Cole v. Capital One, National Association et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 8:15-cv-01121
District Judge George Jarrod Hazel, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge George Jarrod Hazel
Last Updated July 25, 2017 at 2:00 AM EDT (7.7 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Jennifer Cole, Plaintiff

Represented by Jennifer Cole

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Cole +1 202 810 5720
v.
No Logo American Trust Capital Lending, Inc., Defendant
No Logo CACH LLC, Defendant

Represented by Barron & Newburger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren M Burnette +1 904 201 9120 lburnette@bn-lawyers.com
No Logo Capital One National Association, Defendant

Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Chang +1 202 857 1725 +1 202 828 2995 pchang@mcguirewoods.com
Citibank, NA Citibank, NA, Defendant
Officer/Director, Kemet Corporation
Officer/Director, STRATOS LIGHTWAVE, INC.
Officer/Director, Chippac, Inc.
Officer/Director, Citicorp Holdings, Inc.
Citigroup, Inc. Officer/Director, Citigroup, Inc.
Officer/Director, CITICORP
Officer/Director, Intersil Holding Co
Officer/Director, Citigroup Holdings Co

Represented by Miles & Stockbridge, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Steven Rifkin +1 410 385 3857 +1 410 385 3700 drifkin@milesstockbridge.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Hutchinson Robbins, Jr +1 410 385 3408 +1 410 385 3700 erobbins@milesstockbridge.com
No Logo Data Mortgage, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Pennington Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter Allen Pennington +1 619 940 6157 wpennington@pennfirm.com
No Logo E Mortgage Management, L.L.C., Defendant

Represented by Law Offices of Debra Lee Bogo-Ernst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Edward Shelton +1 202 263 3428 cshelton@mayerbrown.com
Equifax Information Services LLC Equifax Information Services LLC, Defendant

Represented by Neuberger, Quinn, Gielen, Rubin & Gibber, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan Daniel Adler +1 410 332 8516 +1 410 951 6039 nda@nqgrg.com
No Logo Equity Loans LLC, Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Shulman Rogers Gangal Pordy & Ecker, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandy David Baron +1 301 230 5200 +1 301 230 2891 sbaron@shulmanrogers.com
No Logo Great Plains National Bank, Defendant

Represented by McNamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Greenan & Lynch, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Paul Lynch +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 jlynch@mhlawyers.com

Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Drew Neal +1 301 441 2420 aneal@mhlawyers.com
No Logo Herbert A. Rosenthal, Defendant

Represented by HERBERT A. ROSENTHAL, CHARTERED

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles F. Gormly +1 202 785 9773 +1 202 659 3536 cfgormly@earthlink.net
No Logo JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Barron & Newburger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren M Burnette +1 904 201 9120 lburnette@bn-lawyers.com
No Logo Mortgage Producers, Inc., Defendant

Represented by BP Fisher Law Group, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Randal Robinson +1 301 599 7700 +1 301 599 2100 srobinson@first-legal.com
No Logo Oliphant Financial, LLC, Defendant

Represented by HERBERT A. ROSENTHAL, CHARTERED

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles F. Gormly +1 202 785 9773 +1 202 659 3536 cfgormly@earthlink.net
Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Barron & Newburger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren M Burnette +1 904 201 9120 lburnette@bn-lawyers.com

Represented by Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/07/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith Steven McGurgan +1 757 519 9300 +1 757 321 2518 kmcgurgan@portfoliorecovery.com
No Logo Sher Financial Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Squaretwo Financial Services Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Barron & Newburger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren M Burnette +1 904 201 9120 lburnette@bn-lawyers.com
TransUnion LLC TransUnion LLC, Defendant

Represented by Gohn Hankey Stichel & Berlage LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED H Mark Stichel +1 410 752 1658 +1 410 752 2519 hmstichel@ghsllp.com

Represented by Schuckit & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KATHERINE E. CARLTON ROBINSON +1 317 363 2400 +1 317 363 2257 krobinson@schuckitlaw.com
No Logo Transworld Systems, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merrilyn E Ratliff +1 410 585 3768 +1 410 764 5366 meratliff@dpscs.state.md.us
No Logo United Consumers, Inc., Defendant

Represented by The Law Offices of Ronald S. Canter, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/21/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY Bradley Todd Canter +1 301 424 7490 +1 301 424 7470 bcanter@roncanterllc.com
Wells Fargo Bank, NA Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "Wells Fargo Bank, National Association"
Officer/Director, NORWEST CORP
Officer/Director, Day Runner, Inc.
Officer/Director, Yucca Uranium Inc
Officer/Director, Munienhanced Fund Inc

Represented by Treanor Pope & Hughes, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Virginia Wood Barnhart +1 410 494 7777 +1 410 494 1658 vwbarnhart@tph-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah E Meyer +1 410 494 7777 semeyer@tph-law.com
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 480 - Consumer Credit
Timeline
  Entries (116) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 95 Motion to Dismiss; Dismissing Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant Data Mortgage, Inc.; Granting Plaintiff 28 Days to Show Cause. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 5/5/2016. (c/m 05/05/2016 jf3, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 5/5/2016. (c/m 05/05/2016 jf3, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER approving 113 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant Mortgage Producers, Inc.. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 5/5/2016. (am2s, Chambers) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Mortgage Producers, Inc. by Mortgage Producers, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's signature authorization, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, Scott) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 110 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 95 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution Responses due by 4/25/2016. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 4/11/2016. (am2s, Chambers) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None
Consent NOTICE to Substitute Attorney (Burnette, Lauren) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 2 Complaint,, by Mortgage Producers, Inc. Responses due by 4/25/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Robinson, Scott) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None
Summons Issued 21 days as to American Trust Capital Lending, Inc., Mortgage Producers, Inc., Sher Financial Group, Inc. (bus, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 74 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default; denying 105 Renewed Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default; directing plaintiff to submit completed summons for Sher Financial Group, Inc., American Trust Capital Lending, Inc., and Mortgage Producers, Inc. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 1/15/2016. (bus, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 1/15/2016. (c/m 01/15/2016 bus, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
Correspondence re: Request for Reissuance of Summons (bus, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
RENEWED MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense (Renewed Motion for Order of Default) by Jennifer Cole (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(bus, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER approving 102 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice as to Defendant Capital One, National Association. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 11/3/2015. (c/m ch 11/3/15 am2s, Chambers) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER approving 101 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice as to E Mortgage Management, L.L.C. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 11/3/2015. (c/m ch 11/3/15 am2s, Chambers) Modified on 11/3/2015 (bus, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 11/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Capital One, National Association ONLY by Jennifer Cole (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Envelope)(aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to E Mortgage Management, L.L.C. only by Jennifer Cole (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Envelope)(aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 95 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution filed by Jennifer Cole. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address by Jennifer Cole (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Envelope)(aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None
Copy of Correspondence to Christopher E. Shelton from National Registered Agents, Inc. regarding attempted service on American Trust Capital Lending, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None
Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Jennifer Cole. (c/m 9/29/2015 aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None
QC NOTICE: 95 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for failure to state claim, lack of personal jurisdiction and improper venue by Data Mortgage, Inc. filed by Data Mortgage, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Please note as a one time courtesy, Clerk's office staff has filed the above documents on your behalf, for all future filings, as an electronic filing court, it is the responsibility of counsel to file their documents through CM/ECF.** (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for failure to state claim, lack of personal jurisdiction and improper venue by Data Mortgage, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 mailing envelope)(aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None
QC NOTICE: 93 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Change Venue, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Data Mortgage, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **A motion, supporting memorandum and proposed order must be filed separately. The motion should be filed as the main document and the supporting memorandum and proposed order as separate attachments to the main document. Your document has been accepted as filed. No corrective action is required in regard to this filing. (bu, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
(DUPLICATE - REFILED AT ECF 95) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Change Venue , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Data Mortgage, Inc. Responses due by 10/9/2015 (Pennington, Walter) Modified on 12/4/2015 (bus, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 74 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense filed by E Mortgage Management, L.L.C.. Replies due by 10/5/2015. (Shelton, Christopher) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
ANSWER to 2 Complaint,, by E Mortgage Management, L.L.C..(Shelton, Christopher) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by E Mortgage Management, L.L.C.. (Shelton, Christopher) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Edward Shelton on behalf of E Mortgage Management, L.L.C. (Shelton, Christopher) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
Return Document Letter (Attachments: # 1 first page of Pro Hac Vice Motion, # 2 first page of Motion to Extend Time)(kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 9/11/15 w/original documents and check) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
QC NOTICE: 86 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Data Mortgage, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Please note, as a one time courtesy, Clerk's Office staff has filed your document on your behalf. Counsel must enter their appearance and electronically file all future documents on their own behalf. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Data Mortgage, Inc. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
Correspondence from National Registered Agents, Inc. re Service (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
QC NOTICE: 82 Answer to Complaint filed by Oliphant Financial, LLC was filed incorrectly. **A local rule 103.3 Disclosure statement must be filed as its own docket entry. Please file your statement under the event Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement. Only the attachment has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bu, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint by Herbert A. Rosenthal. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Rule 7.1 Disclosure)(Gormly, Charles) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint by Oliphant Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 (FILED IN ERROR) - Supplement Rule 7.1 Disclosure)(Gormly, Charles) Modified on 8/3/2015 (bu, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 07/27/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None
Correspondence re: service of document(s) for American Trust Capital Lending, Inc. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Capital One, National Association identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One, National Association.. (Chang, Phillip) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None
ANSWER to 2 Complaint,, by Capital One, National Association.(Chang, Phillip) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 74 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense filed by Capital One, National Association. Replies due by 7/30/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Chang, Phillip) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, Llc. identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Advent International Corp., Other Affiliate GS Capital Partners for Trans Union, Llc... (Stichel, Henry) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None
Summons Issued 21 days as to Data Mortgage, Inc., Sher Financial Group, Inc. (c/m 7/1/2015 ca2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed American Trust Capital Lending, Inc. served on 4/10/2015, answer due 5/1/2015; Capital One, National Association served on 4/14/2015, answer due 5/5/2015; Equity Loans LLC served on 4/16/2015, answer due 5/7/2015; Herbert A. Rosenthal served on 4/16/2015, answer due 5/7/2015. (Attachments: # 1 certificate of service)(aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense (Motion for Order of Default) by Jennifer Cole (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
REQUEST for Summons by Jennifer Cole (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER approving 71 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice as to Great Plains National Bank. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 6/10/2015. (am2s, Chambers) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Great Plains National Bank (Neal, Aaron) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER approving 69 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 6/5/2015. (am2s, Chambers) Modified on 6/5/2015 (jf2s, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 06/05/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims against Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by Jennifer Cole. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(jf2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
ANSWER to 2 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(Baron, Sandy) Modified on 6/1/2015 (jf2s, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 05/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
ANSWER to 2 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C.(Burnette, Lauren) Modified on 6/1/2015 (jf2s, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 05/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying as moot 22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 5/27/2015. (c/m ch 5/27/15 am2s, Chambers) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER approvinf 63 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice as to Citibank, N.A.. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 5/27/2015. (c/m ch 5/27/15 am2s, Chambers) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER approving 60 Stipulation of Dismissal of Transworld Systems Inc. with prejudice. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 5/27/2015. (c/m ch 5/27/15 am2s, Chambers) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Citibank, N.A. ONLY by Jennifer Cole. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER approving 59 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to United Consumers, Inc. with prejudice as of 5/21/2015. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 5/26/2015. (c/m ch 5/26/15 am2s, Chambers) Modified text on 5/26/2015 (kns, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 05/26/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren M Burnette on behalf of Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C. (Burnette, Lauren) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal Agreed Stipulation to Dismiss Transworld Systems, Inc. by Transworld Systems Inc.. (Ratliff, Merrilyn) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United Consumers, Inc. (Canter, Bradley) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
Defendant JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC ANSWER to 2 Complaint,, Plaintiff's Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC.(Burnette, Lauren) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC. (Burnette, Lauren) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent PRA Group for Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C... (McGurgan, Keith) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Transworld Systems Inc. identifying Other Affiliate NCO Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Outsourcing Solutions, Inc., Other Affiliate One Equity Partners, Other Affiliate Expert Global Solutions, Inc., Other Affiliate EGS Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate JP Morgan Chase & Co. for Transworld Systems Inc... (Ratliff, Merrilyn) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
QC NOTICE: 48 Local Rule, Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Transworld Systems Inc. was filed incorrectly. **The Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement needs to be refiled and the corporate parent and/or affiliations need to be entered when the system prompts you do to so. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (jf2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 47 Defendant Transworld Systems, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Response due 6/8/2015. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 5/13/2015. (c/m 5/13/15 jf2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 45 Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Response due 5/29/2015. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 5/12/2015. (c/m 5/13/15 jf2s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/13/2015 (jf2s, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
Correspondence re: Statement Concerning Removal (Burnette, Lauren) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
Correspondence re: Consent to Removal (Burnette, Lauren) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
Deftendants ANSWER to 2 Complaint,, With Affirmative Defenses by Cach, LLC, Square Two Financial Services Corporation.(Burnette, Lauren) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
[FILED IN ERROR] Local Rule 103.3, Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Transworld Systems Inc.. (Ratliff, Merrilyn) Modified on 5/13/2015 (jf2s, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 05/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint,, or Otherwise Plead by Transworld Systems Inc. Responses due by 5/29/2015 (Ratliff, Merrilyn) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
MOTION for Joinder and Consent to Removal by Transworld Systems Inc. Responses due by 5/29/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ratliff, Merrilyn) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C. Responses due by 5/29/2015 (McGurgan, Keith) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, Llc. identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, Llc... (Adler, Nathan) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
ANSWER to 2 Complaint,, by Equifax Information Services, Llc..(Adler, Nathan) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by CitiBank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Citicorp, Corporate Parent Citigroup, Inc. for CitiBank, N.A... (Rifkin, Daniel) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Hutchinson Robbins, Jr on behalf of CitiBank, N.A. (Robbins, Edward) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
QC NOTICE: 37 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by CitiBank, N.A. was filed incorrectly. **The Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement needs to be refiled and the corporate parent and/or affiliations need to be entered when the system prompts you do to so. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (jf2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 36 Defendant Citibank N.A.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Response due 5/29/2015. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 5/7/2015. (c/m 5/8/15 jf2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Steven Rifkin on behalf of CitiBank, N.A. (Rifkin, Daniel) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
[FILED IN ERROR] Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by CitiBank, N.A.. (Rifkin, Daniel) Modified on 5/11/2015 (jf2s, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 05/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by CitiBank, N.A. Responses due by 5/26/2015 (Rifkin, Daniel) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by John Paul Lynch on behalf of Great Plains National Bank (Lynch, John) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
ANSWER to 2 Complaint,, by Great Plains National Bank.(Neal, Aaron) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Great Plains National Bank identifying Corporate Parent Great Plains Bancshares, Inc. for Great Plains National Bank.. (Neal, Aaron) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Drew Neal on behalf of Great Plains National Bank (Neal, Aaron) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
Correspondence re: Response to Standing Order Concerning Removal (Barnhart, Virginia) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Square Two Financial Services Corporation identifying Corporate Parent CA Holding, Inc for Square Two Financial Services Corporation.. (Burnette, Lauren) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Cach, LLC. (Burnette, Lauren) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
Correspondence re: Statement Concerning Removal and Consent to Removal (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Removal)(Burnette, Lauren) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren M Burnette on behalf of Cach, LLC, Square Two Financial Services Corporation (Burnette, Lauren) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
ANSWER to 2 Complaint,, by Trans Union, Llc..(Stichel, Henry) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None
Correspondence re: Removal Statement pursuant to Standing Order (Stichel, Henry) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None
ANSWER to 2 Complaint,, by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association.(Barnhart, Virginia) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Jennifer Cole. (c/m 4/30/15 jf2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by United Consumers, Inc. Responses due by 5/18/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Defendant UCI's Motion to Dismiss Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Canter, Bradley) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE by United Consumers, Inc. of Consent to Removal (Canter, Bradley) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by United Consumers, Inc.. (Canter, Bradley) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Todd Canter on behalf of United Consumers, Inc. (Canter, Bradley) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 17 Motion to Extend the Time for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. to respond. Response due 5/29/2015. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 4/29/2015. (c/m 4/29/15 jf2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 5/15/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baron, Sandy) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E Meyer on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Meyer, Sarah) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Co. (NYSE: Ticker: WFC) for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association.. (Barnhart, Virginia) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association re 1 Notice of Removal Joinder and Consent to Removal (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Barnhart, Virginia) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia Wood Barnhart on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Barnhart, Virginia) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Katherine Elisabeth Carlton. Directing attorney Katherine Elisabeth Carlton to use the attorneys existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at https://ecf.mdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/lostPassword.pl. Signed by Clerk on 4/22/2015. (bu, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Online Date Exchange LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc... (Baron, Sandy) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Katherine E. Carlton ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-5342969.) by Trans Union, Llc. (Stichel, Henry) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Sandy David Baron on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Baron, Sandy) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 4/21/2015. (c/m 4/21/2015) (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
Correspondence to Jennifer Cole re: Removal Notification Letter. (c/m 4/21/2015) (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Joinder and Consent to Removal by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, Llc. identifying Other Affiliate Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Trans Union Corp., Other Affiliate Advent International Corp., Other Affiliate GS Capital Partners, Other Affiliate Trans Union Holding Company, Inc. for Trans Union, Llc... (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Trans Union, Llc. (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
Summons Issued as to Trans Union, Llc.. (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against American Trust Capital Lending, Inc., Cach, LLC, Capital One, National Association, CitiBank, N.A., Data Mortgage, Inc., E Mortgage Management, L.L.C., Equifax Information Services, Llc., Equity Loans LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Great Plains National Bank, JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC, Mortgage Producers, Inc., Oliphant Financial, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C., Herbert A. Rosenthal, Sher Financial Group, Inc., Square Two Financial Services Corporation, Trans Union, Llc., Transworld Systems Inc., United Consumers, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, filed by Jennifer Cole.(ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, case number CAL15-04419. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637080784), filed by Trans Union, Llc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 89 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?