 338 1312 llargess@tinfulton.com

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ashley Stocks Boizelle +1 202 887 3635 +1 202 530 9605 aboizelle@gibsondunn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore Joseph Boutrous, Jr. +1 213 229 7804 +1 213 229 6804 tboutrous@gibsondunn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Dempsey McGill +1 202 955 8668 +5309 530 530 9662 mmcgill@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore B. Olson - PHV +1 202 955 8200 +1 202 530 9575 tolson@gibsondunn.com
No Logo STEVEN-GLENN: JOHNSON, Intervenor Plaintiff

Represented by STEVEN-GLENN: JOHNSON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STEVEN-GLENN: JOHNSON
Attributes
Citation Unknown
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Timeline
  Entries (256) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 245 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - case
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Memorandum
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Amended Document - NOT Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Notice - Other
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Notice of withdrawal and substitution of counsel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Notice - Other
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Notice - Other
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Notice - Other
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Memorandum
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None USCA Mandate
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Joint Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATEMENT re (177 in 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP) Order,,,, Position Statement by Defendants UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, MARGARET SPELLINGS, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP(FRANCISCO, NOEL) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Transcript of the Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/14/2016, before Judge Joi E. Peake. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2017. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(Nesbit, Briana) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Quash
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Notice - Other
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE in Opposition MOTION to Quash and MOTION for Protective Order filed by PHIL BERGER, PATRICK MCCRORY, TIM MOORE, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. Replies due by 11/18/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Initial Disclosures (236), # 2 Exhibit B - Initial Disclosures (425))(STEWART, WILLIAM) Modified document title on 11/2/2016. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Adopt (204 in 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 204 in 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Quash and Modify Defendants Subpoenas Duces Tecum MOTION for Protective Order by Stephanie Paige Dula. Responses due by 11/17/2016 Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(SUSSMAN, JACOB) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CURT C. HARTMAN on behalf of Intervenor Defendants PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE (HARTMAN, CURT) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION of Non-Party Witnesses to Join United States' Motion to Partially Quash and Modify Defendants' Subpoenas Duces Tecum and for a Protective Order by A. N., Alaina Kupec, A. T.. Responses due by 11/14/2016 Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(PFEIFFER, SONYA) Modified on 10/19/2016 to remove duplicate text. (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SONYA PFEIFFER on behalf of Witnesses A. N., A. T., Alaina Kupep. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(PFEIFFER, SONYA) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Memorandum
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Protective Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Transcript of Status Conference held on 09/30/2016, before Judge Joi E. Peake. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/7/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/17/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2017. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Briana) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Suggestion of Subsequently Decided Authority
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Transcript of Status Conference held on 09/16/2016, before Magistrate Judge Joi E. Peake. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/31/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/9/2017. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(Nesbit, Briana) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Notice - Other
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Joint Notice on Proposal Regarding Deposition Limits (PHOENIX, CANDYCE) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Brief by PROPOSED AMICI CURIAE - TEXAS, ARKANSAS, ARIZONA, WEST VIRGINIA, ALABAMA, WISCONSIN, GEORGIA, NEBRASKA, LOUISIANA, SOUTH CAROLINA, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, BY AND THROUGH GOVERNOR MATTHEW G. BEVIN, U re 193 Order on Motion for Leave to File Brief of Texas, Arkansas, Arizona, West Virginia, Alabama, Wisconsin, Georgia, Nebraska, Louisiana, South Carolina, Commonwealth of Kentucky, by and through Governor Matthew G. Bevin, Utah, and Governor Phil Bryant of the State of Mississippi as Amici Curiae in Opposition to United States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (NIMOCKS, DAVID) Modified on 10/2/2016 to correct document type. (Engle, Anita) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 9/30/2016, that the motion (Doc. 161 ) is GRANTED and movants shall separately file the brief as Amici Curiae forthwith. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 186 Notice of Appearance (DE KERVOR, DYLAN) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Docketing Appeal from USCA re: 188 Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment filed by STEVEN-GLENN: JOHNSON. USCA Case Mgr: Rickie Edwards; USCA Case Number 16-2120. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 178 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Rule 26f (Joint),,,,,,,,,, Joint Notice of Issues (PHOENIX, CANDYCE) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 188 Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF APPEAL Without Fee Payment by STEVEN-GLENN: JOHNSON as to 157 Order and 109 Memorandum Order. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope front, # 2 Envelope back)(Daniel, J) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Suggestion of Subsequently Decided Authority re 73 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Addendum)(CARNEY, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DYLAN N. DE KERVOR on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (DE KERVOR, DYLAN) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CAMILLE A. MONAHAN on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (MONAHAN, CAMILLE) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM filed by Intervenor Defendants PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE re 183 Joint MOTION for Protective Order re: Legislative Privilege Memo ISO filed by PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE. (DUNCAN, STUART) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint MOTION for Protective Order re: Legislative Privilege by PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE. Responses due by 10/7/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum ISO, # 2 Text of Proposed Order proposed order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D-1, # 7 Exhibit D-2, # 8 Exhibit D-3, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit G, # 12 Exhibit H, # 13 Exhibit I, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit K)(DUNCAN, STUART) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Protective Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Order on Joint Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Rule 26f - Joint
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE re 166 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,, Joint Notice by All Parties (DUNCAN, STUART) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Rule 26f Report - Joint
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Joint Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/02/2016, before Judge Joi E. Peake. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/3/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/14/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2016. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(Nesbit, Briana) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LEAH D. MCDOWELL on behalf of Plaintiffs PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP(MCDOWELL, LEAH) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Notice - Other
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
FILED IN ERROR NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP(CAMPBELL, JAMES) Modified on 9/2/2016 to reflect filed in error and terminated public access. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae by Proposed Amici Curiae - TEXAS, ARKANSAS, ARIZONA, WEST VIRGINIA, ALABAMA, WISCONSIN, GEORGIA, NEBRASKA, LOUISIANA, SOUTH CAROLINA, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, by and through Governor Matthew G. Bevin, U. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(NIMOCKS, DAVID) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DAVID A. NIMOCKS on behalf of Amicus Parties Proposed Amici Curiae - TEXAS, ARKANSAS, ARIZONA, WEST VIRGINIA, ALABAMA, WISCONSIN, GEORGIA, NEBRASKA, LOUISIANA, SOUTH CAROLINA, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, by and through Governor Matthew G. Bevin, U, Proposed Amici Curiae - TEXAS, ARKANSAS, ARIZONA, WEST VIRGINIA, ALABAMA, WISCONSIN, GEORGIA, NEBRASKA, LOUISIANA, SOUTH CAROLINA, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, by and through Governor Matthew G. Bevin, U, Proposed Amici Curiae - TEXAS, ARKANSAS, ARIZONA, WEST VIRGINIA, ALABAMA, WISCONSIN, GEORGIA, NEBRASKA, LOUISIANA, SOUTH CAROLINA, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, by and through Governor Matthew G. Bevin, U, Proposed Amici Curiae - TEXAS, ARKANSAS, ARIZONA, WEST VIRGINIA, ALABAMA, WISCONSIN, GEORGIA, NEBRASKA, LOUISIANA, SOUTH CAROLINA, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, by and through Governor Matthew G. Bevin, U Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(NIMOCKS, DAVID) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None
MOTION by STEVEN-GLENN: JOHNSON for Extension of Time to file FRCiv.P Rule 59 Motion for Rehearing/Reconsideration of the Court's Memorandum Order denying Intervention. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope front, # 2 Envelope back)(Daniel, J) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Notice - Other
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Notice - Other
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Notice - Other
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Memorandum
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Expedite
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None
Proposed Order re: 138 MOTION for ECF Filing. (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None
Exhibits Supporting 138 MOTION for ECF Filing, filed by CHRIS SEVIER. (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None
MOTION FOR ECF FILING, filed by CHRIS SEVIER. Responses due by 9/6/2016. (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Correct
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None
MOTION to Correct the Docket, filed by CHRIS SEVIER. Responses due by 9/6/2016. (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Goodspeed, filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs ELIZABETH ORDING, CHRIS SEVIER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Quinlan, Former President of PFOX, filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs ELIZABETH ORDING, CHRIS SEVIER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits (Part One), # 2 Exhibits (Part Two)) (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Dr. King, filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs ELIZABETH ORDING, CHRIS SEVIER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Pastor Cothran, filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs ELIZABETH ORDING, CHRIS SEVIER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None
Additional Exhibits to 131 Memorandum. Main document is Exhibit F (Part 1). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F (Part 2), # 2 Exhibit G, # 3 Exhibit H, # 4 Exhibit I, # 5 Exhibit J, # 6 Exhibit K) (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Memorandum
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT, filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs ELIZABETH ORDING, CHRIS SEVIER to 130 MOTION to Intervene. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Intervene
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None
MOTION to Intervene filed by ELIZABETH ORDING, CHRIS SEVIER. Responses due by 9/6/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Intervening Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (Garland, Leah) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2016: # 3 Address Label for Documents 130 - 140) (Daniel, J). (Entered: 08/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Notice - Other
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM Regarding Title IX by Counter Claimants PHIL BERGER, PATRICK MCCRORY, TIM MOORE, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, Intervenor Defendants PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE, Defendants PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. (STEWART, WILLIAM) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney NARENDRA K. GHOSH on behalf of Amicus Proposed Amici Curiae - States of New York, Washington, California, Connecticut, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Mexico, Oregon, and Vermont, and the District of Columbia (GHOSH, NARENDRA) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Hearing: Bench Trial set for 11/14/2016 at 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Exhibit and witness lists and deposition designations shall be filed no later than October 24, 2016. Any objections thereto, as well as any counter-designations, shall be filed no later than November 2, 2016. Pre-trial briefs shall be submitted no later than November 7, 2016. No opposition briefs shall be allowed. Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425, 1:16cv845(Engle, Anita) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
Transcript of Preliminary Injunction held on 8/1/2016, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number (336) 734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/9/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2016. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(Nesbit, Briana) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None
Notice of Filing Additional Exhibits in Support of the Motion to Intervene filed by CHRIS SEVIER. (Documents received 7/27/2016) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Envelope Front and Back)(Engle, Anita) (Modified on 8/8/2016 to reflect name of document as received. To date, Motion to Intervene has not been received.) (Engle, Anita). (Entered: 08/03/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None
ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 8/3/2016, that the motion (Doc. 116 ) is GRANTED and that the associated amicus curiae brief in support of the United States' motion for preliminary injunction is deemed filed as of this date. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
Transcript of Pretrial Scheduling Conference held on 7/22/2016, before Judge Joi E. Peake. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number (336) 734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/22/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/1/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2016. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(Nesbit, Briana) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 73 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS. Replies due by 8/15/2016. (FRANCISCO, NOEL) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None
ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 7/28/2016, that the Court adopts the briefing schedule set out in the Joint Notice (Doc. # 112 ) in 1:16CV425, but any issues that the parties wish to raise in these cases should still be addressed in the dispositive motions and trial briefs on the schedule set out in the July 25, 2016 Scheduling Order, so that all of the relevant issues can be addressed in November after the period of expedited discovery. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(Daniel, J) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Brief of the States of New York, Washington, California, Connecticut, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Mexico, Oregon, and Vermont and the District of Columbia in Support of the United States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Proposed Amici Curiae - States of New York, Washington, California, Connecticut, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Mexico, Oregon, and Vermont, and the District of Columbia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Brief of the States of New York, Washington, California, Connecticut, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Mexico, Oregon, and Vermont and the District of Columbia in Support of the United States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(THOMAS, HOLLY) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney HOLLY A. THOMAS on behalf of Amicus Proposed Amici Curiae - States of New York, Washington, California, Connecticut, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Mexico, Oregon, and Vermont, and the District of Columbia (THOMAS, HOLLY) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ANISHA S. DASGUPTA on behalf of Amicus Proposed Amici Curiae - States of New York, Washington, California, Connecticut, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Mexico, Oregon, and Vermont, and the District of Columbia (DASGUPTA, ANISHA) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOHN M. GORE on behalf of Defendants UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS (GORE, JOHN) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None
JOINT NOTICE by PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE re: 73 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Joint Notice Regarding Preliminary Injunction Briefing Schedule (DUNCAN, STUART) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ALYSSA C. LAREAU on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (LAREAU, ALYSSA) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ARIA S. VAUGHAN on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (VAUGHAN, ARIA) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 7/25/2016, that the motion to intervene by Steven-Glenn: Johnson (Doc. 34 ) is DENIED. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 108 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None
ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 07/25/2016; that the Court adopts the Joint Rule 26(f) Report and the discovery schedule set forth above. FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is set for telephonic conferences at 10:00 am on August 19, 2016, September 2, 2016, September 16, 2016, and September 30, 2016. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 7/25/2016, that the joint motion of Defendants and Intervenor-Defendants for extension (Doc. 97 ) is GRANTED and that Defendants and Intervenor-Defendants are relieved of their obligation to file responses to the United States' motion for preliminary injunction by July 29, 2016. By July 29, 2016, the parties are directed to submit a proposal to the United States Magistrate Judge, jointly if possible and separately if they cannot reach agreement, regarding an appropriate briefing schedule for the United States' motion for preliminary injunction (Doc. 73 ) in light of the fact that the court has advanced trial on the merits and the discovery and pre-trial briefing schedule. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None
JOINT NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re: 93 Order. (PHOENIX, CANDYCE) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None
REPLY, filed by Intervenor Defendant NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY, to Response to 58 MOTION to Intervene filed by NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY. (CAMPBELL, JAMES) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None
Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(CUMMINGS, TOREY) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None
REPLY entitled "Verified Reply to Parties Response in Opposition to Motion to Intervene as Proposed Plaintiff by Steven-Glenn: Johnson" filed by Intervenor Plaintiff STEVEN-GLENN: JOHNSON, to Response to 34 MOTION to Intervene. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JONATHAN D. NEWTON on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NEWTON, JONATHAN) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
Transcript of Telephonic status conference held on 7/13/2016, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana Nesbit, Telephone number (336)734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2016. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP(Nesbit, Briana) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 58 MOTION to Intervene filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Replies due by 8/4/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(CUMMINGS, TOREY) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS re 98 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS. (FRANCISCO, NOEL) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS. Responses due by 8/11/2016 (FRANCISCO, NOEL) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 73 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DUNCAN, STUART) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 95 Notice (Other) filed by PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE. Replies due by 8/4/2016. (DUNCAN, STUART) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA of Conditional Waiver of Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Preliminary Relief (KISCH, LORI) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None
ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 07/15/2016; that this matter is set for an Initial Pretrial Conference on July 22, 2016, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 3 of the United States Courthouse in Winston-Salem, North Carolina. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must file their Rule 26(f) Report(s), whether jointly or individually, by July 20, 2016, as noted herein. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 93 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 07/14/2016; Parties in case 1:16CV236 shall appear on Monday, August 1, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1 of the Hiram H. Ward Federal Building, Winston-Salem, North Carolina, for a hearing on the Carcano Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction (Doc. 21 in 1:16CV236) and UNC defendants' motion to stay proceedings (Doc. 38 in 1:16CV236). Counsel for United States may participate in the hearing as set out. Trial on merits, etc. in United States' action to be consolidated with hearing on United States' motion for preliminary injunction (Doc. 73 in 1:16cv425). Trial in all four HB2 cases will take place in late October or early November, 2016 depending on pretrial schedule to be determined by the Magistrate Judge as set out. Parties shall file a short joint notice identifying any agreements reached and explaining their respective positions no later than 5:00 p.m. on July 22, 2016. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP (Garland, Leah) Docket entry modified on 7/19/2016. (Powell, Gloria). (Entered: 07/14/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None
ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 7/12/2016. Plaintiff United States' 70 Motion to Exceed Page Limit is GRANTED and the Clerk is directed to accept as filed 76 United States' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Engle, Anita) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None
ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 7/12/2016. All responses to North Carolinians for Privacy's motion to intervene (Doc. 58) due on or before July 18, 2016. Any reply by North Carolinians for Privacy due on or before July 22, 2016. If the court were to grant the motion to intervene, it would not extend any deadlines - such that North Carolinians for Privacy's response to the United States' motion for preliminary injunction would be due July 29, 2016.(Engle, Anita) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None
Amicus Curiae BRIEF by 68 Companies Opposed to H.B. 2 and in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (LARGESS, STEPHEN) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None
ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 7/12/2016, that the motion (Doc. 85 ) is GRANTED. The amici are directed to file the associated amicus curiae brief in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction forthwith. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/10/2016, Entered: None
REPLY, filed by Intervenor Defendant NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY, to Response to 78 MOTION to Expedite the Responses to its Motion to Intervene filed by NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY. (CAMPBELL, JAMES) (Entered: 07/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 78 MOTION to Expedite the Responses to its Motion to Intervene filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Replies due by 7/25/2016. (KEVENEY, SEAN) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Amicus PROPOSED AMICI CURIAE 68 COMPANIES (LARGESS, STEPHEN) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiff by PROPOSED AMICI CURIAE 68 COMPANIES. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief by 68 Companies in Support of Plaintiff, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(LARGESS, STEPHEN) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ASHLEY S. BOIZELLE on behalf of Amicus PROPOSED AMICI CURIAE 68 COMPANIES (BOIZELLE, ASHLEY) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MATTHEW D. MCGILL on behalf of Amicus PROPOSED AMICI CURIAE 68 COMPANIES (MCGILL, MATTHEW) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney THEODORE J. BOUTROUS, JR on behalf of Amicus PROPOSED AMICI CURIAE 68 COMPANIES (BOUTROUS, THEODORE) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney THEODORE B. OLSON on behalf of Amicus PROPOSED AMICI CURIAE 68 COMPANIES (OLSON, THEODORE) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MARK JAMES KLEINSCHMIDT on behalf of Amicus PROPOSED AMICI CURIAE 68 COMPANIES (KLEINSCHMIDT, MARK) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney STEPHEN LUKE LARGESS on behalf of Amicus PROPOSED AMICI CURIAE 68 COMPANIES (LARGESS, STEPHEN) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None
MOTION to Expedite the Responses to its Motion to Intervene by NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(CAMPBELL, JAMES) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 77 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: 7/6/2016 Certificate-Other
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: 7/6/2016 Memorandum
MEMORANDUM re 73 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Amended) by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit, # 29 Exhibit, # 30 Exhibit, # 31 Exhibit, # 32 Exhibit, # 33 Exhibit, # 34 Exhibit, # 35 Exhibit, # 36 Exhibit, # 37 Exhibit, # 38 Exhibit, # 39 Exhibit, # 40 Exhibit, # 41 Exhibit, # 42 Exhibit, # 43 Exhibit, # 44 Exhibit, # 45 Exhibit)(CUMMINGS, TOREY) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: 7/6/2016 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOSEPH E. LARUE on behalf of Intervenor Defendant NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY (LARUE, JOSEPH) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document 74 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: 7/5/2016 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
MEMORANDUM Memorandum in Support by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit, # 29 Exhibit, # 30 Exhibit, # 31 Exhibit, # 32 Exhibit, # 33 Exhibit, # 34 Exhibit, # 35 Exhibit, # 36 Exhibit, # 37 Exhibit, # 38 Exhibit, # 39 Exhibit, # 40 Exhibit, # 41 Exhibit, # 42 Exhibit)(CUMMINGS, TOREY) Modified on 7/6/2016 to correct event to a memorandum (Taylor, Abby). (Entered: 07/05/2016)
LREF
Legal Document 73 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: 7/5/2016 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Responses due by 7/29/2016 (CUMMINGS, TOREY) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: 7/5/2016 Memorandum
Memorandum in Support Witness Declarations Using Initials by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Responses due by 7/29/2016 (CUMMINGS, TOREY) Modified on 7/6/2016 to correct event type (Contreras, Jamie). (Entered: 07/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: 7/5/2016 Motion for Leave to File
MOTION for Leave to File Witness Declarations Using Initials by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Responses due by 7/29/2016 (CUMMINGS, TOREY) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: 7/5/2016 Motion to Exceed Page Limit
MOTION to Exceed Page Limit by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Responses due by 7/29/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(CUMMINGS, TOREY) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: 7/5/2016 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOHN MATTHEW SHARP on behalf of Intervenor Defendant NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY (SHARP, JOHN) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: 7/1/2016 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DEBORAH J. DEWART on behalf of Intervenor Defendant NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY (DEWART, DEBORAH) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: 6/30/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
RESPONSE in Opposition re 34 MOTION to Intervene filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Replies due by 7/18/2016. (RAND, RIPLEY) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: 6/30/2016 Answer
Intervenor-Defendants' ANSWER to 2 Complaint, 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, Counterclaim by PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE. (DUNCAN, STUART) Modified on 7/1/2016 to remove duplicate text. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: 6/29/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
RESPONSE in Opposition re 34 MOTION to Intervene filed by PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. Replies due by 7/18/2016. (STEWART, WILLIAM) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: 6/29/2016 Order on Motion to Intervene
MEMORANDUM ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 6/29/2016. For the reasons stated herein, proposed intervenors motion to intervene (Doc. 8 ) is GRANTED. The proposed intervenors shall file their responsive pleading to the complaint forthwith and will be subject to the same schedule as the current parties to the case. (Engle, Anita) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: 6/29/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
RESPONSE in Opposition re 34 MOTION to Intervene filed by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS. Replies due by 7/18/2016. (FRANCISCO, NOEL) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: 6/28/2016 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DAVID A. CORTMAN on behalf of Intervenor Defendant North Carolinians for Privacy (CORTMAN, DAVID) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: 6/28/2016 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JEREMY D. TEDESCO on behalf of Intervenor Defendant North Carolinians for Privacy (TEDESCO, JEREMY) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: 6/28/2016 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JONATHAN CALEB DALTON on behalf of Intervenor Defendant North Carolinians for Privacy (DALTON, JONATHAN) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: 6/28/2016 Brief
BRIEF re 58 MOTION to Intervene . (CAMPBELL, JAMES) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: 6/28/2016 Motion to Intervene
MOTION to Intervene by North Carolinians for Privacy. Responses due by 7/22/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Answer, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(CAMPBELL, JAMES) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: 6/28/2016 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JAMES A. CAMPBELL on behalf of Intervenor Defendant North Carolinians for Privacy (CAMPBELL, JAMES) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: 6/24/2016 Withdrawal of Motion
WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Defendants UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS re 51 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Regarding Suspension of Funds filed by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA (FRANCISCO, NOEL) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: 6/24/2016 Withdrawal of Motion
WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Counter Claimants PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, Defendants PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA re 52 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Stay MOTION to Expedite filed by PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA (STEWART, WILLIAM) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: 6/24/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
Transcript of Telephone Status Conference held on 6/23/2016, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number (336) 734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/18/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2016. (Nesbit, Briana) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: 6/23/2016 Order on Joint Motion
MEMORANDUM ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 6/23/2016. For the reasons stated herein, 37 Joint Motion to enjoin automatic suspension of funds is GRANTED. The United States is hereby enjoined from enforcing the automatic suspension of VAWA funding to Defendants as stated herein. This preliminary injunction shall remain in effect until the court rules on the merits of this claim, or until further order of the court. (Engle, Anita) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: 6/23/2016 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ( Responses due by 7/18/2016), MOTION to Stay ( Responses due by 7/18/2016), MOTION to Expedite () by PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. (STEWART, WILLIAM) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: 6/23/2016 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Regarding Suspension of Funds by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS. Responses due by 7/18/2016 (FRANCISCO, NOEL) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: 6/23/2016 Brief
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re 8 MOTION to Intervene in response to June 22, 2016 telephone conference by Intervenor Defendants Phil Berger, TIM MOORE filed by Phil Berger, TIM MOORE. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Order denying motion to transfer)(SCHAERR, GENE) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: 6/23/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
Transcript of telephone conference/motion hearing held on 6/22/2016, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number (336) 734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/18/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2016. (Nesbit, Briana) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: 6/20/2016 Supplemental Memorandum
Supplemental Memorandum re 37 JOINT MOTIONto Enjoin Automatic Suspension of Funds by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Nadine Neufville, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(STOUGHTON, COREY) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: 6/20/2016 Response in Support of Motion
RESPONSE in Support re 37 JOINT MOTIONto Enjoin Automatic Suspension of Funds filed by PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. Replies due by 7/8/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Perry Declaration)(STEWART, WILLIAM) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: 6/20/2016 Brief
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re 37 JOINT MOTIONto Enjoin Automatic Suspension of Funds by Defendants UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS filed by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Margaret Spellings, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Spellings Declaration - Code Section 501, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Spellings Declaration - Code Section 103, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Spellings Declaration - Public Facilities Privacy & Security Act, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Spellings Declaration - Guidance Memorandum, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Spellings Declaration - Policy Manual, # 7 Declaration of Noel Francisco, # 8 Exhibit A to Francisco Declaration - Spellings April 11 Statement, # 9 Exhibit B to Francisco Declaration - Shanahan April 13 Letter, # 10 Exhibit C to Francisco Declaration - Spellings May 9 Letter, # 11 Declaration of Sarah Smith)(FRANCISCO, NOEL) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
Transcript of telephone conference/motion hearing held on 6/16/2016, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP(Nesbit, Briana) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
REPLY, filed by Intervenor Defendants Phil Berger, Tim Moore, to Response to 8 MOTION to Intervene filed by Phil Berger, Tim Moore. (DUNCAN, STUART) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROBERT N. DRISCOLL on behalf of Counter Claimants PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, Defendants PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA (DRISCOLL, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney GENE C. SCHAERR on behalf of Intervenor Defendants Phil Berger, Tim Moore (SCHAERR, GENE) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None
RESPONSE filed by Counter Claimants PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, Defendants PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA re 8 MOTION to Intervene filed by Phil Berger, Tim Moore filed by PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. Replies due by 6/27/2016. (STEWART, WILLIAM) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 36 Response to Motion (KEVENEY, SEAN) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None
RESPONSE filed by Defendants UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS re 8 MOTION to Intervene filed by Phil Berger, Tim Moore filed by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS. Replies due by 6/27/2016. (FRANCISCO, NOEL) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 38 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None
BRIEF re 37 JOINT MOTIONto Enjoin Automatic Suspension of Funds . (KEVENEY, SEAN) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None
JOINT MOTIONto Enjoin Automatic Suspension of Funds by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (KEVENEY, SEAN) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 8 MOTION to Intervene filed by Phil Berger, Tim Moore filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Replies due by 6/27/2016. (KEVENEY, SEAN) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None
***FILED IN ERROR*** JOINT MOTIONto Enjoin Automatic Suspension of Funds by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support)(KEVENEY, SEAN) Modified on 6/10/2016 to reflect filed in error. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None
Verified MOTION by STEVEN-GLENN: JOHNSON to Intervene of Proposed Plaintiff Intervener ("Movant") Steven-Glenn: Johnson in his capacity as a North Carolinian, one of the people in his capacity as appointed TRUSTEE of the RESULTING TRUST DECLARATION AND AGREEMENT, the State of North Carolina Beneficiary. Responses due by 6/30/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Complaint)(Daniel, J) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TARYN WILGUS NULL on behalf of Counter Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (WILGUS NULL, TARYN) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document 32 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None
ANSWER to 2 Complaint, 1 Complaint, , ANSWER to 2 Complaint, 1 Complaint, , Counterclaim against by PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. (STEWART, WILLIAM) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROBERT C. STEPHENS on behalf of Defendants PATRICK MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA (STEPHENS, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KARL S. BOWERS, JR on behalf of Defendants PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA (BOWERS, KARL) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney FRANK J. GORDON on behalf of Defendants PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA (GORDON, FRANK) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BRENNAN TYLER BROOKS on behalf of Defendants PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA (BROOKS, BRENNAN) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM WOODLEY STEWART, JR on behalf of Defendants PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA (STEWART, WILLIAM) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney GLEN D. NAGER on behalf of Defendants UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS (NAGER, GLEN) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney AMAR MAJMUNDAR on behalf of Defendant STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA (MAJMUNDAR, AMAR) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JAMES M. BURNHAM on behalf of Defendants UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS (BURNHAM, JAMES) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney NOEL J. FRANCISCO on behalf of Defendants UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS (FRANCISCO, NOEL) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 22 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion To Answer or Otherwise Respond 2 Complaint, until 07/18/2016, Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint, 1 Complaint, () by STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Prop Order Extending Time)(VYSOTSKAYA DE BRITO, OLGA) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney OLGA E. VYSOTSKAYA DE BRITO on behalf of Defendant STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA (VYSOTSKAYA DE BRITO, OLGA) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: 5/26/2016 Return of Service by USMO
RETURN OF SERVICE by US Marshal's Office as to Board of Governors of the University of North Carolina (c/o Thomas C. Shanahan) re: Summons/Complaint/Notice of Right to Consent served on 5/12/2016. Answer due by 6/2/2016. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: 5/26/2016 Return of Service by USMO
RETURN OF SERVICE by US Marshal's Office as to Department of Public Safety (c/o Deborah L. McSwain, General Counsel) re: Summons/Complaint/Notice of Right to Consent on 5/12/2016. Answer due by 6/2/2016. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: 5/26/2016 Return of Service by USMO
RETURN OF SERVICE by US Marshal's Office as to State of North Carolina (c/o Roy Cooper) re: Summons/Complaint/Notice of Right to Consent served on 5/12/2016. Answer due by 6/2/2016. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: 5/26/2016 Return of Service by USMO
RETURN OF SERVICE by US Marshal's Office as to University of North Carolina (c/o Thomas C. Shanahan, Senior Vice President and General Counsel) re: Summons/Complaint/Notice of Right to Consent served on 5/12/2016. Answer due by 6/2/2016. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: 5/26/2016 Return of Service by USMO
RETURN OF SERVICE by US Marshal's Office as to Governor Pat McCrory re: Summons/Complaint/Notice of Right to Consent served on 5/12/2016. Answer due by 6/2/2016. Modified on 5/26/2016 to reflect which defendant was served. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: 5/25/2016 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(PRATT, CAROLYN) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: 5/25/2016 Corporate Disclosure Statement - 7.1a
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS (PRATT, CAROLYN) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: 5/25/2016 Corporate Disclosure Statement - 7.1a
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA (PRATT, CAROLYN) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: 5/25/2016 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CAROLYN C. PRATT on behalf of Defendants UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS (PRATT, CAROLYN) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: 5/17/2016 Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: 5/17/2016 Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: 5/17/2016 Memorandum
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: 5/17/2016 Motion to Intervene
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to All Defendants. (PHOENIX, CANDYCE) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JON W. DAVIDSON on behalf of Plaintiffs AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTH CAROLINA, JOAQUIN CARCANO, ANGELA GILMORE, H.S., PAYTON GREY MCGARRY, BEVERLY NEWELL, KELLY TRENT Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP(DAVIDSON, JON) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SEAN R. KEVENEY on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP(KEVENEY, SEAN) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: 5/10/2016 Notice of Right to Consent
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: 5/10/2016 Summons Issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: 5/10/2016 Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: 5/9/2016 Complaint
COMPLAINT against PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS (Related Case # 1:16-cv-236), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PHOENIX, CANDYCE) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 212 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?