Al Dey et al v. The City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-08911
District Judge Loretta A. Preska, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 5:11 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Oliver Al Dey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Oliver Al Dey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Oliver Al Dey
No Logo Shaalivier Douce El, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Shaalivier Douce El

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shaalivier Douce El
v.
No Logo Brett Schantez, Defendant
No Logo Bronx County Robert Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Bronx News 12, Defendant
No Logo Commissioner Raymond Kelly, Defendant
No Logo CT Adminis Jdg Scheerzera, Defendant
No Logo Dt. Shane Rogers, Defendant
No Logo Jdg J. Benitez, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Micheal Bloomberg"
No Logo NYC Policeman Badge No. #170169 John Doe, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Artore, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Donna Farrell, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Tirurcia Kely, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Cooley, Defendant
No Logo P.O. John Doe #947471, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Lieutenant Kevin A. Moroney, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Moralez #6220 Badge 756, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Shield #012909, Defendant
No Logo Policewoman Hispanik #5795 Figueroa, Defendant
No Logo Policewoman Madanna 42 Pct., Defendant
No Logo Shield # John Doe, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
CIVIL JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the order issued March 11, 2014, dismissing the complaint, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's order. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/11/2014) (ft) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket and to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff. Plaintiffs complaint, filed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(1), is dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's order. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/11/2014) (ft) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
      LETTER from Oliver Al Dey Consul 1-3081-1036; re: OPPOSE 3:2 IN JUDICIAL MODE, WRIT OF AFFIDAVIT OF FACT DISCLOSURE, OATH OF OFFICE FACT UNDER FRE 201, COMMON LAW REMEDY HUMAN RIGHT, CHALLENGING THE AUTHORITY & STATUS JURISDICTION 'VENUE' UNDER 28:1602 1611 CHIEF JUDGE. Document filed by Oliver Al Dey.(sc) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Oliver Al Dey. In light of Plaintiff's litigation history, this Court finds that Douce/Parkins was or should have been aware when he filed this action that he cannot bring claims on behalf of S. Douce without counsel. See Sledge v. Kooi, 564 F.3d 105, 109-110 (2d Cir. 2009) (discussing circumstances where frequent pro se litigant may be charged with knowledge of particular legal requirements)." Accordingly, he is warned that frivolous litigation in this Court may result in an order barring him from filing new actions in forma pauperis without prior permission. See 28 U.S.C. § 1651. CONCLUSION: The Court directs the Clerk of Court to assign this matter to my docket and to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff. Unless counsel enters a notice of appearance in this matter within thirty days, the complaint will be dismissed without prejudice because a non attorney guardian cannot bring an action on another's behalf without obtaining counsel. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/28/2014) (ja) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
          AMENDED REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Oliver Al Dey, Shaalivier Douce El.(man) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR AMENDED IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 1/17/2014. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 1/17/2014. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/18/2013) (Attachments: # 1 Amended IFP application)(keb) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
              COMPLAINT against Artore, J. Benitez, Micheal Bloomberg, Bronx News 12, CT Adminis Jdg Scheerzera, Donna Farrell, Robert Johnson, Raymond Kelly, Tirurcia Kely, NYC Policeman Badge No. #170169 John Doe, P.O. Cooley, P.O. John Doe #947471, P.O. Lieutenant Kevin A. Moroney, P.O. Moralez #6220 Badge 756, P.O. Shield #012909, Policewoman Hispanik #5795 Figueroa, Policewoman Madanna 42 Pct., Shane Rogers, Brett Schantez, Shield # John Doe, The City of New York. Document filed by Shaalivier Douce El, Oliver Al Dey. (Attachments: # 1 exhibits)(laq) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
              REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Oliver Al Dey, Shaalivier Douce El.(laq) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 65 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?