Corp of the Pres v. Farm Bureau Mutual
Federal Civil Lawsuit Idaho District Court, Case No. 4:98-cv-00149
District Judge B. Lynn Winmill, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 2:05 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by COOPER & LARSEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R Ron Kerl +1 208 235 1145 Ron@cooper-larsen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirton & McConkie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randy T. Austin +1 801 328 3600
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander Dushku +1 801 321 4810 adushku@kmclaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles W Dahlquist, II +1 801 328 3600

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven V Richert +1 208 478 2046 Steve_Richert@fd.org

Toggle Switch Represented by ROOKER & GIBSON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James B Gisbon +1 702 990 8100
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C Keith Rooker +1 702 990 8100
No Logo Corporation Of The Presiding Bishop Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by COOPER & LARSEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R Ron Kerl +1 208 235 1145 Ron@cooper-larsen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirton & McConkie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randy T. Austin +1 801 328 3600
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander Dushku +1 801 321 4810 adushku@kmclaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles W Dahlquist, II +1 801 328 3600

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven V Richert +1 208 478 2046 Steve_Richert@fd.org

Toggle Switch Represented by ROOKER & GIBSON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James B Gisbon +1 702 990 8100
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C Keith Rooker +1 702 990 8100
v.
No Logo Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Idaho, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MERRILL & MERRILL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen S Dunn +1 208 232 2286 +1 208 232 2499
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kent L Hawkins +1 208 232 2286 +1 208 232 2249
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
  Entries (73) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: None
MANDATE from Circuit Court of Appeals affirming the decision of the District Court on appeal [69-1] (rr) (Entered: 08/28/2001)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/27/2000, Entered: None
    ORDER of the 9th Circuit Denying Appellee's Motion to Strike Appellants' Brief. (rr) (Entered: 04/03/2000)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/19/1999, Entered: None
      CERTIFICATE of Record; cc: attys, 9CCA (rr)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: None
        Representation Statement by plaintiff Corp of the Presid (rr) (Entered: 09/15/1999)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff Corp of the Presid from Dist. Court decision [67-2] (Receipt # 12738) (rr) (Entered: 09/15/1999)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/19/1999, Entered: None
            ORDER by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill that the references to "State Farms" on pages 12 & 13 are stricken and that "Farm Bureau" is substituted in their place (cc: all counsel) (dkh) (Entered: 08/20/1999)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/18/1999, Entered: None
              JUDGMENT: by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill Judgment for def ; terminating case (cc: all counsel) (JUDGMENT SCANNED) (dkh) (Entered: 08/19/1999)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/18/1999, Entered: None
                MEMORANDUM, DECISION, AND ORDER: by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill granting motion for summary judgment [35-1] denying motion for partial summary judgment [45-1] granting motion to strike portions of the affidavit of T. Craig Smith (cc: all counsel) (dkh) (Entered: 08/19/1999)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/24/1999, Entered: None
                  MINUTES OF PENDING MOTIONS - taking under advisement on 5/24/99 the motion for summary judgment [35-1], and the motion for partial summary judgment [45-1]; Court granted pla's request to file the full deposition transcript of Craig Smith BLW (dkh) (Entered: 05/25/1999)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: None
                    REPLY by plas to response to motion to strike portions of the affidavit of T. Craig Smith [58-1] (dkh) (Entered: 05/24/1999)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/19/1999, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT of Paul H Matthewes regarding motion for partial summary judgment [45-1] (dkh) (Entered: 05/21/1999)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: None
                        RESPONSE by def Farm Bureau Mutual to motion to strike portions of the affidavit of T. Craig Smith [58-1] (dkh) (Entered: 05/04/1999)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/16/1999, Entered: None
                          MEMORANDUM by plas in support of motion to strike portions of the affidavit of T. Craig Smith [58-1] (dkh) Modified on 04/22/1999
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/14/1999, Entered: None
                            AFFIDAVIT of Ron Kerl regarding motion to strike portions of the affidavit of T. Craig Smith [58-1] (dkh) Modified on 04/22/1999 (Entered: 04/16/1999)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/14/1999, Entered: None
                              REPLY by plas to response to motion for partial summary judgment [45-1] (dkh) Modified on 04/22/1999 (Entered: 04/16/1999)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/14/1999, Entered: None
                                MOTION by plas to strike portions of the affidavit of T. Craig Smith (dkh) (Entered: 04/16/1999)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/31/1999, Entered: None
                                  AFFIDAVIT of T Craig Smith regarding motion for partial summary judgment [45-1] (dkh) (Entered: 04/05/1999)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/31/1999, Entered: None
                                    RESPONSE by def to pla's statement of undisputed facts and response to pla's additional undisputed facts re: motion for partial summary judgment [45-1] (dkh) (Entered: 04/02/1999)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/31/1999, Entered: None
                                      AFFIDAVIT of Brett C Smith regarding motion for summary judgment [35-1] (dkh) (Entered: 04/02/1999)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/31/1999, Entered: None
                                        SECOND AFFIDAVIT of Kent L Hawkins regarding motion for partial summary judgment [45-1], regarding motion for summary judgment [35-1] (dkh) (Entered: 04/02/1999)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/31/1999, Entered: None
                                          REPLY by def to response to motion for summary judgment [35-1] (dkh) (Entered: 04/02/1999)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Blank 52 Filed: 3/31/1999, Entered: None
                                            MEMORANDUM by def Farm Bureau Mutual in opposition re: motion for partial summary judgment [45-1] (dkh) (Entered: 04/02/1999)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: None
                                              SECOND AMENDED ORDER by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill granting motion to modify scheduling order [50-1]; Reply memorandum supporting Def's motion for summary judgment; DDL 3/31/99; motion for partial summary judgment [45-1] ; Response to motion ddl extended to 3/31/99; Pla's reply memorandum re: Pla's motion for partial summary judgment; DDL 4/14/99 ; All Pending Motions Hrg set for 5/24/99 9:00 Pocatello (cc: all counsel) (dkh) (Entered: 03/23/1999)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/15/1999, Entered: None
                                                MOTION by pla and def to modify scheduling order (dkh) (Entered: 03/17/1999)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: None
                                                  RESPONSE by pla re: statement [38-1] (wm) (Entered: 02/18/1999)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: None
                                                    RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by pla to motion for summary judgment [35-1] (wm) (Entered: 02/18/1999)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: None
                                                      STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS by plas in support of motion for partial summary judgment [45-1] (dkh) (Entered: 01/19/1999)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: None
                                                        MEMORANDUM by plas in support of motion for partial summary judgment [45-1] (dkh) (Entered: 01/19/1999)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION by plas for partial summary judgment (dkh) (Entered: 01/19/1999)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/21/1998, Entered: None
                                                            AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill granting motion to modify scheduling order [43-1], motion for summary judgment [35-1] ; Response to motion ddl extended to 2/16/99 hearing set for 10:00 4/26/99 ; Discovery ddl set for 1/31/99 ; Motion Filing ddl 1/15/99 (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 12/29/1998)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/17/1998, Entered: None
                                                              JOINT MOTION by plas to modify scheduling order (wm) (Entered: 12/28/1998)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/30/1998, Entered: None
                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL by def to disclosure of expert witness [22-1] (dkh) (Entered: 12/03/1998)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/16/1998, Entered: None
                                                                  ORDER by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill denying motion to exclude testimony [25-1] (cc: all counsel) (dkh) (Entered: 11/18/1998)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/6/1998, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING motion for summary judgment [35-1] set before BLW in Pocatello 10:00 2/1/99 (cc: all counsel) (dkh) (Entered: 11/10/1998)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/6/1998, Entered: None
                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Kent L Hawkins regarding motion for summary judgment [35-1] (dkh) (Entered: 11/10/1998)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/6/1998, Entered: None
                                                                        STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS by def in support of motion for summary judgment [35-1] (dkh) (Entered: 11/10/1998)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/6/1998, Entered: None
                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Candy Seal regarding motion for summary judgment [35-1] (dkh) (Entered: 11/10/1998)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/6/1998, Entered: None
                                                                            MEMORANDUM by def in support of motion for summary judgment [35-1] (dkh) (Entered: 11/10/1998)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/6/1998, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION by def Farm Bureau Mutual for summary judgment (dkh) (Entered: 11/10/1998)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/6/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE by def Farm Bureau Mutual of withdrawal of motion to quash subpoenas [28-1] motion for protective barring any further subpoenas [28-2] (dkh) (Entered: 11/10/1998)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/30/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by def Farm Bureau Mutual in support of motion to quash subpoenas [28-1], of motion for protective order barring any further subpoenas [28-2] (dkh) (Entered: 11/02/1998)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/22/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING on motion to quash subpoenas [28-1] and motion for protective order barring any further subpoenas [28-2] set before BLW Pocatello 8:00 11/10/98 (cc: all counsel) (dkh) (Entered: 10/23/1998)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/21/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by pla regarding response to def's motion to quash and protective order (dkh) (Entered: 10/22/1998)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Ron Kerl regarding motion to quash subpoenas [28-1], regarding motion for protective order barring any further subpoenas [28-2] (dkh) (Entered: 10/20/1998)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                          RESPONSE by plas to motion to quash subpoenas [28-1], motion for protective order barring any further subpoenas [28-2] (dkh) (Entered: 10/20/1998)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/1/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION by def Farm Bureau Mutual to quash subpoenas , and for protective order barring any further subpoenas (dkh) (Entered: 10/02/1998)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/30/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                              AMENDED ANSWER [16-1] by def Farm Bureau Mutual (dkh) (Entered: 10/01/1998)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/30/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                ORDER by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill granting motion to amend answer [23-1], granting stipulation to amend answer [24-1] (cc: all counsel) (dkh) (Entered: 10/01/1998)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/29/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION by plas to exclude testimony (dkh) (Entered: 10/01/1998)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/29/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                    STIPULATION to amend answer (dkh) (Entered: 10/01/1998)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/29/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION by def Farm Bureau Mutual to amend answer (dkh) (Entered: 10/01/1998)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                        DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES by def Farm Bureau Mutual (dkh) (Entered: 09/22/1998)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/4/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                          DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES by plas (dkh) (Entered: 09/09/1998)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill ; Telephonic Status Conference held 6/30/98 ; Discovery ddl set for 10/23/98 ; Disp Motion ddl set 11/6/98 ; Dispositive motions hearing set for 2/1/99 10:00 Pocatello (cc: all counsel) (dkh) (Entered: 07/09/1998)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/30/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                              SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by pla and def (dkh) (Entered: 07/01/1998)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/5/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE VIA TELEPHONE ; Teleconf set for 6/30/98 10:00 (cc: all counsel) (dkh) (Entered: 06/08/1998)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/7/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill : granting stipulation for protective order [15-1] (cc: all counsel) (dkh)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/1/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    ANSWER by def Farm Bureau Mutual (dkh) (Entered: 05/05/1998)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/4/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      STIPULATION for protective order (dkh) (Entered: 05/05/1998)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/20/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of taking deposition of Brett Smith 5/19/98 (dkh) (Entered: 04/21/1998)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/20/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of taking deposition of Craig Smith 5/19/98 (dkh) (Entered: 04/21/1998)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/20/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of taking deposition of Sandra Smith 5/19/98 (dkh) (Entered: 04/21/1998)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/16/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting motion for attorneys C. Keith Rooker and James B. Gibson to appear pro hac vice [6-1] (cc: all counsel) (jml)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/16/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting motion for attorney Charles W. Dahlquist, II, Randy T. Austin and Alexander Dushku to appear pro hac vice [2-1] (cc: all counsel) (jml)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/15/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS executed upon def Farm Bureau Mutual on 4/14/98 (dkh) Modified on 04/16/1998 (Entered: 04/16/1998)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of James B. Gibson regarding motion for attorneys C. Keith Rooker and James B. Gibson to appear pro hac vice [6-1] (jml) (Entered: 04/16/1998)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of C. Keith Rooker regarding motion for attorneys C. Keith Rooker and James B. Gibson to appear pro hac vice [6-1] (jml) (Entered: 04/16/1998)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION by plaintiff for attorneys C. Keith Rooker and James B. Gibson to appear pro hac vice (jml) (Entered: 04/16/1998)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Alexander Dushku regarding motion for attorney Charles W. Dahlquist, II, Randy T. Austin and Alexander Dushku to appear pro hac vice [2-1] (jml) (Entered: 04/16/1998)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Randy T. Austin regarding motion for attorney Charles W. Dahlquist, II, Randy T. Austin and Alexander Dushku to appear pro hac vice [2-1] (jml) (Entered: 04/16/1998)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Charles W. Dahlquist, II regarding motion for attorney Charles W. Dahlquist, II, Randy T. Austin and Alexander Dushku to appear pro hac vice [2-1] (jml) (Entered: 04/16/1998)
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION by plaintiff for attorney Charles W. Dahlquist, II, Randy T. Austin and Alexander Dushku to appear pro hac vice (jml) (Entered: 04/16/1998)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued) (dh)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?